DiDi Kendall Square, LLC v. Dumpling Girl, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-13514
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 8:50 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Didi Kendall Square, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sweder & Ross, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M. Haney +1 617 226 3800 +1 617 226 3801 bhaney@sweder-ross.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth A. Sweder +1 617 646 4466 +1 617 646 4470 ksweder@sweder-ross.com
v.
No Logo Dumpling Girl, LLC, Defendant
No Logo HUAN-CHEN LI, Defendant
No Logo Jie Lin, Defendant
No Logo Ying Yao Xiong, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1051
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Haney on behalf of DiDi Kendall Square, LLC (Haney, Brian) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
    Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. The Complaint, the Civil Cover Sheet, the Category Form, the Corporate Disclosure Statement, and Form AO 120 (Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark) have been replaced due to a typographical error in the case caption. (Maynard, Timothy) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
      Summons Issued as to Dumpling Girl, LLC, Huanchen Li, Jie Lin, Ying Yao Xiong. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015 Report on the filing/termination of patent/trademark case
          REPORT ON THE FILING/TERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Sweder, Kenneth) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/8/2015) (Alves-Baptista, Antonia). (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/8/2015) (Maynard, Timothy). (Entered: 10/06/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015 Corporate Disclosure Statement
            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DiDi Kendall Square, LLC d/b/a Dumpling Daughter. (Sweder, Kenneth) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/8/2015) (Maynard, Timothy). (Entered: 10/06/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015 Complaint
              VERIFIED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5779350 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by DiDi Kendall Square, LLC d/b/a Dumpling Daughter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Exhibit Category Form)(Sweder, Kenneth) (Attachment 9 replaced on 10/7/2015) (Jones, Sherry). (Attachment 10 replaced on 10/7/2015) (Jones, Sherry). (Attachment 9 replaced on 10/8/2015) (Maynard, Timothy). (Attachment 10 replaced on 10/8/2015) (Maynard, Timothy). (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/8/2015) (Maynard, Timothy). (Entered: 10/06/2015)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 118 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?