Federal Trade Commission v. Roca Labs, Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:15-cv-02231-MSS-TBM
District Judge Mary S. Scriven, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Mary S. Scriven
Last Updated January 4, 2019 at 4:56 PM EST (6.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
Federal Trade Commission Federal Trade Commission, Plaintiff

Represented by Federal Trade Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J Davis +1 202 326 2458 +1 202 326 3259 mdavis@ftc.gov
Space Carl H Settlemyer, III +1 202 326 2019 +1 202 326 3259 csettlemyer@ftc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl H Settlemyer, III +1 202 326 2019 +1 202 326 3259 csettlemyer@ftc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Spelman +1 202 326 2487 +1 202 326 3396 pspelman@ftc.gov
Space Paul Spelman +1 202 326 2487 +1 202 326 3396 pspelman@ftc.gov
v.
No Logo Don Juravin, Defendant

Represented by Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. Must Cure Obesity, Co and Juravin, Inc. Suzette Marteny smarteny@slk-law.com
No Logo George C. Whiting, Defendant

Represented by Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. and Zero Calorie Labs, Inc. Suzette Marteny smarteny@slk-law.com
No Logo JURAVIN Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Juravin, Incorporated"

Represented by Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a corporation Suzette Marteny smarteny@slk-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suzette Marteny smarteny@slk-law.com
No Logo Must Cure Obesity, Co., Defendant

Represented by Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick - Toledo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suzette Marteny smarteny@slk-law.com

Represented by Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a corporation Suzette Marteny smarteny@slk-law.com
No Logo Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a corporation Suzette Marteny smarteny@slk-law.com
No Logo Roca Labs Inc., Defendant

Represented by Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a corporation Suzette Marteny smarteny@slk-law.com
No Logo Zero Calorie Labs, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suzette Marteny smarteny@slk-law.com
a corporation Suzette Marteny smarteny@slk-law.com
Other Parties
No Logo Avvo, Inc., Amicus

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Mockler, III +1 813 443 4634 +1 813 413 7631 richard@mocklerlaw.com

Represented by Randazza Legal Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc John Randazza +1 888 667 1113 +1 305 437 7662 MJR@randazza.com
No Logo Mediolex Ltd., Amicus

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Mockler, III +1 813 443 4634 +1 813 413 7631 richard@mocklerlaw.com

Represented by Randazza Legal Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc John Randazza +1 888 667 1113 +1 305 437 7662 MJR@randazza.com
Yelp! Inc. Yelp! Inc., Amicus

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Mockler, III +1 813 443 4634 +1 813 413 7631 richard@mocklerlaw.com

Represented by Randazza Legal Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc John Randazza +1 888 667 1113 +1 305 437 7662 MJR@randazza.com
No Logo Peter J. Grilli, Mediator

Represented by Peter J. Grilli, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter John Grilli +1 813 874 1002 +1 813 874 1131 peter@grillimediation.com
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 53b
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Timeline
  Entries (257) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None *Order pdf
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 252 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None *Order pdf
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Supplement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None *Order pdf
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Suggestion of
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Brief - Plaintiff
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Alter Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 234 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Motion to withdraw as attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None order on motion for extension of time to file
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in opposition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time to File answers to interrogatories by Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. Must Cure Obesity, Co and Juravin, Inc.), Juravin, Incorporated. (Hill, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None stipulation
STIPULATION re [210] Amended MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants, [212] MOTION for partial summary judgment as to Count III Plaintiff's and Defendants' Agreed Material Facts by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER DENYING [209] Defendants' Motion to Amend the Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order. The deadline to disclose expert reports has long passed, and Defendants have failed to establish a basis for good cause under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4) to modify the scheduling order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/24/2018. (JLN)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
ORDER granting [184] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying [188] Defendant Don Juravin's Motion for Protective Order on Plaintiff's Interrogatories to Defendant Don Juravin Regarding PayPal Transactions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 5/22/2018. (AHA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in opposition
MEMORANDUM in opposition re [212] Motion for partial summary judgment as to Count Three of the Amended Complaint filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to modifyCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER DENYING [201] Defendants' Motion to Dissolve, or in the Alternative, Modify Preliminary Injunction. The Court finds that Defendants have failed to establish a substantial change in circumstances to justify the relief requested. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/18/2018. (JLN)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in opposition
MEMORANDUM in opposition re [209] Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Defendants' Motion to Amend the Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Davis, Michael)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Remark
Remark: CD re: [211] NOTICE received. (LD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Motion for partial summary judgment
MOTION for partial summary judgment as to Count III by All Defendants. (Hill, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Notice - Other
NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission re [210] Amended MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants of Filing of Physical Exhibit-DVD (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
Amended MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit List, # (2) Exhibit Declaration of Amber Howe, # (3) Exhibit Declaration of Amber Howe, # (4) Exhibit Declaration and Expert Report of Steven Heymsfield, # (5) Exhibit Declaration and Expert Report of Paul Pavlou, # (6) Exhibit Declaration of Carl Settlemyer, # (7) Exhibit Declaration of Carl Settlemyer, # (8) Exhibit 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendants and Exhibits, # (9) Exhibit 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendants and Exhibits, # (10) Exhibit 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendants and Exhibits, # (11) Exhibit 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendants and Exhibits, # (12) Exhibit 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendants and Exhibits, # (13) Exhibit 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendants and Exhibits, # (14) Exhibit 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendants and Exhibits, # (15) Exhibit 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendants and Exhibits, # (16) Exhibit Individual Deposition of Don Juravin, # (17) Exhibit Asset Deposition of Don Juravin, # (18) Exhibit Individual Deposition of George Whiting and Exhibits, # (19) Exhibit Deposition of Sharon King and Exhibits, # (20) Exhibit Deposition of Sharon King and Exhibits, # (21) Exhibit Deposition of Sharon King and Exhibits, # (22) Exhibit Deposition of Ross Finesmith and Exhibits, # (23) Exhibit Deposition of Sharon Hensley and Exhibits, # (24) Exhibit Interrogatory Responses of Don Juravin, # (25) Exhibit Declaration of Raymond Fligman, # (26) Exhibit Declaration of Joyce Agbetunsin, # (27) Exhibit Declaration of Amina Di' Leonardi, # (28) Exhibit Declaration of Diane E. Kolleck, # (29) Exhibit Declaration of Jennifer Schaive, # (30) Exhibit Declaration of Jennifer Schaive, # (31) Exhibit Declaration of Mary Tugwell, # (32) Exhibit Declaration of Rolisa Harper, # (33) Exhibit Certification of Name.com and Records, # (34) Exhibit Certification of First Data and Records, # (35) Exhibit Certification of First Data and Records, # (36) Exhibit Certification of First Data and Records, # (37) Exhibit Certification of Internet Archive and Records, # (38) Exhibit Declaration of Sallie Schools, # (39) Exhibit Declaration of John Zajac and Records, # (40) Exhibit Declaration of Mary Rose Luceri)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Amend Case Management and Scheduling Order by All Defendants. (Hill, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
