Perrigo Company PLC v. Mylan N.V.

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-07341
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 20, 2023 at 2:30 PM EST (1.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Perrigo Company Plc, Plaintiff

Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Savitt +1 212 403 1000 +1 212 403 2000 wdsavitt@wlrk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley R. Wilson +1 212 403 1108 +1 212 403 2108 brwilson@wlrk.com
v.
No Logo Mylan N.V., Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331sv
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Timeline
  Entries (83) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/20/2023, Entered: None Sealed Document Disposed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/20/2023, Entered: None Sealed Document Disposed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/18/2023, Entered: None Sealed Document Attorney Notice to Retrieve
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/18/2023, Entered: None Sealed Document Attorney Notice to Retrieve
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 80 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
JOINT STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Plaintiff/Counterclaim-Defendant Perrigo Company plc ("Perrigo") and Defendant/Counterclaim-Plaintiff Mylan N.V. ("Mylan"), by and through their undersigned counsel, hereby stipulate as follows: (1) Perrigo shall and hereby does voluntarily dismiss its claims as stated in the Complaint filed on September 17, 2015, with prejudice, pursuant to federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); (2) Mylan shall and hereby does voluntarily dismiss its counterclaims as stated in the Counterclaims filed on September 22, 2015, with prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); (3) All parties will bear their own costs and fees. IT IS SO STIPULATED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/23/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Perrigo Company PLC, Mylan N.V. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC.(Wilson, Bradley) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Bradley R. Wilson dated 11/12/2015 re: Novemeber 12th Order. Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted version Mylan Ex. 42, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Redacted version Mylan Ex. 43, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Redacted version Mylan Ex. 44, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Redacted version Mylan Ex. 45, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Redacted version Mylan Ex. 60, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Redacted version Papa Depo, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Redacted version Brown Depo)(Wilson, Bradley) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
REDACTION by Mylan N.V. (Attachments: # 1 Document 2a - Redacted, # 2 Document 2b - Redacted, # 3 Document 2c - Redacted, # 4 Document 2d - Redacted, # 5 Document 2e - Redacted, # 6 Document 2f - Redacted, # 7 Document 3a - Redacted, # 8 Document 3b - Redacted, # 9 Document 3c - Redacted, # 10 Document 4 - Redacted, # 11 Document 5 - Redacted, # 12 Document 6a - Redacted, # 13 Document 6b - Redacted, # 14 Document 6c - Redacted, # 15 Document 6d - Redacted, # 16 Document 6e - Redacted, # 17 Document 6f - Redacted, # 18 Document 7 - Redacted, # 19 Document 8 - Redacted, # 20 Document 9 - Redacted, # 21 Document 10 - Redacted, # 22 Document 11 - Redacted, # 23 Document 12 - Redacted, # 24 Document 13 - Redacted, # 25 Document 14 - Redacted, # 26 Document 15 - Redacted, # 27 Document 16 - Redacted, # 28 Document 17a - Redacted, # 29 Document 17b - Redacted, # 30 Document 17c - Redacted, # 31 Document 17d - Redacted, # 32 Document 17e - Redacted, # 33 Document 17f - Redacted, # 34 Document 17g - Redacted, # 35 Document 17h - Redacted, # 36 Document 18 - Redacted, # 37 Document 19 - Redacted, # 38 Document 20 - Redacted, # 39 Document 21 - Redacted, # 40 Document 22 - Redacted, # 41 Document 23 - Redacted, # 42 Document 24 - Redacted, # 43 Document 25 - Redacted, # 44 Document 26 - Redacted, # 45 Document 27 - Redacted)(Nasab, Omid) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Omid H. Nasab dated 11/12/2015 re: We attach as Exhibit A to this letter a new version of this document with the dial-in code redacted. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/12/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 75 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The parties are ordered to file each of their proposed redacted versions of exhibits previously filed under seal on ECF. The filings should reflect the most recent versions of the parties' proposals, including the revisions contained in Exhibit A to Mylan's letter to the Court dated November 11, 2015. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/12/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PERRIGO COMPANY PLC'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION in Support re: 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #52 and unsealed on 11/5/2015.) (kgo) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
