Jeffrey P. Goldstein v. Mill End Shops, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00239-JFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 12:52 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo United States of America ex rel Jeffrey P. Goldstein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grayson, Kubli & Hoffman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Victor Kubli +1 703 442 8672 kubli@graysonlaw.net
v.
No Logo Mill End Shops, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Richard A Simpson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan M Jacobs +1 202 719 7000 +1 202 719 7049 jjacobs@wileyrein.com
United States of America United States of America, Movant
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen M Schenning +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 209 3124 stephen.schenning@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/29/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729 False Claims Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 3/25/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '03-1464'['Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals']
Def Custody Status
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 38 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 USCA Mandate
JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) "AFFIRMING" the judgment of Disrict Court as to [36] Notice of Appeal filed by United States of America ex rel Jeffrey P. Goldstein (sls, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 37 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Certificate of Clerk
    Certificate of Clerk certifying the record is complete for appeal purposes re: [36] Notice of Appeal (FCCA# 03-1464) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 USCA Case Number
      USCA Case Number 03-1464 for [36] Notice of Appeal filed by United States of America ex rel Jeffrey P. Goldstein. (Case Manager - Margaret Thomas) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
        Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re [36] Notice of Appeal (sls, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003, Terminated: 3/2/2004 Notice of Appeal
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by United States of America ex rel Jeffrey P. Goldstein. Filing fee $ 105. Appeal Record due by 5/7/2003. (Attachments: # (1) Appealed Order)(Kubli, Victor)
          LREF
          Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [27] Motion of defendant to Dismiss the amended complaint; DISMISSING this action without leave to amend. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/25/03. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
            MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/25/03. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 33 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Response in Support of Motion
              REPLY MEMORANDUM by Mill End Shops, Inc. in support of its [27-1] motion to Dismiss Relator's Amended Complaint (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [31-1] motion of defendant Mill End Shops, Inc. for Enlargement of Time to Reply to Relator's opposition to defendant's Motion to Dismiss to 2/7/03. (signed by Judge J. F. Motz 1/24/03) (c/i 1/24/03) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 31 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003, Terminated: 1/24/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                  CONSENT MOTION by Mill End Shops, Inc. for Enlargement of Time to Reply to Relator's opposition to defendant's Motion to Dismiss (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 30 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Response in Opposition
                    RESPONSE by Jeffrey P. Goldstein in opposition to [27-1] motion to Dismiss Relator's Amended Complaint by Mill End Shops, Inc. (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [28-1] consent motion of Jeffrey P. Goldstein for Extension of Time to file opposition to defendant Mill End Shops, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss to 1/10/03. (signed by Judge J. F. Motz 12/27/02) (c/i 12/27/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 28 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002, Terminated: 12/27/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                        CONSENT MOTION by Jeffrey P. Goldstein for Extension of Time to file opposition to defendant Mill End Shops, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 27 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002, Terminated: 3/25/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                          MOTION with memorandum in support by Mill End Shops, Inc. to Dismiss Relator's Amended Complaint (c/s) (rec'd 12/13/02 in GB) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/17/2002
                            LREF
                            Blank 26 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Jury Demand
                            DEMAND for jury trial by Jeffrey P. Goldstein (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 26 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Amended Complaint
                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jeffrey P. Goldstein, amending [1-1] complaint (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 26 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE of filing of the Amended Complaint by Jeffrey P. Goldstein (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [23-1] motion of Jeffrey P. Goldstein for Extension of Time to file an Amended Complaint ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 11/19/02) (c/i 11/19/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 24 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                    MEMORANDUM by Mill End Shops, Inc. in opposition to [23-1] motion for Extension of Time to file an Amended Complaint by Jeffrey P. Goldstein and Exhibit 1 (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 23 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002, Terminated: 11/19/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                      MOTION by Jeffrey P. Goldstein for Extension of Time to file an Amended Complaint (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [13-1] motion of Mill End Shops, Inc. to Dismiss Relator's Complaint; DISMISSING the complaint in its entirety for failure to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b); DIRECTING that plaintiff is granted 21 days in which to file an amended complaint. (signed by Judge J. F. Motz 10/8/02)(c/i & microfilmed 10/8/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                          MEMORANDUM (signed by Judge J. F. Motz 10/8/02) (c/i 10/8/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                            REPLY by Mill End Shops, Inc. to response to its [13-1] motion to Dismiss (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [18-1] motion of defendant Mill End Shops, Inc. for Extension of Time to file Reply on or before 7/26/02. (signed by Judge J. F. Motz 7/16/02) (c/i 7/16/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 18 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002, Terminated: 7/16/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                CONSENT MOTION by Mill End Shops, Inc. for Extension of Time to file a Reply (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Response in Opposition
                                                  RESPONSE by Jeffrey P. Goldstein in opposition to [13-1] motion to Dismiss Relator's Complaint by Mill End Shops, Inc. and Exhibit 1 (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER GRANTING [15-1] Consent motion of Jeffrey P. Goldstein to Extend Time to File Opposition to Defendant Mill End Shops, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss to 7/9/02. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 6/28/02 ) (c/i 6/28/02) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002, Terminated: 6/28/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                      CONSENT MOTION by Jeffrey P. Goldstein to Extend Time to File Opposition to Defendant Mill End Shops, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Mill End Shops, Inc. 4/15/02 (rec'd 6/5/02) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002, Terminated: 10/8/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                          MOTION with memorandum in support by Mill End Shops, Inc. to Dismiss Relator's Complaint (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [11-1] motion of Mill End Shops, Inc. for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading set Answer deadline to 6/7/02 for End Shops, Inc. ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 5/7/02) (c/i 5/7/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002, Terminated: 5/7/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                              CONSENT MOTION by Mill End Shops, Inc. for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [9-1] motion of Mill End Shops, Inc. for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading set Answer deadline to 6/7/02 for End Shops, Inc. ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 5/6/02) (c/i 5/6/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002, Terminated: 5/6/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                  CONSENT MOTION by Mill End Shops, Inc. for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 Summons Issued
                                                                    SUMMONS(ES) 20 days issued for Mill End Shops, Inc. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER DIRECTING that the seal is hereby lifted on the Complaint and the pleadings shall be served upon the defendant by the relator; DIRECTING that all other contents of the Court's file remain under seal, shall not be made public or served upon defendant, except for this Order and the government's Notice of Election to Decline Intervention; DIRECTING that the seal be lifted as to all other matters occurring after the date of this Order, as therein set forth. ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 2/5/02) (c/m 2/6/02 eg ) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                        NOTICE by United States of Election to Decline Intervention (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion of United States for a Second Extension of Time to Intervene; DIRECTING that the United States shall notice its election to intervene or otherwise participate in the canse no later than 6/24/02, granting [4-2] motion of United States to Continue Case under ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 7/31/01) (c/m 7/31/01 eg) (UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/06/2002
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001, Terminated: 7/31/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                            MOTION by United States for a Second Extension of Time to Intervene and Continue Case under Seal (UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/06/2002
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [2-1] unopposed motion of United States for Extension of Time to Intervene no later than 10/2/01, granting [2-2] motion of United States to Continue Case Under Seal ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 2/15/01 ) (c/m 2/15/01 eg) (UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/06/2002
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001, Terminated: 2/15/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION by United States for Extension of Time to Intervene and Continue Case Under Seal (c/s) (UNDER SEAL)(eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/06/2002
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Jury Demand
                                                                                  DEMAND for jury trial by Jeffrey P. Goldstein (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Complaint
                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1173099 (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 62 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?