Rainsoft v. Macfarland
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00432

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2019 at 10:35 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (129) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None USCA Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None USCA Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Certificate and Appellate Cover Sheet Re: Appeal Record
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Certificate and Appellate Cover Sheet Re: Appeal Record
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of appeal
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 judgment
                            JUDGMENT in favor of Brian MacFarland against Rainsoft. So Ordered by Deputy Clerk: Ryan H. Jackson on 10/1/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/30/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                              OPINION AND ORDER granting 85 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part 118 Motion for Sanctions. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/30/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing, held on January 31, 2018, before Chief Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter Denise Veitch, Telephone number 401-323-9337. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 3/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2018. (Veitch, Denise)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 Reply to Response
                                  REPLY to Response re 123 Response to Motion for Sanctions filed by Rainsoft. (Freel, Mark)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Response to motion
                                    RESPONSE In Opposition to 118 MOTION for Sanctions (Redacted), 117 MOTION to Seal Filed. filed by Brian MacFarland. Replies due by 2/9/2018. (Dunn, Mary)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Transcript Order Acknowledgment
                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: 121 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Veitch. Transcript due by 3/5/2018. (Dias, Jennifer)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01-31-2018 before Judge Smith. Ordinary Transcript delivery selected. Transcript to be delivered in 30 days.. (Dunn, Mary)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Reply to Response
                                          REPLY to Response re 114 Reply to Response filed by Rainsoft. (Freel, Mark)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Motion for sanctions
                                            MOTION for Sanctions (Redacted) filed by Rainsoft. Responses due by 2/2/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - July 17 email, # 2 Exhibit B - November 29 email, # 3 Exhibit C - Group Exhibit C - Email Production (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit D - Defendant's Supp. Answers to Plaintiff's 1st Set of Interrogatories, # 5 Exhibit E - December 18 email, # 6 Exhibit F - August 2017 email)(Freel, Mark)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Motion to seal
                                              MOTION to Seal Filed. Notice Sent To: Rainsoft, Brian MacFarland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - RainSoft's Motion for Sanctions, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Group Exhibit C - email production)(Freel, Mark) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Reply to Response
                                                REPLY to Response re 97 Response to Motion, Redacted With Supporting Memo filed by Brian MacFarland. (Dunn, Mary)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Statement of Disputed Facts
                                                  STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS by Brian MacFarland re 95 Statement of Undisputed Facts,,,,,,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex AA, # 2 Exhibit Ex BB, # 3 Exhibit Ex CC, # 4 Exhibit Ex DD, # 5 Exhibit Ex EE Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit Ex Z Filed Under Seal)(Dunn, Mary)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Motion to seal
                                                    MOTION to Seal Defendant's Statement of Disputed Facts and Reply Memorandum of Law Filed. Notice Sent To: Brian MacFarland, Rainsoft. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Statement of Disputed Facts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit Ex AA (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit Ex BB (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit Ex CC (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit Ex DD (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit Ex EE (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit Ex Z (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit Reply Memorandum of Law (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit Statement of Disputed Facts (Redacted), # 10 Exhibit Ex AA (Redacted), # 11 Exhibit Ex BB (Redacted), # 12 Exhibit Ex CC (Redacted), # 13 Exhibit Ex DD (Redacted), # 14 Exhibit Ex EE (Redacted), # 15 Exhibit Ex Z (Redacted), # 16 Exhibit Reply Memorandum of Law (Redacted))(Dunn, Mary) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Response to motion
