Mellerson v. Commissioner
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-02090-BEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jeanette Mellerson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David William Stamper +1 410 580 3000 +1 410 580 3001

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Beth Leasure +1 410 580 3000 +1 410 580 3199 amybeth.leasure@dlapiper.com
Space Tracey Gann Turner +1 410 580 3000 +1 410 580 3278 tracey.turner@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights & Urban Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan E. Huhta +1 202 319 1000 +1 202 319 1010 sue_huhta@washlaw.org
Space Carolyn Peri Weiss +1 202 319 1000 carolyn_weiss@washlaw.org
v.
Social Security Administration Social Security Administration, Defendant
Officially listed as "Commissioner of Social Security Administration"

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com
Space Kristine L. Sendek Smith +1 202 789 6063 +1 202 789 6190 ksendeksmith@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 7/17/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Baltimore County
Terminated 8/31/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MAG
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 69 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER DIRECTING that the case be CLOSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/3/04. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 68 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [52] Motion of plaintiff for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/18/04. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Legal Document 67 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
      MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/18/04. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Legal Document 66 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Supplemental
        Supplemental to Plaintiff's Petition for An Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2)(Leasure, Amy)
          LREF
          Legal Document 65 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER DIRECTING plaintiff to file an itemized chart no later than 5/7/2004. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/27/04. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Legal Document 64 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine L Sendek Smith on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Sendek Smith, Kristine)
              LREF
              Legal Document 63 Filed: 1/24/2004, Entered: 1/24/2004 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Appearance by Nadira Clarke on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Clarke, Nadira)
                LREF
                Legal Document 62 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Certificate of Counsel
                CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [61] Reply to Response to Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Amy Beth Leasure on behalf of Jeanette Mellerson (Leasure, Amy)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 61 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [52] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Jeanette Mellerson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G)(Leasure, Amy)
                    LREF
                    Blank 60 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: 1/5/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [57] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 01/05/2004. (cad, Chambers)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 59 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE by Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Attachments: # (1) Defendant's Notice of Filing of Separate Exhibits in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Costs# (2) Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 6)(Clarke, Nadira)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 58 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Response in Opposition to Motion
                        RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiff's Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Replies due by 1/5/2004. (Clarke, Nadira)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 57 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003, Terminated: 1/5/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Responses due by 1/3/2004 (Clarke, Nadira)
                            LREF
                            Blank 56 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [53] Motion to substitute exhibits to Plaintiff's Petition for an Award of Attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/21/2003. (cad, Chambers)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 55 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/19/03. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 54 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 Notice to Substitute Attorney
                                NOTICE to Substitute Attorney (Clarke, Nadira)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003, Terminated: 11/21/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  MOTION to Substitute Exhibits to Plaintiff's Petition for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Jeanette Mellerson. Responses due by 12/8/2003 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit J (page 6)# (2) Exhibit J-2)(Weiss, Carolyn)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 52 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003, Terminated: 6/18/2004 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                    MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Jeanette Mellerson. Responses due by 12/4/2003 (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support# (2) Exhibit A# (3) Exhibit B# (4) Exhibit C# (5) Exhibit D# (6) Exhibit E# (7) Exhibit F# (8) Exhibit G# (9) Exhibit H# (10) Exhibit I# (11) Exhibit J# (12) Exhibit K# (13) Exhibit L# (14) Exhibit M# (15) Exhibit N# (16) Exhibit O# (17) Exhibit P# (18) Exhibit P1# (19) Exhibit Q# (20) Exhibit R# (21) Exhibit S# (22) Exhibit T)(Stamper, David)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 51 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Miscellaneous Correspondence
                                    Correspondence re: Scheduling Order (Attachments: # (1))(Clarke, Nadira)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Consent to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                      Consent to Magistrate Judge (Huhta, Susan)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                        LETTER ORDER re: Consent Forms. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/9/03. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Consent to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                          Consent to Magistrate Judge (Leasure, Amy)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Memorandum to PartiesCourt Filing
                                            MEMORANDUM ADVISING that counsel let the court know by September 17th whether counsel or their clients would consent to a referral to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 9/8/03. (c/m 9/12/03 Chambers)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [43] Motion of plaintiff to Withdraw as Attorney; DIRECTING that the appearance of Jonathan S. Nash is hereby stricken. Attorney Jonathan S Nash terminated. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 8/15/03. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 45 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                ORDER Administratively Closes [31] Motion of plaintiff for a Privacy Act Order, Administratively Closes [33] Motion of plaintiff for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 8/12/03. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 44 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  LETTER ORDER SETTING date for a Telephone Conference. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/11/03. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003, Terminated: 8/15/2003 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Jonathan S. Nash) by Jeanette Mellerson. Responses due by 6/16/2003 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Stamper, David)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Settlement Conference
                                                    Settlement Conference held before Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/28/03 (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Miscellaneous Correspondence
                                                      Correspondence re: Time Change of settlement conference on May 28, 2003.(Grimm, Paul)(jnf)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Miscellaneous Correspondence
                                                        Correspondence re: Rescheduling Mediation Conference for May 28, 2003 (Nash, Jonathan)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 40 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 Settlement Conference - setting
                                                          Settlement Conference - rescheduling. (Grimm, Paul)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER SETTING date for a settlement conference (signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm 11/19/02) (c/m 11/20/02 jnf) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm for Settlement ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 10/31/02) (c/m 11/12/02 sjd) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER STAYING the Scheduling Order. DIRECTING that if settlement talks fail, then the Magistrate Judge will set the schedule for completing discvoery and filing dispositve motions. (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 10/31/02) (c/i 10/31/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Remark
