Yu v. Clear Recon Corp
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:15-cv-04458

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 15, 2018 at 9:44 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY 14 . Counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at 408.535.5343 to provide a direct dial number for this appearance. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/30/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Case Management Statement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Case Management Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER RE: PRO SE RESOURCES. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/20/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Proposed Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?