Castiblanco v. Environmental &
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-02106-JFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Maria Elizabeth Castiblanco, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by REGAN ZAMBRI & LONG,PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Victor Earl Long +1 202 463 3030 +1 202 463 0667 vlong@rhllaw.com
v.
No Logo Environmental & Demolition Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rachel Bob +1 301 807 7787 +1 410 484 4293
Space Marcela McDonough Jenkins +1 787 381 5255

Toggle Switch Represented by JORDAN, COYNE & SAVITS, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Stephenson Schwinn +1 202 496 2806 +1 202 496 2800 s.schwinn@jocs-law.com
No Logo Environmental & Demolition Services, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by JORDAN, COYNE & SAVITS, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Stephenson Schwinn +1 202 496 2806 +1 202 496 2800 s.schwinn@jocs-law.com
United States of America United States of America, Third Party Defendant
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen M Schenning +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 209 3124 stephen.schenning@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 7/17/2001
Jury Demand Both
Demand $10000000
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Wrongful Death
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to State Court
County Baltimore County
Terminated 11/13/2001
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 24-C-010013[CC-Baltimore City]
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 39 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Notice of Appearance/
NOTICE of attorney appearance for Environmental & by Marcela McDonough (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 38 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER DENYING motion for reconsideration filed by EDS ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 4/8/02) (c/i 4/8/02) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Legal Document 37 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
      MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 4/8/02) (c/i 4/8/02) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 36 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 Response in Opposition
        RESPONSE by United States in opposition to plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 35 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Supplemental
          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Maria Elizabeth Castiblanco regarding Court's Continuing Jurisdiction over Motion for Reconsideration of Order Dismissing Third Party Complaint (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 34 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002 Response in Support of Motion
            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by EDS in support of its [28-1] support memorandum and Request for Hearing (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 33 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002 Response in Opposition
              RESPONSE by Maria Elizabeth Castiblanco in opposition to [28-1] support memorandum by Environmental (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 32 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [31-1] motion of plaintiff to Extend Time to file an opposition to defendant's motion for reconsideration of order dismissing third party complaint up to and including 1/31/02 ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 1/29/02) (c/m 1/29/02 hl) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 31 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002, Terminated: 1/29/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                  MOTION with memorandum in support by Maria Elizabeth Castiblanco to Extend Time to file an opposition to defendant's motion for reconsideration of order dismissing third party complaint (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [29-1] motion of plaintiff to Extend Time to file an opposition to defendant's motion for reconsideration of order dismissing third party complaint up to and including 1/28/02 ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 1/23/02) (c/i 1/23/02) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 29 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002, Terminated: 1/23/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                      MOTION with memorandum in support by Maria Elizabeth Castiblanco to Extend Time to file an opposition to defendant's motion for reconsideration of order dismissing third party complaint (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 28 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 Response in Support of Motion
                        MEMORANDUM by EDS in support of Continuing Jurisdiction Over Motion for Reconsideration of Order Dismissing Third Party Complaint (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [16-1] motion of USA to Dismiss; DISMISSING claims against USA; REMANDING case to the Circuit Court for Baltimore City ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 11/12/01) (c/i 11/13/01) (MICROFILMED 11/13/01) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                            MEMORANDUM ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 11/12/01) (c/i 11/13/01) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Remark
                              Certified copy of memorandum, order and docket entries mailed to the Circuit Court for Baltimore City (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Terminated Case
                                Case closed (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [10-1] motion of USA to substitute itself for third party defendant, United States Department of the Interior ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 11/6/01) (c/i 11/6/01) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 Reply to Response
                                    REPLY by United States in further support of its [16-1] motion to Dismiss (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [21-1] motion of National Park to Extend Time to file reply brief in further support of its motion to dismiss until 11/2/01 ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 10/31/01) (c/i 10/31/01) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001, Terminated: 10/31/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                        MOTION by National Park to Extend Time to file reply brief in further support of its motion to dismiss (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of attorney appearance for Environmental by Rachel Bob (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 19 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                            MEMORANDUM by Environmental in opposition to [16-1] motion to Dismiss by United States and attachment (c/s) (notarized affidavit of David Whisenant rec'd 10/31/01) (hml, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/31/2001
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [17-1] motion of defendant to Extend Time to respond to the motion to dismiss until 10/12/01 ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 10/5/01) (c/i 10/5/01) (c/m) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 17 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001, Terminated: 10/5/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                MOTION with memorandum in support by Environmental & to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 9/14/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001, Terminated: 11/13/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                  MOTION with memorandum in support by United States to Dismiss and Attachments 1-2 (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001 Local Rule
                                                    Local Rule 103.5 Certificate by United States (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [13-1] motion of defendant, USA to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint until 9/11/01 set Answer deadline to 9/11/01 for National Park ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 8/22/01) (c/i 8/22/01) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001, Terminated: 8/22/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                        SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION by United States to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER EXTENDING the time for USA to answer complaint to 8/21/01 ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 7/23/01) (c/i 7/23/01) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001, Terminated: 7/23/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                            CONSENT MOTION by United States to Extend Time to respond to complaint (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Remark
                                                              Notice of Removal mailed to Parties (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001, Terminated: 11/6/2001 Motion to Substitute Party
                                                                MOTION by United States to substitute party by United States (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Local Rule
                                                                  Local Rule 103.5 by United States (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                    NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal by United States (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Summons Issued
                                                                      SUMMONS(ES) issued for United States (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Jury Demand
                                                                        DEMAND for jury trial by Environmental (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                          THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Environmental against United States Department of the Interior National Park Service. (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Environmental & : amends [4-1] answer ; jury demand (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Answer
                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Environmental ; jury demand (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Summons Issued
                                                                                SUMMONS(ES) issued for Environmental & (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Jury Demand
                                                                                  DEMAND for jury trial by Maria Elizabeth Castiblanco (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Complaint
                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed; (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Notice of Removal
                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL; filed by United States Department of the Interior National Park Service (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Remark
                                                                                        The above Pleadings are copies filed in Circuit Court for Baltimore City (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 115 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?