ORDER granting in substantial part and denying in limited part [140] Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Jay Hoffman. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/27/2018. (JLN)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Response to order to show cause
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re [204] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. Must Cure Obesity, Co and Juravin, Inc.), Juravin, Incorporated. (Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot [185] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Interrogatory Answers and Production of Documents Relating to Sale of Frozen Vehicle per representation of Plaintiff's counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 3/12/2018. (SLB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING [154] Defendants' Motion for Relief from Failure to Timely Respond, or in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to Respond Motion; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE [141] Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Defendants; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE [143] Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Count Three of theAmended Complaint. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/9/2018. (JLN)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 204 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
ORDER denying [180] Defendants' Motion for Entry of An Order Authorizing the Sale of Frozen Assets (specifically a 2014 Mercedes-Benz). Defendants are hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order why they should not be held in civil contempt for their failure to comply with the Court's Orders. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/1/2018. (JLN)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in opposition
MEMORANDUM in opposition re [201] Motion to modify Preliminary Injunction filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A - Deposition Testimony of Jay Hoffman)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Notice - Other
NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission re [141] MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Motion to modify
MOTION to modify Motion to modify preliminary injunction by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit in support of modifying preliminary injunction)(Hill, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:15-cv-2231-T-35CPT. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III no longer assigned to the case. (BSN) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Notice - Other
NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission re [141] MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants of Pending Dispositive Motion (Davis, Michael)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 173 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 ~Notice (other)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 Summons Issued
SUMMONS issued as to Zero Calorie Labs, Inc. (DG) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 Summons Issued
SUMMONS issued as to Juravin, Incorporated. (DG) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 Summons Issued
SUMMONS issued as to Must Cure Obesity, Co. (DG) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
MOTION to file amicus brief by Avvo, Inc., Mediolex, Ltd., Yelp Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Promotional Reviews: An Empirical Investigation of Online Review Manipulation, # 2 Exhibit Brief of Amici Curiae, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Opinion Corp.'s Motion for an Emergency Temporary Restraining Order, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Promotional Reviews: An Empirical Investigation of Online Review Manipulation, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Techdirt's Response to Roca Labs' Demand for a Retraction, # 7 Exhibit 5 - Motion for Leave to File Affidavit, # 8 Exhibit 6 - Opposition to Motion to Shorten Time)(Randazza, Marc) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Marc John Randazza on behalf of Yelp Inc., Avvo, Inc., Mediolex, Ltd. (Randazza, Marc) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 11 Filed: None, Entered: None
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015 Certificate of Counsel
CERTIFICATE of counsel Regarding Notice to Defendants of Plaintiff's Motion for TRO by Carl H. Settlemyer on behalf of Federal Trade Commission (Settlemyer, Carl) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order
MOTION for temporary restraining order and Memorandum in Support by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Plaintiff's Exhibit Index for Motion for TRO, # 2 Exhibit PX 1, # 3 Exhibit PX 2-A, # 4 Exhibit PX 2-B, # 5 Exhibit PX 2-C, # 6 Exhibit PX 3, # 7 Exhibit PX 4-A, # 8 Exhibit PX 4-B, # 9 Exhibit PX 4-C, # 10 Exhibit PX 4-D, # 11 Exhibit PX 4-E, # 12 Exhibit PX 4-F, # 13 Exhibit PX 4-G, # 14 Exhibit PX 5, # 15 Exhibit PX 6, # 16 Exhibit PX 7, # 17 Exhibit PX 8)(Settlemyer, Carl) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: 12/26/2017 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Hill on behalf of Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. Must Cure Obesity, Co and Juravin, Inc.), Juravin, Incorporated, Must Cure Obesity, Co., Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Roca Labs, Inc., George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. and Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.), George C. Whiting(individually), Zero Calorie Labs, Inc. (Hill, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Notice - Other
NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission re [141] MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 Response
RESPONSE re [195] Suggestion of Bankruptcy for Defendant Roca Labs, Inc. filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/18/2017, Entered: 11/18/2017 Suggestion of
SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy by Roca Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: 11/8/2017 Notice - Other
NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission re [141] MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants of Pending Dispositive Motion (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Reply to Response to motion
REPLY to Response to Motion re [180] MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically AUTHORIZING SALE OF FROZEN ASSET 2014 Mercedes-Benz filed by Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. Must Cure Obesity, Co and Juravin, Inc.), Juravin, Incorporated. (Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 Memorandum in opposition
MEMORANDUM in opposition re [188] Motion for protective order on Interrogatories Regarding PayPal Transactions filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 191 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [183] MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Entry of an Order to Authorize Sale of Frozen Asset. The Reply shall be filed within seven (7) days of the date of this ORDER, and it not exceed ten pages. However, it SHALL BE VERIFIED UNDER OATH AND PENALTY OF PERJURY by the Defendants Juravin Incorporated and Don Juravin, individually. It shall also state without equivocation whether the vehicle that was the subject of the motion was sold prior to the filing of the motion to which this series of pleading relate. Finally, counsel shall advise whether he knew that the vehicle had been sold, if that was the case, at the time he filed the motion on his clients' behalf. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/30/2017. (Scriven, Mary)
LREF
Blank 190 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [189] UNOPPOSED MOTION to Strike EXHIBIT 1 attached to Defendant's MOTION for protective order [188]. The exhibit was filed inadvertently, and the CLERK is directed to strike it from the docket. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/30/2017. (Scriven, Mary)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: 10/26/2017, Terminated: 10/30/2017 Motion to Strike
MOTION to Strike [188] MOTION for protective order on plaintiff's interrogatories to defendant Don Juravin as to Attached Exhibit 1 ONLY by Don Juravin(individually). (Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
MOTION for protective order on plaintiff's interrogatories to defendant Don Juravin by Don Juravin(individually). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Glenn A. Reid- (Stricken pursuant to Court's [190] Order))(Reid, Glenn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. Modified on 10/31/2017 (AG).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Notice of filing supplemental authority
NOTICE of supplemental authority re [141] MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) FTC v J. William Enters. Order Oct. 23, 2017)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Notice of filing supplemental authority
