Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe v. Jewell
Federal Civil Lawsuit South Dakota District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-03018

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 6:31 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Margaret E. Bad Warrior +1 605 365 5118 +1 866 695 5449 mbadwarrior@gmail.com
, Steven C. Emery +1 605 964 6686 +1 605 964 1166 Steve_Emery1989@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FREDERICKS, PEEBLES LAW FIRM - COLORADO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebecca L. Kidder +1 605 791 1515 +1 605 791 1915 rkidder@ndnlaw.com
, Tracey Zephier +1 605 791 1515 +1 605 791 1915 tzephier@ndnlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hobbs, Straus, Dean & Walker, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Carol L. Barbero +1 202 822 8282 +1 202 296 8834 cbarbero@hsdwdc.com
, Marmaduke D. McCloud +1 202 822 8282 +1 202 296 8834 dmccloud@hsdwdc.com
No Logo Rosebud Sioux Tribe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by azlaw.pro Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Charles T. Abourezk Charlie@azlaw.pro

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan - Minneapolis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Bruce Arthur Finzen +1 612 349 8569 +1 612 339 4181 bfinzen@robinskaplan.com
, Brendan V. Johnson +1 605 335 1300 +1 612 339 4181 bjohnson@robinskaplan.com
, Timothy Q. Purdon +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 tpurdon@robinskaplan.com
, Denise S Rahne +1 612 349 8433 +1 612 339 4181 drahne@robinskaplan.com
v.
No Logo Charles Roessel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Kevin Matthew Snell +1 202 305 0924 +1 202 616 8470 kevin.snell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
No Logo Kevin Washburn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New Hampshire Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , Laura E. B. Lombardi +1 603 271 3650 laura.lombardi@doj.nh.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Ty Bair +1 202 307 3316 tyler.bair@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr. +1 703 299 3700 dennis.barghaan@usdoj.gov
, , , , Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
, , , , Steven E. Butler +1 251 441 5845 steven.butler@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , James Joseph DuBois +1 334 223 7280 +1 334 223 7418 james.dubois2@usdoj.gov
, , , Christine Wild Ennis +1 202 616 9473 +1 202 514 4231 christine.ennis@usdoj.gov
, , , Judith B. Harvey +1 202 514 3932 judith.harvey@usdoj.gov
, , , JoAnn L. Kintz +1 202 305 0424 joann.kintz@usdoj.gov
, , , Steven Miskinis +1 202 305 0262 +1 202 305 0271 steven.miskinis@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Yosef M Negose +1 202 305 0269 +1 202 305 0725 yosef.negose@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Barbara M. R. Marvin +1 202 305 0245 +1 202 305 0506
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Judith Rabinowitz +1 202 307 0386 +1 202 616 3085 judith.rabinowitz@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Jody Helen Schwarz +1 202 305 0245 +1 202 305 0267 jody.schwarz@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Kevin Matthew Snell +1 202 305 0924 +1 202 616 8470 kevin.snell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
No Logo Ryan Zinke, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Travis James Annatoyn +1 202 514 5243 +1 202 305 0275 travis.annatoyn@usdoj.gov
, , , , Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
, , , Patricia Nicole Beyer +1 334 441 5845 +1 251 441 5051 patricia.beyer@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Clare Marie Boronow +1 202 305 0492 clare.boronow@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Evan Borson +1 202 514 1944 +1 202 616 8187 joseph.borson@usdoj.gov
, , , Melissa H. Burkland +1 701 297 7400 melissa.burkland@usdoj.gov
, , , Steven E. Butler +1 251 441 5845 steven.butler@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 09/21/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 09/21/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles Kneeland Cooper, IV +1 512 370 1262 +1 512 916 5854 charlie.cooper@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Devon Lea Damiano +1 202 305 0201 devon.flanagan@usdoj.gov
, , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 09/21/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 09/21/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, Devon Lea Damiano +1 202 305 0201 devon.flanagan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Richard Eitel +1 303 844 1479 +1 303 844 1350 michael.eitel@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Kristen Byrnes Floom +1 202 305 0340 +1 202 305 0275 Kristen.Floom@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Victoria L. Francis +1 406 657 6101 +1 406 657 6058 victoria.francis@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Eric Grant +1 202 514 0943 +1 202 514 0557 eric.grant@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeremy Scott Hessler +1 202 305 0431 +1 202 305 0275 jeremy.hessler@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Sarah D. Himmelhoch +1 202 514 0180 +1 202 514 4180 sarah.himmelhoch@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Coby Healy Howell +1 503 727 1023 +1 503 727 1117 coby.howell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Rebecca J Jaffe +1 202 305 0258 +1 202 305 0506 rebecca.jaffe@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , JoAnn L. Kintz +1 202 305 0424 joann.kintz@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Cesar A. Lopez-Morales +1 202 305 8550 +1 202 616 8460 