Jeffrey P. Goldstein v. Cresthill Draperies, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00240-JFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo United States of America ex rel Jeffrey P. Goldstein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grayson, Kubli & Hoffman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Victor Kubli +1 703 442 8672 kubli@graysonlaw.net
v.
No Logo John Carrow, Ltd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNCIL, BARADEL, KOSMERL & NOLAN, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Patrick Nolan +1 410 268 6600 +1 410 269 8409 Nolan@cbknlaw.com
Space Susan Stobbart Shapiro +1 410 269 6190 +1 410 269 8409 Shapiro@cbknlaw.com
United States of America United States of America, Movant
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen M Schenning +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 209 3124 stephen.schenning@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/29/2001
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729 False Claims Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 4/10/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '03-1465'['Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals']
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 50 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
ORDER denying as moot [47] Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/16/04. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 49 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 USCA Mandate
    JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy)"AFFIRMING" the judgment of the District Court as to [46] Notice of Appeal filed by United States of America ex rel Jeffrey P. Goldstein (sls, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 48 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Certificate of Clerk
      Certificate of Clerk certifying the record is complete for appeal purposes re: [46] Notice of Appeal (FCCA# 03-1465) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 USCA Case Number
        USCA Case Number 03-1465 for [46] Notice of Appeal filed by United States of America ex rel Jeffrey P. Goldstein. (Case Manager - Margaret Thomas) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Legal Document 47 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 3/16/2004 Motion for Attorney Fees
          MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses by John Carrow, Ltd. Responses due by 5/5/2003 (Shapiro, Susan)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
            Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re [46] Notice of Appeal (sls, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Legal Document 46 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003, Terminated: 3/2/2004 Notice of Appeal
              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [45] Order on Motion to Dismiss, by United States of America ex rel Jeffrey P. Goldstein. Filing fee $ 105. Appeal Record due by 5/12/2003. (Kubli, Victor)
                LREF
                Legal Document 45 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                ORDER For the reason stated in the opinion issued in the various companion cases JFM 00-3459, JFM 01-239, JFM 01-1154, JFM 01-1155 and JFM 01-1156 (a copy of which is attached); granting [39] Motion of defendant to Dismiss the Amended Complaint; DISMISSING this action;. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/10/03. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 44 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [39] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Reply to Relator's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by John Carrow, Ltd. (Shapiro, Susan)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Response in Opposition to Motion
                    RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by United States of America ex rel Jeffrey P. Goldstein. Replies due by 4/17/2003. (Attachments: # (1))(Kubli, Victor)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 42 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003, Terminated: 4/10/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION to Dismiss correctly efiled motion to dismiss by John Carrow, Ltd. Responses due by 4/4/2003 (Shapiro, Susan)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 41 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003, Terminated: 4/10/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                      MOTION to Dismiss Proposed order of dismissal by John Carrow, Ltd. Responses due by 4/4/2003 (Shapiro, Susan)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 40 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003, Terminated: 4/10/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss by John Carrow, Ltd. Responses due by 4/4/2003 (Shapiro, Susan)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 39 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003, Terminated: 4/10/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                          MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by John Carrow, Ltd. Responses due by 4/4/2003 (Shapiro, Susan)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [36-1] unopposed motion of Jeffrey P. Goldstein to Waive Local Rule Redline Requirement for filing his Amended Complaint. ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 2/26/03) (c/i 2/26/03) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 37 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Jury Demand
                              DEMAND for jury trial by Jeffrey P. Goldstein (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 37 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Amended Complaint
                                AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jeffrey P. Goldstein, amending [1-1] complaint (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 36 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003, Terminated: 2/26/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION by Jeffrey P. Goldstein to Waive Local Rule Redline Requirement and proposed Amended Complaint (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 35 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [21-1] motion of John Carrow, Ltd. for Judgment on the Pleadings, provided, however, that plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint on or before 2/25/03; and granting [21-2] motion of John Carrow, Ltd. for Protective Order ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 2/11/03) (c/i 2/11/03) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                      MEMORANDUM (signed by Judge J. F. Motz 2/11/03) (c/i 2/11/03) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 33 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                        REPLY by John Carrow, Ltd to Relator's opposition to his [21-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and his [21-2] motion for Protective Order (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER denying [20-1] motion of Jeffrey P. Goldstein to Compel responses to Relator's First Request for Production of Documents ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 1/10/03) (c/i 1/13/03) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 31 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Response in Opposition