NOTICE of supplemental authority re [140] MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Exclude Testimony of Defense Expert Dr. Jay Hoffman, [141] MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) FTC v. NUG, Order, Oct. 10, 2017)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Answers and Production of Documents Relating to Sale of Frozen Vehicle by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Transcript pages - Juravin Sept. 9, 2016, # (2) Exhibit B - Transcript pages - Juravin Feb. 2017, # (3) Exhibit C - Transcript pages - King, Juravin, Antico, # (4) Exhibit D - Florida SOS - Core Ventures LLC)(Settlemyer, Carl) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017, Terminated: 10/30/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Entry of an Order to Authorize Sale of Frozen Asset. by All Defendants. (Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: 8/30/2017 Memorandum in opposition
MEMORANDUM in opposition re [180] Motion for Miscellaneous Relief for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Sale of Frozen Assets filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit List, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit A - Juravin Asset Deposition Excerpts, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit B - Settlemyer Declaration and Attachments, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit C - Juravin Second Responses to Vehicle Interrogatories, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit D - Document Production of Mercedes Benz of Tampa)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017 Notice of filing supplemental authority
NOTICE of supplemental authority re [160] Memorandum in opposition, [141] MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Opinion FTC v World Patent Mktg.)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically AUTHORIZING SALE OF FROZEN ASSET 2014 Mercedes-Benz by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit COMPOSITE EXHIBIT A)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Notice of filing supplemental authority
NOTICE of supplemental authority re [167] Memorandum in opposition by Roca Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Slip Opinion)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER staying all remaining case deadlines pending further Order of the Court and denying as moot [176] Unopposed Motion for Telephone Status Conference Regarding Preparation of the Joint Pretrial Statement. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/26/2017. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 177 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
ORDER staying all remaining case deadlines pending further Order of the Court and denying as moot [176] Unopposed Motion for Telephone Status Conference Regarding Preparation of the Joint Pretrial Statement. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/26/2017. (KMS) Terminated as erroneous filing on 7/26/2017. Order docketed at [178]. (KMS)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017, Terminated: 7/26/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Telephone Status Conference Regarding Preparation of Joint Pretrial Statement by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 175 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Order on motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [174] the Parties' Joint Motion to Amend Case Scheduling Order. The deadline for the Parties to file their Joint Pretrial Statement is hereby extended up to and including July 27, 2017. The deadline for the filing of motions in limine is hereby extended up to and including August 3, 2017. No other deadlines are changed by this Order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/19/2017. (KMS)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017, Terminated: 7/19/2017 Motion to Amend/Correct
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct [83] Case management and scheduling order by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 Notice - Other
CORRECTED NOTICE of filing Physical Exhibit (PX27, Attachment A) by Federal Trade Commission re [172] Notice (Other), [170] Reply to Response to Motion. (DG)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Notice - Other
NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission re [171] Notice (Other), [170] Reply to Response to Motion Corrected Notice of Filing of Physical Exhibit (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Notice - Other
NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission re [170] Reply to Response to Motion Filing of Physical Exhibit (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Reply to Response to motion
REPLY to Response to Motion re [141] MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit PX27-Declaration of Amber Howe 5-19-2017, # (2) Exhibit PX28-George Whiting Deposition Transcript Excerpts 1-11-2017)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [168] the FTC's Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. The FTC's reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment shall not exceed fifteen (15) pages. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/22/2017. (JST)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017, Terminated: 5/22/2017 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Memorandum in opposition
MEMORANDUM in opposition re [141] Motion for summary judgment filed by Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. Must Cure Obesity, Co and Juravin, Inc.), Juravin, Incorporated, Must Cure Obesity, Co., Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Roca Labs, Inc., George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. and Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.), George C. Whiting(individually), Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Testimonials, # (2) Affidavit Testimonials, # (3) Exhibit Testimonials, # (4) Exhibit Testimonials, # (5) Exhibit Testimonials, # (6) Exhibit Deposition Transcript Excerpt, # (7) Exhibit Deposition Transcript Excerpt, # (8) Exhibit Deposition Transcript Excerpt, # (9) Exhibit Deposition Transcript Excerpt, # (10) Exhibit Deposition Transcript Excerpt, # (11) Exhibit Deposition Transcript Excerpt)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 stipulation
STIPULATION re [143] MOTION for partial summary judgment FOR COUNT THREE OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT, [141] MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants Plaintiff's and Defendants' Stipulation of Agreed Material Facts by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 Notice - Other
NOTICE of Errata on document item 41 by Federal Trade Commission re [141] MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
ORDER DENYING [128] Defendant Don Juravin's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses; DENYING [129] Defendant Juravin, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses; DENYING [130] Defendant Must Cure Obesity Co.'s Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses; Denying [131] Defendant Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses; DENYING [132] Defendant Roca Labs, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses; DENYING [133] Defendant George C. Whiting's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses; DENYING [134] Defendant Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses; DENYING [135] Defendant Don Juravin's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses; DENYING [136] Defendant George C. Whiting's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/2/2017. (JST)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 Memorandum in opposition
MEMORANDUM in opposition re [140] Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Jay Hoffman filed by Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. Must Cure Obesity, Co and Juravin, Inc.), Juravin, Incorporated, Must Cure Obesity, Co., Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Roca Labs, Inc., George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. and Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.), George C. Whiting(individually), Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Notice - Other
NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission re [160] Memorandum in opposition of Delay in Filing Stipulation of Agreed Material Facts (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Memorandum in opposition
MEMORANDUM in opposition re [154] Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Defendants' Motion for Relief From Failure to Timely Respond filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Settlemyer Declaration)(Davis, Michael)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Memorandum in opposition
