Turn Key Wine Brands Llc v. Fireside Cider Co. Llc

Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91221349-OPP
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Turn Key Wine Brands, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Schley Look Guthrie & Locker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brett Locker +1 805 969 4929 +1 805 456 2992 blocker@slgl-law.com
v.
No Logo Fireside Cider Co. Llc, Defendant

Represented by Jacobs & Burleigh LLP

Attributes
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney WENDY COHEN
Date in Location 4/3/2015
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
Timeline
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None T
Bd Decision: Dismissed W/o Prej
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None T
Notice Of Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/12/2015, Entered: None T
Response Due 30 Days (due Date)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None S
Suspended
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None W
Stip To Susp Pend Settl Negotiations
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None T
Pending, Instituted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None T
Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None N
Filed And Fee
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?