Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company v. Pro-Inspect Inc

Federal Civil Lawsuit Wyoming District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00196
District Judge Alan B. Johnson, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Alan B. Johnson
Last Updated October 3, 2019 at 5:43 PM EDT (5.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company, Plaintiff

Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Buck S Beltzer +1 303 295 8455 +1 303 295 8261 bsbeltzer@hollandhart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geraldine A. Brimmer +1 303 295 8000 +1 303 295 8261 gbrimmer@hollandhart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick R Day +1 307 778 4200 +1 307 778 8175 pday@hollandhart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa D. Locke +1 303 295 8480 +7136 713 713 6227 tlocke@hollandhart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 307 778 4250 +1 307 778 8175 tlsansonetti@hollandhart.com

Represented by Sinclair Oil Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn C Hart +1 801 524 2756 +1 801 524 2880 lhart@sinclairoil.com
v.
No Logo Pro-Inspect Inc, Defendant

Represented by HICKEY & EVANS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David F Evans +1 307 634 1525 +1 307 638 7335 devans@hickeyevans.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J Hickey +1 307 634 1525 +1 307 638 7335 phickey@hickeyevans.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED O'Kelley H Pearson +1 307 634 1525 +1 307 638 7335 kpearson@hickeyevans.com

Represented by Hoguet Newman Regal & Kenney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jules R Cattie, III +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101 jcattie@hnrklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Patrick Curley +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101 jcurley@hnrklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Joseph Kenney +1 212 689 8808 +1 212 689 5101 jkenney@hrklaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Timeline
  Entries (236) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Clerk's Bill of Cost
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Bill of Costs
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to 209 Notice (Other) Of Supplemental Authority filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company of Additional Authority (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motions No Longer Referred: 193 MOTION for Order (Court Staff, szf)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEPOSITION of Collin Cross taken on 11/15/13 consisting of 187 pages. (Court Staff, sth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEPOSITION of Joshua Stephen Kiss taken on 6/27/13 consisting of 238 pages. (Court Staff, sjlg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEPOSITION of Paul S. Moote taken on 11/12/13 consisting of 192 pages. (Court Staff, sjlg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEPOSITION of Kenneth Baker taken on 09/20/13 consisting of 233 pages. (Court Staff, sth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEPOSITION of Steve Wells taken on 10/10/13 consisting of 99 pages. (Court Staff, sth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEPOSITION of Stephen Anderson taken on 10/15/13 consisting of 157 pages. (Court Staff, sth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Additional days added due to continuance of start date. Set Hearings: Trial Consecutive Day set for 4/28/2014 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Trial Consecutive Day set for 4/29/2014 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, sth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEPOSITION of Jon Christensen taken on 08/27/13 consisting of 212 pages. (Court Staff, sth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEPOSITION of Robert D. Caligiuri taken on 09/10/13 consisting of 236 pages. (Court Staff, sth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEPOSITION of J.R. Eggleston taken on 05/30/13 consisting of 204 pages. (Court Staff, sth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEPOSITION of Michael Pitzpatrick taken on 06/28/13 consisting of 190 pages. (Court Staff, sth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEPOSITION of Juan Alfredo Malave taken on 05/16/13 consisting of 250 pages. (Court Staff, sth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEPOSITION of James Allen taken on 10/30/13 consisting of 138 pages. (Court Staff, sth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEPOSITION of Raymond Hansen taken on 08/23/13 consisting of 220 pages. (Court Staff, sth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motions No Longer Referred: 165 MOTION for Order Regarding Sequestration of Witnesses. (Court Staff, ssc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Trial start is 4/14/14 with Trial Consecutive Day set for 4/15/2014 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Trial Consecutive Day set for 4/16/2014 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Trial Consecutive Day set for 4/17/2014 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Trial Consecutive Day set for 4/18/2014 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Trial Consecutive Day set for 4/21/2014 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Trial Consecutive Day set for 4/22/2014 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Trial Consecutive Day set for 4/23/2014 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Trial Consecutive Day set for 4/24/2014 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Trial Consecutive Day set for 4/25/2014 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, sth) Modified on 4/9/2014 (Court Staff, sth).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motions No Longer Referred: 139 MOTION to Strike. (Court Staff, ssc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motions No Longer Referred: 139 MOTION to Strike Pro-Inspect's Borrowed Servant Affirmative Defense, (Court Staff, szf)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motions No Longer Referred: 82 MOTION to Strike Dr. Caligiuri's Affidavit, (Court Staff, szf)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motions No Longer Referred: 79 MOTION for Order To Allow Defendant's General Counsel To Participate By Telephone (Court Staff, szf)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motions No Longer Referred: 68 MOTION to Vacate and Reset Hearing on Motion for Spoliation Sanctions Together with Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Court Staff, sth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motions No Longer Referred: 56 MOTION for Sanctions (Dispositive) (Court Staff, szf)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 11/15/2013. (Court Staff, sth)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc Public. (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
