Bill Jamal v. Maria Gonzalez
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-07966

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 5, 2018 at 10:24 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Receipt
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Remand Case to State Court
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to the Superior Court of California listed above, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (Attachments: # 1 Remand letter) (bp)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 1 time.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?