Henry v. U.S. Bank
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:15-cv-02338

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 11:39 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER adopting 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency filed by Eva Henry. The cause of action is dismissed for failure to state a cause of action, and the Plaintiff will have up to and including December 2, 2015 to file an amended complaint that will correct the deficiencies in the initial complaint. Failure to do so will result in dismissal. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 11/2/2015. (EJJ)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency filed by Eva Henry; recommending that complaint be dismissed but allowing plaintiff opportunity to file amended complaint within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/13/2015. (DMS)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of designation of track
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Standing Order re: 25 pages
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 5 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?