Westlake Services LLC et al v. Credit Acceptance Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-07490

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Last Updated February 14, 2018 at 7:26 PM ST (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nowcom Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Tsang, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roy C. Lewellen +1 870 295 2764 lewellen_roy@yahoo.com
No Logo Westlake Services LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Tsang, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roy C. Lewellen +1 870 295 2764 lewellen_roy@yahoo.com
v.
Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin James Minnick +1 213 687 5272 +1 213 621 5272 kevin.minnick@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Y Pak +1 212 735 2546 +1 917 777 2546 James.Pak@skadden.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paramjeet Singh Sammi +1 212 735 3000 +1 212 735 2000 Anthony.Sammi@Skadden.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Craig Sunshine +1 202 862 2339 +1 202 862 2400 steve.sunshine@skadden.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia K. York +1 202 371 7146 +1 202 393 5760 julia.york@skadden.com
No Logo Does, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 0002
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (285) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Objection
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Amended Minutes
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None In Limine - Exclude
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: On the Courts own motion, the Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED from November 20, 2017 to January 8, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. The Jury Trial is CONTINUED from December 4, 2017 to January 23, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (lc)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude IAN ANDERSON'S TESTIMONY OF A "BUILD AROUND" OF THE '807 PATENT filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 12/5/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas A. Smith, # 2 Exhibits 1 - 5, # 3 Proposed Order)(Russell, Jason)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude The Expert Opinions Of David Hricik filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/5/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy B. Yoo and Exhibits A through C, # 2 Proposed Order)(Yoo, Timothy)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Argument And Evidence Regarding Any Settlement Agreement Between Westlake And A Government Agency Or Any Other Governmental Investigation filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/5/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yoo, Timothy)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Prevent Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation From Introducing Argument And Evidence Relating To Its State Of Mind filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/5/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yoo, Timothy)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 246 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiffs Westlake Services LLC. (Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 245 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Joint Exhibit List filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation.. (Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 244 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Witness List filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation.. (Russell, Jason) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 243 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Russell, Jason) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            The Court finds the following motions suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. [ECF #187] and the MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Element of Sham Litigation Claim filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. [ECF #194] set for hearing on October 16, 2017. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/05/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              SCHEDULING NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE by Judge S. James Otero. Jury Trial set for 12/5/2017 @ 09:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/05/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                SCHEDULING NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE by Judge S. James Otero re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Donald House, Sr. 209 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Robert Stoll 208 Motion set for hearing on 12/5/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/05/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                  REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Donald House, Sr. 209 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas A. Smith, # 2 Exhibits 2 - 5)(Russell, Jason)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                    REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Robert Stoll 208 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas A. Smith, # 2 Exhibit 21)(Russell, Jason)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                      OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Donald House, Sr. 209 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Ray Seilie In Support Of Westlake Services, LLCs Opposition To CACs Motion To Exclude Expert Opinions Of Dr. Donald House, Sr., # 2 Declaration of Donald R. House In Support Of Westlake Services, LLCs Opposition To CACs Motion To Exclude Expert Opinions Of Dr. Donald House, Sr.)(Yoo, Timothy)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                        Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Robert Stoll 208 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Timothy B. Yoo In Support Of Westlake Services, LLCs Opposition To CACs Motion To Exclude Expert Opinions Of R. Stoll, # 2 Declaration Of Robert Stoll In Support Of Westlake Services, LLCs Opposition To CACs Motion To Exclude Expert Opinions Of Robert Stoll)(Yoo, Timothy)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 235 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT Pursuant to Order of the Court re Reply (Motion related), 223 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 227 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Westlake Services, LLCs Response To Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporations Statement Of Additional Undisputed Material Facts And Conclusions Of Law)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Sealed Legal Document 234 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT Pursuant to Order of the Court re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),,,, 200 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,, 218 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Westlake Services, LLCs Separate Statement Of Undisputed Facts In Support Of Its Opposition To Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporations Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Unredacted Document Westlake Services, LLCs Statement Of Genuine Disputes Of Material Fact, # 3 Unredacted Document Face Page of Declaration of Timothy Yoo, # 4 Unredacted Document Exhibits 13, 23, and 39)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 233 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT Pursuant to Order of the Court re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Element of Sham Litigation Claim 194 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, 216 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Plaintiff Westlake Services, LLCs Statement Of Uncontroverted Facts And Conclusions Of Law Filed In Support Of Its Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Unredacted Document Face Page of Declaration of Timothy Yoo In Support of Partial MSJ, # 3 Unredacted Document Exhibits 2-7, # 4 Unredacted Document Exhibits 8, 10-11, 13-16, 18-20)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation, re Sealed Opposition, 230 , Sealed Document,,,, 228 , Sealed Document,,, 231 served on September 18, 2017. (Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 231 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT Pursuant to Court Order Documents Filed Under Seal, Unredacted Document Defendant's Reply Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Conclusions of Law re Reply (Motion related),,, 221 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 226 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Response to Plaintiff's Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 2 Face Page of Declaration of Jason D. Russell In Support of Defendant's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment Filed as Docket No. 221-01, # 3 Unredacted Document Ex. 138 to the Decl. of Jason D. Russell, # 4 Unredacted Document Ex. 139 to the Decl. of Jason D. Russell, # 5 Unredacted Document Ex. 148 to the Decl. of Jason D. Russell)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 230 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    SEALED OPPOSITION RE Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, 198 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,, 217 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts and Conclusions of Law)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PREVIOUSLY FILED CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 187 Redacted Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 2 Face Page to the Declaration of Douglas A. Smith In Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Filed as Docket No. 187-03, # 3 Exhibit 1 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith, # 4 Exhibit 7-9 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith, # 5 Exhibit 11 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith, # 6 Exhibit 14 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith, # 7 Exhibit 16 and 17 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith, # 8 Exhibit 22 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith, # 9 Exhibit 30-32 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith, # 10 Exhibit 34 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith, # 11 Exhibit 36-39 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith, # 12 Exhibit 50-53 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith, # 13 Exhibit 56 and 57 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith, # 14 Exhibit 70 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith, # 15 Exhibit 73 and 74 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith, # 16 Exhibit 82-86 