Muhammad, et al v. Henderson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-02078-WMN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Abdul Khaliq Mustafa Muhammad, Plaintiff
v.
United States Postal Service United States Postal Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "William J. Henderson Postmaster General U.S. Postal Service Capital Metro Operations Agency"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 7/16/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $700000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2003 Job Discrimination
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Baltimore County
Terminated 5/8/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, IFPPRO
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 32 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER terminating [21-1] Motion of Plaintiff for Judgment on the Pleadings, denying [21-2] Motion of Plaintiff for Summary Judgment, granting [19-1] Motion of Defendant to Dismiss, granting [19-2] Motion of Defendant for Summary Judgment and CLOSING CASE. (signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 5/8/02) (c/i & Microfilmed 5/8/02 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION (signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 5/8/02) (c/i & Microfilmed 5/8/02 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Terminated Case
      Case closed (mms, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 30 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 Jury Demand
        DEMAND for jury trial by Abdul Khaliq Mustafa Muhammad (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 29 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002 Reply to Response
          SURREPLY by Abdul Khaliq Mustafa Muhammad to Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's [21-2] Motion for Summary Judgment by Abdul Khaliq Mustafa Muhammad (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Legal Document 28 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [27-1] Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defense Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Opposition to Defense Motion to Dismiss ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 3/25/02) (c/i 3/25/02 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 27 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002, Terminated: 3/25/2002 Motion for Leave to File
              MOTION by Abdul Khaliq Mustafa Muhammad for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defense Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Opposition to Defense Motion to Dismiss with Certificate of Conference LR 104 (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 26 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Correspondence
                CORRESPONDENCE by Court Returning to Plaintiff Motion to Compel for failure to comply with LR 104.8. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 25 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Correspondence
                  CORRESPONDENCE by Court returning Plaintiff's Sur-Reply. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 24 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Motion for Discovery
                    MOTION by Abdul Khaliq Mustafa Muhammad for Discovery (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 23 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 Response in Opposition
                      RESPONSE by William J. Henderson in Opposition to [21-1] Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Abdul Khaliq Muhammad, [21-2] Motion for Summary Judgment by Abdul Mustafa Muhammad (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 23 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                        REPLY by William J. Henderson to Plaintiff's Opposition to his [19-2] Motion for Summary Judgment (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 22 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed on U.S. Attorney General on 2/15/02 by USMS (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 21 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002, Terminated: 5/8/2002 Response to Motion
                            RESPONSE by Abdul Khaliq Mustafa Muhammad to [19-1] Motion to Dismiss by William J. Henderson, [19-2] Motion for Summary Judgment by William J. Henderson with Exhibits A - S (ENTIRE PLEADING FILED SEPARATELY) (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/26/2002
                              LREF
                              Blank 21 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002, Terminated: 5/8/2002 ~Motion for Judgment
                              MOTION with memorandum in support by Abdul Khaliq Mustafa Muhammad for Judgment on the Pleadings , or for Summary Judgment with Exhibits A - S (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 20 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Local Rule
                                Local Rule 12/56 Letter mailed/sent to all parties. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                  MOTION with memorandum in support by William J. Henderson to Dismiss , or for Summary Judgment with Exhibit A (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting [15-1] Motion of Plaintiff to Effect Service and DIRECTING Clerk to mail copy of Order and one USMS 285 Service of Process Form to Plaintiff for completion. (signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 1/23/02) (c/m 1/23/02 with 1-USMS 285 Service of Process Form ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint reset Answer deadline to 2/13/02 for William J. Henderson (signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 1/7/02) (c/i 1/7/02 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 16 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002, Terminated: 1/7/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                        MOTION by William J. Henderson to Extend Time to Answer Complaint (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 15 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001, Terminated: 1/23/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                          MOTION by Abdul Khaliq Mustafa Muhammad to Effect Service (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 14 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 Summons Issued
                                            SUMMONS(ES) (60 Days) issued to Attorney General of the United States. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 13 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 Correspondence
                                              CORRESPONDENCE by Abdul Khaliq Mustafa Muhammad requesting issuance of summons as to Attorney General of the United States and Affidavit. (jlb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/06/2001
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 12 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to U.S. Attorney on 11/7/01 (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 Summons Issued
                                                  SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for William J. Henderson (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER denying [9-1] Second Motion of Plaintiff for Default Judgment against William J. Henderson ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 11/01/01) (c/i 11/01/01 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                      MOTION by Abdul Khaliq Mustafa Muhammad for Default Judgment against William J. Henderson (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to William J. Henderson 10/25/01 Answer due on 12/26/01 for William J. Henderson (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER denying [6-1] Motion of Plaintiff for Default Judgment against William J. Henderson for failure to properly serve Defendant for want of Answer or Other Defense (signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 10/19/01 ) (c/m 10/19/01 chambers) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001, Terminated: 10/19/2001 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                            MOTION by Abdul Khaliq Mustafa Muhammad for Default Judgment against William J. Henderson for want of Answer or Other Defense (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to William J. Henderson 8/9/01 Answer due on 10/8/01 for William J. Henderson (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 Summons Issued
                                                                SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for William J. Henderson (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/06/2001
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 Filing Fee Paid
                                                                  Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1178050 (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER denying [2-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; ALLOWING Plaintiff 30 days to submit filing fee. Failure to pay the filing fee will result in dismissal of case without prejudice. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 7/19/01) (c/i 7/19/01 ms) (c/m) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001, Terminated: 7/19/2001 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                      MOTION by Abdul Khaliq Mustafa Muhammad to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001 Complaint
                                                                        COMPLAINT and Attachments filed; (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?