NON-PUBLIC ACCESS - PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc . (Hickey, Paul) Modified on 6/13/2014 (Court Staff, sth). (Entered: 06/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company . (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF UNSEALED TRANSCRIPT re 190 of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME IX (Pages 1728-1911) held on 4/28/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2014. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF UNSEALED TRANSCRIPT re 189 of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME VIII (Pages 1556-1727) held on 4/25/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2014. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF REDACTED TRANSCRIPT re 188 of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME VII (Pages 1318-1555) held on 4/24/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2014. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF REDACTED TRANSCRIPT re 187 of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME VI (Pages 1090-1317) held on 4/23/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2014. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF REDACTED TRANSCRIPT re 186 of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME V (Pages 869-1089) held on 4/22/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2014. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF UNSEALED TRANSCRIPT re 185 of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME IV (Pages 622-868) held on 4/21/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2014. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF REDACTED TRANSCRIPT re 184 of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME III (Pages 431-621) held on 4/18/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2014. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF UNSEALED TRANSCRIPT re 183 of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME II (Pages 225-430) held on 4/17/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2014. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF REDACTED TRANSCRIPT re 182 of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME I (Pages 1-224) held on 4/16/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2014. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson re 195 Order.(Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - ORDER granting 193 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Redact Transcripts of Bench Trial Proceedings and to Seal Confidential Trial Exhibits by the Honorable Alan B Johnson (Court Staff, slb) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
ORDER Granting 192 Unopposed Motion to Seal the Transcript of Motion for Summary Judgment by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Transcript sealed on May 15, 2014. (Court Staff, szf) Modified on 5/15/2014 - corrected document number for related motion. (Court Staff, sjc). (Entered: 05/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - MOTION to Redact Transcripts of Bench Trial Proceedngs and to Seal Confidential Trial Exhibits filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, sjc) Modified on 5/15/2014 (Court Staff, szf). (Entered: 05/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Seal Transcript re 136 Transcript,,, 191 Redacted Transcript filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Day, Patrick) Modified on 5/15/2014 - terminated motion, see order #194. (Court Staff, sjc). (Entered: 05/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF REDACTED TRANSCRIPT re 136 Transcript of Motion for Summary Judgment Proceedings held 3/18/14. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2014. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 05/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 190 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME IX (Pages 1728-1911) held on 4/28/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson, To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 189 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME VIII (Pages 1556-1727) held on 4/25/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson, To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 188 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME VII (Pages 1318-1555) held on 4/24/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson, To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 187 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME VI (Pages 1090-1317) held on 4/23/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson, To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 186 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME V (Pages 869-1089) held on 4/22/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson, To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 185 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME IV (Pages 622-868) held on 4/21/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson, To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 184 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME III (Pages 431-621) held on 4/18/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson, To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 183 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME II (Pages 225-430) held on 4/17/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson, To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 182 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of BENCH TRIAL, VOLUME I (Pages 1-224) held on 4/16/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson, To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - Trial Witness and Exhibit List. (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Bench Trial completed on 4/28/2014, Case Taken Under Advisement. Witness Regan Howell testified. Deposition Colin Cross and Deposition of James Allen used. (Court Reporter Julie Thomas.) (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Bench Trial held on 4/25/2014. Dr. Michael Casey, Kathy Spletter and Regan Howell testified. (Court Reporter Julie Thomas.) (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Bench Trial Day 7 held on 4/24/2014. Defendant's witnesses: Joshua Kiss (deposition used); John Rosacker; deposition of Paul Moote read into the record; and Dr. Michael E. Casey. Court stands in recess until 4/25/14 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Thomas.) (Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson:Bench Trial held on 4/23/2014. (Court Reporter Julie Thomas.) (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
MOTION for Judgment On Partial Findings filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 171 Notice (Other) filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Bench Trial held on 4/22/2014. Jay Mick testified, Robert Simms(defense) testified, Jon Christensen testified, and Kevin Waguespack testified. (Court Reporter Julie Thomas.) (Court Staff, sth) (Main Document 174 replaced on 4/23/2014) (Court Staff, sth). (Entered: 04/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Bench Trial held on 4/21/2014. Dr. Robert Claigiuri testified, John Anderson testified, and Jay Mick testified. (Court Reporter Julie Thomas.) (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Bench Trial held on 4/18/2014. J.R. Eggleston testified. Taped deposition of Michael Fitzpatrick, Dan Bulkley testified, Taped deposition of Juan Malave, Read deposition of James Allen. (Court Reporter Julie Thomas.) (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING PLAINTIFFS (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson Sealing Trial Transcripts until Further Order.(Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Bench Trial held on 4/17/2014. Witness Hansen testifies, Witness J.R. Eggleston testifies. (Court Reporter Julie Thomas.) (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Bench Trial commenced to the Court on 4/16/2014. Opening statements made by both sides. Witness Raymond Hansen testified. (Court Reporter Julie Thomas.) (Court Staff, sth) (Main Document 168 replaced on 4/17/2014) (Court Staff, sth). (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Patrick R Day re 136 Transcript,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 165 Motion for Order filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order Regarding Sequestration of Witnesses filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson granting 139 Motion to Strike Pro-Inspect Inc.'s Borrowed Servant Defense.(Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