PERRIGO COMPANY PLC'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MYLAN N.V.'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION in Opposition re: 44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #46 and unsealed on 11/5/2015.) (kgo) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFF MYLAN N.V.'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION in Support re: 44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Mylan N.V.. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #51 and unsealed on 11/5/2015.) (kgo) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 71 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 70 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF/COUNTERCLAIM-DEFENDANT PERRIGO COMPANY PLC'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION in Opposition re: 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Mylan N.V.. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #35 and unsealed on 11/5/2015.) (kgo) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PERRIGO COMPANY PLC'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION in Support re: 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #30 and unsealed on 11/5/2015.) (kgo) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFF MYLAN N.V.'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Document filed by Mylan N.V.. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #29 and unsealed on 11/5/2015.) (kgo) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 65 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. In light of the public filing of the opinion and the fact that the parties' briefs will be publicly filed in their entirety shortly, we believe the following course of action is appropriate, as further set forth in this Order. Mylan should determine whether information conta1ned in the disputed proposed redactions or temporarily sealed exh1bits was rel1ed upon in the parties' briefing or by the Court in its opinion, and modify its proposal so as to make those portions of the exhibits publicly available immediately, and as further set forth in this Order. Mylan's proposed redactions at page 9 and 15 of the PwC private report must be revised. The Court believes Mylan may disclose limited aspects of Goldman's analyses that make clear that Goldman's models credited the Perrigo entity in a less-than-100% ownership s1tuation with a pro-rata portion of combined synergies--the point for which the Perrigo cited the analyses--without disclosing additional sensitive information. Both parties are directed to review their proposals in light of the forego1ng discussion, and are ordered to file under seal and to subm1t two copies of revised proposals directly to Chambers no later than Monday, November 9, 2015, at 10:00 AM. At the outset, Mylan should clarify whether it objects to any of Perrigo's proposed redactions, and as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/5/2015) (rjm) Modified on 11/5/2015 (rjm). (Entered: 11/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 63 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the following filings are unsealed: 1. The Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff Perrigo Company plc's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, filed under seal on October 14, 2015; Perrigo Company plc's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Mylan N.V.'s Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, filed under seal on October 16, 2015; and the Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff Perrigo Company plc's Motion for Preliminary Injunct1on, filed under seal on October 19, 2015. 2. The Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant/Counterclaim-Plaintiff Mylan N.V.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed under seal on October 14, 2015; the Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff/Counterclaim-Defendant Perrigo Company plc's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed under seal on October 16, 2015; and the Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant/Counterclaim-Plaintiff Mylan N.V.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed under seal on October 19, 2015. 3. Exhibits 51, 53, 54, and 65 to the Declaration of Sandra C. Goldstein in Opposition to Plaintiff/Counterclaim-Defendant Perr1go Company plc's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed under seal on October 16, 2015. 4. Exhibit 76 to the Supplemental Declaration of Stefan H. Atkinson in Support of Defendant/Counterclaim-Plaintiff Mylan N.V.'s Mot1on for Preliminary Injunction, filed under seal on October 19, 2015. 5. Exhibits L, R, T, U, II, KK, and QQ to the Declaration of Bradley R. Wilson in Support of Perrigo's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, filed under seal on October 14, 2015. 6. Exhibits 6 and 18 to the Declaration of Bradley R. Wilson in Opposition to Mylan N.V.'s Mot1on for a Preliminary Injunction, filed under seal on October 16, 2015. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/5/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 36 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 44 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. For the reasons set forth in this opinion, the Court denies Perrigo's and Mylan's motions for a preliminary injunction. