Germano v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 5:14-cv-00458

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 5:55 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Judgment*Court Filing
Judgment Entry: Plaintiff's motion to voluntarily dismiss is granted and this case is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b)(2). (Related Doc # [10]). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/24/2014. (P,J)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 OrderCourt Filing
    Order: For good cause shown, plaintiff's motion to voluntarily dismiss (Doc. No. [9]) is granted and this case is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b)(2). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/24/2014. (P,J)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Motion to Dismiss
      Motion to dismiss Complaint without prejudice with attached memorandum filed by Plaintiff John K. Germano. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Bank of America correspondence, # (2) Exhibit B- Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. letter, # (3) Exhibit C- Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. Assistance Review Application, # (4) Exhibit D- Plaintiff's Letter to SPS, Inc.)(R,Sh)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
        Motion for extension of time until April 21, 2014 to answer move or otherwise plead filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration, and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Wallace, David)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Attorney Appearance
          Attorney Appearance by David A. Wallace and Amberle Houghton filed by defendants Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration, and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Wallace, David) Modified text on 3/20/2014 (M,De).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
            Motion for extension of time until 04/19/2014 to answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by BAC Home Loan Services, L.P., Bank of America, First Franklin Home Loan Services, Home Loan Services, Inc., Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Company, National City Bank of Indiana, PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.. Related document(s)[1]. (Sandy, James)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Attorney Appearance
              Joint Attorney Appearance by James W. Sandy and Bryan T. Kostura filed by on behalf of BAC Home Loan Services, L.P., Bank of America, First Franklin Home Loan Services,Home Loan Services, Inc., Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Company, National City Bank of Indiana, PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. (Sandy, James) Modified text on 3/14/2014 (R,Sh).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                Order denying plaintiff's motion to stay (Related Doc # [3]). Judge Sara Lioi on 3/5/2014.(P,J)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 Motion to Stay
                  Motion for stay of sale of property with attached Memorandum filed by Plaintiff John K. Germano. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Notice of Sale Filed in Portage County Court of Common Pleas) (S,He) Modified text on 3/4/2014 (R,Sh).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 Summons Issued
                    Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to Plaintiff at counter for service upon BAC Home Loan Services, L.P., Bank of America, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, First Franklin Home Loan Services, Home Loan Services, Inc., Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration, Mortgage Placement Services, Inc., National City Bank of Indiana, PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (M,TL)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 Complaint
                      Complaint with jury demand against BAC Home Loan Services, L.P., Bank of America, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Does 1-10, First Franklin Home Loan Services, Home Loan Services, Inc., Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration, Mortgage Placement Services, Inc., National City Bank of Indiana, PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. Filing fee of $400.00 paid, receipt # 54660004960, filed by John K. Germano. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Proposed Settlement, # (3) Letter to FBI, # (4) Exhibit A - Letter from Sherrod Brown, # (5) Exhibit B - News Articles, # (6) Exhibit C - Foreclosure Assistance Paperwork, # (7) Exhibit D - Loan Agreement Paperwork, # (8) Exhibit E - Assignment of Mortgage Paperwork, # (9) Exhibit F - List of Alleged Robo-Signers) (M,TL)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 14 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?