MEMORANDUM in opposition re [143] Motion for partial summary judgment on Count III of the Amended Complaint filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List, # (2) Exhibit Excerpts from Juravin Feb. 17 Deposition, # (3) Exhibit Excerpts from King Deposition, # (4) Exhibit Excerpts from Finesmith Deposition, # (5) Exhibit Excerpts from Hensley Deposition)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [156] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' deadline to file their response is extended fourteen (14) days to May 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/24/2017. (JST)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Order on motion to modifyCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER DENYING [139] Defendants' Motion To Amend the Case Management and Scheduling Order and for Continuance of Trial. Judge McCoun has already entered an order denying the motion for reconsideration of the withdrawal of former counsel, on which the relief sought in the instant motion is generally based and determining that "a blanket extension by ninety days of the remaining case management deadlines as requested is not warranted." (Dkt. 153) This case shall remain scheduled for the September 2017 Trial Term. However, this ruling is without prejudice to Defendants' right to seek extensions of any particular deadlines as may be needed, keeping in mind, as Judge McCoun previously noted, it is unlikely that past due deadlines will be revived and extended. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/24/2017. (JST)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 response in opposition to motion
RESPONSE in Opposition re [156] First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [141] MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017, Terminated: 4/24/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [141] MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants by All Defendants. (Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
ORDER denying [115] Defendants' Motion to Vacate Stipulated Preliminary Injunction Freezing Assets [90]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 4/13/2017. (SLB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically relief from Technical Admissions by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Responses to Request for Admissions, # (2) Exhibit Responses to Request for Admissions, # (3) Exhibit Responses to Request for Admissions, # (4) Exhibit Responses to Request for Admissions, # (5) Exhibit Responses to Request for Admissions, # (6) Exhibit Responses to Request for Admissions, # (7) Exhibit Responses to Request for Admissions, # (8) Exhibit Responses to Request for Admissions, # (9) Exhibit Responses to Request for Admissions, # (10) Exhibit Responses to Request for Admissions, # (11) Exhibit Responses to Request for Admissions, # (12) Exhibit Responses to Request for Admissions, # (13) Exhibit Responses to Request for Admissions)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
ORDER denying [122] Defendants' Motion to Reconsider Attorney Marteny's Motion to Withdraw and Order Granting Motion to Withdraw with a Motion for Continuance to Cure Unintended Prejudice re [116]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 4/7/2017. (SLB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Order on Motion for Release of FundsCourt Filing
ORDER denying without prejudice [94] Defendants' Motion for Release of Frozen Funds to Pay Legal Expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 4/7/2017. (SLB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [146] Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Jay Hoffman. Defendants' deadline to file its response is extended twenty (20) days to April 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/6/2017. (JST)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [145] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Strike Docket Item 141-7 and Substitute Redacted Item 144. The clerk is directed to strike Docket Item 141-7 from the docket. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/6/2017. (JST)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Memorandum in opposition
MEMORANDUM in opposition re [133] Motion for Leave to file document, [129] Motion for Leave to file document, [131] Motion for Leave to file document, [134] Motion for Leave to file document, [128] Motion for Leave to file document, [132] Motion for Leave to file document, [136] Motion for Leave to file document, [130] Motion for Leave to file document, [135] Motion for Leave to file document filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Davis, Michael)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Memorandum in opposition
MEMORANDUM in opposition re [146] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Memorandum in opposition
MEMORANDUM in opposition re [139] Motion to modify Case Management and Scheduling Order and for Continuance filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017, Terminated: 4/6/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [140] MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Exclude Testimony of Defense Expert Dr. Jay Hoffman by All Defendants. (Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017, Terminated: 4/6/2017 Motion to Strike
Unopposed MOTION to Strike Docket Item 141-7 and Substitute Redacted Item 144 by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Redacted Document
REDACTION to [141] MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants PX6(2) by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement PX6(2) Continued)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Motion for partial summary judgment
MOTION for partial summary judgment FOR COUNT THREE OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT by All Defendants. (Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Notice - Other
NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission re [141] MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants of Filing of Physical Exhibit-DVD (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for summary judgment Against All Defendants by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit List, # (2) Exhibit Declaration of Amber Howe, # (3) Exhibit Declaration and Expert Report of Steven Heymsfield, # (4) Exhibit Declaration and Expert Report of Paul Pavlou, # (5) Exhibit Deposition of Jay Hoffman, # (6) Exhibit 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendants and Exhibits, # (7)STRICKEN, PURSUANT TO ENDORSED ORDER [150] (FOR NEW EXHIBIT (7), SEE LAST EXHIBIT [35] Exhibit 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendants and Exhibits, # (8) Exhibit 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendants and Exhibits, # (9) Exhibit 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendants and Exhibits, # (10) Exhibit 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendants and Exhibits, # (11) Exhibit 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendants and Exhibits, # (12) Exhibit Individual Deposition of Don Juravin and Exhibits, # (13) Exhibit Asset Deposition of Don Juravin, # (14) Exhibit Individual Deposition of George Whiting and Exhibits, # (15) Exhibit Deposition of Sharon King and Exhibits, # (16) Exhibit Deposition of Sharon King and Exhibits, # (17) Exhibit Deposition of Ross Finesmith and Exhibits, # (18) Exhibit Deposition of Sharon Hensley and Exhibits, # (19) Exhibit Interrogatory Responses of Don Juravin, # (20) Exhibit Declaration of Raymond Fligman, # (21) Exhibit Declaration of Joyce Agbetunsin, # (22) Exhibit Declaration of Amina Di' Leonardi, # (23) Exhibit Declaration of Diane Kolleck, # (24) Exhibit Declaration of Jennifer Schaive, # (25) Exhibit Declaration of Jennifer Schaive, # (26) Exhibit Declaration of Mary Tugwell, # (27) Exhibit Declaration of Rolisa Harper, # (28) Exhibit Declaration of Joan Minchak, # (29) Exhibit Declaration of Carl Settlemyer re Requests for Admissions, # (30) Exhibit Requests for Admissions to George Whiting, # (31) Exhibit Requests for Admissions to RLI et al., # (32) Exhibit Exhibits Attached to FTC's 2nd Requests for Admissions to RLI et al., # (33) Exhibit Documents Referenced in FTC's Requests for Admissions to RLI et al., # (34) Exhibit Documents Referenced in FTC's Requests for Admissions to RLI et al.)(Settlemyer, Carl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2017: # (35) Exhibit 7) (DG). Modified on 4/6/2017 (DG).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Exclude Testimony of Defense Expert Dr. Jay Hoffman by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit PX 1 Hoffman Expert Rpt, # (2) Exhibit PX 2 Hoffman Transcript Excerpts, # (3) Exhibit PX 3 Heymsfield Expert Rpt, # (4) Exhibit PX 4 RFA Excerpts, # (5) Exhibit PX 5 Exhibit List)(Spelman, Paul)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017, Terminated: 4/24/2017 Motion to modify
MOTION to modify Case Management and Scheduling Order by All Defendants. (Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Response to motion
RESPONSE to Motion re [122] First MOTION for Reconsideration re [116] Order on Motion to Withdraw AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS filed by Suzette Marteny. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Marteny Declaration, # (2) Affidavit Wood Declaration)(Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 OrderCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER re [127] Notice of Limited Appearance to File Motion for Leave to File a Response to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Movant Suzette Marteny and her firm Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP may file their response within seven days hereof. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 3/20/2017. (AHA)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017, Terminated: 5/2/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