cesar.a.lopez-morales@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , Steven Miskinis +1 202 305 0262 +1 202 305 0271 steven.miskinis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Shaughnessy Most +1 202 616 3353 +1 202 305 0506 john.most@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Jennifer Ashley Najjar +1 202 305 0476 jennifer.najjar@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Bradley H. Oliphant +1 202 305 0500 bradley.oliphant@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lisa Ann Olson +1 202 514 5633 +1 202 616 8470 lisa.olson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Marissa A Piropato +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 marissa.piropato@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Kaitlyn Poirier +1 202 307 6623 +1 202 305 0275 kaitlyn.poirier@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov
, , Nicole Marie Smith +1 202 305 0368 +1 202 305 0275 nicole.m.smith@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Kevin Matthew Snell +1 202 305 0924 +1 202 616 8470 kevin.snell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
, , , James Patrick Thomas +1 701 530 2420 +1 701 530 2421 James.P.Thomas@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James D. Todd +1 202 514 3378 +1 202 616 8470 james.todd@usdoj.gov
No Logo Sally Jewell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Henderson & Grohman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/29/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/29/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/29/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/29/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/29/2017 Karen Grohman +1 505 738 3507 kfg@hglegalgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Charmaine Michele Aarons Holder +1 713 567 9000 +1 713 718 3303 charmaine.holder@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N F. Franklin Amanat +1 718 254 6024 +1 718 254 6081 franklin.amanat@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Travis James Annatoyn +1 202 514 5243 +1 202 305 0275 travis.annatoyn@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Travis James Annatoyn +1 202 514 5243 +1 202 305 0275 travis.annatoyn@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Ty Bair +1 202 307 3316 tyler.bair@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr. +1 703 299 3700 dennis.barghaan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/14/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/14/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/14/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/14/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul D Barker, Jr. +1 202 305 0434 +1 202 305 0506 paul.barker@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259 jared.bennett@usdoj.gov
, , , Patricia Nicole Beyer +1 334 441 5845 +1 251 441 5051 patricia.beyer@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Clare Marie Boronow +1 202 305 0492 clare.boronow@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Clare Marie Boronow +1 202 305 0492 clare.boronow@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Bradley S. Bridgewater +1 303 844 1359 bradley.s.bridgewater@usdoj.gov
, , , , Steven E. Butler +1 251 441 5845 steven.butler@usdoj.gov
, , , Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melenaniikeawakea Coleman +1 202 305 0229 mele.coleman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Trent S.W. Crable +1 202 305 0339 +1 202 305 0275 trent.crable@usdoj.gov
, , , Devon Lea Damiano +1 202 305 0201 devon.flanagan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Dean Dunsmore +1 907 271 5452 +1 907 271 5827 dean.dunsmore@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Ethan Carson Eddy +1 202 305 0202 +1 202 305 0275 ethan.eddy@usdoj.gov
, , , Christine Wild Ennis +1 202 616 9473 +1 202 514 4231 christine.ennis@usdoj.gov
, , , Meredith L Flax +1 202 305 0404 meredith.flax@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Kristen Byrnes Floom +1 202 305 0340 +1 202 305 0275 Kristen.Floom@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , David W Fuller +1 612 664 5627 +1 612 664 5787 david.fuller@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 07/24/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 07/24/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 07/24/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 07/24/2013 Ronald Ray Gallegos - Inactive +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 USAAZ.DepartedAUSAs@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Ronald Ray Gallegos - Inactive +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 USAAZ.DepartedAUSAs@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 12/23/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 12/23/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 12/23/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 12/23/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Edward S Geldermann +1 202 305 2042 +1 202 305 0506 jay.geldermann@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , William Eron Gerard +1 202 305 0475 +1 202 305 0267 william.gerard@usdoj.gov
, , , David Bernard Glazer +1 415 744 6477 +1 415 744 6476 david.glazer@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , John Brett Grosko, GOVT +1 202 305 0342 +1 202 305 0275 brett.grosko@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Luther L. Hajek +1 202 305 0492 +1 303 844 1350 luke.hajek@usdoj.gov
, , , Judith B. Harvey +1 202 514 3932 judith.harvey@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Leslie K. Herje +1 608 264 5158 leslie.herje@usdoj.gov