Witness List by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
Exhibit List by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
Exhibit/Witness List by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Beltzer, Buck) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial RESET for 4/16/2014 09:00 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, slb) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company of Objections and Counter-Designations to Defendant's Designations of Deposition Testimony for Use at Trial (Beltzer, Buck) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
Supplemental OBJECTION to 142 Designation, 146 Notice (Other) filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson denying 82 Motion to Strike ; denying 97 Motion in Limine; granting 99 Motion in Limine; granting 100 Motion in Limine; granting 103 Motion in Limine (Court Staff, sal) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2014. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Julie Thomas.) (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
OBJECTION filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Beltzer, Buck) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support of 139 Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin GRANTING 152 Stipulation Motion to Amend/Correct Caption. The caption shall be amended to reflect Defendants are Pro-Inspect, Inc. (d/b/a Moody International Asset Integrity Services, Inc.) and Intertek Asset Integrity Management, Inc., the successor corporation. (Court Staff, ssc) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption, filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Day, Patrick) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENT re 103 Motion in Limine filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
AMENDED FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson.(Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson.(Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/1/2014. Exhibits and witnesses discussed and well as proper caption. 1 hour opening statements. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Julie Thomas.) (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 137 Objection filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc Deposition Testimony (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Hickey, Paul) Text modified on 4/1/2014 (Court Staff, sal). (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
TRIAL BRIEF by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
TRIAL BRIEF by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit) (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 138 Notice (Other) filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
Designation of Deposition Testimony for Use at Trial by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Day, Patrick) Text modified on 4/1/2014 (Court Staff, sal). (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company re 136 Transcript,, Intent to Redact (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 139 Motion to Strike filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Strike Pro-Inspect's Borrowed Servant Affirmative Defense, filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Day, Patrick) Modified on 4/7/2014 (Court Staff, szf). (Entered: 03/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc Objections to Plaintiff's Trial Exhibits (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
OBJECTION filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 136 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
SEALED DOCUMENT - REDACTED TRANSCRIPT FILED AS DOC 191 - - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT held on 3/18/14 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. A party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 7 business days. If a party fails to request redaction, the unredacted transcript attached to this entry will be made available electronically without redaction.. Notice of Intent to Redact due 3/31/2014. Notice of Redaction Request due 4/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2014. (Thomas, Julie) Modified on 5/5/2014 (Court Staff, sjc). Modified on 5/20/2014 (Court Staff, sjc). (Entered: 03/24/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting 134 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting John P Curley for Pro-Inspect Inc (Court Staff, sal) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for John P. Curley to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit John P. Curley, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company re No Intent to Redact (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson denying 59 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 63 Motion for Summary Judgment.(Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2014. Motions taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Julie Thomas.) (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
RETURN of Subpoena to Appear and Testify at Trial by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company upon John Rosacker on 3/7/2014. (Sansonetti, Thomas) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
RETURN of Subpoena to Appear and Testify at Trial by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company upon Nancy Gehrig on 3/12/2014. (Sansonetti, Thomas) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 77 Objection filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
Joint STATUS REPORT by Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc re 60 Brief, 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment, Schedule of New Exhibits to be Submitted During Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AAA, # 2 Exhibit BBB, # 3 Exhibit CCC, # 4 Exhibit DDD, # 5 Exhibit EEE, # 6 Exhibit FFF, # 7 Exhibit GGG, # 8 Exhibit HHH) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTIONS held on 12/27/13 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email jht.thomas@gmail.com. A party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 7 business days. If a party fails to request redaction, the unredacted transcript attached to this entry will be made available electronically without redaction.. Notice of Intent to Redact due 3/20/2014. Notice of Redaction Request due 4/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/14/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2014. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
