BONNER v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-01617

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 11:15 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RYAN BONNER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
On Behalf of Himself and all Others Similarly Situated Joseph H. Meltzer, PHV +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 661 7056 jmeltzer@ktmc.com
On Behalf of Himself and all Others Similarly Situated Melissa L. Troutner +1 484 270 1409 +1 610 667 7056 mtroutner@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KESSLER, MELTZER & CHECK LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
On Behalf of Himself and all Others Similarly Situated Naumon A. Amjed +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 namjed@sbtklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
v.
No Logo Keypoint Government Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT, Defendant
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      INITIAL PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/10/15. (DMK) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by RYAN BONNER. Case related to Case No. 15-1015, 15-1321, 15-1449, 15-1564. (md) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 46 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?