Allstate Insurance Company v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-08678
District Judge Robert W. Sweet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 2:43 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Allstate Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J. Sommi +1 212 908 1244 +1 212 509 9492 msommi@cozen.com
v.
No Logo Airbus Industrie, Defendant
Officially listed as "Airbus"
No Logo Airbus France, SAS, Defendant
No Logo Airbus Industrie G.I.E., Defendant
No Logo Airbus Industrie of North America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Airbus North America, Defendant
No Logo Airbus North America Customer Service, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Airbus North America Holdings, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Airbus North America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Airbus, SAS, Defendant
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Clyde & Co US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Carlsen +1 212 710 3900 +1 212 710 3950 christopher.carlsen@clydeco.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo AMR Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clyde & Co US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Carlsen +1 212 710 3900 +1 212 710 3950 christopher.carlsen@clydeco.us
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332tm
Nature of Suit 245 - Real Property: Tort Product Liability
  Entries (1) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER PURSUANT TO MEMORANDUM FROM THE ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. COURTS, DATED JUNE 15TH, 1973....Case Closed administratively pursuant to Memorandum from the Administrative Office of the United States Courts dated June 15th, 1973. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 5/29/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
    LREF

    Statistics

    This case has been viewed 107 times.

    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
    Space
    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
     
    PlainSite
    Sign Up
    Need Password Help?