Mauney v. Commission on Presid
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-10147
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 2:16 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fred W. Mauney, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred W. Mauney
v.
No Logo Commission on Presidential Debates "CPD", Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
Complaint filed in accordance with order no. 2. Case assigned to Judge: Young. . Fee Status: Waived (scj) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
    Chief Judge William G. Young . Memorandum and Order entered. cc/pla [EOD Date 10/4/02] (scj) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
      Chief Judge William G. Young . Order entered granting [1-1] motion to proceed without prepayment of fees (in forma pauperis). It is further ordered that the claims against the Masachusetts State Police be dismissed pursuant to 28 USC s1915(e) without further notice after 35 days from the date of this Order, unless before that time plaintiff shows good cause, in writing why this case should not be dismissed for the reasons stated in the accompanying memorandum. It is further ordered that the plaintiff Rider for America will be dismissed from this action unless counsel is retained within 35 days from the date of this order. cc/pla [EOD Date 10/4/02] (scj) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: None
        Application/petition by Fred W. Mauney to proceed without prepayment of fees (in forma pauperis) . filed. (scj) (Entered: 01/25/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 26 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?