Barefoot v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-01877-BEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 6:10 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Redin James Barefoot, Plaintiff
No Logo Tina Dillon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by rjackclapp.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Desjardins +1 202 638 5300 +1 202 393 1725 dpd@cdelaw.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jamie M Bennett +1 410 209 4838 +1 410 962 9947 jamie.bennett@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen M Schenning +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 209 3124 stephen.schenning@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 6/27/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $5000000
Nature of Suit 330 - Personal Injury: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2674 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Baltimore County
Terminated 6/2/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 Settlement OrderCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs otherwise agreed without predudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated within 60 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 6/2/03. (Microfilmed 6/2/03 ms)(mms, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
    SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Chief Judge Benson E. Legg 2/3/03) (c/i 2/6/03 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      MARGINAL ORDER granting [23-1] motion of plaintiffs for Continuance of 180 Days ( signed by Chief Judge Benson E. Legg 1/29/03) (c/m 1/31/03 jl) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003, Terminated: 1/31/2003 Motion to Continue
        MOTION by Redin James Barefoot, Tina Dillon for Continuance of 180 Days (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Answer to Amended Complaint
          ANSWER by United States (Attorney Thomas M DiBiagio, Jamie M Bennett) to amended complaint (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 10/31/02) (c/i 11/1/02) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 20 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 Supplemental
              BRIEF clarifying claims and parties by Redin James Barefoot, Tina Dillon (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002, Terminated: 8/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [19-1] Motion of Plaintiffs to Extend Time to File Supplemental Brief ( signed by Chief Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 8/20/02) (c/i 8/20/02 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002, Terminated: 8/20/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                  MOTION by Redin James Barefoot, Tina Dillon to Extend Time to File Supplemental Brief (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER denying [15-1] Motion of Defendant to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, denying [15-2] motion of Defendant for Summary Judgment, denying [15-3] motion of Defendant to Limit Damages, denying [6-1] motion of Defendant to Dismiss, denying [6-2] motion of Defendant for Summary Judgment, denying [6-3] motion of Defendant to Limit Damages (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 8/6/02) (c/i 8/7/02 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY MEMORANDUM by United States to Plaintiff's Opposition to its [15-1] Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by United States, or [15-2] Motion for Summary Judgment by United States (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Response in Opposition
                        RESPONSE/BRIEF by Redin James Barefoot, Tina Dillon in opposition to [15-1] Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by United States, [15-2] Motion for Summary Judgment by United States, [15-3] motion to Limit Damages by United States (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002, Terminated: 8/7/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                          MOTION with memorandum in support by United States to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint , or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment , and to Limit Damages (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Amended Complaint
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by Redin James Barefoot, Tina Dillon , (Answer due 12/27/01 for United States ) amending [1-1] complaint (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm 12/14/01) (c/m 12/17/01 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Response in Support of Motion
                                REPLY MEMORANDUM by United States in support of its [6-1] Motion to Dismiss by United States, [6-2] Motion for Summary Judgment by United States, [6-3] Motion to Limit Damages by United States (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Response in Support of Motion
                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM by United States in further support of its [6-1] Motion to Dismiss by United States, [6-2] motion for Summary Judgment by United States, [6-3] motion to Limit Damages by United States (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001 Response in Opposition
                                    RESPONSE by Redin James Barefoot, Tina Dillon in opposition to [6-1] motion to Dismiss or in the alternative [6-2] motion for Summary Judgment by United States, [6-3] motion to Limit Damages by United States (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/20/2001, Terminated: 12/17/2001 Motion for Leave to File
                                      MOTION by Redin James Barefoot, Tina Dillon for Leave to File Amended Complaint with Proposed Amended Complaint (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [7-1] Consent Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss until 11/16/01 and for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Reply (signed by Chief Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 11/6/01) (c/i 11/6/01 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001, Terminated: 11/6/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                          CONSENT MOTION by Redin James Barefoot, United States to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Reply (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/06/2001
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001, Terminated: 8/7/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                            MOTION with memorandum in support by United States to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative for Summary Judgment , and to Limit Damages with Exhibits 1 & 2 (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [4-1] Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint reset Answer deadline to 10/22/01 for United States (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 9/7/01) (c/i 9/10/01 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001, Terminated: 9/10/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                CONSENT MOTION by United States to Extend Time to Answer Complaint (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to United States, U.S. Attorney and Attorney General 7/23/01; Answer due on 9/24/01 for United States. (das, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001 Summons Issued
                                                    SUMMONS(60 days) issued for United States, United States AG (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001 Jury Demand
                                                      DEMAND for jury trial by Redin James Barefoot, Tina Dillon (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1176909 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?