Harrell et al v. The City Of New York , et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-07246
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 13, 2019 at 11:02 AM EDT (5.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jacklyn Restrepo, Plaintiff

Represented by Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/31/2014 Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Represented by danackmanlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Lee Ackman +1 917 282 8178 +1 917 591 8300 dan@danackmanlaw.com

Represented by Harris, O'Brien, St. Laurent & Houghteling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M. St. Laurent +1 212 397 3370 +1 212 202 6206 andrew@harrislawny.com
No Logo John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/31/2014 Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Represented by danackmanlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Lee Ackman +1 917 282 8178 +1 917 591 8300 dan@danackmanlaw.com

Represented by Harris, O'Brien, St. Laurent & Houghteling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M. St. Laurent +1 212 397 3370 +1 212 202 6206 andrew@harrislawny.com
No Logo Michael Harrell, Plaintiff

Represented by Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/31/2014 Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Represented by danackmanlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Lee Ackman +1 917 282 8178 +1 917 591 8300 dan@danackmanlaw.com

Represented by Harris, O'Brien, St. Laurent & Houghteling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M. St. Laurent +1 212 397 3370 +1 212 202 6206 andrew@harrislawny.com
No Logo Pedro Camacho, Plaintiff

Represented by Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/31/2014 Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Represented by danackmanlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Lee Ackman +1 917 282 8178 +1 917 591 8300 dan@danackmanlaw.com

Represented by Harris, O'Brien, St. Laurent & Houghteling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M. St. Laurent +1 212 397 3370 +1 212 202 6206 andrew@harrislawny.com
No Logo Susan Calvo, Plaintiff

Represented by Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/31/2014 Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Represented by danackmanlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Lee Ackman +1 917 282 8178 +1 917 591 8300 dan@danackmanlaw.com

Represented by Harris, O'Brien, St. Laurent & Houghteling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M. St. Laurent +1 212 397 3370 +1 212 202 6206 andrew@harrislawny.com
v.
No Logo David Yassky, Defendant

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Beth Selvin +1 212 442 0588 +1 212 791 9714 kselvin@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Meera Joshi, Defendant

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Beth Selvin +1 212 442 0588 +1 212 791 9714 kselvin@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Raymond Scanlon, Defendant

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Beth Selvin +1 212 442 0588 +1 212 791 9714 kselvin@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City Of New York ,"

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Beth Selvin +1 212 442 0588 +1 212 791 9714 kselvin@law.nyc.gov
Attributes
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Timeline
  Entries (261) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Enforce Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Settlement Agreement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None In Limine
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Order Lifting Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 224 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Certify Class . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. Responses due by 12/1/2017(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
OPINION & ORDER re: 165 MOTION to Certify Class . filed by Susan Calvo, Yong Zhang, Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Pedro Camacho. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion is DENIED without prejudice. If Plaintiffs would like to move again for class certification, they must file their motion on or before November 1, 2017. Defendants must file their opposition brief on or before December 1, 2017. Plaintiffs may file a reply brief on or before December 20, 2017. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Docket Entry No. 165. ( Motions due by 11/1/2017., Responses due by 12/1/2017, Replies due by 12/20/2017.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/21/2017) (kgo) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER re: 211 Report and Recommendations. For the foregoing reasons, the R&R is ADOPTED in part and MODIFIED in part. The Court's adjustments result in a total award of $103,258.75 in attorneys' fees to Plaintiffs, as set forth in the table herein. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Docket Entry No. 139. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/15/2017) (kgo) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Andrew St. Laurent dated September 14, 2017 re: Class Certification. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Transcript Excerpts))(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated September 12, 2017 re: Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Sept. 11, 2017 Letter. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Gallagher Nov. 30, 2016 email)(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Andrew St. Laurent dated September 11, 2017 re: September 8th Hearing. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Andrew St. Laurent dated September 7, 2017 re: Petrobras Decision. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties are directed to appear for oral argument on Plaintiffs' motion on September 8, 2017, at 3:00 p.m., in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. SO ORDERED. (Oral Argument set for 9/8/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/29/2017) (anc) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: 211 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: # 1 Internet Citation, # 2 Internet Citation, # 3 Internet Citation, # 4 Internet Citation) (vf) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE Objections to Report and Recommendation. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE re: 213 Objection to Report and Recommendations . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Angel DeCastro, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION to 211 Report and Recommendations Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION to 211 Report and Recommendations Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Angel DeCastro, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Rothenberg Stipulation))(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 211 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 139 MOTION for Attorney Fees. For the reasons set forth above, I respectfully recommend that the Court grant Plaintiffs' interim attorneys' fees application, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1988(b), as follows Ackman $55,608.00, CHW $21,010.50 and HSC $32,593.75. total $109,212.25. I further recommend that Plaintiffs' request for interim costs be denied. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties shall have fourteen (14) days from service of this Report tofile written objections. See also Frd.R. Civ. P. 6 (allowing three (3) additional days for service by mail). Such objections, and any responses to objections, shall be filed with the Clerk of Court, with courtesy copies delivered to the Chambers of the Honorable Valerie Caproni, united States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, Room 240, New York, New York 10007, and to the chambers of the undersigned, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, Room 1660, New York, New York 10007. Any requests for an extension of time for filing objections must be directed to Judge Caproni. So Ordered. Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2017 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 7/20/2017) (js) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Daniel Ackman dated 5/15/17 re: CGS Decision. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo.(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Daniel Ackman dated 5/15/17 re: CGS Decision. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo.(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Karen B. Selvin dated May 11, 2017 re: CGS Taxi LLC v. The City of New York Decision. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CGS Taxi Decision)(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated May 11, 2017 re: CGS Taxi LLC v. The City of New York Decision. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CGS Taxi Decision)(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from All Plaintiffs' Counsel dated 3/27/17 re: Decision in Cruz v. Zucker. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Angel DeCastro, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cruz decision)(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Edward Murray in Opposition re: 165 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A-Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C-Part 1, # 5 Exhibit C-Part 2, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E-Part 1, # 8 Exhibit E-Part 2, # 9 Exhibit E-Part 3, # 10 Exhibit F-Part 1, # 11 Exhibit F-Part 2, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Exhibit H, # 14 Exhibit I, # 15 Exhibit J-Part 1, # 16 Exhibit J-Part 2, # 17 Exhibit J-Part 3, # 18 Exhibit J-Part 4, # 19 Exhibit K, # 20 Exhibit L-Part 1, # 21 Exhibit L-Part 2, # 22 Exhibit L-Part 3, # 23 Exhibit M, # 24 Exhibit N-Part 1, # 25 Exhibit N-Part 2, # 26 Exhibit O, # 27 Exhibit P, # 28 Exhibit Q-Part 1, # 29 Exhibit Q-Part 2, # 30 Exhibit Q-Part 3, # 31 Exhibit Q-Part 4, # 32 Exhibit R, # 33 Exhibit S-Part 1, # 34 Exhibit S-Part 2, # 35 Exhibit T, # 36 Exhibit U-Part 1, # 37 Exhibit U-Part 2, # 38 Exhibit U-Part 3, # 39 Exhibit U-Part 4, # 40 Exhibit U-Part 5, # 41 Exhibit V-Part 1, # 42 Exhibit V-Part 2, # 43 Exhibit W, # 44 Exhibit X, # 45 Exhibit Y-Part 1, # 46 Exhibit Y-Part 2, # 47 Exhibit Y-Part 3, # 48 Exhibit Z, # 49 Exhibit AA, # 50 Exhibit AB, # 51 Exhibit AC-Part 1, # 52 Exhibit AC-Part 2, # 53 Exhibit AD, # 54 Exhibit AE-Part 1, # 55 Exhibit AE-Part 2, # 56 Exhibit AF-Part 1, # 57 Exhibit AF-Part 2, # 58 Exhibit AF-Part 3, # 59 Exhibit AG-Part 1, # 60 Exhibit AG-Part 2, # 61 Exhibit AG-Part 3, # 62 Exhibit AH, # 63 Exhibit AI, # 64 Exhibit AJ-Part 1, # 65 Exhibit AJ-Part 2, # 66 Exhibit AJ-Part 3, # 67 Exhibit AK-Part 1, # 68 Exhibit AK-Part 2, # 69 Exhibit AL, # 70 Exhibit AM-Part 1, # 71 Exhibit AM-Part 2, # 72 Exhibit AM-Part 3, # 73 Exhibit AN, # 74 Exhibit AO-Part 1, # 75 Exhibit AO-Part 2, # 76 Exhibit AO-Part 3, # 77 Exhibit AO-Part 4, # 78 Exhibit AO-Part 5, # 79 Exhibit AP-Part 1, # 80 Exhibit AP-Part 2, # 81 Exhibit AP-Part 3, # 82 Exhibit AP-Part 4, # 83 Exhibit AP-Part 5, # 84 Exhibit AQ)(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: WHEREAS Defendants filed redacted versions of Exhibits B-AQ to the Declaration of Edward Murray in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification ("Murray Declaration"); WHEREAS several of the driver's licenses shown in the exhibits do not redact the driver's birthdate or license number, which are personally identifying information; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before March 17, 2017, Defendants must refile revised redactions to Exhibits B-AQ to the Murray Declaration such that all personally identifying information is redacted, including birthdates and license numbers. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/13/2017) (mro) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: denying 201 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application DENIED. If the issue of estoppel becomes important to deciding the case, the Court will provide the parties the opportunity to submit supplemental briefs on the issue. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 03/10/2017) (ap) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Joseph T. Gallagher dated March 10, 2017 re: 201 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen Selvin dated March 9, 2017. . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (Gallagher, Joseph) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen Selvin dated March 9, 2017. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law)(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 200 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 199 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: WHEREAS Plaintiffs submitted proposed redactions in connection with their Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' proposed redactions to their reply brief and attached exhibits are APPROVED. Plaintiffs must submit an unredacted copy of the documents to the Sealed Records Department of the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/1/2017) (cla) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Edward Murray in Opposition re: 165 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1 (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2 (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit B (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit C - Part 1 (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit C - Part 2 (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit D (Redacted), # 7 Exhibit E - Part 1 (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit E - Part 2 (Redacted), # 9 Exhibit E - Part 3 (Redacted), # 10 Exhibit F - Part 1 (Redacted), # 11 Exhibit F - Part 2 (Redacted), # 12 Exhibit G (Redacted), # 13 Exhibit H (Redacted), # 14 Exhibit I (Redacted), # 15 Exhibit J - Part 1 (Redacted), # 16 Exhibit J - Part 2 (Redacted), # 17 Exhibit K (Redacted), # 18 Exhibit L - Part 1 (Redacted), # 19 Exhibit L - Part 2 (Redacted), # 20 Exhibit M (Redacted), # 21 Exhibit N - Part 1 (Redacted), # 22 Exhibit N - Part 2 (Redacted), # 23 Exhibit O (Redacted), # 24 Exhibit P (Redacted), # 25 Exhibit Q - Part 1 (Redacted), # 26 Exhibit Q - Part 2 (Redacted), # 27 Exhibit Q - Part 3 (Redacted), # 28 Exhibit R (Redacted), # 29 Exhibit S - Part 1 (Redacted), # 30 Exhibit S - Part 2 (Redacted), # 31 Exhibit T (Redacted), # 32 Exhibit U - Part 1 (Redacted), # 33 Exhibit U - Part 2 (Redacted), # 34 Exhibit U - Part 3 (Redacted), # 35 Exhibit V (Redacted), # 36 Exhibit W (Redacted), # 37 Exhibit X (Redacted), # 38 Exhibit Y - Part 1 (Redacted), # 39 Exhibit Y - Part 2 (Redacted), # 40 Exhibit Z (Redacted), # 41 Exhibit AA (Redacted), # 42 Exhibit AB (Redacted), # 43 Exhibit AC - Part 1 (Redacted), # 44 Exhibit AC - Part 2 (Redacted), # 45 Exhibit AD (Redacted), # 46 Exhibit AE - Part 1 (Redacted), # 47 Exhibit AE - Part 2 (Redacted), # 48 Exhibit AF - Part 1 (Redacted), # 49 Exhibit AF - Part 2 (Redacted), # 50 Exhibit AG - Part 1 (Redacted), # 51 Exhibit AG - Part 2 (Redacted), # 52 Exhibit AH (Redacted), # 53 Exhibit AI (Redacted), # 54 Exhibit AJ - Part 1 (Redacted), # 55 Exhibit AJ - Part 2 (Redacted), # 56 Exhibit AK - Part 1 (Redacted), # 57 Exhibit AK - Part 2 (Redacted), # 58 Exhibit AL (Redacted), # 59 Exhibit AM - Part 1 (Redacted), # 60 Exhibit AM - Part 2 (Redacted), # 61 Exhibit AM - Part 3 (Redacted), # 62 Exhibit AN (Redacted), # 63 Exhibit AO - Part 1 (Redacted), # 64 Exhibit AO - Part 2 (Redacted), # 65 Exhibit AO - Part 3 (Redacted), # 66 Exhibit AP - Part 1 (Redacted), # 67 Exhibit AP - Part 2 (Redacted), # 68 Exhibit AP - Part 3 (Redacted), # 69 Exhibit AQ (Redacted))(Thomas, Angelie) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen Selvin dated February 3, 2017 re: Sealing/ Redaction Email Transmittal. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Thomas, Angelie) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Andrew M. St. Laurent in Support re: 165 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31)(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 165 MOTION to Certify Class . (REDACTED). Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 192 Motion to Seal Document. Application GRANTED. Counsel may file on ECF in redacted form on February 24, 2017. The Court, however, may order after reviewing counsel's proposed redactions that counsel re-file revised redactions. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/23/2017) (kgo) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Joseph T. Gallagher dated February 22, 2017. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang.(Gallagher, Joseph) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' request is GRANTED with the exception of Exhibits B-AQ to the Murray Declaration. Defendants are directed to redact only the personally identifying information contained in Exhibits B-AQ and file the balance on ECF or show cause on or before February 28, 2017, why filing Exhibits B-AQ entirely under seal is appropriate in light of the presumption of access discussed by the Second Circuit in Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 119-20 (2d Cir. 2006); IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant must file the email transmittal in letter form on ECF and must deliver a copy of the unredacted documents, including the documents contained on the CD-ROM, to the Southern District of New York Sealed Records Department. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/22/2017) (cla) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni dated 2/8/17 re: Nnebe v. Daus Order. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Angel DeCastro, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Yong Zhang.(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated February 8, 2017 re: Feb. 7, 2017 Order in Nnebe v. Daus. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Feb. 7, 2017 Order in Nnebe v. Daus)(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 165 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Thomas, Angelie) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION in Opposition re: 165 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit C (Pending Application for Sealing Order), # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R)(Thomas, Angelie) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Edwin Mulero in Opposition re: 165 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Thomas, Angelie) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Edward Murray in Opposition re: 165 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1 (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2 (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit B - AQ (Pending Application for Sealing Order))(Thomas, Angelie) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 183 LETTER RESPONSE; granting in part and denying in part 182 Motion to Seal Document ; granting 182 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ENDORSEMENT: Requests GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants may file an extra five pages in their opposition brief. Plaintiffs may file an extra five pages in its reply brief. Plaintiffs' deadline to file the reply brief is ADJOURNED to February 24, 2017. Regarding Defendants' redactions request, public disclosure of Michael Harrell's documents and information is permitted. The personally identifiable information of Roland Ogbomo and Deirdre Harrell must be treated similarly to the personally identifiable information of other non-parties. Counsel is referred to this Court's Individual Practices regarding the procedure for requesting redaction of certain information. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/1/2017) (kgo) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Andrew St. Laurent dated February 1, 2017 re: 182 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Angelie Thomas dated January 31, 2017.FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Angelie Thomas dated January 31, 2017. . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FIRST LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Angelie Thomas dated January 31, 2017., FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Angelie Thomas dated January 31, 2017. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Sealing Order)(Thomas, Angelie) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 180 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application GRANTED. Defendants' opposition brief must be filed on or before February 3, 2017. Plaintiffs' reply brief must be filed on or before February 17, 2017. Responses due by 2/3/2017 Replies due by 2/17/2017. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/18/2017) (kgo) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 166 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, 167 Declaration in Support of Motion,, 165 MOTION to Certify Class ., 168 Declaration in Support of Motion, 169 Declaration in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Angelie Thomas dated January 17, 2017. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Thomas, Angelie) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 178 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court extends its sympathies to Ms. Selvin and her family. Application GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants' opposition brief is ADJOURNED to January 20, 2017. The deadline for Plaintiffs' reply brief is ADJOURNED to February 3, 2017. Responses due by 1/20/2017 Replies due by 2/3/2017. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/4/2017) (kgo) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 166 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, 167 Declaration in Support of Motion,, 165 MOTION to Certify Class ., 168 Declaration in Support of Motion, 169 Declaration in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Angelie Thomas dated January 3, 2017. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Thomas, Angelie) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute: Report and Recommendation regarding the amount of attorneys' fees: Plaintiffs' Motion for an Interim Fee Award [Dkt. 139]. Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. Motions referred to Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/19/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated December 14, 2016 re: Letter of Joseph Gallagher, Esq.. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Joseph T. Gallagher dated December 14, 2016 re: Individual Rule 2(B). Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang.(Gallagher, Joseph) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated 12/12/2016 re: I write to advise the Court, as detailed more fully herein, that plaintiffs' request to depose Mr. Murray violates a previous discovery agreement. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' December 12, 2016, submission [Dkt. 172] is STRICKEN because the submission was submitted in response to Plaintiffs' December 12, 2016, submission, which the Court struck for noncompliance with Individual Rule 2(B). (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/13/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Joseph T. Gallagher dated 12/12/2016 re: Plaintiffs respectfully request that the Court re-open discovery for the limited purpose of deposing Mr. Murray, and as further specified in this letter. ENDORSEMENT: This December 12, 2016, submission from Plaintiffs [Dkt. 171] is STRICKEN. On or before December 14, 2016, counsel for Plaintiffs must submit a letter explaining why counsel should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with the Court's Individual Rule 2(B), which requires for discovery disputes that counsel meet and confer in good faith and jointly call the Court to schedule a joint teleconference for resolution of the dispute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/12/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/2/2016) (anc) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Daniel L. Ackman in Support re: 165 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Andrew M. St. Laurent in Support re: 165 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Joseph T. Gallagher in Support re: 165 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (2015 Data), # 2 Exhibit 2 (2014 Data), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Camacho Depo), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Camacho Disp), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Restrepo Depo), # 6 Exhibit 6 (Restrepo Disp 1), # 7 Exhibit 7 (Restrepo Summonses), # 8 Exhibit 8 (Restrepo Disp 2), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Yuel Summonses), # 10 Exhibit 10 (Yuel Disp), # 11 Exhibit 11 (Yuel Depo), # 12 Exhibit 12 (JPPL Disp), # 13 Exhibit 13 (2013 Data), # 14 Exhibit 14 (2012 Data), # 15 Exhibit 15 (2011 Data))(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 165 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Certify Class . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. Responses due by 1/6/2017(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated December 1, 2016 re: Discovery Status and Request for Confidentiality Order. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Confidentiality Order)(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Eric Hecker in Support re: 121 MOTION for Attorney Fees Interim fee award.. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Hecker, Eric) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 139 MOTION for Attorney Fees . . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Angel DeCastro, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang, Yong Zheng. (St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Daniel L. Ackman in Support re: 139 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Angel DeCastro, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang, Yong Zheng. (St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b), judgment in Plaintiff Harrell's favor is VACATED, and Plaintiff Harrell is DISMISSED with prejudice from the case for failure to prosecute and failure to provide discovery. Michael Harrell terminated. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/14/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIRMATION of Daniel Ackman re efforts to contact M. Harrell. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Angel DeCastro, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 10/19/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 157 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 10/19/2016 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 154 Letter, filed by Susan Calvo, Yong Zhang, Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Michael Harrell, Angel DeCastro, Yong Zheng, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Pedro Camacho. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs' counsel must file an affidavit on or before November 10, 2016, that details the steps that Plaintiffs' counsel have taken to contact Mr. Harrell. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/7/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 139 MOTION for Attorney Fees . . Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Andrew St. Laurent dated November 4, 2016 re: October 20, 2016 Show Cause Order. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Angel DeCastro, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang, Yong Zheng.(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated November 3, 2016 re: Michael Harrell Show Cause Order. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: Pursuant to the October 19, 2016 conference with the Court, it is HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc. (JPPL) must produce to Defendants the following documents, on or before November 11, 2016: a. Any registration documents for automobiles owned, leased or controlled by JPPL during the class period that Plaintiffs have not already produced and that are within JPPL's possession, custody or control; b. Information reflecting the date on which JPPL disposed of the vehicle that is specified in the Corrected Second Amended Complaint as having been seized as a first time violation; c. JPPL leasing agreements in JPPL's possession, custody or control that were entered into prior to November 16, 2012, for vehicles owned, leased or controlled by JPPL during the class period; and d. Documents in JPPL's possession, custody or control that reflect the registered owner and the title holder for vehicles owned from December 2010 through November 15, 2012. 2. The Plaintiffs have indicated a desire to move for class certification prior to the December 1, 2016, deadline. Regardless of whether they do so, the Defendants' deadline to respond remains January 6, 2017, as previously set. 3. The Parties are directed to meet and confer to resolve the Defendants' concerns regarding a third-party subpoena served in connection with DeCastro v. The City of New York, No. 16-cv-3850 (RA) that might result in the production of materials covered by the protective order entered in this matter. 4. The parties are reminded that they may jointly contact Chambers at any point to request a referral to Magistrate Judge Freeman for a settlement conference. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/20/2016) (mro) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: WHEREAS Plaintiff Michael Harrell, on several occasions, has failed to appear for his scheduled deposition; and WHEREAS counsel for Plaintiff Harrell has informed the Court that Plaintiff Harrell has not responded to counsel's attempts to contact Plaintiff Harrell; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, pursuant to Fed. Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b), that Plaintiff Harrell show cause, on or before November 2, 2016, why judgment in his favor should not be vacated and he should not be dismissed from the case for failure to provide discovery. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/20/2016) (mro) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from the Parties dated October 14, 2016 re: Meet and Confer. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang.(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 147 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated October 7, 2016. filed by David Yassky, The City Of New York,, Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants may file a response to Plaintiffs' interim attorneys' fee application on or before November 4, 2016. Plaintiffs may file a reply on or before November 18, 2016. ( Responses due by 11/4/2016, Replies due by 11/18/2016.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/12/2016) (mro) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 147 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Request GRANTED, in part. The status conference currently scheduled for October 12, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. is ADJOURNED until October 19, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. The deadline for the parties' joint letter is ADJOURNED until October 14, 2016 at 5:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 10/19/2016 at 03:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/7/2016) (cf) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated October 7, 2016. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: The status conference currently scheduled for October 7, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. is ADJOURNED until Wednesday, October 12, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. Before the Wednesday status conference, the parties must meet and confer, in person, for at least two hours to attempt to resolve as many of their disputes regarding outstanding discovery as possible. The parties must file a joint letter on or before Tuesday, October 11, 2016 at 5:00 p.m. indicating what disputes remain. (Status Conference set for 10/12/2016 at 03:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/6/2016) (kko) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated October 4, 2016 re: Motion for FRCP 37 Sanctions. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H)(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of John R. Cuti in Support re: 139 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Yong Zhang. (Hecker, Eric) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Eric Hecker in Support re: 139 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Yong Zhang. (Hecker, Eric) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 139 MOTION for Attorney Fees . . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Andrew M. St. Laurent in Support re: 139 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Daniel L. Ackman in Support re: 139 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Attorney Fees . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang.(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Andrew M. St. Laurent re: 137 Letter, in opposition to motion to strike. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Andrew St. Laurent dated July 27, 2016 re: Opposition to defendants' motion to strike. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang.(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 135 Letter, filed by David Yassky, The City Of New York,, Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs must respond to Defendants' letter motion on or before September 27, 2016. Defendants may file a reply on or before October 4, 2016. The parties are directed to appear for a conference before the undersigned on October 7, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. ( Responses due by 9/27/2016, Replies due by 10/4/2016., Status Conference set for 10/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/20/2016) (mro) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated September 19, 2016 re: Coordinating Teleconference Pertaining to Defendants' Motion to Strike Pleadings of Plaintiffs Michael Harrell and John Peters Professional Limousines. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 7/21/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 7/21/2016 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 121 Motion for Attorney Fees. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to terminate Docket Entry 121. As previously described, the Plaintiffs must submit their application for interim attorneys' fees accompanied by supporting records on or before September 30, 2016. Defendants may file their response on or before October 21, 2016, and Plaintiffs may file a reply on or before November 4, 2016. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/30/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/28/2016) (mro) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated July 28, 2016 re: Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Concerning Confidential Information. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Concerning Confidential Information)(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: Pursuant to the July 21, 2016 conference with the Court, it is HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Defendants must provide the Plaintiff's complete identifying information regarding every fifth entry on the spreadsheet that Defendants produced to Plaintiffs reflecting all first time seizures of vehicles for a violation of Administrative Code § 19-506(b)(1) in 2015, and must produce copies of all documentation maintained by the Taxi and Limousine Commission regarding those seizures. Defendants must produce this information to Plaintiffs no later than August 8, 2016. The parties must agree to a confidentiality order to cover this production and, on or before July 28, 2016, must submit the proposed confidentiality order to the Court pursuant to the undersigned's Individual Practice 1.E. 2. Plaintiffs must produce to Defendants title, registration, and insurance information for John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc. ("JPPL") on or before August 8, 2016. 3. The deadline for discovery, including depositions, is December 1, 2016. 4. Plaintiffs must file their motion for class certification or before December 1, 2016. Plaintiffs are bound by their representation at the July 21, 2016 conference that they will not include Plaintiff Michael Harrell as a putative class representative. The City must file its response on or before January 6, 2017. Plaintiffs must file their reply on or before January 20, 2017. 5. The parties are reminded that they may jointly contact Chambers at any point to request a referral to Magistrate Judge Freeman for a settlement conference. ( Deposition due by 12/1/2016., Discovery due by 12/1/2016., Motions due by 12/1/2016., Responses due by 1/6/2017, Replies due by 1/20/2017.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/22/2016) (mro) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 125 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Parties dated July 12, 2016 re: Discovery Status Update. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel for the parties are directed to appear for a status conference before the undersigned on July 21, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. The parties should be prepared to discuss the contents of this letter. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 7/21/2016 at 03:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/14/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 125 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Parties dated July 12, 2016 re: Discovery Status Update. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel for the parties are directed to appear for a status conference before the undersigned on July 21, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. The parties should be prepared to discuss the contents of this letter. So ordered. (Status Conference set for 7/21/2016 at 03:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/14/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 121 MOTION for Attorney Fees Interim fee award. . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Parties dated July 12, 2016 re: Discovery Status Update. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang.(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 121 MOTION for Attorney Fees Interim fee award. . Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: The parties are directed to meet and confer on a class certification discovery deadline and a briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' anticipated motion for class certification. The parties must submit a joint letter to the Court with a proposed deadline and briefing schedule on or before July 12, 2016. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/28/2016) (tn) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 121 MOTION for Attorney Fees Interim fee award. . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Attorney Fees Interim fee award. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Angel DeCastro, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang.(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying 109 Letter Motion for Discovery: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' letter motion requesting discovery of fines under Section 19-506 is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Docket Entry 109. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/20/2016) (tn) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated June 15, 2016 re: Discovery. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated June 6, 2016 re: Discovery. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Angelie Thomas on behalf of Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Thomas, Angelie) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Defendants have represented to the Plaintiffs that the owner as listed in the spreadsheet that was produced on May 23, 2016 (entitled "2015 Defendants' Production"), is the registered owner as represented to the New York City Taxi & Limousine Commission ("TLC") at the time of the vehicle seizure. Defendants further represented that they have not researched to determine whether, in fact, the person represented to be the registered owner had an economic interest in the seized vehicle. 2. Defendants have further represented to Plaintiffs that the spreadsheet contains the universe of first-offense seizures of straight-plate vehicles under New York City Administrative Code § 19-506(b)(1) during 2015 as determined by a review of the records maintained by various entities that were reviewed by the Defendants in order to provide a good faith response to Plaintiffs' discovery request. 3. The parties are directed to meet and confer to discuss whether sampling can resolve Plaintiffs' concerns as to the Defendants' disclaimers on: (1) whether the registered owner are legitimate owners with an actual economic interest in the vehicle, (2) whether the registered owner was the individual who paid the towing or storage fees listed, and (3) whether there were reasons in addition to a suspected violation of New York City Administrative Code § 19-506(b)(1) that would have supported a seizure of the vehicle. 4. The Plaintiffs confirmed that their argument in favor of requiring the Defendants to provide records reflecting the fines paid by first time violators whose vehicles were seized pursuant to New York City Administrative Code § 19-506(b)(1) (Dkt. 109) rests on their contention that the process of seizing vehicles was inherently coercive for all drivers ones who were innocent of the violation as well as those who were guilty of the violation. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/3/2016) (spo) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: WHEREAS the parties jointly contacted Chambers on May 26, 2016 to request a teleconference with the Court to discuss a discovery dispute, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must jointly call Chambers on June 2, 2016 at 5:00 p.m. SO ORDERED.(Telephone Conference set for 6/2/2016 at 05:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/26/2016) (kl) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 4/22/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Siwik, Christine) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 4/22/2016 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/20/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2016.(Siwik, Christine) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated May 23, 2016 re: Discovery Status Report. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 101 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated May 19, 2016 re: 109 LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding fines addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Andrew St. Laurent dated May 6, 2016. . Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION for Discovery regarding fines addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Andrew St. Laurent dated May 6, 2016. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Joseph T. Gallagher dated May 2, 2016 re: Discovery. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang.(Gallagher, Joseph) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The deadline for the completion of all fact discovery is ADJOURNED sine die. 2. No later than April 30, 2016, Plaintiffs must produce the following material to Defendants as further set forth in this Order. 3. No later than May 2, 2016, Plaintiffs must submit a report to the Court regarding the status of the production ordered in paragraph 2. 4. No later than May 23, 2016, Defendants must produce to the Plaintiffs a spreadsheet listing for the year 2015 the owners of vehicles that were subject to first-offense seizures of straight-plate vehicles. The Defendants are authorized to redact the names and addresses of the owners. 5. On or before May 23, 2016, Defendants must submit a report to the Court regarding the status of discovery. 6. In the May 23, 2016 status report to the Court, the parties must indicate whether they would like a reference to Magistrate Judge Freeman for a settlement conference or to the Southern District of New York Mediation Program or whether Plaintiffs are ready to move for class certification. If the parties are not interested in a settlement referral, the letter should simply state that the parties do not wish such a referral without indicating which party is uninterested in discussing settlement at that time. Defendants should proceed with document production relating to other years in the putative class period. 7. On or before May 6, 2016, Plaintiffs may file a letter motion of no more than 5 pages explaining why Plaintiffs should be entitled to discovery regarding all fines levied under Section 19-506 against owners of vehicles subject to first time seizures during the putative class period. If Plaintiffs file such a motion, Defendants' response, also limited to 5 pages, shall be filed no later than May 20, 2016. There will be no replies. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/25/2016) (spo) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 105 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Request GRANTED. Defendants must file their Answer to the Corrected Second Amended Complaint on or before May 23, 2016. All Defendants. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/21/2016) (spo) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated April 20, 2016. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from All Counsel dated 4/20/16 re: Discovery Issues. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Angel DeCastro, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang.(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 102 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Request GRANTED. The parties' fact discovery deadline of April 15, 2016 is ADJOURNED until April 22, 2016. The parties may discuss with the Court the current status of discovery at the status conference scheduled for April 22, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. On or before April 20, 2016 at noon, the parties must submit a joint letter to the Court of no more than two (2) pages briefly previewing any discovery disputes that they wish to discuss. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/15/2016) (mro) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from All Counsel dated April 15, 2016. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 89 Amended Complaint, against Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Susan Calvo, Michael Harrell, Yong Zhang. Related document: 89 Amended Complaint, filed by Susan Calvo, Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Michael Harrell, Angel DeCastro, Yong Zheng, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Pedro Camacho.(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 89 Amended Complaint, against Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Susan Calvo, Michael Harrell, Yong Zhang with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Pedro Camacho, Yong Zheng, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Susan Calvo, Michael Harrell. Related document: 89 Amended Complaint, filed by Susan Calvo, Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Michael Harrell, Angel DeCastro, Yong Zheng, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Pedro Camacho.(Ackman, Daniel) Modified on 4/8/2016 (pc). (Entered: 04/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 98 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 4/8/2016. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/7/2016) (mro) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Joseph T. Gallagher dated April 7, 2016. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zhang.(Gallagher, Joseph) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None