MOTION for leave to file FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by George C. Whiting(individually). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017, Terminated: 5/2/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
MOTION for leave to file FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. Must Cure Obesity, Co and Juravin, Inc.). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017, Terminated: 5/2/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
MOTION for leave to file FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017, Terminated: 5/2/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
MOTION for leave to file FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. and Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017, Terminated: 5/2/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
MOTION for leave to file FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Roca Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017, Terminated: 5/2/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
MOTION for leave to file FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017, Terminated: 5/2/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
MOTION for leave to file FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Must Cure Obesity, Co.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017, Terminated: 5/2/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
MOTION for leave to file FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Juravin, Incorporated. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017, Terminated: 5/2/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
MOTION for leave to file FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Don Juravin(individually). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Special Limited Appearance by Suzette M. Marteny on behalf of Suzette Marteny (Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 Memorandum in opposition
MEMORANDUM in opposition re [115] Motion to Vacate Consent Preliminary Injunction filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Schools Declaration)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 Memorandum in opposition
MEMORANDUM in opposition re [122] Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Motion to Withdraw filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: 3/14/2017 Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
ORDER denying without prejudice [108] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 3/14/2017. (SLB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: 3/14/2017 Order referring motion to Magistrate Judge for dispositionCourt Filing
ORDER referring motions to Magistrate Judge for entry of an Order or Report and Recommendation, as appropriate: [94] Motion for Release of Frozen Funds to Pay Legal Expenses, [115] Motion to Vacate Consent Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/14/2017. (JST) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: 3/10/2017, Terminated: 4/7/2017 Motion for Reconsideration
First MOTION for Reconsideration re [116] Order on Motion to Withdraw AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: 3/10/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III: MOTION HEARING held on 3/10/2017 re [108] MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories filed by Federal Trade Commission. (DIGITAL) (LYB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 119 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: 3/10/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [118] the FTC's Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Motion for Summary Judgment. The FTC's Motion for Summary Judgment shall not exceed forty-five (45) pages. Defendants' response shall likewise not exceed forty-five (45) pages. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/10/2017. (KMS)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017, Terminated: 3/10/2017 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for Summary Judgment by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 117 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017 Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING: telephone hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel [108] set for 3/10/2017 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. At least five minutes prior to the date and time specified, counsel shall call 1-888-684-8852; enter access code 2121806; and the security code 2231 followed by the # (pound) key. (SLB)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
ORDER granting [110] Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants filed by Suzette Marteny, Esq., of Shumaker,Loop & Kendrick, LLP. Attorney Marteny and the law firm of Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP, are excused from further responsibility in these proceedings, and the Clerk is directed to terminate them from the record. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 3/7/2017. (SLB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017, Terminated: 4/13/2017 Motion to Vacate
First MOTION to Vacate Consent Preliminary Injuncton by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C)(Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Additional Counsel Appearance by Glenn Alan Reid on behalf of Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. Must Cure Obesity, Co and Juravin, Inc.), Juravin, Incorporated, Must Cure Obesity, Co., Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Roca Labs, Inc., George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. and Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.), George C. Whiting(individually), Zero Calorie Labs, Inc. (Reid, Glenn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017 Response
RESPONSE re [108] MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Don Juravin(individually), Juravin, Incorporated, Must Cure Obesity, Co., Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Roca Labs, Inc., George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. and Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.). (Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Notice of unavailability
NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. Must Cure Obesity, Co and Juravin, Inc.), Juravin, Incorporated, Must Cure Obesity, Co., Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Roca Labs, Inc., George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. and Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.), George C. Whiting(individually), Zero Calorie Labs, Inc. from 2/6/17 to 2/10/17. (Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Response to motion
RESPONSE to Motion re [110] MOTION to Withdraw As Counsel filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017, Terminated: 3/7/2017 Motion to Withdraw
MOTION to Withdraw As Counsel by All Defendants. (Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 109 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Order on motion to modifyCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [97] the Parties' Joint Motion to Amend Case Management and Scheduling Order. Defendants' expert report deadline is hereby extended up to and including February 3, 2017. No other deadlines are changed by this Order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/30/2017. (KMS)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017, Terminated: 3/14/2017 motion for discoveryCourt Filing
MOTION for Discovery , MOTION to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Federal Trade Commission. (Spelman, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
ORDER denying [98] Motion to Hold Non-Party Nicholas Peters in Contempt and for Sanctions; denying [104] Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part [98] construed motion to compel additional production. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 1/13/2017. (JDE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III: MOTION HEARING held on 1/12/2017 re outstanding discovery disputes (DIGITAL) (LYB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion to Strike
MOTION to Strike Non-Party Nicholas Peters' Response to Motion for Contempt and Motion for Sanctions Response to Motion for Contempt and Motion for Sanctions by All Defendants. (Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Response to motion
RESPONSE to Motion re [98] MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Hold Non-Party Nicholas Peters in Contempt and for Sanctions for Failing to Comply with Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Nicholas Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Aiken, Peter)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Non Party Subpoenaed witness Appearance by Peter D. Aiken on behalf of Nicholas Peters (Aiken, Peter)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance of Michael Davis Appearance by Carl H. Settlemyer on behalf of Federal Trade Commission (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: 1/4/2017 *Order pdfCourt Filing
ORDER and NOTICE of hearing: re: [98] Defendants' MOTION for miscellaneous relief to Hold Non-Party Nicholas Peters in Contempt and for Sanctions for Failing to Comply with Subpoena Duces Tecum. Hearing set for Thursday 1/12/2017 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12 B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 1/4/2017. (JDE)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: 12/15/2016 Notice - Other