(TEXT-ONLY) JOINT STATUS REPORT ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Plaintiff and Defendant shall confer and file a joint status report generally addressing the current status of settlement negotiations, if any. The Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 3/14/14. (Court Staff, ssc) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
RETURN of Subpoena to Appear and Testify at Trial by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company upon Dan Bulkley on February 27, 2014. (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
RETURN of Subpoena to Appear and Testify at Trial by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company upon George Zak on February 27, 2014. (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Support of 100 Motion in Limine, filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Beltzer, Buck) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 111 Notice (Other) filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Support of 99 Motion in Limine, filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Beltzer, Buck) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 98 Brief, 108 Response in Opposition to Motion, 97 Motion in Limine filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
REPLY to 103 Motion in Limine, 107 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 112 Notice (Other), filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit) (Beltzer, Buck) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 4/1/2014 08:30 AM in Judge Johnson Chambers (Room No. 2018) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, slb) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
(TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. On February 26, 2014, the Court held an informal discovery conference with Geraldine A. Brimmer and Patrick R. Day appearing for Plaintiff and Paul J. Hickey and RJ Walker appearing for Defendant. The Court ORDERED the following: (1) Jon Christensen's 2/27/14 scheduled 30(b)(6) deposition shall proceed; (2) Plaintiff shall expeditiously provide Defendant the unredacted, single page 2010-2011 financial reports; (3) Plaintiff is not required to comply with Defendant's second issued subpoena duces tecum to Mr. Christensen; and (4) Plaintiff shall provide Defendant with those documents and/or information noted during Mr. Christensen's November, 2013 deposition, including that information referred to on transcript pages 40-42. In the event Plaintiff cannot locate the documents/information described in (4), Plaintiff shall immediately inform Defendant to explain. (Court Staff, ssc) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing on 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment, (Confidential/Non-Redacted), 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment, Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2014 08:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, slb) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc Objections Based Upon Authenticity (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company of Authenticity Objections to Defendant's Trial Exhibits (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 100 Motion in Limine, filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q) (Hickey, Paul) (Attachment 4 replaced on 2/24/2014) (Court Staff, sjc). (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 99 Motion in Limine, filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 97 Motion in Limine filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 103 Motion in Limine filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin GRANTING 102 Joint Motion for Order to Modify Certain IPT Deadlines. Demonstrative exhibits disclosed on or before 4/8/14. Motions in limine identified between 1/24/14 and 1/31/14 shall be filed by 2/7/14. Responses to motions in limine due 2/21/14. Replies due 2/28/14. Objections to authentication due 2/21/14. Responses due 2/28/14. Parties shall exchange actual exhibits by 3/14/14. (Court Staff, ssc) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson denying 56 Motion for Sanctions (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support of 103 Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Prior Criminal Conduct of Witness filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Hickey, Paul) Text modified on 2/10/2014 (Court Staff, sal). (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Prior Criminal Conduct Witness filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Joint MOTION for Order to Modify Certain Deadlines in Court's Jan. 23, 2013 Order on Initial Pretrial Conference filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Day, Patrick) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Irrelevant OSHA Citations and Safety Compliance Audits filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Proposed Order)(Beltzer, Buck) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Terms from the Unsigned and Irrelevant 2011 Contract Form filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Proposed Order)(Beltzer, Buck) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
BRIEF re 97 Motion in Limine filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
Amended Designation of Expert Witnesses by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin GRANTING 89 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Substitute Expert and Amend Expert Disclosures. (Court Staff, ssc) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference on Privacy and Public Access - , EXHIBIT in reference to 93 Reply Brief filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Beltzer, Buck) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
REPLY BRIEF re 89 Motion for Order for Leave to Substitute Expert and Amend Expert Disclosures filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Beltzer, Buck) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin DENYING 87 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. (Court Staff, ssc) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 89 Motion for Order filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 87 Motion for Protective Order, filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order Granting Leave to Substitute Expert and Amend Expert Disclosures filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Beltzer, Buck) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference on Privacy and Public Access - , EXHIBIT in reference to 87 Motion for Protective Order, filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Proposed Order)(Day, Patrick) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
REPLY BRIEF re 84 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion To Strike Dr. Caligiuri's Affidavit filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Motion Hearing held on 12/27/2013. Arguments held, motion taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Julie Thomas.) (Court Staff, sth) Text modified on 12/30/2013 (Court Staff, sal). (Entered: 12/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 82 MOTION to Strike Dr. Caligiuri's Affidavit, filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
Defendant's BRIEF in Support of Defendant's Motion to Strike Dr. Caligiuri's Affidavit re 82 Motion to Strike filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Strike Dr. Caligiuri's Affidavit, filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hickey, Paul) Modified on 12/30/2013 (Court Staff, szf). (Entered: 12/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
(TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. On 12/20/13, the Court held an informal telephone discovery conference with Geraldine A. Brimmer appearing on behalf of Plaintiff and Paul J. Hickey on behalf of Defendant. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff permission to brief the discovery issue related to the Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) fact deposition of Mr. John Christianson on or before 1/6/14. Defendant shall file a response in accordance with U.S.D.C.L.R. 7.1(b)(1)(B).(Court Staff, ssc) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson granting 79 Motion for Order to allow General Counsel to participate by telephone at the Motion hearing scheduled for December 27, 2013.(Court Staff, sdl) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order To Allow Defendant's General Counsel To Participate By Telephone filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW re 76 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION to 59 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit) (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW re 71 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
EXHIBIT (last part of exhibit 1) in reference to 71 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Spoliation Sanctions filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Day, Patrick) Modified on 12/11/2013 (Court Staff, sdl). (Entered: 12/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
EXHIBIT in reference to 71 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Spoliation Sanctions filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit) (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
EXHIBIT in reference to 71 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Spoliation Sanctions filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit) (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 56 MOTION for Sanctions (Dispositive) filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing on 56 MOTION for Sanctions (Dispositive) Motion Hearing RESET for 12/27/2013 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, slb) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 68 Motion to Vacate, filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Vacate and Reset Hearing on Motion for Spoliation Sanctions Together with Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Day, Patrick) Modified on 12/6/2013 (Court Staff, sth). Modified on 12/6/2013 (Court Staff, sth). (Entered: 12/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing on 56 MOTION for Spoliation Sanctions (Dispositive) Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2013 01:15 PM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, slb) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
(TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin FINDING AS MOOT 54 Defendant's Motion for Order To File Under Seal its Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, in light of Defendant filing the brief as non-public [63, 64, 65]. (Court Staff, ssc) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None
NON_PUBLIC DOCUMENT PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW re 63 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law) (Hickey, Paul) Modified on 12/2/2013 (Court Staff, sth). (Entered: 11/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None
NON-PUBLIC MEMORANDUM in Support of 63 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A - F, # 3 Exhibit G - M, # 4 Exhibit N, # 5 Exhibit O - P, # 6 Exhibit Q, # 7 Exhibit R - X, # 8 Exhibit Y, # 9 Exhibit Z - HH, # 10 Exhibit II - LL, # 11 Exhibit MM Part 1, # 12 Exhibit MM Part 2, # 13 Exhibit NN - SS, # 14 Exhibit TT - ZZ) (Hickey, Paul) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/2/2013) (Court Staff, sth). Modified on 12/2/2013 (Court Staff, sth). (Entered: 11/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None
NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - MOTION for Summary Judgment, (Confidential/Non-Redacted) filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 11/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None
REQUEST for Hearing re 60 Brief, 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 11/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None
PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW re 60 Brief, 59 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 11/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None
BRIEF re 59 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A - F, # 3 Exhibit G - M, # 4 Exhibit N, # 5 Exhibit O - Q, # 6 Exhibit R - X, # 7 Exhibit Y - HH, # 8 Exhibit II - LL, # 9 Exhibit MM - UU, # 10 Exhibit VV - ZZ) (Hickey, Paul) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/2/2013) (Court Staff, sth). (Entered: 11/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 11/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
REQUEST for Hearing re 56 MOTION for Sanctions (Dispositive), 57 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support of 56 Motion for Sanctions filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K (NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT) # 12 Exhibit L (NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT) # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Proposed Order) (Hickey, Paul) Modified on 4/10/2014 at the request of Hickey and Evans. (Court Staff, sal) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Sanctions (Dispositive) filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Hickey, Paul) Modified on 11/27/2013 (Court Staff, szf). (Entered: 11/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson granting 53 Motion to File Excess Pages (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order To File Under Seal Its Brief In Support of Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
On November 12, 2013, the Court held an informal telephonic discovery conference surrounding the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of Mr. John Christianson. After hearing arguments the Court ordered Mr. Christianson to respond, to the best of his ability and knowledge, regarding the comparison of the 2010 and 2011 projected earnings to actual earnings. If either party has any further objections or concerns the parties may seek further assistance and guidance of the Court. by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin.(Court Staff, sjgc) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
RETURN of Subpoena by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc upon GE Betz Inc on October 21, 2013. (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin GRANTING 49 parties' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Additional Depositions. The discovery deadline shall be extended to 11/15/13. (Court Staff, ssc) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc, Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 47 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
Designation of Expert Witnesses by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A Report Figures, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A Appendices A to N, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit A Appendices O to T, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit A Appendices U to AA, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit C Filed Under Seal) (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