, , Jason Alan Hill +1 202 514 1024 +1 202 305 0506 jason.hill@usdoj.gov
, , , , Jason Alan Hill +1 202 514 1024 +1 202 305 0506 jason.hill@usdoj.gov
, Mary Hollingsworth +1 202 305 0324 mary.hollingsworth@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Mary Hollingsworth +1 202 305 0324 mary.hollingsworth@usdoj.gov
, Daniel David Hu +1 713 567 9518 +1 713 718 3303 daniel.hu@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/26/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/26/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/26/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/26/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY Caitlin Brynna Imaki +1 202 305 0247 + 120 220 2202 caitlin.imaki@usdoj.gov
, , , , Rebecca J Jaffe +1 202 305 0258 +1 202 305 0506 rebecca.jaffe@usdoj.gov
, , , JoAnn L. Kintz +1 202 305 0424 joann.kintz@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JoAnn L. Kintz +1 202 305 0424 joann.kintz@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Peter Michael Lantka +1 602 514 7739 +1 602 514 7760 peter.lantka@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Lesley K. Lawrence-Hammer +1 202 305 0217 +1 202 305 0275 Lesley.Lawrence-Hammer@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Jacob Licht-Steenfat +1 303 454 0308 Jacob.Licht-Steenfat@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Cesar A. Lopez-Morales +1 202 305 8550 +1 202 616 8460 cesar.a.lopez-morales@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Kevin William McArdle +1 202 353 7977 +1 202 353 7988 kevin.mcardle2@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin William McArdle +1 202 353 7977 +1 202 353 7988 kevin.mcardle2@usdoj.gov
, , , Bridget Kennedy McNeil +1 303 844 1484 +1 303 844 1350 bridget.mcneil@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Bridget Kennedy McNeil +1 303 844 1484 +1 303 844 1350 bridget.mcneil@usdoj.gov
, Monica L Miller +1 213 894 4061 monica.miller@usdoj.gov
, , , Steven Miskinis +1 202 305 0262 +1 202 305 0271 steven.miskinis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Miskinis +1 202 305 0262 +1 202 305 0271 steven.miskinis@usdoj.gov
, , , , Guillermo A. Montero +1 202 305 0443 guillermo.montero@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Jennifer Ashley Najjar +1 202 305 0476 jennifer.najjar@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Yosef M Negose +1 202 305 0269 +1 202 305 0725 yosef.negose@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Tanya Camille Nesbitt +1 202 305 0457 +1 202 305 0506 tanya.nesbitt2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Tanya Camille Nesbitt +1 202 305 0457 +1 202 305 0506 tanya.nesbitt2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lisa Ann Olson +1 202 514 5633 +1 202 616 8470 lisa.olson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Richard Glenn Patrick +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 richard.patrick@usdoj.gov
, , , Shaun M. Pettigrew +1 202 305 3895 shaun.pettigrew@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Romney Sharpe Philpott +1 202 305 0258 romney.philpott@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Marissa A Piropato +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 marissa.piropato@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Marissa A Piropato +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 marissa.piropato@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Marissa A Piropato +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 marissa.piropato@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Kaitlyn Poirier +1 202 307 6623 +1 202 305 0275 kaitlyn.poirier@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Daniel Joseph Pollak +1 202 305 0201 +1 202 305 0275 daniel.pollak@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Sara C. Porsia +1 202 305 0503 +1 202 305 0506 sara.porsia@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/27/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/27/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/27/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/27/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY Sara C. Porsia +1 202 305 0503 +1 202 305 0506 sara.porsia@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Barbara M. R. Marvin +1 202 305 0245 +1 202 305 0506
, , , , , Judith Rabinowitz +1 202 307 0386 +1 202 616 3085 judith.rabinowitz@usdoj.gov
, , , , Rachel K. Roberts +1 206 220 4199 +1 206 220 4077 rachel.roberts@usdoj.gov
, , , , Katherine Ann Ross +1 303 454 0286 +1 303 454 0408 katherine.ross@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Rebecca M. Ross +1 202 616 3148 rebecca.ross@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Barclay Thomas Samford +1 303 844 1475 +1 303 844 1350 Clay.Samford@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Ayako Sato +1 202 305 0239 +1 202 305 0506 ayako.sato@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Andrew Allen Smith +1 505 224 1468 +1 505 346 7205 andrew.smith@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Andrew Allen Smith +1 505 224 1468 +1 505 346 7205 andrew.smith@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicole Marie Smith +1 202 305 0368 +1 202 305 0275 nicole.m.smith@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Kevin Matthew Snell +1 202 305 0924 +1 202 616 8470 kevin.snell@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Thomas Kevin Snodgrass +1 303 844 1368 +1 303 844 1350 thomas.snodgrass@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Clifford Eugene Stevens +1 202 353 7548 +1 202 305 0275 clifford.stevens@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clifford Eugene Stevens +1 202 353 7548 +1 202 305 0275 clifford.stevens@usdoj.gov