NOTICE by Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. Must Cure Obesity, Co and Juravin, Inc.), Juravin, Incorporated, Must Cure Obesity, Co., Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Roca Labs, Inc., George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. and Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.), George C. Whiting(individually), Zero Calorie Labs, Inc. re [98] MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Hold Non-Party Nicholas Peters in Contempt and for Sanctions for Failing to Comply with Subpoena Duces Tecum of Filing Rule 3.01(g) Supplement to Defendants' Motion To Hold Non-Party Nicholas Peters In Contempt For Failing To Comply With Subpoena Duces Tecum (Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: 12/8/2016, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Hold Non-Party Nicholas Peters in Contempt and for Sanctions for Failing to Comply with Subpoena Duces Tecum by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016, Terminated: 1/30/2017 Motion to modify
Joint MOTION to modify Case Management and Scheduling Order by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: 10/27/2016 Memorandum in opposition
MEMORANDUM in opposition re [94] Motion for Release of Funds filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit Index, # (2) Exhibit Juravin Deposition Excerpts, # (3) Exhibit Colbert Declaration and Attachments, # (4) Exhibit Antico Deposition Excerpts)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016 Mediation Report
MEDIATION report Hearing held on October 13, 2016. Hearing outcome: The case did not settle. The parties will continue to discuss settlement outside of mediation... (Grilli, Peter)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016, Terminated: 4/7/2017 Motion for Release of Funds
MOTION for Release of Funds to Pay Legal Expenses by All Defendants. (Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Notice of mediation conference/hearing
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on Thursday, October 13th, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. before Peter J. Grilli, Esquire.(Grilli, Peter)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: 10/6/2016 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [91] the Parties' Joint Motion to Reopen Mediation. The Parties shall be permitted to reopen mediation in accordance with the Court's previous order granting the Parties relief from the Local Rule 9.05(c) settlement authority requirement. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/6/2016. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016, Terminated: 10/6/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Reopen Mediation by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016 Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FREEZING ASSETS WITH OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/13/2016. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016 Order on motion for Temporary Restraining OrderCourt Filing
ORDER adopting [88] Report and Recommendations; and denying as moot [69] Motion for Order to Show Cause Why the Preliminary Injunction Should Not be Modified. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/13/2016. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016, Terminated: 9/13/2016 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re [86] the parties' Proposed Stipulated Preliminary Injunction Freezing Assets [69], and the Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to Show Cause why the Preliminary Injunction Should not be Modified. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 9/12/2016. (SLB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/12/2016. (DIGITAL) (LYB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 stipulation
STIPULATION re [69] MOTION for temporary restraining order with other equitable relief and an order to show cause why the preliminary injunction should not be modified by Don Juravin(individually), Juravin, Incorporated, Must Cure Obesity, Co., Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Roca Labs, Inc., George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. and Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.), Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.. (Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
ORDER granting [81] Defendant Don Juravin's Motion to Permit Attendance at Deposition. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 9/7/2016. (SLB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Memorandum in opposition
MEMORANDUM in opposition re [81] Motion for Miscellaneous Relief to Permit Attendance at Deposition filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Defendants' Subpoena to Jenna Antico, # (2) Exhibit Juravin Verified Response to FTC Interrogatory 3, # (3) Exhibit Juravin Aug. 31, 2016 email to Peters)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 Case management and scheduling orderCourt Filing
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 7/19/2017, Bench Trial set for the September 2017 Trial Term which commences on 9/5/2017 with a more precise date to follow. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/6/2016. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 Order on motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [79] the Parties' Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. An Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order shall be entered under separate notice. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/6/2016. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016, Terminated: 9/7/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Permit Don Juravin To Attend Jenna Antico's Deposition in Person by Don Juravin(individually). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016 Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING on Plaintiff's Motion [76]. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2016 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12 B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. The Court has set aside two hours for the hearing and intends to proceed by way of arguments and affidavits or other discovery. The parties shall file any supplemental pleadings on or before 9/8/2016. (SLB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: 9/1/2016, Terminated: 9/6/2016 Motion to Amend/Correct
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct [43] Case management and scheduling order by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting [77] Joint Motion to Extend Expedited Discovery Deadline to 9/9/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 8/31/2016. (SLB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: 8/30/2016, Terminated: 8/31/2016 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryCourt Filing
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016 Response
RESPONSE re [69] MOTION for temporary restraining order with other equitable relief and an order to show cause why the preliminary injunction should not be modified by Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. Must Cure Obesity, Co and Juravin, Inc.), Juravin, Incorporated, Must Cure Obesity, Co., Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Roca Labs, Inc., George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. and Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.). (Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: 8/22/2016 Order on motion for Temporary Restraining OrderCourt Filing
ORDER ENTERING STIPULATED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/22/2016. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016, Terminated: 8/22/2016 Motion for temporary restraining order
Joint MOTION for temporary restraining order with other equitable relief by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated TRO)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: 8/16/2016 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER directing Defendants to file an expedited response to Plaintiff's Motion [69] on or before 8/24/2016 and permitting the parties to conduct expedited discovery for a period of 20 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III on 8/16/2016. (SLB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: 8/16/2016 Motion HearingCourt Filing
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/16/2016 re [69] MOTION for temporary restraining order with other equitable relief and an order to show cause why the preliminary injunction should not be modified filed by Federal Trade Commission. (DIGITAL) (LYB)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016 Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