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith, # 17 Exhibit 88-98 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith, # 18 Exhibit 100-102 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith, # 19 Exhibit 122 to the Decl. of Douglas A. Smith)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 228 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT Pursuant to Order of the Court re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 187 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, 215 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 2 Unredacted Document Face Page of Declaration of Douglas A. Smith In Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Filed as Docket No. 187-03, # 3 Unredacted Document Exs. 19 and 20 to Decl. of Douglas Smith, # 4 Unredacted Document Ex. 33 to Decl. of Douglas Smith, # 5 Unredacted Document Ex. 40 to Decl. of Douglas Smith, # 6 Unredacted Document Exs 58 and 59 to Decl. of Douglas Smith, # 7 Unredacted Document Ex. 68 to Decl. of Douglas Smith, # 8 Unredacted Document Exs. 71 and 72 to Decl. of Douglas Smith, # 9 Unredacted Document Ex. 81 to Decl. of Douglas Smith, # 10 Unredacted Document Ex. 87 to Decl. of Douglas Smith, # 11 Unredacted Document Ex. 99 to Decl. of Douglas Smith, # 12 Unredacted Document Ex. 112 to Decl. of Douglas Smith)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Westlake Services, LLCs APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 220 by Judge S. James Otero (lc) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATIONS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 224 by Judge S. James Otero (lc) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 225 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document - Various Documents In Support of Credit Acceptance Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment under seal 224 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - September 11, 2017 email, # 2 Unredacted Document Reply Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 3 Unredacted Document Response to Westlake's Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 4 Unredacted Document Exhibit 148 to Declaration of Jason D. Russell, # 5 Unredacted Document Exhibit 138 to Declaration of Jason D. Russell, # 6 Unredacted Document Exhibit 139 to Declaration of Jason D. Russell, # 7 Proof of Service)(Russell, Jason) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                APPLICATION to file document - Various Documents In Support of Credit Acceptance Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment under seal filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Russell, Jason) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Element of Sham Litigation Claim 194 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Plaintiff Westlake's Response to Credit Acceptance Corporation's Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts and Conclusions of Law)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 222 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal 220 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Plaintiff Westlake's Response to Credit Acceptance Corporation's Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts and Conclusions of Law)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 221 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 187 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason D. Russell, # 2 Redacted Document Exhibits 137-155, # 3 Redacted Document Reply Statement of Undisputed Material Fact and Conclusions of Law, # 4 Redacted Document Response to Plaintiff's Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 5 Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Chris Urban, # 6 Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Ian Anderson, # 7 Response to Plaintiff's Request for Evidentiary Ruling on Specified Objections to the Declaration of Jeffrey Brock, # 8 Response to Plaintiff's Request for Evidentiary Ruling on Specified Objections to the Declaration of Douglas Busk)(Russell, Jason) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Plaintiff Westlake's Response to Credit Acceptance Corporation's Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts and Conclusions of Law)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 219 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          MINUTES (in chambers): ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE AND VACATE HEARING DATES FOR DEFENDANT CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION'S PREMATURE AND EXCESSIVE MOTIONS IN LIMINE 214 by Judge S. James Otero. For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES Plaintiff Westlake Services, LLC d/b/a Westlake Financial Services' Ex Parte Application to Strike and Vacate Hearing Dates for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Premature and Excessive Motions in Limine. The Court CONTINUES the Hearing on Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment, Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Robert Stoll, and Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Donald House, Sr. to October 16, 2017. Plaintiff must file an Opposition of not more than twenty (20) pages to Defendant's Motions to Exclude by September 25, 2017. Defendant may file a Reply of not more than five (5) pages by October 2, 2017. (lom) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 203 by Judge S. James Otero. The portions of the following documents, which contain information and exhibits that have been designated as confidential and/or attorney-eyes only by the Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation (CAC) pursuant to the Protective Order entered by this Court 59 , shall be filed under seal and redacted as proposed by Plaintiff's Application: (1)Portions of Westlake's Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Its Opposition to Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment; (2)Portions of Westlake's Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact;and (3)Portions of Exhibits 13 and 23, and Exhibit 39 in its entirety, which are attached to the Declaration of Timothy B. Yoo. (lom) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 199 by Judge S. James Otero. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the following documents are filed under seal: Exhibit B, CAC's Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts and Conclusions of Law; Exhibit C, CAC's Opposition to Plaintiff Westlake's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on an Element of the Sham Litigation Exception to Noerr-Pennington Immunity. Compelling reasons that outweigh the public's interest in disclosure justify ordering these documents filed under seal. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 192 by Judge S. James Otero. Plaintiff's Application to File Under Seal is hereby GRANTED. Pursuant to the Protective Order entered by this Court 59 , shall be filed under seal and redacted as proposed by Plaintiff's Application: (1) Portions of Westlake's Motion referencing confidential exhibits and deposition testimony; (2) Portions of Westlake's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law Filed in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment; and (3) Confidential Exhibits 2-8, 10-11, 13-16, and 18-21 attached to the Declaration of Timothy B. Yoo Filed in Support of Plaintiff Westlake Services, LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (lom) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MINUTES (in chambers): ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION TO FILE VARIOUS DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL 190 by Judge S. James Otero. The Court finds that good cause has been demonstrated and GRANTS the Application to file under seal as to Exhibits 19-20, 33, 40, 58-59, 68, 71-72, 81, 87, 99, and 112. The Court DENIES Defendant's Application as to all other Exhibits and ORDERS that these Exhibits be filed publicly. It is so Ordered. (lom) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Donald House, Sr. 209 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Robert Stoll 208 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application to Strike and Vacate Hearing Dates For Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Premature and Excessive Motions in Limine) (Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      RESPONSE filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporationto Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,,, 211 Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Response To Order To Show Cause Re: Application To File Various Documents Under Seal (Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 212 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document re Various Documents re Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment under seal 190 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Exhibits 33, 40, 58, 71, 72, 87, 99, and 112)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          SCHEDULING NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge S. James Otero. The following is a correction to the Court's August, 25, 2017 Order to Show Cause [ECF 206]. The August 25, 2017 Order to Show Cause is VACATED and a corrected order is issued as follows: This matter is before the Court on Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Application to File Various Documents Under Seal ("Application"), filed July 28, 2017 [ECF 190]. Defendant has submitted sixty-one (61) exhibits for the Court's consideration with the only general explanation that these exhibits are designated as Confidential or Highly Confidential or that they contain "propietary and sensitive business information." This is insufficient as a matter of law to justify an application to file under seal as the movant must show "compelling reasons" for sealing the specified records with a "particularized showing that specific prejudice or harm will result" if the information is disclosed. See Shultz Steel Co. v. Cont'l Cas. Co., No. CV1408044RSWLASX, 2016 WL 1465315, at *2 (C.D. Cal. Apr. 14, 2016). The Court ORDERS that Defendant show cause for filing under seal each individual exhibit as filed under the Application on or before September 6, 2017. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLCto Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,, 206 Order to Show Cause Re Application to File Various Material Under Seal (Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Donald House, Sr. filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 10/2/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Zachary Faigen, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Proposed Order) (Russell, Jason) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Robert Stoll filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 10/2/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Zachary Faigen, # 2 Exhibits 1 - 8, # 3 Exhibits 9 - 20, # 4 Proposed Order) (Russell, Jason) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 207 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Plaintiff Westlake Services, LLC's Application to File Various Documents under seal 203 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Exhibit 13 to T. Yoo's Declaration In Support Of Westlake's MSJ Opposition, # 2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 39 to T. Yoo's Declaration In Support Of Westlake's MSJ Opposition, # 3 Proof of Service)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge S. James Otero This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff Westlake Services, LLC's Application to File Various Documents Under Seal ("Application"), filed August 22, 2017 [ECF 203]. Plaintiff has submitted sixty-one (61) exhibits for the Court's consideration with the only general explanation that these exhibits are designated as Confidential or Highly Confidential or that they contain "propietary and sensitive business information." This is insufficient as a matter of law to justify an application to file under seal as the movant must show "compelling reasons" for sealing the specified records with a "particularized showing that specific prejudice or harm will result" if the information is disclosed. See Shultz Steel Co. v. Cont'l Cas. Co., No. CV1408044RSWLASX, 2016 WL 1465315, at *2 (C.D. Cal. Apr. 14, 2016). The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff show cause for filing under seal each individual exhibit as filed under the Application on or before August 30, 2017. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, 204 served on 8/22/17. (Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 204 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Plaintiff Westlake Services, LLC's Application to File Various Documents under seal 203 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts In Support of Its Opposition to CAC's MSJ, # 2 Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to file document Plaintiff Westlake Services, LLC's Application to File Various Documents under seal filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Application to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 [Redacted] Separate Statement og Undisputed Facts In Support of Its Opposition to CAC's MSJ, # 3 [Redacted] Statementof Genuine Disputes of Material Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 4 Declaration of Timonty Yoo In Support Of Opposition to CAC's MSJ, # 5 Exhibit 1-17 [Redacted], # 6 Exhibit 18-42 [Redacted], # 7 Exhibit 43-44 [Redacted], # 8 Exhibit 45-50 [Redacted], # 9 Exhibit 51-56 [Redacted])(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            STATEMENT Joint Stipulation Re Westlake's Payments of Attorney's Fees filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jacob Morrow)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 201 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Application to File Various Documents under seal 199 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - August 22, 2017 Email, # 2 Unredacted Document Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 3 Unredacted Document Credit Acceptance Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiff Westlake's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 4 Proof of Service of Under Seal Documents)(Russell, Jason) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION TO re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 187 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chris Urban In Opposition to CAC's MSJ, # 2 Declaration of Ian Anderson In Opposition to CAC's MSJ, # 3 Declaration of Timothy Yoo, # 4 Exhibit 1-17 In Support of Declaration of Timothy Yoo, # 5 Exhibit 18-42 In Support of Declaration of Timothy Yoo, # 6 Exhibit 43-44 In Support of Declaration of Timothy Yoo, # 7 Exhibit 45-50 In Support of Declaration of Timothy Yoo, # 8 Exhibit 51-56 In Support of Declaration of Timothy Yoo, # 9 [Redacted] Separate Statement, # 10 [Redacted] Statement of Genuine Disputes Material Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 11 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Jeff Brock, # 12 Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Douglas Busk, # 13 Proposed Order Re Evidentiary Objections to the Decl. of Jeff Brock, # 14 Proposed Order Re Evidentiary Objections to the Decl. of Douglas Busk)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to file document Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Application to File Various Documents under seal filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Russell, Jason) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION (Redacted Opposition) re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Element of Sham Litigation Claim 194 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact and Conclusions of Law and Evidentiary Objections, # 2 Redacted Document Statement of Additional Undisputed Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 3 Declaration of Zachary Faigen, # 4 Exhibit Nos. 123-136, # 5 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Brock, # 6 Request for Judicial Notice, # 7 Proposed Order)(Russell, Jason) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 197 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal 192 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Exhibit 8, # 2 Proof of Service)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, 193 served on July 28, 2017. (Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, 191 served on July 29, 2017. (Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Element of Sham Litigation Claim filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/2/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Yoo, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 193 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal 192 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Unredacted Document Decl. of Timothy Yoo, # 3 Unredacted Document Exhibits 1, # 4 Unredacted Document Exhibits 2, # 5 Unredacted Document Exhibits 3, # 6 Unredacted Document Stmt of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. Application set for hearing on 10/2/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 3 Redacted Document Decl of T Yoo and Exhibits 1-9, # 4 Redacted Document Exhibits 10-21, # 5 Redacted Document Stmt of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law)(Yoo, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 191 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document re Various Documents re Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment under seal 190 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 July 28, 2017 Email, # 2 Unredacted Document Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Unredacted Document Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 4 Unredacted Document Exs. 1, 7-9, 11, 14, 16-17, 17 to Declaration of Douglas A. Smith, # 5 Unredacted Document Ex. 20 and 22 to Declaration of Douglas A. Smith, # 6 Unredacted Document Exs. 30-34, 36-40, 50-53, 56-59, 68, 70-74, 81-85 to Declaration of Douglas A. Smith, # 7 Unredacted Document Exs. 86-102, 112, 122 to Declaration of Douglas A. Smith)(Russell, Jason) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to file document re Various Documents re Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment under seal filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Russell, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 187 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Russell, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT Joint Stipulation on Authenticity filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 187 . (Russell, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 10/2/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 3 Redacted Document Declaration of Douglas A. Smith, # 4 Exhibit Part 1 of 7, # 5 Exhibit Part 2 of 7, # 6 Exhibit Part 3 of 7, # 7 Exhibit Part 4 of 7, # 8 Exhibit Part 5 of 7, # 9 Exhibit Part 6 of 7, # 10 Exhibit Part 7 of 7, # 11 Declaration of Jeffrey Brock, # 12 Declaration of Douglas Busk) (Russell, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING JOINTSTIPULATION 185 by Judge S. James Otero. The Court orders as follows: 1. Credit Acceptance may have until Friday, June 30, 2017 to depose Mr. Ball. 2. Neither Westlake nor its experts may rely on or use any testimony, including at summary judgment or trial, that Mr. Ball may later provide on subject matters on which Mr. Ball invoked his Fifth Amendment right against self-incrimination during his deposition. 3. At summary judgment or trial, Westlake may not rely on or use any documents from Mr. Ball or Ball Automotive other than those produced to Credit Acceptance before Mr. Ball's deposition. Notwithstanding anything to the contrary contained herein, Mr. Ball and Ball Automotive shall have a continuing obligation to produce to Credit Acceptance any documents responsive to the extant subpoenas to the extent Mr. Ball or Ball Automotive gains possession, custody or control of any such documents currently in the possession of the BOE. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 185 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Order And Joint Motion Re: Extension Of Time For Discovery And Testimony From Third-Party David Ball In Light Of Fifth Amendment Assertions And Ongoing BOE Investigation filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Russell, Jason) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/10/2017; 9:09 a.m. re Transcript 183 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (at) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/10/2017; 9:09 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2017. (at) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION 180 by Judge S. James Otero : Fact discovery is re-opened for the following limited purposes (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILED LIST AND SPECIFICS). (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/18/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The parties joint request for relief of their obligation to submit briefs on the now-moot CAC custodian dispute is GRANTED. No further briefing will be required. 9See Minute Order for further details) re: Stipulation to Continue 180 (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Joint STIPULATION to Continue Pretrial Deadlines and Trial Date, and Set Briefing Schedule For Summary Judgment Motions from 8/21/17, 9/6/17, and 6/2/17 (respectively) to 11/6/17, 11/13/17, and 7/28/17 (respectively) Re: Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, 92 , Text Only Scheduling Notice, 174 , Joint STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Briefing for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas A. Smith, # 2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Bora Lee at blee@birdmarella.