FILING ERROR DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 89 Amended Complaint, against Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Pedro Camacho, Yong Zheng, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Susan Calvo, Michael Harrell. Related document: 89 Amended Complaint, filed by Susan Calvo, Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Michael Harrell, Angel DeCastro, Yong Zheng, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Pedro Camacho.(Gallagher, Joseph) Modified on 4/7/2016 (pc). (Entered: 04/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER terminating 90 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting 94 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs may file the proposed "corrected" SAC, Dkt. 94-1, except that they must remove as a Plaintiff Angel DeCastro, the putative named plaintiff who was driving a vehicle that was licensed by the Taxi and Limousine Commission as a car for hire, and must remove any allegations specific to him from the Amended Complaint. This case was brought on the theory that straight tag vehicles were being improperly seized, see, e.g., Am. Compl. 20-25 (Dkt. 24); it is too late in the case to alter the fundamental premise of the case. Plaintiffs must file a corrected Second Amended Complaint on the docket on or before April 6, 2016. 2. As to Defendants' other objections, the Court notes that it has given Plaintiffs several opportunities to identify appropriate class representatives and to "clean up" their allegations regarding seizures of the Plaintiffs' vehicles. If Plaintiffs have failed to do so, then a class will not be certified. On the other hand, if any of the current Plaintiffs are appropriate class representatives and they can satisfy the other requirements for class certification, then a class will be certified. 3. The attorneys for the parties are further reminded that the Court expects them to act in a professional and courteous manner with each other. Whether they can do that or not, they are ordered to refrain from sniping at each other in correspondence to the Court. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close Docket Entries 90 and 94. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/31/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated March 19, 2016 re: 94 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Andrew St. Laurent and Daniel Ackman dated 3/18/2016., 90 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time or to Strike the Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated March 7, 2016. . Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 03/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Andrew St. Laurent and Daniel Ackman dated 3/18/2016. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Angel DeCastro, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zheng. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 90 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time or to Strike the Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated March 7, 2016, filed by David Yassky, The City Of New York, Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon. ENDORSEMNT: Plaintiffs are directed to respond on or before March 22, 2016. Defendants' time to answer is ADJOURNED sine die pending further order of the Court. (Responses due by 3/22/2016) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/8/2016) (spo) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFRENCE proceeding held on 2/8/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFRENCE held on 2/8/2016 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time or to Strike the Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated March 7, 2016. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 24 Amended Complaint, against Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Pedro Camacho, Yong Zheng, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Angel DeCastro, Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Susan Calvo, Michael Harrell. Related document: 24 Amended Complaint, filed by Susan Calvo, Jacklyn Restrepo, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Pedro Camacho.(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 86 Letter re: Second Amended Complaint / ECF Issue, filed by Susan Calvo, Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Michael Harrell, Angel DeCastro, Yong Zheng, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Pedro Camacho. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/24/2016) (spo) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER withdrawing 65 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Plaintiffs' Motion for a Permanent Injunction (Dkt. 65) is hereby WITHDRAWN, without prejudice to Plaintiffs' renewal of the motion, if appropriate, at a later stage of the case. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to close Docket Entry 65. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/24/2016) (spo) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Daniel L. Ackman dated 2/24/16 re: Second Amended Complaint / ECF Issue. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Angel DeCastro, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zheng.(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 82 Amended Complaint,, against Michael Harrell, Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Pedro Camacho, Yong Zheng, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Angel DeCastro, Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Susan Calvo, Michael Harrell. Related document: 82 Amended Complaint,, filed by Susan Calvo, Jacklyn Restrepo, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Pedro Camacho.(Ackman, Daniel) Modified on 2/25/2016 (pc). (Entered: 02/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 24 Amended Complaint, against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Pedro Camacho, Yong Zheng, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Angel DeCastro, Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Susan Calvo, Michael Harrell. Related document: 24 Amended Complaint, filed by Susan Calvo, Jacklyn Restrepo, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Pedro Camacho.(Ackman, Daniel) Modified on 2/24/2016 (pc). (Entered: 02/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Andrew St. Laurent, Daniel Ackman dated February 22, 2016 re: Second Amended Complaint and injunction application. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Angel DeCastro, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Eamon Yuel, Yong Zheng.(Gallagher, Joseph) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 24 Amended Complaint, against Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Susan Calvo, Michael Harrell, Angel DeCastro, Yong Zheng, Eamon Yuel with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Susan Calvo, Michael Harrell. Related document: 24 Amended Complaint, filed by Susan Calvo, Jacklyn Restrepo, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Pedro Camacho.(Ackman, Daniel) Modified on 2/23/2016 (pc). (Entered: 02/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Andrew M. St. Laurent on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Harris, St. Laurent & Chaudhry LLP, 40 Wall Street, 53rd Floor, New York, NY, United States 10005, 2123973370. (St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs may file a Second Amended Complaint on or before February 22, 2016. The permitted amendments are limited to adding not more than three new plaintiffs who are complaining about a "first time violation" seizure and correcting allegations regarding the date of the "first time violation" seizure of the existing named plaintiffs. For the reasons stated during the status conference, it is FURTHER ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs' request to amend the complaint to add claims on behalf of second or subsequent violators of Admin. Code § 19-506 is DENIED. 2. Discovery must be limited to first-time violators. The parties are reminded that, in the event of a discovery dispute, the parties should follow the Court's Individual Rules at Rule 2.B. 3. The parties must appear for a post-discovery status conference on April 22, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. On or before April 15, 2016, the parties must file a joint letter to the Court reporting on the status of discovery and proposing how to proceed in the case. If the need arises, the parties may seek a reasonable adjournment of the fact discovery deadline and the post-discovery status conference. 