UBS Financial Services, Inc. v. Gary T. Padussis
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 15-2148

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2017 at 4:30 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4896 - Other Statutes
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
ORDER filed [999695624] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 11/30/2015. Response brief due 01/04/2016 Copies to all parties.. [15-2148] (TF)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None
    Mediation conference data modified. [15-2148] (LP)
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None
      Initial mediation conference scheduled. [15-2148] (LP)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant UBS Financial Services, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999678068] [15-2148] Francis Dee
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
          DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant UBS Financial Services, Incorporated. [15-2148] Francis Dee
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Francis X. Dee for UBS Financial Services, Incorporated.[999678024] [15-2148] Francis Dee
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/10/2015, Entered: None
              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Gary T. Padussis. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999675987] [15-2148] Edward McDermott
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/10/2015, Entered: None
                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) for Gary T. Padussis.[999675986] [15-2148] Edward McDermott
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                  BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Watson. Opening Brief and Appendix due 11/09/2015. Response Brief due 12/14/2015 [15-2148] (TF)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                    DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:14-cv-03721-WDQ. Mailed to: Watson. [15-2148] (TF)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
                      Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:14-cv-03721-WDQ. Case manager: TFischer. [15-2148] (TF)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 180 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?