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder. (Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (vm) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Objections to R&R due by May 26, 2017. (Attachments: # 1 Report and Recommendation) (vm) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE BALL by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minuet Order for further details) denying 143 Motion to Exclude (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Amended Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED MINUTES ORDER RE: MOTION TO EXCLUDE FACT WITNESSES held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The parties may submit briefs by May 17, 2017. (See Minute Order for further details) re: Motion Hearing 172 . (vm) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING NOTICE OF ADVANCING THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES by Judge S. James Otero. On the Court's own motion, due to a scheduling conflict, the Court advances the Jury Trial set for 9/11/17 to Wednesday, 9/6/2017 @ 08:30 AM and the Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/17 to Monday, 8/21/2017 @ 09:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPACT DISC Order for date of proceedings 05/10/17 to 05/10/17 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Court will contact Douglas A. Smith at douglas.smith@skadden.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: Motion to Exclude Witnesses Hearing. FEE PAID. (Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: 5/10/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The parties may submit briefs by May 17, 2017. (See Minute Order for further details) Court Recorder: CS 5/10/2017. (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Exclude Fact Witnesses Brian Hopper and David Ball 143 Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Notice Of New Facts Relevant To Its Motion To Exclude Fact Witnesses Brian Hopper And David Ball filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas A. Smith)(Smith, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER, FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND TO REOPEN FACTDISCOVERY 137 ; DENYING MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 72(a) AND LOCAL RULE 72-2.1 138 . The Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer with Magistrate Judge Wilner within 10 days of the issuance of this Order to determine whether and to what extent discovery from Messrs. Roberts, Simmet,Knoblauch, and McClusky is proper under Rule 26(b). In light of the history of this litigation, which has been marked by contentious behavior and lack of cooperation between the parties, the Court finds it appropriate to remind the parties that it has limited each side to a total of four (4) motions in limine, including Daubert motions. The Court also advises the parties to carefully review the Court's Initial Standing Order regarding trial preparation. Strict compliance with the Initial Standing Order is required. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in support of a motion SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 72(a) AND LOCAL RULES 72-2.1 re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 140 142 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Yoo, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER, TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO REOPEN FACT DISCOVERY 137 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Seilie, Ray)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 167 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 3 To The Declaration Of Douglas A. Smith In Support Of Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Supplemental Memorandum re Supplement(Motion related) 161 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 165 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation.(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      The Court finds the following motions suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing re the MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order, to File Second Amended Complaint and to Reopen Fact Discovery filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. [ECF #137], and the MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Sanctions on Discovery Matters, Order on Motion to Compel 134 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. [ECF #138], and the MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order, for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, and to Reopen Fact Discovery; [ECF#141], and the MOTION for Review of Magistrate Order Regarding Discovery Motions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a) and Local Rules 72-2.1 [ECF #142], set for hearing on May 15, 2017. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATIONS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Order for details) 162 APPLICATION to Seal Document (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION to file document Various Documents under seal 162 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Credit Acceptance Corporation's Application to File Under Seal [Correcting Case Number])(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 163 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Various Documents under seal 162 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Apr 18-19 Email, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Apr 26, 2017 Email, # 3 Unredacted Document Ex. 3 to Declaration of Douglas A. Smith In Support of Supplemental Memorandum, # 4 Proof of Service)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to file document Various Documents under seal filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Exclude Fact Witnesses Brian Hopper and David Ball 143 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Declaration of Douglas A. Smith)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 37-2.3 RE CAC'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF HOPPER/BALL re MOTION to Exclude Fact Witnesses Brian Hopper and David Ball 143 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy B. Yoo)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 159 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT Request For Judicial Notice And Incorporation By Reference In Support Of Credit Acceptance's Opposition To Westlake's Motion For Leave To File The Second Amended Complaint re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, 147 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 154 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation.(Russell, Jason) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 158 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 2 And 5-7 To The Declaration Of Douglas A. Smith In Support Of Defendant Credit Acceptance's Opposition To Westlake's Motion To Modify Scheduling Order, For Leave To File The Second Amended Complaint, And To Reopen Fact Discovery; Request For Judicial Notice And Incorporation By Reference re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, 147 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 154 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation.(Russell, Jason) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 157 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 4 To The Declaration Of Douglas A. Smith In Support Of Defendant Credit Acceptance's Opposition To Westlake's Motion For Review Of Magistrate Order Regarding Discovery Motion re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), 148 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 154 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation.(Russell, Jason) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 156 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT Credit Acceptance's Opposition To Westlake's Motion To Modify Scheduling Order, For Leave To File The Second Amended Complaint, And To Reopen Fact Discovery re SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER, FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND TO REOPEN FACT DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Un 141 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 154 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation.(Russell, Jason) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 155 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT Credit Acceptance Corporation's Opposition To Westlake's Motion For Review Of Magistrate Order Regarding Discovery Motions re SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 72(a) AND LOCAL RULES 72-2.1 re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 140 142 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 154 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation.(Russell, Jason) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATIONS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 149 by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPACT DISC Order for date of proceedings March 29, 2017 to March 29, 2017 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Court will contact Douglas Smith at douglas.smith@skadden.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: FEE PAID. (Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Bora Lee at blee@birdmarella.