Tucker et al v. Oregon Department of Transportation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00466
District Judge Marco A. Hernandez, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 6:35 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Chanda Waulters, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica A. Goracke +1 503 295 0676 mgoracke@oregonlawcenter.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hong Kim Thi Dao +1 503 473 8680 +1 503 295 0676 hdao@oregonlawcenter.org
No Logo Jeff Nelson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica A. Goracke +1 503 295 0676 mgoracke@oregonlawcenter.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hong Kim Thi Dao +1 503 473 8680 +1 503 295 0676 hdao@oregonlawcenter.org
No Logo Joel Tucker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica A. Goracke +1 503 295 0676 mgoracke@oregonlawcenter.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hong Kim Thi Dao +1 503 473 8680 +1 503 295 0676 hdao@oregonlawcenter.org
No Logo Mitchal Poncel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica A. Goracke +1 503 295 0676 mgoracke@oregonlawcenter.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hong Kim Thi Dao +1 503 473 8680 +1 503 295 0676 hdao@oregonlawcenter.org
No Logo Robert Dean Thomas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica A. Goracke +1 503 295 0676 mgoracke@oregonlawcenter.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hong Kim Thi Dao +1 503 473 8680 +1 503 295 0676 hdao@oregonlawcenter.org
No Logo Steven Fletcher, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica A. Goracke +1 503 295 0676 mgoracke@oregonlawcenter.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hong Kim Thi Dao +1 503 473 8680 +1 503 295 0676 hdao@oregonlawcenter.org
v.
No Logo Daniel Staton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Multnomah County Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan M. Dunaway +1 503 988 3138 +1 503 988 3377 susan.m.dunaway@multco.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katharine Von Ter Stegge +1 503 988 3138 +1 503 988 3377 katevts@multco.us
No Logo Does # 1-50, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Garrett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Markowitz, Herbold, Glade & Mehlhaf, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. Dunbar +1 503 295 3085 +1 503 323 9105 johndunbar@MHGM.com

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca M. Johansen +1 971 673 1880 +1 971 673 5000 rebecca.m.johansen@doj.state.or.us
No Logo Multnomah County, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Multnomah County Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan M. Dunaway +1 503 988 3138 +1 503 988 3377 susan.m.dunaway@multco.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katharine Von Ter Stegge +1 503 988 3138 +1 503 988 3377 katevts@multco.us
No Logo Oregon Department of Transportation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Markowitz, Herbold, Glade & Mehlhaf, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. Dunbar +1 503 295 3085 +1 503 323 9105 johndunbar@MHGM.com

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca M. Johansen +1 971 673 1880 +1 971 673 5000 rebecca.m.johansen@doj.state.or.us
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. See 2-page order attached. Signed on 8/10/2011 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
    LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
    Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by All Plaintiffs (Goracke, Monica) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      Scheduling Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Having been advised that this case has settled, Final Papers must be SUBMITTED by 8/9/2011. All other pending dates are hereby STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Settlement Conference held 6/7/11. Case settles. Spencer Neal; Hong Dao; Monica Goracke present as counsel for plaintiff(s). John Dunbar; Rebecca Johansen; Katharine Von Ter Stegge; Susan Dunaway present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: (None). (gm) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Telephone Conference held 5/27/11. Spencer Neal; Hong Dao present as counsel for plaintiff(s). John Dunbar; Rebecca Johansen; Katharine Von Ter Stegge; Susan Dunaway present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: (None). (gm) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Setting a Telephone Conference for 5/27/2011 at 10:30AM in Chambers. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. (gm) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Setting a Settlement Conference for 6/7/2011 at 9:30AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. Counsel for each side are to submit a confidential letter to Judge Papak not later than noon on 6/3/2011 which includes: 1) a brief outline (not argument) of the issues involved in the case; 2) your current position regarding settlement; 3) the last settlement offer made by each party; and 4) any settlement proposal you would agree to make to conclude the matter at this time. Counsel should bring their clients to the conference and should also bring or have available for immediate conference anyone who retains final settlement authority. (gm) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                Scheduling Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 . Pursuant to agreement of the parties, the currently-set briefing schedule for the motion 3 is STRICKEN and the motion is STAYED. The parties will engage in settlement negotiations/settlement conference. A Joint Status Report is DUE by 6/27/2011. (mr) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER: regarding Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 18 : Defendants' (Oregon Dept of Transportation and Matthew Garrett) Answer to complaint shall be DUE 10 days after this court's ruling on the motion for preliminary injunction. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 18 . Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due from all defendants by 5/23/2011. Reply in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due by 6/10/2011. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                      Declaration of Rebecca Johansen in Support of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Matthew Garrett, Oregon Department of Transportation. (Dunbar, John) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                        Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Matthew Garrett, Oregon Department of Transportation. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time 18 .) (Dunbar, John) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                          Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Matthew Garrett, Oregon Department of Transportation. (Dunbar, John) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                            Notice of Limited Appearance and Acceptance of Service Filed by Matthew Garrett, Oregon Department of Transportation (Dunbar, John) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                              Declaration of Monica Goracke of service of motion for preliminary injunction and related documents. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 .) (Goracke, Monica) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                Declaration of Rick Gove of service of motion for preliminary injunction and related documents. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 .) (Goracke, Monica) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER: Granting Defendants Multnomah County's and Daniel Staton's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 12 as follows: As to these defendants only, Response to motion for preliminary injunction is DUE by 5/9/2011. Answer to complaint shall be DUE 10 days after this court's ruling on the motion for preliminary injunction. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                    Declaration of Katharine von Ter Stegge in Support of Unopposed Motion to Extend Response Deadlines by Defendants Multnomah County and Daniel Staton. Filed by Multnomah County, Daniel Staton. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time 12 .) (Von Ter Stegge, Katharine) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                      Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Deadlines by Defendants Multnomah County and Daniel Staton. Filed by Multnomah County, Daniel Staton. (Von Ter Stegge, Katharine) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Association of Attorney Susan M. Dunaway,Katharine Von Ter Stegge for Multnomah County,Katharine Von Ter Stegge for Daniel Staton. Filed by Multnomah County, Daniel Staton (Dunaway, Susan) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                          Declaration of Monica Goracke in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 . Filed by Steven Fletcher, Jeff Nelson, Mitchal Poncel, Robert Dean Thomas, Joel Tucker, Chanda Waulters. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 .) (dmd) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                            Declaration of Steven Fletcher in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 . Filed by Steven Fletcher, Jeff Nelson, Mitchal Poncel, Robert Dean Thomas, Joel Tucker, Chanda Waulters. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 .) (dmd) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                              Declaration of Mitchal Poncel in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 . Filed by Steven Fletcher, Jeff Nelson, Mitchal Poncel, Robert Dean Thomas, Joel Tucker, Chanda Waulters. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 .) (dmd) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                Declaration of Joel Tucker in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 . Filed by Steven Fletcher, Jeff Nelson, Mitchal Poncel, Robert Dean Thomas, Joel Tucker, Chanda Waulters. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 .) (dmd) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Declaration of Jeff Nelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 . Filed by Steven Fletcher, Jeff Nelson, Mitchal Poncel, Robert Dean Thomas, Joel Tucker, Chanda Waulters. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 .) (dmd) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Declaration of Chanda Waulters in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 . Filed by Steven Fletcher, Jeff Nelson, Mitchal Poncel, Robert Dean Thomas, Joel Tucker, Chanda Waulters. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 .) (dmd) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 . Filed by Steven Fletcher, Jeff Nelson, Mitchal Poncel, Robert Dean Thomas, Joel Tucker, Chanda Waulters. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 .) (dmd) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Steven Fletcher, Mitchal Poncel, Robert Dean Thomas, Joel Tucker, Chanda Waulters. (dmd) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Discovery is to be completed by 8/15/2011. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/12/2011. Pretrial Order is due by 9/12/2011. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (dmd) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Complaint. Filing Fee in amount of $350 collected. Receipt No. 39926. Summons issued as to Oregon Department of Transportation, Matthew Garrett, Multnomah County and Daniel Staton. Filed by Mitchal Poncel, Jeff Nelson, Chanda Waulters, Joel Tucker, Steven Fletcher against Does # 1-50, Matthew Garrett, Multnomah County, Oregon Department of Transportation, Daniel Staton, Robert Dean Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Attachment summons issued to all defendants) (dmd) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 94 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?