Unknown
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:15-mj-01104
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 6:42 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Kenneth Drumm, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Demeo, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2016 Tracy A. Miner +1 617 263 2600 +1 617 263 2300 tminer@demeollp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2016 Daniel J. Fetterman +1 212 506 1934 +1 212 506 1800 dfetterman@kasowitz.com
TERMINATED: 03/21/2016 Edward E. Mc Nally +1 212 506 1700
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    Transcript of Consent to Extradition Hearing as to David Kenneth Drumm held on February 11, 2016, before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: James Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 3/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None
      CERTIFICATION OF EXTRADITABILITY AND ORDER OF COMMITMENT as to David Kenneth Drumm (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None
        AFFIDAVIT OF Consent to Extradition by David Kenneth Drumm (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Consent to Extradition Hearing as to David Kenneth Drumm held on 2/11/2016. Defendant and counsel appear to consent to the defendant's extradition to Ireland. The court engages in a colloquy with the def't and finds that the def't understands his rights, waives his right to an extradition hearing, and intends to hasten the execution of the certificate of extraditability. Def't signs the affidavit of consent to extradition in open court. Defense counsel requests that the record be kept open until the def't is actually transferred to Irish Authorities and the court will do so. Def't remanded to the custody of the USM. (Attorneys present: Walters (for Burkart); Forni, Fetterman. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: James Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
            NOTICE as to David Kenneth Drumm re 49 Notice of Hearing. The 2/11/16 @ 3:00 PM hearing will take place in Courtroom 17, 5th Floor. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
              ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to David Kenneth Drumm: Hearing set for 2/11/2016 @ 03:00 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
                ELECTRONIC NOTICE CANCELING HEARING OR OTHER DEADLINE as to David Kenneth Drumm: due to the inclement weather forecast for 2/8/16 the 2:00 pm hearing is cancelled. A new date will be announced by the court. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Set/Reset Hearings as to David Kenneth Drumm: Hearing set for 2/8/2016 @ 02:00 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 45 Motion for Hearing as to David Kenneth Drumm (1). Hearing set 2.8.16 @ 2:00 PM. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Hearing /Motion to Request Conference as to David Kenneth Drumm. (McNally, Edward) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Eric A. Forni appearing for USA. (Forni, Eric) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELEASE ON BAIL PENDING EXTRADITION PROCEEDINGS (#21) denying 21 Motion for Release from Custody as to David Kenneth Drumm (1) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT of Brian S. Choi, Esq. by David Kenneth Drumm (Miner, Tracy) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to David Kenneth Drumm: Extradition Hearing set for 3/1/2016 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Transcript of Detention Hearing/Status Conference as to David Kenneth Drumm held on November 13, 2015, before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 12/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Detention and Status Hearing as to David Kenneth Drumm held on 11/13/2015. The court remarks that in just the last few days over 125 pages have been filed with the court concerning the motion for release so the court will need time to fully review. In addition, the court asks the parties to confer concerning a date for an extradition hearing in February and notify the clerk by 11/20/15 so that a firm hearing date can be set. The parties proceed as to detention by argument and the court will take the issue of detention under advisement. Def't remanded to the custody of the USM. (Attorneys present: Burkart, McNally, Fetterman. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to David Kenneth Drumm re 21 MOTION for Release from Custody on Bail Pending Extradition Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Court Decision)(Burkart, Amy) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                                        AFFIDAVIT of Brian S. Choi by David Kenneth Drumm 22 Memorandum in Support, filed by David Kenneth Drumm (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. E To Supplemental Declaration of Brian S. Choi in Support of Motion for Bail)(Miner, Tracy) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by David Kenneth Drumm re 21 MOTION for Release from Custody on Bail Pending Extradition Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Staines Affidavit, # 2 O'Malley Affidavit, # 3 Choi Declaration, # 4 Choi Decl. Ex. A, Part 1 (Redacted), # 5 Choi Decl. Ex. A, Part 2 (Redacted), # 6 Choi Decl. Ex. A, Part 3 (Redacted), # 7 Choi Decl. Ex. B (Redacted), # 8 Choi Decl. Ex. C (Redacted), # 9 Choi Decl. Ex. D)(Miner, Tracy) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Release from Custody on Bail Pending Extradition Proceedings as to David Kenneth Drumm. (Miner, Tracy) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of change in hearing location as to David Kenneth Drumm: The 11/13/15 detention hearing will take place in courtroom 22, 7th floor. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to David Kenneth Drumm: The Status Conference previously set for 11/10/15 @ 2:30 PM is reset for 11/13/15 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 17 Agreed Motion to Continue Detention Hearing as to David Kenneth Drumm (1). Detention hearing reset for 11/13/15 @ 10:00 AM. Counsel should be prepared to go forward on 11/13. Further extensions will only be allowed for good cause shown. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                    Assented to MOTION for Detention Hearing to be Continued as to David Kenneth Drumm. (Miner, Tracy) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Edward E. McNally. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. as to David Kenneth Drumm (1) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Daniel J. Fetterman, Esq. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. as to David Kenneth Drumm (1) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edward E. McNally Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0101-5804571. as to David Kenneth Drumm. (Miner, Tracy) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel J. Fetterman Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0101-5804538. as to David Kenneth Drumm. (Miner, Tracy) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                              Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/13/15 as to David Kenneth Drumm. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 10 Assented to Motion to Continue as to David Kenneth Drumm (1). Detention Hearing re-set for 10/26/2015 @ 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing to October 26, 2015 as to David Kenneth Drumm. (Miner, Tracy) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tracy A. Miner appearing for David Kenneth Drumm. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Miner, Tracy) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE as to David Kenneth Drumm: The 10/16/15 Detention Hearing set for 10:00 AM will take place in Courtroom 19, 7th Floor before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: 10/13/2015 Notice of Hearing for Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING for Initial Appearance as to David Kenneth Drumm. Initial Appearance set for 10/13/2015 @ 02:30 PM in Courtroom 22 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell:Initial Appearance as to David Kenneth Drumm held on 10/13/2015. The Court informs the def't of the reason for his arrest and notes the nature of extradition proceedings. Att. Miner indicates the time period she expects for an extradition hearing may be about 3-4 months. The court sets a status conference for 11/10/15 @ 2:30 PM. At that time, discovery should have been provided, the parties should inform the court about the scheduling of the extradition hearing and what defenses the def't may be intending to use. Gov't moves for detention and the court notes that there is a presumption of detention in extradition proceedings. The court sets a detention hearing for Friday, October 16, 2015 @ 10:00 AM. The gov't notes that the consulate of Ireland was notified of Mr. Drumm's arrest and there was an error in paragraph 4 of the complaint (referring to 2013 should have been 2014). Def't remanded to the custody of the USM. (Attorneys present: Burkart, Miner. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Carol Scott at carollynnscott@cs.com. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to David Kenneth Drumm; Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015 Arrest Warrant Issued Court Filing
                                                                              Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell as to David Kenneth Drumm. (Catino3, Theresa)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015 Complaint(Sealed)
                                                                                SEALED COMPLAINT as to David Kenneth Drumm (1). (Attachments: # (1) JS45)(Catino3, Theresa)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [1] Motion to Seal as to David Kenneth Drumm (1)...MOTION ALLOWED... (Catino3, Theresa)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015 Motion to Seal
                                                                                  MOTION to Seal as to David Kenneth Drumm by USA. (Catino3, Theresa)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 140 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?