NOTICE of status conference on motion re [69] MOTION for temporary restraining order with other equitable relief and an order to show cause why the preliminary injunction should not be modified. Status Conference set for 8/16/2016 at 2:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 12 B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III. Five minutes before the time specified for the hearing, counsel shall call 1-888-684-8852; enter access code 2121806; and the security code 2231 followed by the # (pound) key. (LYB) Modified on 8/15/2016 (LYB).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [69] MOTION for temporary restraining order with other equitable relief and an order to show cause why the preliminary injunction should not be modified filed by Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/15/2016. (KMS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016, Terminated: 9/13/2016 Motion for temporary restraining order
MOTION for temporary restraining order with other equitable relief and an order to show cause why the preliminary injunction should not be modified by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Index, # (2) Exhibit PX 1 - Antico Declaration, # (3) Exhibit PX 2 - Colbert Declaration)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [67] the Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Stay. Subject to the continued operation of the preliminary injunction entered in this matter [38], all deadlines in this case shall continue to be STAYED pending further order of the Court. If the Parties have not submitted a proposed final consent judgment for consideration on or before September 1, 2016, the Parties shall file a further report to the Court regarding the status of their settlement of this matter by that date. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/2/2016. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 67 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016, Terminated: 8/2/2016 Motion To Stay
Joint MOTION to stay re [66] Order on motion to stay by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: 4/20/2016 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [65] the Parties' Joint Motion for Stay. Subject to the continued operation of the preliminary injunction entered in this matter [38], all deadlines in this case are hereby STAYED pending further order of the Court. On August 1, 2016, the Parties shall file a further report to the Court regarding the status of their settlement of this matter if they have not submitted a proposed final consent judgment for consideration by that date. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/20/2016. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: 4/18/2016, Terminated: 4/20/2016 Motion To Stay
Joint MOTION to stay by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: 4/15/2016 Answer to amended complaint
ROCA LABS NUTRACEUTICAL USA, INC.'S ANSWER and affirmative defenses to [48] Amended Complaint by Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc..(Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: 4/15/2016 Answer to amended complaint
ZERO CALORIE LABS, INC.'S ANSWER and affirmative defenses to [48] Amended Complaint by Zero Calorie Labs, Inc..(Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: 4/15/2016 Answer to amended complaint
GEORGE WHITING'S ANSWER and affirmative defenses to [48] Amended Complaint by George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. and Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.).(Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: 4/15/2016 Answer to amended complaint
MUST CURE OBESITY, CO.'S ANSWER and affirmative defenses to [48] Amended Complaint by Must Cure Obesity, Co..(Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 60 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: 4/15/2016 Answer to amended complaint
ROCA LABS, INC.'S ANSWER and affirmative defenses to [48] Amended Complaint by Roca Labs, Inc..(Marteny, Suzette)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: 4/15/2016 Answer to amended complaint
DON JURAVIN, INCORPORATED'S ANSWER and affirmative defenses to [48] Amended Complaint by Juravin, Incorporated.(Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: 4/15/2016 Answer to amended complaint
DON JURAVIN'S ANSWER and affirmative defenses to [48] Amended Complaint by Don Juravin(individually).(Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [56] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall have up to and including April 15, 2016 to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/11/2016. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016, Terminated: 4/11/2016 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [48] Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: 3/31/2016 Status report
STATUS report Joint Request for Telephone Conference by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: 3/30/2016 Proof of Service
PROOF of service by Federal Trade Commission (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: 3/30/2016 Proof of Service
PROOF of service by Federal Trade Commission (Settlemyer, Carl) Modified on 3/30/2016 Item terminated due to the filing of [54].(DG).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 Summons issued
SUMMONS issued as to Zero Calorie Labs, Inc. (DG)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 Summons issued
SUMMONS issued as to Juravin, Incorporated. (DG)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 Summons issued
SUMMONS issued as to Must Cure Obesity, Co. (DG)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Mediation Report
MEDIATION report Hearing held on March 1, 2016. Hearing outcome: The parties made progress on numerous issues. Counsel will continue to negotiate directly and will report further to the Court within 30 days.. (Grilli, Peter)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. Must Cure Obesity, Co and Juravin, Inc.), Juravin, Incorporated, Must Cure Obesity, Co., Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Roca Labs, Inc., George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc. and Zero Calorie Labs, Inc.), George C. Whiting(individually), Zero Calorie Labs, Inc. filed by Federal Trade Commission.(BES)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [46] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint, docketed at entry (46-1), shall be deemed filed as of the date of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/19/2016. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016, Terminated: 2/19/2016 Motion for Leave to file document
Unopposed MOTION for leave to file First Amended Complaint by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: 2/17/2016 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
ORDER granting [44] Motion for Relief from Local Rule 9.05(c) Settlement Authority Requirement. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/17/2016. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016, Terminated: 2/17/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically LR 905(c) Settlement Authority by Federal Trade Commission. (Spelman, Paul)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015 Case management and scheduling orderCourt Filing
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 1/17/2017, Bench Trial set for the March 2017 trial term, which commences on 2/27/2017, with a more precise date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 3/1/2016. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/7/2015. (APV)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: 11/24/2015 Case Management Report
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Confidentiality Agreement)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: 11/20/2015 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [40] Joint Motion to Waive In-Person Meeting Requirement for Purposes of Preparing and Filing the Case Management Report. The Parties may appear by telephone at the case management conference for the purpose of filing their joint Case Management Report. In the event that the Parties fail to agree upon necessary terms of the Case Management Report, the Court may direct that they conduct a second conference, in person. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/20/2015. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: 11/19/2015, Terminated: 11/20/2015 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Joint Motion to Waive In-Person Meeting Requirement for Purposes of Preparing and Filing Case Management Report by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: 11/17/2015 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter John Grilli on behalf of Peter J. Grilli (Grilli, Peter)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER FOR OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/29/2015. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 Notice - Other
NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission re [32] Order (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Preliminary Injunction)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re [10] Interested persons order by Avvo, Inc., Mediolex, Ltd., Yelp Inc.. (Randazza, Marc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 Notice to counsel of filing of official transcript
NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Claudia Spangler-Fry. (CS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Show Cause/Preliminary Injunction held on 10/22/15 before Judge Mary S. Scriven. Court Reporter Claudia Spangler-Fry,Telephone number (813)301-5575. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 11/16/2015, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2015, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2016. (CS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Certificate of service