, , , Clifford Eugene Stevens +1 202 353 7548 +1 202 305 0275 clifford.stevens@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Anna K. Stimmel +1 202 305 3895 +1 202 305 0506 anna.stimmel@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Anna K. Stimmel +1 202 305 3895 +1 202 305 0506 anna.stimmel@usdoj.gov
, , , Ruth Ann Storey +1 202 305 0493 +1 202 305 0506 ruth.ann.storey@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Ruth Ann Storey +1 202 305 0493 +1 202 305 0506 ruth.ann.storey@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kristofor Ross Swanson +1 202 305 0248 +1 202 305 0267 kristofor.swanson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Yoshinori H. T. Himel +1 916 554 2760 +1 916 554 2900 yoshinori.himel@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED Justin A. Torres +1 202 305 0874 +1 202 305 0506 justin.torres@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Justin A. Torres +1 202 305 0874 +1 202 305 0506 justin.torres@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr. +1 202 305 0229 +1 202 305 0275 rickey.turner@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Holly A. Vance +1 775 784 5438 Holly.A.Vance@usdoj.gov
, , , Christine J. Wichers +1 617 748 3278 christine.wichers@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Michelle-Ann Camielle Williams +1 202 305 0420 +1 202 305 0506 michelle-ann.williams@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Pendleton Williams +1 202 305 0206 +1 202 305 0275 robert.p.williams@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Robert Pendleton Williams +1 202 305 0206 +1 202 305 0275 robert.p.williams@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Hao-Chin Yang +1 202 305 0209 hubert.yang@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of the Interior

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Delores Young +1 404 730 2682
No Logo United States Bureau of Indian Education, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Kevin Matthew Snell +1 202 305 0924 +1 202 616 8470 kevin.snell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
United States Department of the Interior United States Department of the Interior, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Department of Interior"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Raymond Hamilton +1 505 450 1032 raymondhamiltonlawoffice@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rose Michele Weckenmann

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Rose Michele Weckenmann +1 916 208 4956 +1 916 520 3586 rmw@weckenmannlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
, Ty Bair +1 202 307 3316 tyler.bair@usdoj.gov
, , , , Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Evan Borson +1 202 514 1944 +1 202 616 8187 joseph.borson@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joanna Kathryn Brinkman +1 202 305 0476 +1 202 305 0267 joanna.brinkman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Lori Caramanian +1 303 844 1499 +1 303 844 1350 lori.caramanian@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Sara E. Costello +1 202 305 0466 +1 202 305 0267 Sara.Costello@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Dean Dunsmore +1 907 271 5452 +1 907 271 5827 dean.dunsmore@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Meredith L Flax +1 202 305 0404 meredith.flax@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Victoria L. Francis +1 406 657 6101 +1 406 657 6058 victoria.francis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James David Gette +1 202 305 1461 +1 202 305 0274 james.gette@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , David Bernard Glazer +1 415 744 6477 +1 415 744 6476 david.glazer@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Michele S. Greif +1 202 353 2492 +1 202 616 4473 michele.greif@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Rebecca J Jaffe +1 202 305 0258 +1 202 305 0506 rebecca.jaffe@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Lesley K. Lawrence-Hammer +1 202 305 0217 +1 202 305 0275 Lesley.Lawrence-Hammer@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Anthony Maysonett +1 202 305 0216 +1 202 305 0275 James.A.Maysonett@usdoj.gov
, , , Bridget Kennedy McNeil +1 303 844 1484 +1 303 844 1350 bridget.mcneil@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Guillermo A. Montero +1 202 305 0443 guillermo.montero@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary A. Moore +1 251 441 5845 +1 251 441 5051 gary.moore2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Tanya Camille Nesbitt +1 202 305 0457 +1 202 305 0506 tanya.nesbitt2@usdoj.gov
Space Charles Michael O'Connor +1 415 436 7180 +1 415 436 6748 Charles.OConnor@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Romney Sharpe Philpott +1 202 305 0258 romney.philpott@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Marissa A Piropato +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 marissa.piropato@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Rachel K. Roberts +1 206 220 4199 +1 206 220 4077 rachel.roberts@usdoj.gov