4. The parties are reminded that they may jointly contact Chambers at any point to request a referral to Magistrate Judge Freeman for a settlement conference or to the Southern District of New York mediation program. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Amended Pleadings due by 2/22/2016.) (Status Conference set for 4/22/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/9/2016) (spo) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 75 Letter Motion for Conference. Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for a status conference on February 8, 2016, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. Status Conference set for 2/8/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/3/2016) (cf) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Joseph Terence Gallagher on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Harris, St. Laurent & Chaudhry LLP, 40 Wall Street, 53rd Floor, New York, New York, USA 10005, 917-512-9464. (Gallagher, Joseph) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated January 25, 2016 re: 75 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from All Plaintiffs' Counsel dated 1/21/16. . Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Terence Gallagher on behalf of Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Gallagher, Joseph) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from All Plaintiffs' Counsel dated 1/21/16. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo.(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 74 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION AND ORDER re: 60 MOTION for Reconsideration, filed by David Yassky, The City Of New York, Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon. For all the reasons discussed above, Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. 60) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is denied as to Susan Calvo and John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., but granted as to all other Plaintiffs. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Docket Entry 60. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/18/2015) (spo) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Karen B. Selvin in Opposition re: 65 MOTION for Permanent Injunction .. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 65 MOTION for Permanent Injunction . . Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for November 20, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. is ADJOURNED until April 22, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. (Status Conference set for 4/22/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/19/2015) (spo) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 69 Letter Motion for Discovery. Request GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/13/2015) (spo) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated November 12, 2015. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Court enters sua sponte a corrected memorandum opinion and order on the second issue that defendants raise in the motion for reconsideration, relating to punitive damages against individual defendants in their official capacities. The Court temporarily withholds judgment on the parties' remaining arguments. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/10/2015) (spo) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 60 MOTION for Reconsideration . . Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 65 MOTION for Permanent Injunction . . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
MOTION for Permanent Injunction . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. Responses due by 12/1/2015(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 60 MOTION for Reconsideration . . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 59 Letter Injunctive relief and class certification, filed by David Yassky, Jacklyn Restrepo, The City Of New York, Michael Harrell, Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Pedro Camacho. ENDORSEMENT: It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Defendants' request that the Court hold in abeyance the issues of class certification and injunctive relief is DENIED. 2. The parties must meet and confer on a discovery schedule for class certification and must submit a proposed schedule to the Court no later than November 13, 2015. 3. Plaintiffs may file a motion for injunctive relief no later than November 6, 2015. Defendants must file any opposition no later than December 1, 2015. Plaintiffs must file a reply, if any, no later than December 15, 2015. 4. Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for a status conference on November 20, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. (Motions due by 11/6/2015.) (Responses due by 12/1/2015.) (Replies due by 12/15/2015.) (Status Conference set for 11/20/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/26/2015) (spo) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 60 MOTION for Reconsideration . . Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Karen B. Selvin in Support re: 60 MOTION for Reconsideration .. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
MOTION for Reconsideration . Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from All Counsel dated 10/23/15 re: Injunctive relief and class certification. Document filed by Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Meera Joshi, Jacklyn Restrepo, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 9/24/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTION held on 9/24/2015 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 9/24/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTION held on 9/24/2015 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 53 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Request GRANTED. The parties' joint letter must be submitted no later than October 23, 2015. No additional extensions will be granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/8/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated October 8, 2015. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 52 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
CORRECTED OPINION & ORDER re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Susan Calvo, Jacklyn Restrepo, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Pedro Camacho, 15 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by David Yassky, The City Of New York, Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, 25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, filed by David Yassky, The City Of New York, Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon. This Opinion and Order shall supersede the Court's prior Opinion and Order at docket number 52. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment as to liability to first time violators, Docket Entry 30, is GRANTED. Defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment, Docket Entry 25, is GRANTED with respect to the claims against the individual defendants in their individual capacity, and the claim for punitive damages against the City and the individual defendants in their official capacity. Count Five is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c). The motion is DENIED in all other respects. At oral argument, Plaintiffs stated that they were seeking injunctive relief, but that request was not included in their moving papers. The Amended Complaint also sought class certification. Given that the Court has determined that the City's policy of summarily seizing vehicles of alleged first-time violators violates the Fourth and Fourteenth Amendments, the parties are ORDERED to submit a joint letter no later than October 9, 2015, indicating whether Plaintiffs intend to pursue injunctive relief and, if so, proposing a schedule for briefing their request. The letter should also address whether Plaintiffs still wish to pursue class certification, and, if so, whether they require class discovery before briefing that request. The Clerk of Court is requested to terminate Docket Entries 15, 25 and 30. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/10/2015) (spo) (Main Document 52 replaced on 11/10/2015) (spo). Modified on 11/10/2015 (spo). (Entered: 09/30/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that oral argument on the parties' motions shall be held on September 24, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. (As is further set forth in this Order.) (Oral Argument set for 9/24/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/14/2015) (spo) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Andrew St. Laurent dated 8/14/2015 re: United States v. Cosme. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc..(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated August 13, 2015 re: Plaintiffs Letter Dated August 11, 2015. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Andrew St. Laurent dated 8/11/2015 re: United States v. Cosme. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc..(St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated April 30, 2015 re: Plaintiffs' 4/28/15 Letter. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from All Plaintiffs' Counsel dated 4/28/15 re: Rodriguez v. U.S.. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Karen B. Selvin in Opposition re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., 25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit H - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Exhibit J, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L, # 7 Exhibit M, # 8 Exhibit N, # 9 Exhibit O)(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