                                                                  LINE RE: Exhibits Subject to Protection Order (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER denying as moot [15-1] motion of plaintiff Mellerson to Extend Time to get representation ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 10/29/02) (c/m 10/29/02 eg) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                      ANSWER by Commissioner to first amended complaint (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002, Terminated: 8/12/2003 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                        MOTION with memorandum in support by Jeanette Mellerson for Leave of Court to take more than Ten Depositions and Exhibits 1 through 8 (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                          NOTICE of attorney appearance for Jeanette Mellerson by Carolyn Peri Weiss (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002, Terminated: 8/12/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                            MOTION with memorandum in support by Jeanette Mellerson for Privacy Act Order (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 Jury Demand
                                                                              DEMAND for jury trial by Jeanette Mellerson (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                                                FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jeanette Mellerson, amending [1-1] complaint (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  MARGINAL ORDER granting [28-1] motion of plaintiff for Leave to File First Amended Complaint ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 9/26/02) (c/m 9/27/02 eg) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/10/2002
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002, Terminated: 9/27/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Jeanette Mellerson for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and proposed First Amended Complaint (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/12/2002 Correspondence
                                                                                      LINE by Commissioner Re: Disclosure of documents pursuant to the court's 2/21/02 Protective Order (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER EXTENDING the deadline for defendant producing documents referenced in the court's order of 8/8/02 until 9/11/02 ( signed by Chief Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 8/15/02 ) (c/i 8/16/02) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002, Terminated: 8/15/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                          MOTION by Commissioner to Extend Time to produce documents referenced in the Court's 8/8/02 order (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                            NOTICE of attorney appearance for Commissioner by Nadira Clarke (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [20-1] motion of Mellerson for time to conduct discovery to oppose defendant's Motion to Dismiss, dismissing [10-1] motion of Commissioner to Dismiss, dismissing [10-2] motion of Commissioner for Summary Judgment as premature, as therein set forth. (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 8/8/02) (c/m 8/8/02 chambers) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                REPLY by Jeanette Mellerson to defendant's opposition to her [20-1] (Rule 56(f)) motion for time to conduct discovery (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM by Commissioner in support of its [10-1] motion to Dismiss and its [10-2] motion for Summary Judgment (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Commissioner in opposition to [20-1] motion (Rule 56(F) ) for time to conduct discovery to oppose defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Jeanette Mellerson (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002, Terminated: 8/8/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                      MOTION with memorandum in support by Jeanette Mellerson for time to conduct discovery to oppose defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Exhibit A (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [18-1] unopposed motion of Mellerson for Extension of Time to Respond to defendant's Motion to dismiss or for Summary Judgment to 6/24/02. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 6/14/02) (c/i 6/17/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002, Terminated: 6/17/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                          UNOPPOSED MOTION by Jeanette Mellerson for Extension of Time to Respond to defendant's Motion to dismiss or for Summary Judgment (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                            NOTICE of attorney appearance for Jeanette Mellerson by Tracey Gann Turner, Jonathan S Nash, David William Stamper, Amy Beth Leasure, Susan E. Huhta (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER DIRECTING that, although Ms. Mellerson's letter of 5/1/02 is styled as an Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, the paper is actually a request for an extension of time; GRANTING Ms. Mellerson an extension of time until 5/25/02 to file an opposition to the Motion to Dismiss, as therein set forth. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 5/3/02) (c/m 5/6/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002, Terminated: 10/29/2002 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Jeanette Mellerson in opposition to [10-1] motion to Dismiss by Commissioner (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002, Terminated: 10/23/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                  MOTION by Jeanette Mellerson to Extend Time to get representation (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER DIRECTING that if plaintiff does not oppose the motion to dismiss by 5/5/02, the Court will assume that the plaintiff has no further interest in pursuing the case and will grant the motion to dismiss. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 4/23/02) (c/i 4/23/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Correspondence
                                                                                                                      LINE by Commissioner Re: Exhibits Subject to Protective Order (FILED UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Jeanette Mellerson in opposition to [10-1] motion of Commissioner to Dismiss and [10-2] motion of Commissioner for Summary Judgment (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [9-1] motion of Commissioner for Privacy Act Order, as therein set forth. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 2/20/02) (c/m 2/21/02 eg) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/21/2002
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002, Terminated: 8/8/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                            MOTION with memorandum in support by Commissioner to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1 through 26 (c/s) (EXHIBITS FILED SEPARATELY) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/28/2002
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002, Terminated: 2/21/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                              MOTION with memorandum in support by Commissioner for Privacy Act Order (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                MARGINAL ORDER granting [7-1] motion of Commissioner for Enlargement of Time to answer; DIRECTING that no further extensions will be granted reset Answer deadline to 2/8/02 for Commissioner signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 1/3/02) (c/m 1/7/02 eg) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001, Terminated: 1/7/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Commissioner for Enlargement of Time to answer (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [5-1] motion of defendant Commissioner for Enlargement of Time to Answer set Answer deadline to 12/21/01 for Commissioner signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 10/20/01) (c/m 10/22/01 eg) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 10/22/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Commissioner for Enlargement of Time to Answer (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Commissioner, U.S. Attorney 8/7/01, U.S. Attorney General 8/6/01 Answer due on 10/9/01 for Commissioner (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS (60 days) issued for Commissioner (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER REMINDING the plaintiff that under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(1), the person effecting service must notify the Court through an affidavit that he or she has served the defendant; ADVISING the plaintiff that Local Rule 102.1 is required to notify the Court in writing of any change in address; DIRECTING that a failure to comply with this Rule may result in dismissal of all claims, as therein set forth. (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 7/24/01) (c/m 7/24/01 eg) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT and attachments filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1177320 (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?