, , E. Kathleen Shahan +1 202 307 0249 +1 202 307 0494 kathie.shahan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Charles Ray Shockey +1 916 930 2203 +1 916 930 2210 charles.shockey@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Andrew Allen Smith +1 505 224 1468 +1 505 346 7205 andrew.smith@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 02/05/2010, TERMINATED: 02/05/2010, TERMINATED: 02/05/2010, TERMINATED: 02/05/2010, TERMINATED: 02/05/2010 Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Kevin Matthew Snell +1 202 305 0924 +1 202 616 8470 kevin.snell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Carol A Statkus +1 307 772 2124 +1 307 772 2123 carol.statkus@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kristofor Ross Swanson +1 202 305 0248 +1 202 305 0267 kristofor.swanson@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael D. Thorp +1 202 305 0456 michael.thorp@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James D. Todd +1 202 514 3378 +1 202 616 8470 james.todd@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED Justin A. Torres +1 202 305 0874 +1 202 305 0506 justin.torres@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , John P Tustin +1 202 305 3022 +1 202 305 0506 john.tustin@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Nicholas Vassallo +1 307 772 2124 +1 307 772 2123 nick.vassallo@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Joseph N. Watson +1 202 305 0467 joseph.watson@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/04/2013, TERMINATED: 01/04/2013, TERMINATED: 01/04/2013, TERMINATED: 01/04/2013, TERMINATED: 01/04/2013 Tyler Guy Welti +1 202 305 0481 tyler.welti@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (109) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Notice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Reply
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Reply
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Response
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Response
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Response
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Extend Deadlines
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Extend Deadlines
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Extend
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 72 Motion for Leave to Allow Depositions. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/12/17. (SLW)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Joint MOTION for Leave to Allow Depositions by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn, Ryan Zinke. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin) Modified on 12/13/2017 to remove duplicative text (KLK).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 68 Motion for Admission of Attorney Daniel E. Bensing for Charles Roessel,Daniel E. Bensing for United States Bureau of Indian Education,Daniel E. Bensing for United States Department of Interior,Daniel E. Bensing for Kevin Washburn,Daniel E. Bensing for Ryan Zinke. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/27/17. (DJP)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. Kidder on behalf of Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Kidder, Rebecca)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  [FILED IN ERROR] NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey Zephier on behalf of Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Zephier, Tracey) Modified on 11/22/2017 to add text (KLK).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MOTION for Admission by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn, Ryan Zinke. (Bensing, Daniel) Modified event on 11/22/2017 (SST).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER denying 66 Motion to Extend Deadlines. The Court's Scheduling Order 65 remains in effect. Discovery due by 12/15/2017 Motions due by 1/29/2018. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/30/17. (DJP)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Rosebud Sioux Tribe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to Extend Deadlines)(Abourezk, Charles)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 63 Motion to Extend. Defendants have until 9/15/17 to respond or object to Rosebud Sioux Tribe's Interrogatories. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/14/17. (SLW) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER: Discovery due by 12/15/2017, Motions due by 1/29/2018. Granting 62 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Complete Discovery and Motions. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/14/17. (DJP) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Rosebud Sioux Tribe's Interrogatories by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Complete Discovery and Motions by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  (FILED IN ERROR) Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Complete Discovery and Motions by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin) Modified on 9/12/2017 to add text and terminate motion (KLK). (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/16/2017 Motions due by 11/30/2017. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/14/17. (SLW)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Discovery Report by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn.(Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 57 Motion to Extend. The parties shall file a discovery report on or before July 14, 2017. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/10/17. (DJP)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Extend Time to File Discovery Report and Stipulation to Stay Any Discovery by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint of Intervenor-Plaintiff Rosebud Sioux Tribe by All Defendants. (Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 54 Motion to Extend. The parties shall file a discovery report on or before 7/7/17. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/5/2017. (JLS)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Extend Time to File Discovery Report and Stipulation to Stay Any Discovery by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 48 Motion to Intervene. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/1/17. (DJP)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: 5/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 48 MOTION to Intervene filed by All Defendants. (Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 50 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Discovery Report due 6/5/17. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/5/17. (SLW)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines to File Discovery Report and Stipulation to Stay any Discovery by Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zephier, Tracey) Modified on 5/5/2017 to edit duplicative text (KLK).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 48 MOTION to Intervene filed by Rosebud Sioux Tribe. (Abourezk, Charles)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene by Rosebud Sioux Tribe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Rosebud Sioux Tribe's Complaint and Petition for Permanent Injunction, Declaratory Relief, and Writ of Mandamus)(Abourezk, Charles)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 46 Motion to Extend. Discovery report due 5/5/17. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/13/17. (SLW)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Extend Time to File Discovery Report and Stipulation to Stay Any Discovery by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT by Defendants Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn re 40 Notice, CRST-003869 - CRST-004088. (Attachments: # 1 CRST-004089 - CRST-004150) (Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT by Defendants Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn re 40 Notice, CRST-003239 - CRST-003499. (Attachments: # 1 CRST-003500 - CRST-003752, # 2 CRST-003753 - CRST-003868) (Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENT by Defendants Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn re 40 Notice, CRST-002337 - CRST-002530. (Attachments: # 1 CRST-002531 - CRST-002651, # 2 CRST-002652 - CRST-003238) (Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENT by Defendants Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn re 40 Notice, CRST-001975 - CRST-002139. (Attachments: # 1 CRST-002140 - CRST-002232, # 2 CRST-002233 - CRST-002336) (Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT by Defendants Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn re 40 Notice, CRST-000501 - CRST-000639. (Attachments: # 1 CRST-000640 - CRST-001742, # 2 CRST-001743 - CRST-001974) (Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn of Filing Administrative Record. (Attachments: # 1 Certification, Index, and CRST-000001 - CRST-000206, # 2 CRST-000207 - CRST-000320, # 3 CRST-000321 - CRST-000500)(Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 38 Motion to Extend. The parties shall file a discovery report on or before 4/14/17 Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/13/17. (SLW)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Extend Time to File Discovery Report and Stipulation to Stay Any Discovery by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 36 Motion to Extend. The parties shall file a discovery report on or before February 13, 2017. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/24/16. (DJP) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Extend Time to File Discovery Report and Stipulation to Stay Any Discovery by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Snell, Kevin) Modified docket text on 9/28/2016 (SAC). (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Defendants shall file an answer on or before September 27, 2016. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/19/16. (DJP)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/7/16. (DJP)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/6/16. (SLW)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: 2/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to 21 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, filed by All Defendants. (Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: 2/5/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 28 Motion to Extend. Defendants shall file a reply brief in support of the motion to dismiss on or before February 10, 2016. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/5/16. (DJP)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Second MOTION to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 26 Motion to Extend. Defendants shall file a reply brief in support of the motion to dismiss on or before February 5, 2016. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/26/16. (DJP)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: 1/25/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange no longer assigned to case. Motions terminated: 20 MOTION to Change Venue to District of South Dakota-Southern Division filed by Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 1/25/16. (SKK)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support re 20 MOTION to Change Venue to District of South Dakota-Southern Division, 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 3 part 2)(Zephier, Tracey)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re 20 MOTION to Change Venue to District of South Dakota-Southern Division, 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 3 part 1)(Zephier, Tracey)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support re 20 MOTION to Change Venue to District of South Dakota-Southern Division, 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Zephier, Tracey)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 20 MOTION to Change Venue to District of South Dakota-Southern Division, 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Zephier, Tracey)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Change Venue to District of South Dakota-Southern Division by Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Zephier, Tracey)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: 1/13/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time: Response due by 1/15/2016. