Fleischer v. American Airlines
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00784
District Judge Robert W. Sweet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 8:22 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Estelle Fleischer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Spragg +1 212 973 3435 +1 212 972 9432 rspragg@kreindler.com
v.
No Logo Airbus Industrie G.I.E., Defendant
AMR Corporation AMR Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "American Airlines"
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Randal Robert Craft +1 212 513 3200
LEAD ATTORNEY DAVID J. HARRINGTON +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010 david.harrington@hklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan D. Reitzfeld +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010 alan.reitzfeld@hklaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331pi
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REGARDING STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL, This Document Relates To: All Actions, WHEREAS, attached as an Addendum to this Order is a list prepared by Holland & Knight LLP, co- counsel for defendants American Airlines, Inc. and AMR Corporation (collectively "American"), of individual cases in which original stipulations of dismissal (hereinafter "Stipulations"), with prejudice and without costs, have been signed by counsel for the respective parties but have not yet been filed; WHEREAS, there are more than 250 Stipulations, the Court's files for some of the cases referred to in the Stipulations have already been ordered to be closed (administratively or otherwise), and the filing of the Stipulations may result in unnecessary administrative burdens to the offices of the Clerk of the Court; NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. The Stipulations are hereby deemed to have been filed with and docketed by the Clerk of this Court; 2. In accordance with the Stipulations, the cases referred to in the Stipulations are hereby dismissed with prejudice but without interest or costs to any party; and 3. The Stipulations shall be retained by the law firm of Holland & Knight LLP, in their offices or in offsite storage, for a period of no less than seven years. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/20/10) (pl) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    MINUTE ORDER PURSUANT TO MEMORANDUM FROM THE ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. COURTS, DATED JUNE 15TH, 1973....Case Closed administratively pursuant to Memorandum from the Administrative Office of the United States Courts dated June 15th, 1973. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 5/29/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David J Harrington, Randal R. Craft, Jr, Alan David Reitzfeld on behalf of American Airlines (jar) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
        CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York, Case Number: 1:04-cv-4671, MDL Number: MDL 1448. (Signed by Judge MDL Panel on 1/6/05) (laq, ) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 113 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?