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder. (Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for details) re: MOTION to Exclude Fact Witnesses Brian Hopper and David Ball 143 (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 150 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Various Documents under seal 149 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Apr 24, 2017 Email, # 2 Unredacted Document Opposition to Westlake's Motion for Review of Magistrate Order, etc., # 3 Unredacted Document Opposition to Westlake's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, for Leave, etc., # 4 Unredacted Document Ex. 4 to the Declaration of Douglas A. Smith in Support of Opposition to Review of Magistrate Order, # 5 Unredacted Document Exs. 2 and 5-7 to Declaration of Douglas A. Smith in Support of Opposition to Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, etc., # 6 Unredacted Document Request for Judicial Notice, # 7 Proof of Service)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to file document Various Documents under seal filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION to re: SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 72(a) AND LOCAL RULES 72-2.1 re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 140 142 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Declaration of Douglas A. Smith)(Russell, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to re: SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER, FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND TO REOPEN FACT DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Un 141 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Declaration of Douglas A. Smith, # 2 Redacted Document Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Proposed Order)(Russell, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 146 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Joint Stipulation Addressing Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion to Exclude Fact Witnesses and Certain Exhibits under seal 145 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Mar 8, 2017 Email, # 2 Exhibit 2 Mar 15, 2017 Email, # 3 Exhibit 3 Apr 18-19, 2017 Email, # 4 Exhibit 4 Mar 9, 2017 Order, # 5 Unredacted Document Ex 5 - Joint Stipulation, # 6 Unredacted Document Ex 6 - Exhs 3, 8 and 15 to Declaration of D. Smith, # 7 Unredacted Document Ex 7 - Declaration of T. Yoo, # 8 Proof of Service)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to file document Joint Stipulation Addressing Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion to Exclude Fact Witnesses and Certain Exhibits under seal filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Joint Stipulation to Exclude Witnesses, # 3 Redacted Document Declaration of Douglas A. Smith, # 4 Redacted Document Declaration of Timothy B. Yoo)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: 4/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Exclude Fact Witnesses Brian Hopper and David Ball 143 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas A. Smith - redacted, # 2 Declaration of Timothy B. Yoo - redacted)(Smith, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: 4/19/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Fact Witnesses Brian Hopper and David Ball filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2017 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 142 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 72(a) AND LOCAL RULES 72-2.1 re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 140 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero.(Yoo, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 141 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER, FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND TO REOPEN FACT DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 140 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero.(Yoo, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLCS APPLICATION TO FILE VARIOUS DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS) 135 by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of RAY S. SEILIE IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER, TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO REOPEN FACT DISCOVERY 137 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Sanctions on Discovery Matters, Order on Motion to Compel 134 138 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Yoo, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Sanctions on Discovery Matters, Order on Motion to Compel 134 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Yoo, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER, TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO REOPEN FACT DISCOVERY filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Yoo, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 136 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Various Documents under seal 135 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Unredacted Document Motion for Review of Magistrate Order, # 3 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to file document Various Documents under seal filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Redacted Document Motion for Review of Magistrate Order, # 3 Proposed Order)(Yoo, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: 3/29/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for details) denying 99 Motion for Sanctions; denying 101 Motion to Compel (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 133 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 24 to the Declaration of Douglas A. Smith in Support of Defendant Credit Acceptance's Notice of Supplemental Facts Relevant to Its Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion, 100 , MOTION for Sanctions Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions 99 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 130 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 132 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Notice of Supplemental Facts Relevant to Its Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion, 100 , MOTION for Sanctions Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions 99 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 130 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 131 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Notice of Supplemental Facts Relevant to Its Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions and Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Douglas A. Smith under seal 129 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Email with T. Yoo, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Email with T. Yoo, # 3 Unredacted Document Notice of Supplemental Facts Relevant to Its Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions, # 4 Unredacted Document Declaration of Douglas A. Smith In Support Of Notice of Supplemental Facts Relevant to Its Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions, # 5 Proof of Service)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATIONS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Order for details) 129 APPLICATION to Seal Document (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to file document Notice of Supplemental Facts Relevant to Its Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions and Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Douglas A. Smith under seal filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Request for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Facts Relevant to Its Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions, # 3 Redacted Document Declaration of Douglas A. Smith in Support of Notice of Supplemental Facts)(Smith, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Sanctions Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions 99 Request for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Facts Relevant to Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas A. Smith)(Smith, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero. This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff Westlak e Services, LLC's ("Westlake") Ex Parte Application for a Limited Extension of Time to Complete Certain Fact Discovery ("Application"), filedMarch 16, 2017 123 . The Court therefore finds Westlake's Application to be premature, and DENIES without prejudice its request for additional time to complete discovery as to these issues. To the extent Westlake seeks additional time to conduct already-noticed depositions, it should make this request in the form of either a joint stipulation or, if the parties are for some reason unable to reach an agreement as to this issue, file an appropriate request with Magistrate Judge Wilner. See document for details. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 4/28/2017 123 DEFENDANT CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE FACT DISCOVERY filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas A. Smith)(Russell, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 125 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 19 and 20 to the Declaration of Douglas A. Smith in Support of Credit Acceptance's Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Its re MOTION for Sanctions Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions 99 , Supplement(Motion related), 116 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 119 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 124 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT Credit Acceptance Corporation's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Its re MOTION for Sanctions Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions 99 , Supplement(Motion related), 116 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 119 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 4/28/2017 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-10, # 3 Proposed Order) (Yoo, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 122 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS A. SMITH REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM ADDITIONAL CUSTODIANS AND DOCUMENTS CONCERNING INVENTORSHIP, THE DECISION TO SUE WESTLAKE, AND DOCUMENTS IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED AS PRIVILEGED re MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM ADDITIONAL CUSTODIANS AND DOCUMENTS IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED AS PRIVILEGED 101 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, 107 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC.(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 121 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY B. YOO IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM ADDITIONAL CUSTODIANS AND DOCUMENTS CONCERNING INVENTORSHIP, THE DECISION TO SUE WESTLAKE, AND DOCUMENTS IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED AS PRIVILEGED re MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM ADDITIONAL CUSTODIANS AND DOCUMENTS IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED AS PRIVILEGED 101 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, 107 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC.(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 120 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM ADDITIONAL CUSTODIANS AND DOCUMENTS CONCERNING INVENTORSHIP, THE DECISION TO SUE WESTLAKE, AND DOCUMENTS IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED AS PRIVILEGED re MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM ADDITIONAL CUSTODIANS AND DOCUMENTS IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED AS PRIVILEGED 101 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, 107 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC.(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATIONS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Order for details) 117 APPLICATION to Seal Document (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 118 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Credit Acceptance Corporation's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions, and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Douglas A. Smith under seal 117 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Email to T. Yoo, # 2 Unredacted Document Ex. 2 - Supplemental Memorandum, # 3 Unredacted Document Ex. 3 - Exhibits 19 and 20 to Declaration of Douglas A. Smith, # 4 Proof of Service)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to file document Credit Acceptance Corporation's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions, and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Douglas A. Smith under seal filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Supplemental Memorandum, # 3 Redacted Document Exhibits 19 and 20 to Declaration of Douglas A. Smith)(Smith, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 116 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Sanctions Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions 99 Credit Acceptance Corporation's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Douglas A. Smith)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 115 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM ADDITIONAL CUSTODIANS AND DOCUMENTS IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED AS PRIVILEGED 101 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas A. Smith)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM ADDITIONAL CUSTODIANS AND DOCUMENTS IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED AS PRIVILEGED 101 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy B. Yoo)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 113 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit A to the Declaration of Julian C. Burns in Opposition to Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion, 100 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 108 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 112 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 14 to the Declaration of Douglas A. Smith In Support of Defendant Credit Acceptance's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion, 100 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 108 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 111 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT Joint Stipulation Addressing Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion, 100 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 108 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DENYING SHORTENING TIME FOR WESTLAKES MOTION TO COMPEL AND CREDITACCEPTANCES MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS UNDER LOCAL RULE 37-1 by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The request is DENIED. re Stipulation for Order 109 (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION for Order Shortening Time For Westlakes Motion To Compel And Credit Acceptances Motion For Evidentiary Sanctions Under Local Rule 37-1 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATIONS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Order for details) 105 APPLICATION to Seal Document (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF: (1) PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THE ACCOMPANYING JOINT STIPULATION; (2) DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY B. YOO AND ATTACHMENTS IN SUPPORT THEREOF; AND (3) DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS A. SMITH AND EXHIBIT 17 THERETO by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Order for details) 103 APPLICATION to Seal Document (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 106 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document the Joint Stipulation Addressing Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions under seal 105 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Joint Stipulation Addressing Credit Acceptance Corporations Motion For Evidentiary Sanctions, And Certain Exhibits Of The Declaration Of Douglas A. Smith Under Seal, # 2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 14 to the Declaration of Douglas Smith, # 3 Unredacted Document Exhibit A to the Declaration of Julian Burns)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to file document the Joint Stipulation Addressing Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions under seal filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Joint Stipulation re Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions, # 2 Redacted Document Declaration of Douglas Smith, # 3 Redacted Document Declaration of Julian Burns, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Proof of Service)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 104 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document VARIOUS DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL under seal 103 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Declaration of Tim Yoo, # 2 Unredacted Document Declaration of Douglas Smith, # 3 Unredacted Document Joint Stipulation in Support of Motion to Compel, # 4 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to file document VARIOUS DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL under seal filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Joint Stipulation in Support of Motion to Compel, # 2 Redacted Document Declaration of Tim Yoo - Part 1, # 3 Redacted Document Declaration of Tim Yoo - Part 2, # 4 Redacted Document Declaration of Douglas Smith, # 5 Proposed Order, # 6 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM ADDITIONAL CUSTODIANS AND DOCUMENTS IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED AS PRIVILEGED 101 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy B. Yoo - Part 1 (Redacted Version), # 2 Declaration of Timothy B. Yoo - Part 2 (Redacted Version), # 3 Declaration of Douglas A. Smith (Redacted Version))(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM ADDITIONAL CUSTODIANS AND DOCUMENTS IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED AS PRIVILEGED filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/29/2017 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion (Rule 37)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Sanctions Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions 99 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas Smith - Redacted, # 2 Declaration of Julian Burns - Redacted, # 3 Declaration of Michael Kunkel, # 4 Declaration of Kyle Menger, # 5 Declaration of Jeremy Waugh)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Sanctions on Discovery Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Credit Acceptance Corporation's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/29/2017 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING ANSWERING CREDIT ACCEPTANCES INTERROGATORY Nos. 8-15, 17, AND 18, AND WESTLAKES INTERROGATORY No. 5 by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Order for details) re Stipulation for Discovery 97 (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION for Discovery as to Answering Credit Acceptance's Interrogatory Nos. 8-15, 17, And 18, And Westlake's Interrogatory No. 5 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conferred with counsel regarding the status of the discovery dispute. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Telephone Conference set for February 21, 2017 at 2:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Blecher Collins & Pepperman, P.C., Maxwell M. Blecher, and Donald R. Pepperman as counsel of record 93 , for the following reasons: FAILURE to comply with L.R. 5-4.4 Submission of Proposed Orders, Judgments, or Other Proposed Documents That Require a Judges Signature. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: 1/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Blecher Collins & Pepperman, P.C., Maxwell M. Blecher, and Donald R. Pepperman as counsel of record filed by plaintiffs Nowcom Corporation, Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Maxwell M Blecher added to party Nowcom Corporation(pty:pla)) (Blecher, Maxwell) Modified on 1/31/2017 (lc). (STRICKEN PER 1/31/17 ORDER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES 91 by Judge S. James Otero: The fact discovery cutoff: March 31, 2017. Deadline for service of opening expert reports: April 7, 2017; The deadline for service of rebuttal expert reports : May 5, 2017; The expert discovery cutoff: May 26, 2017; The deadline for filing dispositive motions:June 2, 2017; Pretrial Conference: August 28, 2017 at 9:00 AM; Trial date: September 11, 2017 at 9:00 AM. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 91 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STIPULATION to Continue PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES from May 16, 2016 to September 11, 2017 Re: Scheduling Conference,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, 55 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE WESTLAKE'S EXPERT TESTIMONY, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDERCOMPELLING WESTLAKE'S EXPERT DISCLOSURES IMMEDIATELY [Docket. No. 82 ]. The Court DENIES Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's ("CAC" or "Defendant") Motion to Exclude Westlake's Expert Testimony, or in the Alternative, for an Order Compelling Westlake's Expert Disclosures Immediately. The parties should continue to work among themselves and with the magistrate judge to resolve any remaining discovery disputes. The Court encourages the parties to file an appropriate stipulation concerning remaining deadlines. The parties are limited to a total of four (4) motions in limine per side, including Daubert motions.IT IS SO ORDERED. See minute order for further details. (jy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: 12/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Westlake's Expert Testimony, Or In The Alternative, For An Order Compelling Westlake's Expert Disclosures Immediately 82 filed by Defendants Credit Acceptance Corporation, Does. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas A. Smith, # 2 Exhibit 18 and 19)(Attorney Jason D Russell added to party Does(pty:dft))(Russell, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: This matter is before the Court on its own initiative. On December 27, 2016, the Court grantedDefendant's Ex Parte Application for an Expedited Briefing and Hearing Schedule. (See ECF No. 86.) In its Order the Court set a hearing date of Wednesday, January 4, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. This date was placed in the order in error. The Court modifies the schedule and sets a hearing date on Defendant's Motion to Exclude Westlake's Expert Testimony, or in theAlternative, for an Order Compelling Westlake's Expert Disclosures Immediately. 