ORDER Granting 45 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit C to its Designation of Expert Witnesses by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. (Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order For Leave To File Under Seal Exhibit C To Defendant's Designation of Expert Witness filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting 42 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Teresa D Locke for Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company (Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
OBJECTION filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Teresa D. Locke to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Day, Patrick) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by O'Kelley H Pearson on behalf of Pro-Inspect Inc (Pearson, O'Kelley) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting 39 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Lynn C Hart for Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company (Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Lynn C. Hart to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Day, Patrick) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time. Expert Witness Designation-Defendant deadline 10/1/2013.(Court Staff, srankin1) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) Defendant's Deadline to File Its Designation of Experts filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc, Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
FILED UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT B in reference to 35 Designation of Experts, 34 Order on Motion for Order filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
Designation of Expert Witnesses by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit) (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Entered: 08/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order to File Under Seal Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Day, Patrick) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
RETURN of Subpoena Acceptance of Service of Deposition Subpoena Duces Tecum by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company upon Michael K. Fitzpatrick on 6/20/2013. (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
RETURN of Subpoena Acceptance of Service of Deposition Subpoena Duces Tecum by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company upon Joshua S. Kiss on 6/20/2013. (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
RETURN of Subpoena Duces Tecum by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc upon Juan Malave thru Jared LeBlanc on 5-10-13. (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Pro-Inspect Inc. (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/23/13 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Julie Thomas, phone (307) 778-0078 or email hedelson@qwestoffice.net. A party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 7 business days. If a party fails to request redaction, the unredacted transcript attached to this entry will be made available electronically without redaction.. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/8/2013. Notice of Redaction Request due 2/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2013. (Thomas, Julie) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER: Motions filing deadline 11/29/2013. Motion response deadline 12/13/2013. Replies due by 12/20/2013. Expert Witness Designation-Plaintiff deadline 8/1/2013. Expert Witness Designation-Defendant deadline 9/1/2013. Discovery due by 10/15/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2014 08:30 AM in Judge Johnson Chambers (Room No. 2018) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Bench Trial set for 4/14/2014 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson.by the Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/23/2013. (Court Reporter Julie Thomas.) (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc, Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 23 Motion for Protective Order by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. (Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Day, Patrick) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, slb) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT OF MEETING AND PROPOSED JOINT DISCOVERY AND CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2013 09:30 AM in Judge Johnson Chambers (Room No. 2018) before Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, slb) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting 19 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting John J Kenney,Jules R Cattie, III for Pro-Inspect Inc (Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for John J. Kenney & Jules R. Cattie III to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit John J. Kenney & Jules R. Cattie III, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Pro-Inspect Inc,. (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Complexity by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc, this case is complex. (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Pro-Inspect Inc. (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David F Evans on behalf of Pro-Inspect Inc (Evans, David) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul J Hickey on behalf of Pro-Inspect Inc (Hickey, Paul) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendants shall have until October 17, 2012 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint.(Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Pro-Inspect Inc, Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Day, Patrick) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. Pro-Inspect Inc served on 9/5/2012, answer due on 9/26/2012 (Day, Patrick) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas L Sansonetti on behalf of Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company (Sansonetti, Thomas) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting 7 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Geraldine A Brimmer for Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company (Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting 6 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Buck S Beltzer for Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company (Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Geraldine A. Brimmer to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Buck S. Beltzer to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company, one issued. (Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Complexity by Plaintiff Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company, this case is complex. (Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick R Day on behalf of Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company (Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT (one summons issued) ( Filing fee $350 receipt #CHY015278.), filed by Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, szf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2012: # 2 Exhibit A) (Court Staff, szf). (Entered: 08/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 89 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?