                                            RESPONSE by Jeffrey P. Goldstein in opposition to [21-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by John Carrow, Ltd, [21-2] motion for Protective Order by John Carrow, Ltd and attachment 1 (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER AMENDING scheduling order ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 1/3/03) (c/i 1/3/03) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 29 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Reply to Response
                                                REPLY by Jeffrey P. Goldstein in support of his [18-1] motion to Reschedule Expert Designation Dates (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 Reply to Response
                                                  REPLY by Jeffrey P. Goldstein in support of his [20-1] motion to Compel responses to Relator's First Request for Production of Documents (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 01/02/2003
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [26-1] consent motion of Jeffrey P. Goldstein for Extension of Time to file opposition to defendant Cresthill Draperies, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss to 1/10/03. (signed by Judge J. F. Motz 12/27/02) (c/i 12/27/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002, Terminated: 12/27/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                      CONSENT MOTION by Jeffrey P. Goldstein for Extension of Time to file opposition to defendant Cresthill Draperies, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER denying [19-1] motion of Relator's Jeffrey Goldstein to Compel defendant Cresthill Draperies' Initial Disclosures (signed by Judge J. F. Motz 12/27/02) (c/i 12/27/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002, Terminated: 1/3/2003 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                          MOTION by John Carrow, Ltd to Revise Entire [17-1] Scheduling Order (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Response to Motion
                                                            RESPONSE by John Carrow, Ltd to [18-1] motion to Reschedule Expert Designation Dates by Jeffrey P. Goldstein (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Response in Opposition
                                                              RESPONSE by John Carrow, Ltd in opposition to [20-1] motion to Compel responses to Relator's First Request for Production of Documents by Jeffrey P. Goldstein (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Response in Opposition
                                                                RESPONSE by John Carrow, Ltd in opposition to [19-1] motion to Compel defendant Cresthill Draperies' Initial Disclosures by Jeffrey P. Goldstein (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002, Terminated: 2/11/2003 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                  MOTION with memorandum in support by John Carrow, Ltd for Judgment on the Pleadings and for Protective Order (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002, Terminated: 1/13/2003 Motion to Compel
                                                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Jeffrey P. Goldstein to Compel responses to Relator's First Request for Production of Documents (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002, Terminated: 12/27/2002 Motion to Compel
                                                                      MOTION with memorandum in support by Jeffrey P. Goldstein to Compel defendant Cresthill Draperies' Initial Disclosures (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002, Terminated: 4/10/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                        MOTION by Jeffrey P. Goldstein to Reschedule Expert Designation Dates (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER (signed by Judge J. F. Motz 7/30/02) (c/i 7/30/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                            ANSWER by John Carrow, Ltd (Attorney James P Nolan, Susan Stobbart Shapiro) to amended complaint; jury demand (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jeffrey P. Goldstein, amending [1-1] complaint against John Carrow, Ltd (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [13-1] consent/motion of Jeffrey P. Goldstein for Leave to File an Amended Complaint to correct a misnomer ( signed by Judge J. F. 6/17/02) (c/i 6/17/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002, Terminated: 6/17/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                  CONSENT MOTION by Jeffrey P. Goldstein for Leave to File an Amended Complaint to correct a misnomer (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [11-1] consent/motion of Cresthill Draperies for Extension of Time to answer the complaint set Answer deadline to 6/24/02 for Draperies ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 6/12/02) (c/i 6/12/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002, Terminated: 6/12/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                      CONSENT MOTION by Cresthill Draperies for Extension of Time to answer the complaint (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                        NOTICE of attorney appearance for Cresthill Draperies by James P Nolan, Susan Stobbart Shapiro (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Cresthill Draperies 4/17/02 Answer due on 5/7/02 (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 Summons Issued
                                                                                            SUMMONS(ES) 20 days issued for Cresthill Draperies (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER DIRECTING that the seal is hereby lifted on the Complaint and the pleadings shall be served upon the defendant by the relator; DIRECTING that all other contents of the Court's file remain under seal, except for this Order and the government's Notice of Election to Decline Intervention; DIRECTING that the seal shall be lifted as to all other matters occurring after the date of this Order, as therein set forth. (signed by Judge J. F. Motz 2/5/02) (c/m 2/6/02 eg) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                NOTICE by United States of Election to Decline Intervention (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [4-1] unopposed motion for a second Extension of Time to Intervene, granting [4-2] motion to Continue case under Seal (signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 7/31/01) (c/m 7/31/01 eg) (UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/06/2002
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001, Terminated: 7/31/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION by United States for a second Extension of Time to Intervene , and to Continue case under Seal (UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/06/2002
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [2-1] unopposed motion of United States to Extend Time to Intervene, granting [2-2] Unopposed motion to Continue case under Seal ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 7/31/01) (c/m 7/31/01 eg) (UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/06/2002
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001, Terminated: 7/31/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION by United States to Extend Time to Intervene , and to Continue case under Seal (UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/06/2002
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Jury Demand
                                                                                                          DEMAND for jury trial by Jeffrey P. Goldstein (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1173097 (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?