82 , for Tuesday, January 17, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Westlake's Expert Testimony, Or In The Alternative, For An Order Compelling Westlake's Expert Disclosures Immediately 82 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy B. Yoo, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Yoo, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN EXPEDITED BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT CREDIT ACCEPTANCES MOTION TO EXCLUDE WESTLAKESEXPERT TESTIMONY 83 by Judge S. James Otero: (1) Westlake must file any opposition to the Motion by Wednesday, December 28, 2017, at 4:00 p.m. PST; Credit Acceptance must file any reply by Thursday, December 28, 2016, at 12:00 p.m. PST; and the motion will be heard by this Court on Wednesday, January 4, 2017, at 10:00 a.m.; and (2) Credit Acceptances motion is exempted from C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-3s requirement that a party wait 7 days after conferencing with opposing counsel before filing a motion. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ray S Seilie counsel for Plaintiffs Nowcom Corporation, Westlake Services LLC. Adding Ray S. Seilie as counsel of record for Nowcom Corporation and Westlake Services, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Nowcom Corporation and Westlake Services, LLC. (Attorney Ray S Seilie added to party Nowcom Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Ray S Seilie added to party Westlake Services LLC(pty:pla))(Seilie, Ray) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Douglas A. Smith in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Westlake's Expert Testimony, Or In The Alternative, For An Order Compelling Westlake's Expert Disclosures Immediately 82 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Exclude Westlake's Expert Testimony, Or In The Alternative, For An Order Compelling Westlake's Expert Disclosures Immediately (see Docket No. 82 83 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Russell, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Exclude Westlake's Expert Testimony, Or In The Alternative, For An Order Compelling Westlake's Expert Disclosures Immediately (see Docket No. 82) filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Russell, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Westlake's Expert Testimony, Or In The Alternative, For An Order Compelling Westlake's Expert Disclosures Immediately filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Russell, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: 12/14/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 76 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan L Frank APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation, designating Douglas A. Smith as local counsel. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: 12/14/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 75 Non-Resident Attorney James A. Keyte APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation, designating Douglas A. Smith as local counsel. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Julia K York counsel for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Julia K. York is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (York, Julia) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 73 Non-Resident Attorney Patrick G. Rideout APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation, designating Douglas A. Smith as local counsel. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven C Sunshine counsel for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Steven C. Sunshine is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Sunshine, Steven) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: 11/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan L. Frank to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18977167) filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (At tachments: # 1 Good Standing Certificate of New York, # 2 Good Standing Certificate of Massachusetts, # 3 Proposed Order) (Smith, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: 11/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James A. Keyte to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18977151) filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attac hments: # 1 Good Standing Certificate, # 2 Proposed Order) (Smith, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Patrick G. Rideout to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18921337) 73 . The following error(s) was/were found: Superseded version of Form G-64 used. Application incomplete. Did not provide City, State or Zip Code (lt) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: 11/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Patrick G. Rideout to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18921337) filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (A ttachments: # 1 Rideout Good Standing Certificate, # 2 Proposed Order) (Smith, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The motion is DISMISSED without further consequence based on the parties agreement regarding the production of additional materials. (See Minute Order for further details) 60 Motion to Compel (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING NOTICE RE: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The previously scheduled Telephone Conference set for November 9, 2016 at 8:00 a.m. has been rescheduled to November 14, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. re: Text Only Scheduling Notice 63 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin James Minnick counsel for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Kevin James Minnick is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), 66 by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 11/10/16.Document 65 and 66 are duplicate documents. Document no. 66 attached document does not matchits text entry. Attached document is for attorney Carl Roth, whereas text entry reference attorney Kevin Minnick. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) 66 . The following error(s) was found:Document 65 and 66 are duplicate documents. Document no. 66 attached document does not match its text entry. Attached document is for attorney Carl Roth, whereas text entry reference attorney Kevin Minnick. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James Young Pak counsel for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. James Young Pak is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Pak, James) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin James Minnick counsel for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Kevin James Minnick is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Carl Alan Roth counsel for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Carl Alan Roth is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Roth, Carl) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge S. James Otero. Effective November 7, 2016, Judge Otero will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 10C on the 10th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 10C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conferred with counsel regarding the status of the discovery dispute. The Court sets a further telephonic status conference on November 9, 2016 at 8:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Telephone Conference set for October 31, 2016 at 10:30 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: 10/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION 60 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration)(Yoo, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: 10/26/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2016 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Yoo, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, re: Stipulation for Protective Order, 58 . (mz) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order)(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 06/06/2016 8:57 a.m. re Transcript 56 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Zurborg, Carol) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 06/06/2016 8:57 a.m. Court Reporter: Carol Jean Zurborg, phone number (213) 894-3539. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2016. (Zurborg, Carol) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Scheduling Conference held before Judge S. James Otero. The Court sets the following schedule: Jury Trial: Tuesday, May 16, 2017 at 9:00 a.m.; Pretrial Conference: Monday, May 1, 2017 at 9:00 a.m.; Motion Cutoff: Monday, March 13, 2017 at 10:00 a.m.; Discovery Cutoff: Thursday, February 16, 2017; Last Date to Amend: Wednesday, July 6, 2016. Settlement is referred to Private Mediation for all further proceedings.Court Reporter: Carol Zurborg. (See attached document for other requirements.) (lom) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting 33 REQUEST to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT John D. van Loben Sels, as well as the firm Fish & Tsang LLP are permitted to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiffs Westlake Services, LLC dba Westlake Financial Services and Nowcom Corporation (collectively, "Westlake") in this matter. Westlake will continue to be represented in this case by counsel from the firms Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks, Lincenberg & Rhow, P.C. and Blecher Collins & Pepperman, P.c. Attorney John D Van Loben Sels terminated (bp) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Report 52 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT REPORT of Pursuant to RFCP Rule 26(f) and Local Rule 26-1 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, 37 [Corrected] Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Answer to Plaintiffs' Civil Antitrust First Amended Complaint for Violations of the Sherman Act (15 U.S.C. Section 2) filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation.(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. correcting Answer to Complaint, 45 Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Notice of Errata Regarding ECF No. 45 (Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Douglas Allen Smith counsel for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Adding Douglas A. Smith as counsel of record for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attorney Douglas Allen Smith added to party Credit Acceptance Corporation(pty:dft))(Smith, Douglas) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Carl Alan Roth counsel for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Adding Carl Alan Roth as counsel of record for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attorney Carl Alan Roth added to party Credit Acceptance Corporation(pty:dft))(Roth, Carl) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason D Russell counsel for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Adding Jason D. Russell as counsel of record for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Russell, Jason) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/23/2016. Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (vcr) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, 37 JURY DEMAND. Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation's Answer to Plaintiffs' Civil Antitrust First Amended Complaint for Violations of the Sherman Act (15 U.S.C. 2) filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation.(Attorney Jason D Russell added to party Credit Acceptance Corporation(pty:dft))(Russell, Jason) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC is hereby ORDERED to show cause in writing by no later than May 2, 2016 as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following as an appropriate response tothis Order to Show Cause, on or before the above date: Answer by the Defendant or Plaintiff's request for entry of default. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the court. TheOrder will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. (lc) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 38 . Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation has 14 days to file an Answer to the First Amended Complaint. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 38 by Judge S. James Otero: The Court finds the following motion suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing re the MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant'sNotice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed byDefendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. 38 , set for hearing on March 28, 2016. No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint from March 28, 2016 to April 11, 2016 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint 38 filed by Plaintiffs Nowcom Corporation, Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pepperman, Donald) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint 38 Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Minnick, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint 38 filed by Plaintiffs Nowcom Corporation, Westlake Services LLC. (Pepperman, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/28/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin J. Minnick, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint) (Minnick, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , filed by Plaintiffs Westlake Services LLC, Nowcom Corporation(Attorney Donald R Pepperman added to party Nowcom Corporation(pty:pla))(Pepperman, Donald) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST of John van Loben Sels to Withdraw as Attorney 33 , pdf is the G-01 form. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Request: substitute attorney (G-01). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED CIVIL MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: The Court therefore DENIES Plaintiffs' Application. Should Plaintiffs wish to file a First AmendedComplaint, they must do so by no later than Friday, February 19, 2016. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (vv) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: The Court DENIES 31 Plaintiffs Westlake Services, LLC d/b/a Westlake Financial Services and Nowcom Corporation's Application for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint. Should Plaintiffs wish to file a First AmendedComplaint, they must do so by no later than Monday, February 19. (lc) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: 2/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST of John van Loben Sels to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiffs Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Van Loben Sels, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/13/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF 31 filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Plaintiffs Nowcom Corporation, Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Timothy B. Yoo, # 2 Proposed Order) (Yoo, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Timothy B Yoo counsel for Plaintiffs Nowcom Corporation, Westlake Services LLC. Adding Timothy B. Yoo as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Westlake Services, LLC and Nowcom Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs Westlake Services, LLC and Nowcom Corporation. (Attorney Timothy B Yoo added to party Nowcom Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy B Yoo added to party Westlake Services LLC(pty:pla))(Yoo, Timothy) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ekwan E Rhow counsel for Plaintiffs Nowcom Corporation, Westlake Services LLC. Adding Ekwan E. Rhow as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Westlake Services, LLC and Nowcom Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs Westlake Services, LLC and Nowcom Corporation. (Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Ekwan E. Rhow and Timothy B. Yoo from Bird Marella Boxer Wolpert Nessim Drooks Lincenberg & Rhow, P.C. and Maxwell M. Blecher and Donald R. Pepperman from Blecher Collins & Pepperman, P.C. on behalf of Plaintiffs Nowcom Corporation, Westlake Services LLC. Filed by Plaintiffs Nowcom Corporation, Westlake Services LLC (Attorney Ekwan E Rhow added to party Nowcom Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Ekwan E Rhow added to party Westlake Services LLC(pty:pla))(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: 12/18/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILEFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 25 by Judge S. James Otero: The time for the Plaintiffs to file the First Amended Complaint is EXTENDED from December 21, 2015 to February 19, 2016. (lc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Non-Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof 25 Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by plaintiff Nowcom Corporation, Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ellen J. Wang ISO Ex Parte Application For Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order) (Van Loben Sels, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES (In chambers): ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 15 by Judge S. James Otero. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Complaint is accordingly DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs may file a First Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the issuance of this Order. Defendant will have ten (10) days thereafter to respond. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      The Court finds the following motion suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. 15 , set for hearing on November 23, 2015. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss 15 Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Minnick, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin James Minnick counsel for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Adding James Y. Pak as counsel of record for Credit Acceptance Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss 15 filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Van Loben Sels, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HACE VICE by Judge S. James Otero: granting 18 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paramjeet Singh Sammi on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation, designating Kevin J. Minnick as local counsel. GRANTED CONDITIONED THAT ALL DATES SET SHALL REMAIN. (lom) Modified on 11/2/2015 (lom). (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for attorney Paramjeet S. Sammi to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Minnick, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation, identifying Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Defendant's FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation identifying Credit Acceptance Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Minnick, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin J. Minnick, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice) (Minnick, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge S. James Otero: GRANTED CONDITIONED ALL DATES SET SHALL REMAIN 11 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven C. Sunshine on behalf of Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation, designating Kevin J. Minnick as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge S. James Otero: GRANTED CONDITIONED ALL DATES SET SHALL REMAIN 12 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Julia K. York on behalf of Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation, designating Kevin J. Minnick as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for attorney Julia K. York to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16657503 paid.) filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for attorney Steven C. Sunshine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16657501 paid.) filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin James Minnick counsel for Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. Adding Kevin James Minnick as counsel of record for Credit Acceptance Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Attorney Kevin James Minnick added to party Credit Acceptance Corporation(pty:dft))(Minnick, Kevin) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation. (lc) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Transferring Case purs GO 14-03 (Related Case)(CV 34)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV13-01523 SJO (MRWx). Case transferred from Judge George H. King and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV15-07490 SJO (MRWx). Signed by Judge S. James Otero. (mg) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. King and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney John D Van Loben Sels added to party Nowcom Corporation(pty:pla))(Van Loben Sels, John) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Notice of Related Case(s) 3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs Nowcom Corporation, Westlake Services LLC. (Van Loben Sels, John) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Nowcom Corporation, Westlake Services LLC. Related Case(s): 13-CV-01523-SJO-MRWx (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Van Loben Sels, John) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Westlake Services LLC. (Van Loben Sels, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16503659 - Fee: $400, filed by Westlake Financial Services Westlake Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service) (Attorney John D Van Loben Sels added to party Westlake Services LLC(pty:pla))(Van Loben Sels, John) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 298 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?