Nigen Biotech, L.L.C. v. Ken Paxton
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 14-10923

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 11:09 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3450 - Interstate Commerce
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503242607 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate pull date satisfied. [14-10923] (SDH)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503213658 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [14-10923] (JRS)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 00503213635 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [14-10923 Affirmed in Part, Reversed in Part and Remanded ] Judge: WED , Judge: EHJ , Judge: EBC Mandate pull date is 10/21/2015 [14-10923] (JRS)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503182005 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
      LETTER filed by Appellee Mr. Ken Paxton Attorney Autumn Hamit Patterson withdrawing from case due to change in employment.. Date of Service: 09/04/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Allison, Breaux, Kernodle, Kerr, Parkinson, Price, Snow, Sullivan; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Juren, Patterson [14-10923] (Autumn Hamit Patterson )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502979022 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
        APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER BRIEF FILED . A/Pet's Supplemental Brief deadline satisfied [14-10923]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER filed by Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C. Date of Service: 03/23/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Allison, Breaux, Kernodle, Kerr, Parkinson, Snow, Sullivan; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Juren [14-10923] (David R. Parkinson )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502978945 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
          APPELLEE'S SUPPLMENTAL LETTER BRIEF FILED E/Res's Supplemental Brief deadline satisfied [14-10923]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S SUPPLMENTAL BRIEF FILED by Mr. Ken Paxton Date of service: 03/23/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Allison, Breaux, Kernodle, Kerr, Parkinson, Snow, Sullivan; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Juren [14-10923] (Bill L. Davis )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502978498 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
            LETTER filed by Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C. David R. Parkinson of the firm of Price, Parkinson & Kerr will be lead counsel instead of Ron Breaux of Haynes and Boone. Ron Breaux remains as counsel.. Date of Service: 03/23/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Allison, Breaux, Kernodle, Kerr, Parkinson, Snow, Sullivan; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Juren [14-10923] (Ronald Wayne Breaux )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502967679 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
              COURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED requesting supplemental briefing [7863563-2] A/Pet Supplemental Brief due on 03/23/2015 for Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C. E/Res Supplemental Brief due on 03/23/2015 for Appellee Ken Paxton.. [14-10923] (MCS)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502956932 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: Sending the parties a revised caption [14-10923] (MCS)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502954118 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None
                  LETTER filed by Appellee Mr. Greg Abbott in accordance with FRAP 43(c)(2). Date of Service: 03/02/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Allison, Breaux, Kernodle, Kerr, Snow; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Juren [14-10923] (Bill L. Davis )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502922384 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                    CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 04/06/2015. [14-10923] (GAM)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502907000 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None
                      DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Paper Copy of Appellant's Reply Brief Received on January 15, 2015. received from Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C. because as this is a copy of the insufficient brief. [14-10923] (NFD)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502902529 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                        BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C. in 14-10923 [7817199-2]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 01/20/2015 for Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C.. [14-10923] (SDH)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502898645 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                          APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED Brief NOT Sufficient as it is over the page limit and word count. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 01/26/2015 for Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C.. [14-10923] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Nigen Biotech, L.L.C. Date of service: 01/12/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Allison, Breaux, Kernodle, Kerr, Snow; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Juren [14-10923] (Jason M. Kerr )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502880592 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            COURT ORDER granting motion to amend caption of this case by replacing the words “individually and” with the words “in his official capacity” filed by Appellee Mr. Greg Abbott [7802922-2] Judge(s): GJC. [14-10923] (SDH)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502878900 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                              Attorney Ronald F. Price for Nigen Biotech, L.L.C. is advised to resubmit appearance form. Reason: The appearance form must be filed electronically. [14-10923] (AJV)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502876353 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Mr. Greg Abbott to amend caption [7802922-2]. Date of service: 12/19/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Allison, Breaux, Kernodle, Kerr, Snow; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Juren [14-10923] (Bill L. Davis )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502874384 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                  CLERK ORDER granting unopposed motion to extend time to file reply brief to and including 1/12/15 filed by Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C. [7801511-2]. Reply Brief deadline updated to 01/12/2015 for Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C.. [14-10923] (No Further Extensions Will Be Granted) (MCS)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502874122 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C. to extend time to file reply brief until 01/12/2015 at 11:59 pm [7801511-2]. Date of service: 12/17/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Allison, Breaux, Kernodle, Kerr, Snow; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Juren [14-10923] (John P. Snow )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502868524 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                      RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 12/22/2014 for Appellee Greg Abbott. [14-10923] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellee Mr. Greg Abbott. Date of service: 12/12/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Allison, Breaux, Kernodle, Kerr, Snow; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Juren [14-10923] (Bill L. Davis )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502868506 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                        APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED . E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/22/2014 for Appellee Greg Abbott.. Reply Brief due on 12/29/2014 for Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C. [14-10923] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Appellee Mr. Greg Abbott. Date of service: 12/12/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Allison, Breaux, Kernodle, Kerr, Snow; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Juren [14-10923] (Bill L. Davis )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502836540 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
                                          RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C.. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 11/24/2014 for Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C.. [14-10923]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C.. Date of service: 11/13/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Allison, Breaux, Kernodle, Kerr, Snow; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Juren [14-10923] (Jason M. Kerr )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502836510 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
                                            APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Nigen Biotech, L.L.C.. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 11/24/2014 for Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C... Appellee's Brief due on 12/16/2014 for Appellee Greg Abbott [14-10923]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Nigen Biotech, L.L.C.. Date of service: 11/13/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Allison, Breaux, Kernodle, Kerr, Snow; Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Juren [14-10923] (Jason M. Kerr )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502752949 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                                            BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/14/2014 for Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C.. [14-10923] (MRB)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502746219 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None
                                              INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7714582-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Electronic ROA due on 09/10/2014. [14-10923] (RLL)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502737599 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Nigen Biotech, L.L.C. [14-10923] (RLL)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 176 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?