CERTIFICATE of service by Federal Trade Commission ., PROOF of service by Federal Trade Commission (Spelman, Paul)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER directing filing of proposed preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/23/2015. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 Show Cause HearingCourt Filing
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Mary S. Scriven: SHOW CAUSE HEARING on Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 10/22/2015. Court Reporter: Claudia Spangler-Fry (APV)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: 10/20/2015 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Mockler, III on behalf of Avvo, Inc., Mediolex, Ltd., Yelp Inc. (Mockler, Richard)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: 10/20/2015 Notice - Other
NOTICE by Avvo, Inc., Mediolex, Ltd., Yelp Inc. Notice of Errata (Randazza, Marc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: 10/20/2015 Brief - Defendant
BRIEF of Amici Curiae re [27] Order on motion to file amicus brief filed by Avvo, Inc., Mediolex, Ltd., Yelp Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6)(DG) Modified on 10/20/2015 (DG).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: 10/20/2015 Order on motion to file amicus briefCourt Filing
ORDER granting [26] Motion to File Brief as Amici Curiae. The CLERK is directed to docket the Brief of Amici Curiae (Dkt. 26-2) along with its exhibits (Dkt. 26-3, 26-4, 26-5, 26-6, 26-7, 26-8) in this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/20/2015. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/20/2015 Motion to File Amicus Brief
MOTION to file amicus brief by Avvo, Inc., Mediolex, Ltd., Yelp Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Promotional Reviews: An Empirical Investigation of Online Review Manipulation, # (2) Exhibit Brief of Amici Curiae, # (3) Exhibit 1 - Opinion Corp.'s Motion for an Emergency Temporary Restraining Order, # (4) Exhibit 2 - Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, # (5) Exhibit 3 - Promotional Reviews: An Empirical Investigation of Online Review Manipulation, # (6) Exhibit 4 - Techdirt's Response to Roca Labs' Demand for a Retraction, # (7) Exhibit 5 - Motion for Leave to File Affidavit, # (8) Exhibit 6 - Opposition to Motion to Shorten Time)(Randazza, Marc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Marc John Randazza on behalf of Yelp Inc., Avvo, Inc., Mediolex, Ltd. (Randazza, Marc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 Answer
DEFENDANT GEORGE WHITING ANSWER and affirmative defenses to [1] Complaint by George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc.).(Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 Answer
DEFENDANT ROCA LABS NUTRACEUTICAL USA INC. ANSWER and affirmative defenses to [1] Complaint by Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc..(Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 Answer
DEFENDANT DON JURAVIN ANSWER and affirmative defenses to [1] Complaint by Don Juravin(individually).(Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 Answer
DEFENDANT ROCA LABS INC. ANSWER and affirmative defenses to [1] Complaint by Roca Labs, Inc..(Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: 10/16/2015 Reply to Response to motion
REPLY to Response to Motion re [6] MOTION for temporary restraining order and Memorandum in Support filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: 10/14/2015 Notice - Other
NOTICE by Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc.), Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Roca Labs, Inc., George C. Whiting(individually), George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc.) of Filing Draft of Proposed Stipulated Preliminary Injunction Identifying Disputed Issue (Joint Notice) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: 10/12/2015 response in opposition to motion
RESPONSE in Opposition re [6] MOTION for temporary restraining order and Memorandum in Support filed by Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc.), Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Roca Labs, Inc., George C. Whiting(individually), George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc.). (Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 Notice of pendency of related cases
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re [9] Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Federal Trade Commission. Related case(s): N (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re [10] Interested persons order by Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc.), Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Roca Labs, Inc., George C. Whiting(individually), George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc.). (Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: 9/29/2015 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re [10] Interested persons order by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: 9/29/2015 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
NOTICE of hearing: Show Cause Hearing set for 10/22/2015 at 09:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 B before Judge Mary S. Scriven. The Court has set aside two (2) hours for this hearing. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: 9/29/2015 Temporary Restraining OrderCourt Filing
ORDER ENTERING STIPULATED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. See Order for details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/29/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/27/2015, Entered: 9/27/2015 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Suzette M. Marteny on behalf of Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc.), Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Roca Labs, Inc., George C. Whiting(individually), George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc.) (Marteny, Suzette)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 stipulation
STIPULATION Stipulated Temporary Restraining Order with Other Equitable Relief and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 Interested persons orderCourt Filing
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/9/2015. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/25/2015. (APV)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 Related case order and track 2 noticeCourt Filing
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/9/2015. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/25/2015. (APV)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 Notice - Other
NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission of Filing of Exhibits (PX 1 Atts. V1-V4) (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015 Certificate of Counsel
CERTIFICATE of counsel Regarding Notice to Defendants of Plaintiff's Motion for TRO by Carl H. Settlemyer on behalf of Federal Trade Commission (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015, Terminated: 9/29/2015 Motion for temporary restraining order
MOTION for temporary restraining order and Memorandum in Support by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Plaintiff's Exhibit Index for Motion for TRO, # (2) Exhibit PX 1, # (3) Exhibit PX 2-A, # (4) Exhibit PX 2-B, # (5) Exhibit PX 2-C, # (6) Exhibit PX 3, # (7) Exhibit PX 4-A, # (8) Exhibit PX 4-B, # (9) Exhibit PX 4-C, # (10) Exhibit PX 4-D, # (11) Exhibit PX 4-E, # (12) Exhibit PX 4-F, # (13) Exhibit PX 4-G, # (14) Exhibit PX 5, # (15) Exhibit PX 6, # (16) Exhibit PX 7, # (17) Exhibit PX 8)(Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING [4] Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Plaintiff's Motion for Noticed Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiff is permitted to file its Motion for Noticed Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support, which shall not exceed thirty-three (33) pages. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/24/2015. (KMS)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015, Terminated: 9/24/2015 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Memordandum in Support by Federal Trade Commission. (Settlemyer, Carl)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015 Summons issued
SUMMONS issued as to Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc.), Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Roca Labs, Inc., George C. Whiting(individually), George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc.). (AMD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015 appendix
EXHIBIT INDEX re [1] Complaint by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Part 2)(AMD)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015 Complaint
COMPLAINT against Don Juravin(individually), Don Juravin(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc.), Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc., Roca Labs, Inc., George C. Whiting(individually), George C. Whiting(as an officer of Roca Labs, Inc. and Roca Labs Nutraceutical USA, Inc.) filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(AMD)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1,518 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?