U. S. ex rel. Szymoniak v. American Home Mortgage Serv
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 15-1720

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 1, 2017 at 6:14 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2190 - Contract: Other Contract Action
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
BRIEF by Appellees American Home Mortgage Servicing, Incorporated, Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Docx LLC, HSBC USA National Association, Lender Processing Services, Inc. and Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/17/2015. [999720839] [15-1720] Mary Gearns
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
    ORDER filed [999674880] granting Motion to extend filing time [39], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Response brief due 12/17/2015 Copies to all parties.. [15-1720] (SAW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION by Appellee Bank of New York Mellon Corporation to extend filing time for response brief until December 17, 2015. Date and method of service: 10/07/2015 ecf. [999674362] [15-1720] Michael Kimberly
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 36 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
        BRIEF by Appellant United States ex rel. Lynn E. Szymoniak in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 09/29/2015. [999667569] [15-1720] Richard Harpootlian
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
          FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant United States ex rel. Lynn E. Szymoniak. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 09/29/2015. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Not applicable. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999667558] [15-1720] Richard Harpootlian
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Juston M. O'Brien for American Home Mortgage Servicing, Incorporated.[999646176] [15-1720] Juston O'Brien
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
              BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/28/2015. Response Brief due 11/02/2015 [15-1720] (SAW)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT of 07/15/2015 for Dan Mayo and Jenny Williams rescinded because transcripts previously filed at district court docket entry #s 354 & 375. [15-1720] (CAD)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Barbara Van Gelder for Docx LLC and Lender Processing Services, Inc..[999635869] [15-1720] Barbara Van Gelder
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Alice W. Parham Casey for Bank of New York Mellon Corporation.[999635214] [15-1720] Alice Parham Casey
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Christopher J. Allen for Docx LLC and Lender Processing Services, Inc..[999633854] [15-1720] Christopher Allen
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                        Initial mediation conference scheduled. [15-1720] (LP)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee HSBC USA National Association. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999622322] [15-1720] Michael Ware
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Michael O. Ware for HSBC USA National Association.[999622320] [15-1720] Michael Ware
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                              Corrected APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by B. Rush Smith III for HSBC USA National Association.[999621744] [15-1720] B. Smith
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Carmen Harper Thomas for HSBC USA National Association.[999621743] [15-1720]--[Edited 07/16/2015 by SAW] Carmen Thomas
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by B. Rush Smith III for HSBC USA National Association.[999621742] [15-1720] Carmen Thomas
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Dan Mayo. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: 5/28/2015 - motions hearing. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: US ex rel. Lynn Szymoniak.. Originating case number: 0:10-cv-01465-JFA. Transcript due from Dan Mayo, Official Court Reporter on 09/21/2015. [15-1720] (SAW)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Jenny Williams. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: 4/28/2014 - motions hearing. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: US ex rel. Lynn E. Szmoniak.. Originating case number: 0:10-cv-01465-JFA. Transcript due from Jenny Williams, Official Court Reporter on 09/21/2015. [15-1720] (SAW)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999620955] [15-1720] Michael Kraut
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999620952] [15-1720] Michael Kraut
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Michael S. Kraut for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas.[999620950] [15-1720] Michael Kraut
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Christopher P. Kenney for United States ex rel. Lynn E. Szymoniak.[999620842] [15-1720] Christopher Kenney
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant United States ex rel. Lynn E. Szymoniak. [15-1720] Richard Harpootlian
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant United States ex rel. Lynn E. Szymoniak. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999620838] [15-1720] Richard Harpootlian
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Richard A. Harpootlian for United States ex rel. Lynn E. Szymoniak.[999620837] [15-1720] Richard Harpootlian
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999620832] [15-1720] Michael Kimberly
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Michael B. Kimberly for Bank of New York Mellon Corporation.[999620831] [15-1720] Michael Kimberly
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999620807] [15-1720] Mary Gearns
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Mary Gail Gearns for Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc..[999620806] [15-1720] Mary Gearns
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Lender Processing Services, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999620415] [15-1720] Fred Goldberg
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Docx LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999620412] [15-1720] Fred Goldberg
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Fred Goldberg for Docx LLC and Lender Processing Services, Inc..[999620408] [15-1720] Fred Goldberg
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Melissa J. Copeland for American Home Mortgage Servicing, Incorporated.[999619119] [15-1720] Melissa Copeland
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Gabriel A. Crowson for American Home Mortgage Servicing, Incorporated.[999618973] [15-1720] Gerard Wimberly
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee American Home Mortgage Servicing, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999618868] [15-1720] Gerard Wimberly
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Gerard E. Wimberly, Jr. for American Home Mortgage Servicing, Incorporated.[999618864] [15-1720] Gerard Wimberly
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 0:10-cv-01465-JFA. Mailed to: C. Allen, A. Casey, D. Drake, D. Dugas, M. Gearns, M. Harris, M. Hines, C. Houpt, M. Ingber, M. Kraut, J. Lehman, C. O'Loughlin, D. Plunkett, J. Rosa, J. Victor, M. Ware. [15-1720] (SAW)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              Case docketed. Originating case number: 0:10-cv-01465-JFA. Case manager: SWiley. [15-1720] (SAW)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 126 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?