GHAITH SULEIMAN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-01626

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 3, 2018 at 1:04 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ABDULRAHMAN ABDOU ABOU AL G SULEIMAN, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W. DeBruin +1 202 639 6015 +1 202 637 6375 ddebruin@jenner.com
No Logo ABDULRAHMAN ABDOU ABOU AL GHAITH SULEIMAN, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by BRONTE LAW LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia Ann Bronte +1 312 388 7890 +1 312 431 0228 bronte@brontelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W. DeBruin +1 202 639 6015 +1 202 637 6375 ddebruin@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. Sullivan +1 312 923 2940 +1 312 840 7328 tsullivan@jenner.com
v.
No Logo ASHTON B. CARTER, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Respondent
Officially listed as "BARACK OBAMA"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
No Logo JUAN R. MONTEAGUDO, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: 8/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
    RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ABDULRAHMAN ABDOU ABOU AL GHAITH SULEIMAN re 22 Order, dated August 23, 2016. (Bronte, Patricia)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: 8/23/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER. For the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that any party shall SHOW CAUSE on or before September 6, 2016, why the Court should not deny as moot the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and close this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 23, 2016. (lcrbw1)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: 8/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
        ERRATA Correcting Notice of Transfer of Petitoner Suleiman (ISN 223) by ASHTON B. CARTER, JUAN R. MONTEAGUDO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 20 Notice (Other) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JUAN R. MONTEAGUDO, ASHTON B. CARTER, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Warden, Andrew)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: 8/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Transfer of Petitioner Suleiman (ISN 223) by ASHTON B. CARTER, JUAN R. MONTEAGUDO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Warden, Andrew)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ABDULRAHMAN ABDOU ABOU AL GHAITH SULEIMAN re 18 Sealed Order (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Sullivan, Thomas) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              SEALED ORDER; Show Cause Responses due by 7/12/2016, Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/27/2016. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons(hs) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ASHTON B. CARTER, JUAN R. MONTEAGUDO, BARACK H. OBAMA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  REPLY re 11 Notice (Other), 10 Notice (Other) Respondents' Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment filed by ASHTON B. CARTER, JUAN R. MONTEAGUDO, BARACK H. OBAMA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 57, # 2 Exhibit 58, # 3 Exhibit 59, # 4 Exhibit 60)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment by ASHTON B. CARTER, JUAN R. MONTEAGUDO, BARACK H. OBAMA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      RESPONSE (opposition) re 11 Notice (Other), filed by ABDULRAHMAN ABDOU ABOU AL GHAITH SULEIMAN; (See docket entry no. 13 to view document.) (td) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY re 1 Notice (Other), Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ABDULRAHMAN ABDOU ABOU AL GHAITH SULEIMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bronte, Patricia) Modified linkage on 3/21/2016 (td).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by ABDULRAHMAN ABDOU ABOU AL GHAITH SULEIMAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bronte, Patricia)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Public Filing: Respondents' Response to Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus and Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment by ASHTON B. CARTER, JUAN R. MONTEAGUDO, BARACK H. OBAMA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Motion/Brief, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit List, # 4 Exhibits 1-11, # 5 Exhibits 12-17, # 6 Exhibits 18-46, # 7 Exhibits 47-56)(Warden, Andrew)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: 2/5/2016 Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of Classified Filing: Respondents' Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment by ASHTON B. CARTER, JUAN R. MONTEAGUDO, BARACK H. OBAMA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Warden, Andrew)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of ASHTON B. CARTER, JUAN R. MONTEAGUDO, BARACK H. OBAMA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Henry, Terry)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                  Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule, Joint MOTION for Protective Order Seeking Entry of Guantanamo Bay Habeas Protective Order by ASHTON B. CARTER, JUAN R. MONTEAGUDO, BARACK H. OBAMA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia A. Bronte on behalf of ABDULRAHMAN ABDOU ABOU AL G SULEIMAN (Bronte, Patricia)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Sullivan on behalf of ABDULRAHMAN ABDOU ABOU AL G SULEIMAN (Sullivan, Thomas)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of Filing Patricia A. Bronte's Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information and Acknowledgment by ABDULRAHMAN ABDOU ABOU AL G SULEIMAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information, # 2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment)(DeBruin, David)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Filing Thomas P. Sullivan's Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information and Acknowlegment by ABDULRAHMAN ABDOU ABOU AL G SULEIMAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information, # 2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment)(DeBruin, David)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None
                                              CERTIFICATION OF REPRESENTATION WITHOUT COMPENSATION by ABDULRAHMAN ABDOU ABOU AL G SULEIMAN (zrdj) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ABDULRAHMAN ABDOU ABOU AL G SULEIMAN. Case related to Case No. 05cv2386. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                      PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ABDULRAHMAN ABDOU ABOU AL G SULEIMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?