Laurie Wood v. US
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 15-2106

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2017 at 2:49 AM EST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2360 - Personal Injury: Other Personal
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Laurie L. Wood. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 11/03/2002. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Not applicable. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999691188] [15-2106] Matthew Green
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
    BRIEF by Appellant Laurie L. Wood in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/03/2015. [999691187] [15-2106] Matthew Green
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Laurie L. Wood. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999676349] [15-2106] Matthew Green
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) for Laurie L. Wood.[999676343] [15-2106] Matthew Green
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Kent Pendleton Porter for US.[999673808] [15-2106] Kent Porter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Mark Anthony Exley for US.[999673769] [15-2106] Mark Exley
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
              DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Laurie L. Wood. [15-2106] Matthew Green
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Brittany Aungier. Opening Brief and Appendix due 11/02/2015. Response Brief due 12/03/2015 [15-2106] (JSN)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                  DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 2:14-cv-00469-RAJ-TEM. Mailed to: Brittany Aungier. [15-2106] (JSN)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:14-cv-00469-RAJ-TEM. Case manager: JeffNeal. [15-2106] (JSN)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 36 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?