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 01/12/2016. (LH)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: 1/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Extend Deadlines to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Zephier, Tracey)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 01/07/2016. (LH)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: 12/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to to Appear on Behalf of Federal Defendants by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sowles, Marcia)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: 12/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Compliance, # 2 Affidavit)(Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: 12/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn. (Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear on Behalf of Federal Defendants. Kevin M. Snell added. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/17/15. (SLW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: 12/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear on Behalf of Federal Defendants by Sally Jewell, Charles Roessel, United States Bureau of Indian Education, United States Department of Interior, Kevin Washburn. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney's Office on 10/22/2015, filed by Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Zephier, Tracey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Sally Jewell; Secretary of U.S. Department of Interior on 10/9/2015, filed by Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Zephier, Tracey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Office of the Attorney General on 10/30/2015, filed by Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Zephier, Tracey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Kevin Washburn; Assistant Secretary, U.S. BIA on 10/9/2015, filed by Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Zephier, Tracey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Department of Interior on 10/9/2015, filed by Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Zephier, Tracey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Charles Roessel; Director of Bureau of Indian Education on 10/9/2015, filed by Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Zephier, Tracey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on United States Bureau of Indian Education on 10/9/2015, filed by Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Zephier, Tracey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mailed one true copy of each, along with Clerk's Memo, and eight copies of AO85 form to Attorney Zephier) (DJP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filing fee received: Fee Amount: $400.00, Receipt No.: #SDX400037945. (DJP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET. (DJP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT and PETITION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION, DECLARATORY RELIEF, AND WRIT OF MANDAMUS filed by Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe. (Attachments: # 1 Ex 1 - Settlement Agreement, # 2 Ex 2 - 3/6/12 ltr from Dept of Interior to Tribal Leaders, # 3 Ex 3 - 4/2/12 ltr from Keckler to Echohawk and Moore, # 4 Ex 4 - BIE Streamlining, # 5 Ex 5 - BIE Consultation on Proposed Streamlining 5/2/12, # 6 Ex 6 - 2/7/13 ltr from Abourezk to Solicitor, # 7 Ex 7 - 4/3/13 ltr from Roessel to Abourezk, # 8 Ex 8 - 3/28/14 ltr from Washburn to Tribal Leaders, # 9 Ex 9 - Federal Rebister Notice 3/27/14, # 10 Ex 10 - Bureau of Indian Education Transformation Plan, # 11 Ex 11 - Draft Report for Purposes of Tribal Consultation 4/17/14, # 12 Ex 12 - Great Plains Tribal Chairmans Association Transformation Plan 4/28/14, # 13 Ex 13 - 2014-2018 Bureau of Indian Education Strategic Plan, # 14 Ex 14 - Great Plains Tribal Response to Bureau of Indian Education Strategic Plan 2014-2018 (May 2014), # 15 Ex 15 - Article by President Obama "On My Upcoming Trip to Indian Country", # 16 Ex 16 - Findings and Recommendation Prepared by the ureau of Indian Education Study Group 6/11/14, # 17 Ex 17 - Order No. 3334 re: Restructuring the Bureau of Indian Education, # 18 Ex 18 - News Release 6/13/14 by Department of Interior, # 19 Ex 19 - National Indial Education Association Webinar 8/19/14, # 20 Ex 20 - Bureau of Indian Education Implementation Plan Overview, # 21 Ex 21 - 11/25/14 ltr from Zephier to Officer of the Solicitor of the Department of Interior, # 22 Ex 22 - 1/23/15 - ltr from Baum to Zephier, # 23 Ex 23 - Tribal Consultation Booklet, # 24 Ex 24 - Bureau of Indian Education Proposed Reorganization, # 25 Ex 25 - Bureau of Indian Education Proposed Reorganization - Tribal COnsultation Document 4/22/15, # 26 Ex 26 - Statement of the Cheyene River Sioux Tribe 4/22/15, # 27 Ex 27 - 5/15/15 ltr from Zephier to Roessel and Cheek, # 28 Ex 28 - 7/16/15 ltr from Prince to Zephier, # 29 Ex 29 - 9/15/15 ltr from Sarri to Calvert, # 30 Ex 30 - BIA Government-to-Government Consultation Policy 12/13/00) (BEST SCAN - GAVE ORIGINAL DOCUMENT TO JUDGE LANGE'S CHAMBERS) (DJP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?