LANDMARK LEGAL FOUNDATION v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-01655

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 3, 2018 at 1:04 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo LANDMARK LEGAL FOUNDATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ansa Assuncao LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur F Fergenson +1 410 370 1139 arthur.fergenson@ansalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LANDMARK LEGAL FOUNDATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Conrad Forys +1 703 554 6100 +1 703 554 6119
Space Richard Hutchison +1 816 931 5559 +1 816 931 1115
Space Mark R. Levin +1 703 554 6100 +1 703 554 6119
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. O'Neill +1 703 554 6105 mike@landmarklegal.org
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marina Utgoff Braswell +1 202 514 7226 +1 202 514 8780 Marina.Braswell@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Evan Borson +1 202 514 1944 +1 202 616 8187 joseph.borson@usdoj.gov
Space Marian L. Borum +1 202 514 6531 +1 202 307 6059 Marian.L.Borum@usdoj.gov
Space Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
Space Rhonda Lisa Campbell +1 202 514 9519 +1 202 514 8780 rhonda.campbell@usdoj.gov
Space Kyle Renee Freeny +1 202 514 5108 +1 202 616 8460 kyle.freeny@usdoj.gov
Space Michael J Gerardi +1 202 616 0680 +1 202 616 8470 Michael.J.Gerardi@usdoj.gov
Space Julie Straus Harris +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 julie.strausharris@usdoj.gov
Space Adam Kirschner +1 202 249 0920 adam.kirschner@usdoj.gov
Space Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Space Tamra Tyree Moore +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8460 tamra.moore@usdoj.gov
Space Carl Ezekiel Ross +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 carl.ross@usdoj.gov
Space Daniel Patrick Schaefer +1 202 252 2531 +1 202 252 2599 Daniel.Schaefer@usdoj.gov
Space Kevin Matthew Snell +1 202 305 0924 +1 202 616 8470 kevin.snell@usdoj.gov
Space Laurie J. Weinstein +1 202 252 2527 +1 202 514 8780 Laurie.Weinstein2@usdoj.gov
Space Eric R. Womack +1 202 514 4020 +1 202 616 8470 eric.womack@usdoj.gov
Space Marsha Wellknown Yee +1 202 252 2539 +1 202 252 2599 marsha.yee@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Settlement and Dismissal by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None
    STATUS REPORT by LANDMARK LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Neill, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER that the parties shall MEET AND CONFER and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The parties shall file the schedule no later than 7/12/2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/7/16. (dot) Modified on 6/7/2016 to correct date. (dot). (Entered: 06/07/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None
        STATUS REPORT by LANDMARK LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Neill, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER Joint Status Report due by 6/6/2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/6/16. (dot) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
            STATUS REPORT by LANDMARK LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Neill, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDERED that the parties shall Meet and Confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The parties shall file the schedule no later than 5/6/2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/18/16. (dot) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
                STATUS REPORT by LANDMARK LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Neill, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER: Based upon the parties' 11 Meet and Confer Statement and in light of the Joint Status Report it is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter by 4/15/2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 02/16/16. (tb) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                      MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Neill, Michael)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Braswell, Marina)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: 12/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Braswell, Marina)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: 11/19/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall MEET AND CONFER and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, (2) the status of Plaintiff's Administrative Appeal, (3) a proposed briefing schedule, if any, (4) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, (5) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, (6) whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, and (7) whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case. The parties shall file the schedule not later than DECEMBER 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/19/2015. (lcckk1)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                              ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Braswell, Marina)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Braswell, Marina)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 10/19/2015, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/19/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/19/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/18/2015.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(O'Neill, Michael)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: 10/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                    SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: 10/13/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 13, 2015. (NS)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                        LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LANDMARK LEGAL FOUNDATION (O'Neill, Michael)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                          COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4271928) filed by LANDMARK LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons)(O'Neill, Michael)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 58 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?