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/29/2015) (kko) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/21/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/21/2015 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 59 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Kevin J. Orsini dated October 26, 2015 re: the treatment of confidential documents. Document filed by Mylan N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B--under seal, # 3 Exhibit C--under seal, # 4 Exhibit D--under seal, # 5 Exhibit E--under seal, # 6 Exhibit F--under seal, # 7 Exhibit G--under seal, # 8 Exhibit H--under seal, # 9 Exhibit I--under seal, # 10 Exhibit J--under seal, # 11 Exhibit K--under seal, # 12 Exhibit L--under seal, # 13 Exhibit M--under seal, # 14 Exhibit N--under seal, # 15 Exhibit O--under seal, # 16 Exhibit P--under seal, # 17 Exhibit Q--under seal, # 18 Exhibit R--under seal, # 19 Exhibit S--under seal, # 20 Exhibit T--under seal, # 21 Exhibit U--under seal, # 22 Exhibit V--under seal, # 23 Exhibit W--under seal, # 24 Exhibit X--under seal, # 25 Exhibit Y--under seal, # 26 Exhibit Z--under seal, # 27 Exhibit AA--under seal, # 28 Exhibit BB--under seal)(Orsini, Kevin) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Kevin J. Orsini dated October 20, 2015 re: application to bring electronic devices to the court for use during the hearing. Document filed by Mylan N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Orsini, Kevin) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Defendant-counterclaimant Mylan N.V. ("Mylan") requests that the courtroom be closed during the oral argument scheduled for October 21 on the motions of Mylan and plaintiff-counterclaim defendant Perrigo Company plc ("Perrigo") for a preliminary injunction. Mylan requests that this Court seal oral argument, asserting that its disclosure in open court of certain internal financial estimates relevant to its defense may run afoul of Irish Takeover Rule 19.3(b), and offers to submit a redacted version of the transcript to be publicly filed after the hearing. Our reading of Rule 19.3(b) does not lead us to conclude that Mylan's presentation of such estimates in open court would violate the Rule. Moreover, even assum1ng that our interpretation is incorrect, Rule 19.3(b) expressly permits a party to consult the Irish Takeover Panel and seek an exception from the Rule's requirements, however understood. Mylan, having failed to avail itself of such a remedy despite knowing for weeks that certain statements regarding financial estimates would very likely be implicated by its counterclaims and its defense in this action, cannot now invoke Rule 19.3(b) to prevent public access to judicial proceedings. This conclusion is especially warranted because the central issue in this tender offer case is the adequacy and/or accuracy of statements made by the offeror and target to the shareholders of the target corporation. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/19/2015) (rjm) Modified on 10/19/2015 (rjm). (Entered: 10/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Sandra C. Goldstein dated October 16, 2015 re: Perrigo's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Mylan N.V..(Goldstein, Sandra) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 54 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Sandra C. Goldstein in Opposition re: 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Mylan N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 37, # 2 Exhibit 38 (Filed Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 39 (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit 40 (Filed Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit 41, # 6 Exhibit 42 (Filed Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit 43 (Filed Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit 44 (Filed Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit 45 (Filed Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit 46 (Filed Under Seal), # 11 Exhibit 47, # 12 Exhibit 48 (Filed Under Seal), # 13 Exhibit 49, # 14 Exhibit 50 (Filed Under Seal), # 15 Exhibit 51, # 16 Exhibit 52, # 17 Exhibit 53, # 18 Exhibit 54, # 19 Exhibit 55 (Filed Under Seal), # 20 Exhibit 56 (Intentionally Omitted), # 21 Exhibit 57, # 22 Exhibit 58 (Filed Under Seal), # 23 Exhibit 59 (Filed Under Seal), # 24 Exhibit 60 (Filed Under Seal), # 25 Exhibit 61, # 26 Exhibit 62 (Intentionally Omitted), # 27 Exhibit 63 (Intentionally Omitted), # 28 Exhibit 64 (Intentionally Omitted), # 29 Exhibit 65, # 30 Exhibit 66 (Filed Under Seal), # 31 Exhibit 67 (Filed Under Seal), # 32 Exhibit 68 (Filed Under Seal), # 33 Exhibit 69 (Filed Under Seal), # 34 Exhibit 70 (Filed Under Seal), # 35 Exhibit 71, # 36 Exhibit 72, # 37 Exhibit 73, # 38 Exhibit 74 (Part I), # 39 Exhibit 74 (Part II), # 40 Exhibit 74 (Part III), # 41 Exhibit 74 (Part IV), # 42 Exhibit 74 (Part V), # 43 Exhibit 74 (Part VI), # 44 Exhibit 74 (Part VII), # 45 Exhibit 74 (Part VIII), # 46 Exhibit 74 (Part IX), # 47 Exhibit 74 (Part X), # 48 Exhibit 74 (Part XI), # 49 Exhibit 74 (Part XII), # 50 Exhibit 74 (Part XIII), # 51 Exhibit 74 (Part XIV), # 52 Exhibit 74 (Part XV))(Goldstein, Sandra) (Attachment 15 replaced on 11/12/2015) (kgo). (Attachment 17 replaced on 11/12/2015) (kgo). (Attachment 18 replaced on 11/12/2015) (kgo). (Attachment 29 replaced on 11/12/2015) (kgo). Modified on 11/12/2015 (kgo). (These documents (Exhibits 51, 53, 54, 65) were previously sealed in envelope #35 and unsealed on 11/5/2015.) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 53 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 52 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 51 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 50 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #54) DECLARATION of Sandra C. Goldstein in Opposition re: 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Mylan N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 37, # 2 Exhibit 38 (Filed Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 39 (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit 40 (Filed Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit 41, # 6 Exhibit 42 (Filed Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit 43 (Filed Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit 44 (Filed Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit 45 (Filed Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit 46 (Filed Under Seal), # 11 Exhibit 47, # 12 Exhibit 48 (Filed Under Seal), # 13 Exhibit 49, # 14 Exhibit 50 (Filed Under Seal), # 15 Exhibit 51 (Filed Under Seal), # 16 Exhibit 52, # 17 Exhibit 53 (Filed Under Seal), # 18 Exhibit 54 (Filed Under Seal), # 19 Exhibit 55 (Filed Under Seal))(Goldstein, Sandra) Modified on 10/19/2015 (lb). (Entered: 10/19/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Redacted). Document filed by Mylan N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Part II))(Goldstein, Sandra) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Omid H. Nasab dated October 14, 2015 re: Mylan's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Mylan N.V..(Nasab, Omid) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 47 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Stefan H. Atkinson in Support re: 44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Mylan N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Part I, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Part II, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Part I, # 9 Exhibit 7 - Part II, # 10 Exhibit 8 (Filed Under Seal), # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14 (Filed Under Seal), # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18 (Filed Under Seal), # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20 (Filed Under Seal), # 23 Exhibit 21 (Filed Under Seal), # 24 Exhibit 22 (Filed Under Seal), # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27 (Filed Under Seal), # 30 Exhibit 28 (Filed Under Seal), # 31 Exhibit 29 (Filed Under Seal), # 32 Exhibit 30 (Filed Under Seal), # 33 Exhibit 31, # 34 Exhibit 32, # 35 Exhibit 33, # 36 Exhibit 34 (Filed Under Seal), # 37 Exhibit 35 (Filed Under Seal), # 38 Exhibit 36)(Nasab, Omid) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 46 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Redacted). Document filed by Mylan N.V.. (Nasab, Omid) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Mylan N.V..(Nasab, Omid) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Kevin J. Orsini dated October 16, 2015 re: oral argument on October 21, 2015. Document filed by Mylan N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of S. B. Ranalow (redacted))(Orsini, Kevin) (Entered: 10/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Bradley R. Wilson dated 10/14/15 re: Perrigo's motion for preliminary injunction (redacted). Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC.(Wilson, Bradley) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Michael McDowell SC in Support re: 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Annex A, # 2 Annex B, # 3 Annex C, # 4 Annex D, # 5 Annex E, # 6 Annex F)(Wilson, Bradley) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Daniel R. Fischel in Support re: 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)(Wilson, Bradley) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Bradley R. Wilson in Support re: 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C (under seal), # 4 Exhibit D (under seal), # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L (under seal), # 13 Exhibit M (under seal), # 14 Exhibit N (under seal), # 15 Exhibit O (under seal), # 16 Exhibit P (under seal), # 17 Exhibit Q (under seal), # 18 Exhibit R (under seal), # 19 Exhibit S (under seal), # 20 Exhibit T (under seal), # 21 Exhibit U (under seal), # 22 Exhibit V (under seal), # 23 Exhibit W (under seal), # 24 Exhibit X (under seal), # 25 Exhibit Y (under seal), # 26 Exhibit Z (under seal), # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH (under seal), # 35 Exhibit II (under seal), # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK (under seal), # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN (under seal), # 41 Exhibit OO (under seal), # 42 Exhibit PP, # 43 Exhibit QQ (under seal), # 44 Exhibit RR, # 45 Exhibit SS (under seal), # 46 Exhibit TT, # 47 Exhibit UU, # 48 Exhibit VV, # 49 Exhibit WW)(Wilson, Bradley) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Sandra C. Goldstein dated October 13, 2015 (redacted version) re: responding to Plaintiff's letter of October 9, 2015. Document filed by Mylan N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Sandra) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Redacted). Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC. (Wilson, Bradley) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC.(Wilson, Bradley) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from William Savitt dated October 9, 2015 Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (under seal), # 2 Exhibit B (under seal), # 3 Exhibit C (under seal), # 4 Exhibit D (under seal), # 5 Exhibit E)(Savitt, William) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Bradley R. Wilson dated October 11, 2015 Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (under seal), # 2 Exhibit B (under seal), # 3 Exhibit C (under seal), # 4 Exhibit D (under seal), # 5 Exhibit E (under seal), # 6 Exhibit F (redacted), # 7 Exhibit G (redacted), # 8 Exhibit H (redacted), # 9 Exhibit I (redacted), # 10 Exhibit J (redacted), # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L (redacted), # 13 Exhibit M (redacted), # 14 Exhibit N (under seal))(Wilson, Bradley) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Sandra C. Goldstein dated October 13, 2015 (redacted version) re: responding to Plaintiff's letter of October 9, 2015. Document filed by Mylan N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Sandra) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Sandra C. Goldstein dated October 11, 2015 re: in response to letter from Mr. Wilson of this date. Document filed by Mylan N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Sandra) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 29 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Omid H. Nasab on behalf of Mylan N.V.. (Nasab, Omid) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from William Savitt dated October 9, 2015 Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (under seal), # 2 Exhibit B (under seal), # 3 Exhibit C (under seal), # 4 Exhibit D (under seal), # 5 Exhibit E (under seal))(Savitt, William) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Bradley R. Wilson dated October 8, 2015 re: Perrigo's redactions (redacted letter). Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E (under seal), # 6 Exhibit F (under seal), # 7 Exhibit G (under seal), # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K (under seal), # 12 Exhibit L (under seal))(Wilson, Bradley) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 18 Motion for Charles D. Cording to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/8/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Sandra C. Goldstein dated October 7, 2015 re: Perrigo's redactions (redacted letter). Document filed by Mylan N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--under seal, # 2 Exhibit B--under seal, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E--redacted, # 6 Exhibit F--redacted, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H--redacted, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J--under seal, # 11 Exhibit K--under seal)(Goldstein, Sandra) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED AND PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING THE PRODUCTION AND EXCHANGE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS... regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/5/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None
MOTION for Charles Dean Cording to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11474713. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cording, Charles) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REGARDING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: Motions due by 10/14/2015. Responses due by 10/16/2015 Replies due by 10/19/2015. Deposition due by 10/13/2015. Oral Argument set for 10/21/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/1/2015) (ajs) Modified on 10/5/2015 (mt). (Entered: 10/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Sandra C. Goldstein dated September 25, 2015 re: responding to Perrigo's letter of this date (docket entry no. 15). Document filed by Mylan N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Goldstein, Sandra) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from William Savitt dated September 25, 2015 re: Proposed Schedule. Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Savitt, William) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Sandra C. Goldstein dated September 24, 2015 re: Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Mylan N.V..(Goldstein, Sandra) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Mylan N.V. on September 20, 2015. Service was accepted by Sandra Goldstein. Service was made by e-mail. Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC. (Wilson, Bradley) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Abbott Laboratories for Mylan N.V., Mylan N.V.. Document filed by Mylan N.V..(Goldstein, Sandra) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin J. Orsini on behalf of Mylan N.V.. (Orsini, Kevin) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sandra C Goldstein on behalf of Mylan N.V.. (Goldstein, Sandra) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
COUNTERCLAIM against Perrigo Company PLC.Document filed by Mylan N.V..(Goldstein, Sandra) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mylan N.V..(Goldstein, Sandra) Modified on 9/23/2015 (lb). (Entered: 09/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from William Savitt dated September 20, 2015 re: Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC.(Savitt, William) (Entered: 09/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mylan N.V.. (pc) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bradley Reid Wilson on behalf of Perrigo Company PLC. (Wilson, Bradley) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mylan N.V., re: 2 Complaint. Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC. (Savitt, William) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC.(Savitt, William) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Mylan N.V.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11397572)Document filed by Perrigo Company PLC.(Savitt, William) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Savitt, William) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 179 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?