Think Computer Corporation v. Plainlegal, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91221497-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Think Computer Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron J. Greenspan +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959 aarong@thinkcomputer.com
v.
No Logo Plainlegal, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Plainlegal, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nehal Madhani +1 646 863 5568
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ELIZABETH WINTER
Date in Location 4/14/2015
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None T
Bd Decision: Dismissed W/o Prej
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None T
    W/draw Of Application
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None N
      W/draw Of Opposition
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None T
        P Mot To Amend Pleading/amended Pleading
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None T
          D Mot To Dismiss: Frcp 12(b)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None T
            D Appearance / Power Of Attorney
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None T
              Pending, Instituted
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None T
                Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None N
                  Filed And Fee
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 376 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?