Acorda Therapeutics Inc. et al v. Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00077
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 24, 2017 at 12:13 AM EDT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
No Logo Alkermes Pharma Ireland Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
No Logo Actavis Laboratories Fl, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
v.
No Logo Actavis Laboratories Fl, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com
No Logo Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
No Logo Alkermes Pharma Ireland Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryellen Noreika +1 302 658 9200 mnoreika@mnat.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,540,938. (ntl) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
    Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Maryellen Noreika regarding denial of inter partes review. (Attachments: # 1 PTAB Decisions)(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
      PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. These case are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes and all papers shall be filed in Civil Action No. 14-882-LPS. Discovery due by 12/18/2015. Status Report due by 8/3/2015. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 11/9/2015. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 1/15/2016. A Markman Hearing is set for 3/7/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/1/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/22/2016. A 5-day Bench Trial is set for 9/19/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/21/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00882-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on April 1, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
            PROPOSED ORDER -- Scheduling Order -- re (25 in 1:14-cv-00932-LPS, 23 in 1:14-cv-00917-LPS, 22 in 1:14-cv-00922-LPS, 23 in 1:14-cv-00909-LPS, 53 in 1:14-cv-00935-LPS, 15 in 1:15-cv-00077-LPS, 22 in 1:14-cv-00941-LPS, 27 in 1:14-cv-00882-LPS, 23 in 1:14-cv-00955-LPS) Oral Order,,, by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Actavis Laboratories Fl, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Actavis Laboratories FL Inc..(Bilson, David) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letter of April 8 (C.A. No. 14-882 D.I. 26), and having had a trial slot in September 2016 open up (subsequent to the scheduling call held on April 1), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) a five-day bench trial will begin on September 19, 2016; (2) the pretrial conference will be held on September 1, 2016 at 2:00 p.m.; (3) the proposed final pretrial order shall be submitted by August 22, 2016; (4) the Markman hearing will be held on March 7, 2016 beginning at 9:00 a.m.; (5) no motions for summary judgment will be permitted without leave of the Court; and (6) the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order consistent with the terms of this order no later than April 20, 2015. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/13/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00882-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
                  Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding the parties' respective positions regarding the scheduling of Markman hearing and trial - re Scheduling Conference. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aaron Stiefel, Daniel D. DiNapoli, Benjamin Hsing, Soumitra Deka, Jeffrey Martin, and Sylvia M. Becker - filed by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Rule 16 scheduling teleconference has been scheduled for April 1, 2015 at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4573. No further submissions are needed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/17/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00882-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Bilson on behalf of Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. (Bilson, David) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                          ANSWER to 7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited.(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                            PROPOSED ORDER /Proposed Scheduling Order by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Actavis plc for Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc..(Phillips, John) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                  STIPULATION by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                    DECLARATION of Mailing (as to service on Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.) by Acorda Therapeutics Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Noreika, Maryellen) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,540,938. (rwc) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                        Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 1/13/15. Date of Expiration of Patent: 7/30/18.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 7/22/2017. (rwc) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                            COMPLAINT - filed against Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1661489.) - filed by Acorda Therapeutics Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 253 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?