COUNTER STATEMENT TO 33 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Edwin Mulero in Opposition re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., 25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., 25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 39 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Request GRANTED. Defendants shall file their response no later than February 19, 2015. Plaintiffs' reply shall be filed no later than February 26, 2015. Responses due by 2/19/2015 Replies due by 2/26/2015. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/29/2015) (mro) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated January 29, 2015. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Daniel L. Ackman in Support re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-NYC COde 19-506, # 2 Exhibit 2-TLC Seizure Report, # 3 Exhibit 4-TLC Refund Form, # 4 Exhibit 5-Restrepo Dec., # 5 Exhibit 6-Allsta Dec., # 6 Exhibit 7-Angels Limo Dec, # 7 Exhibit 8-Harrell Summons, # 8 Exhibit 9-Harrell Vacate Dec., # 9 Exhibit 10-Harrell Dec., # 10 Exhibit 11-Camacho Summos, # 11 Exhibit 12-Camacho Dec., # 12 Exhibit 13-Restrepo Summons, # 13 Exhibit 14-Restrepo Receipt, # 14 Exhibit 15-Restrepo Vehicle rel., # 15 Exhibit 16-Redacted Summons, # 16 Exhibit 17-Restrepo Summons, # 17 Exhibit 18-ALJ Dec. re redacted, # 18 Exhibit 19-Restrepo Dec.)(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Michael Harrell in Support re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Pedro Camacho in Support re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Jacklyn Restrepo in Support re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Susan Calvo in Support re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment . and in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Daniel L. Ackman in Support re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-NYC COde 19-506, # 2 Exhibit 2-TLC Seizure Report, # 3 Exhibit 4-TLC Refund Form)(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo.(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 28 Letter, filed by Susan Calvo, Jacklyn Restrepo, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Pedro Camacho. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' motion to dismiss and Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment shall be filed no later than January 7, 2015. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and reply in further support of their motion to dismiss shall be filed no later than February 4, 2015. Plaintiff's reply in further support of its motion to dismiss shall be filed no later than February 11, 2015. ( Responses due by 2/4/2015, Replies due by 2/11/2015.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/9/2014) (mro) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Andrew St. Laurent dated December 8, 2014 re: Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo.(Sakin, Alexander) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Karen B. Selvin in Support re: 25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G)(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. Responses due by 12/15/2014(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Susan Calvo, Michael Harrell. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Susan Calvo, Jacklyn Restrepo, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Pedro Camacho.(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Susan Calvo, Michael Harrell with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Susan Calvo, Michael Harrell. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Susan Calvo, Jacklyn Restrepo, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Pedro Camacho.(Ackman, Daniel) Modified on 11/13/2014 (lcu). (Entered: 11/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew M. St. Laurent on behalf of Jacklyn Restrepo. (St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew M. St. Laurent on behalf of Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc.. (St. Laurent, Andrew) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 15 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION in Support re: 15 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew James Frisch terminated. The motion of attorney Andrew Frisch to withdraw as attorney for the Plaintiffs, Dkt. 13, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall amend the Complaint or respond to the Defendants' motion to dismiss no later than November 21, 2014. If Plaintiff decides to respond to the motion to dismiss and to cross move for summary judgment, the cross motion for summary judgment shall be filed no later than November 21, 2014 and shall be supported by one brief that combines the Plaintiffs' response to the Defendants' motion to dismiss and arguments in support of Plaintiffs' cross motion for summary judgment. If Plaintiffs respond to the motion to dismiss and cross move for summary judgment, Defendants' reply, including a response to any cross motion for summary judgment, shall be contained in a single brief to be filed no later than December 22, 2014. Plaintiffs' reply to Defendants' response to any cross motion for summary judgment shall be filed no later than January 9, 2015. SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/31/2014) (ajs) Modified on 10/31/2014 (ajs). (Entered: 10/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. Responses due by 11/21/2014(Selvin, Karen) Modified on 11/3/2014 (db). (Entered: 10/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Dismiss Declaration of Karen B. Selvin. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. Responses due by 11/21/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Selvin, Karen) Modified on 11/3/2014 (db). (Entered: 10/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. Responses due by 11/21/2014(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Andrew J Frisch in Support re: 13 MOTION for Andrew J Frisch to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
MOTION for Andrew J Frisch to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo.(Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Andrew J Frisch to Withdraw as Attorney for plaintiffs. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Counsel in Support of Motion to Withdraw)(Frisch, Andrew) Modified on 10/31/2014 (db). (Entered: 10/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from All Counsel dated 10/24/14 re: Initial Conference. Document filed by Susan Calvo, Pedro Camacho, Michael Harrell, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Meera Joshi, Jacklyn Restrepo, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Request GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The parties are not required to submit a proposed Case Management Plan, but shall submit the joint letter described in the Court's September 17, 2014, Order no later than October 24, 2014. The parties should be prepared to discuss how their anticipated motions affect discovery at the initial pretrial conference. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/23/2014) (mro) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated October 22, 2014. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 7 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting 7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Request GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise move against the Complaint no later than October 31, 2014. The conference scheduled for October 3, 2014, is ADJOURNED to October 31, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. The parties should submit their joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan no later than October 24, 2014. SO ORDERED. ( Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/29/2014) (mro) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated September 29, 2014., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Karen B. Selvin dated September 29, 2014. Document filed by Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky.(Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Beth Selvin on behalf of Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/10/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/17/2014) (mro) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. All Defendants. Service was accepted by B. Yee (City), Elaine Moore (TLC Defendants). Document filed by Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Susan Calvo, Michael Harrell. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (moh) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Meera Joshi, Raymond Scanlon, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401104439)Document filed by Pedro Camacho, John Peters Professional Limousines, Inc., Jacklyn Restrepo, Susan Calvo, Michael Harrell.(moh) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 47 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?