                                                      RESPONSE In Opposition to 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rainsoft. Replies due by 1/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Memo of Law in Response to Defs MSJ and in Support of Cross-Motion for Partial SJ)(Freel, Mark)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Motion to seal
                                                        MOTION to Seal RainSoft Memorandum of Law Filed. Notice Sent To: Rainsoft, Brian MacFarland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exibit 1-Memo of Law in Response to Defs MSJ and in Support of Cross-Motion for Partial SJ)(Freel, Mark) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                          STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by Rainsoft. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab A-MacFarland Dep Exhibit 3-LazyMan Article, RS1618 to 21, # 2 Exhibit Tab B-MacFarland Dep Exhibit 7, LazyMan Article, RS1663 to 1664, # 3 Exhibit Tab C-MacFarland Dep Exhibit 10, LazyMan Article, RS1667 to 1670, # 4 Exhibit Tab D-Get Clean Purified Water Best, # 5 Exhibit Tab E-MacFarland Dep Exhibit 13, LazyMan Article, RS1622 to 1626, # 6 Exhibit Tab F-MacFarland Dep Exhibit 20, LazyMan Article, RS1760 to 1764, # 7 Exhibit Tab G-MacFarland Dep Exhibit 14, LazyMan Article, RS1627 to 1632, # 8 Exhibit Tab H, MacFarland Dep Exhibit 15, LazyMan Article, RS1633 to 1639, # 9 Exhibit Tab I, MacFarland Dep Exhibit 17, LazyMan Article, RS1640 to 1645, # 10 Exhibit Tab J, MacFarland Dep Exhibit 18, LazyMan Article RS1646 to 1662, # 11 Exhibit Tab K, LazyMan Article, # 12 Exhibit Tab L, LazyMan Article, # 13 Exhibit Tab M, MacFarland Dep Exhibit 24, LazyMan Article, # 14 Exhibit Tab N, LazyMan Article With All Comments, # 15 Exhibit Tab O, MacFarland Comments, # 16 Exhibit Tab P (Redacted) MacFarland Depo Excerpts, # 17 Exhibit Tab Q, MacFarland Dep Exhibit 41, MacFarland Affidavit, # 18 Exhibit Tab R (Filed Conditionally Under Seal), # 19 Exhibit Tab S (Filed Conditionally Under Seal), # 20 Exhibit Tab T, Basement Technologies Website, # 21 Exhibit Tab U (Filed Conditionally Under Seal), # 22 Exhibit Tab V, September 12 Email, # 23 Exhibit Tab W (Filed Conditionally Under Seal), # 24 Exhibit Tab X, EPA Facts, # 25 Exhibit Tab Y, NSF Article, # 26 Exhibit Tab Z, MacFarland Dep Exhibit 31, RainSoft System Owner's Manual, # 27 Exhibit Tab AA, MacFarland Dep Exhibit 32, RainSoft Performance Data Sheet, # 28 Exhibit Tab BB, MacFarland Dep Exhibit 36, RainSoft Ultrefiner System Doc, # 29 Exhibit Tab CC, MacFarland Dep Exhibit 37, Whirlpool Water Softener Doc, # 30 Exhibit Tab DD, MacFarland Dep Exhibit 29, Whirlpool Whole House Doc, # 31 Exhibit Tab EE (Filed Conditionally Under Seal), # 32 Exhibit Tab FF, MacFarland Dep Exhibit 22, MacFarland Go Fund Me Page, # 33 Exhibit Tab GG (Filed Conditionally Under Seal), # 34 Exhibit Tab HH (Filed Conditionally Under Seal), # 35 Exhibit Tab II, Verson Declaration, # 36 Exhibit Tab JJ, MacFarland Dep Exhibit 23, Google Search, # 37 Exhibit Tab KK (Unredacted), Palframan Affidavit, # 38 Exhibit Tab LL (Filed Conditionally Under Seal))(Freel, Mark)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Motion to seal
                                                            MOTION to Seal RainSoft's Statement of Undisputed Facts Filed. Notice Sent To: Rainsoft, Brian MacFarland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Statement of Undisputed Facts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Tab P-MacFarland Dep Excerpts (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Tab R-LazyMan Emails (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4-Tab S-Palframan Depo Excerpts (Filed Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5-Tab U-MacFarland Depo Exhibit 9 (Filed Under Seal), # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6-Tab W-Commenter Info (Filed Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7-Tab EE-Supplemental Interrogatory Resp. 12-13 (Filed Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit 8-Tab GG-Website Traffic (Filed Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit 9-Tab HH-Lost Sales (Filed Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10-Tab KK-Palframan Affidavit (Unredacted), # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11-Tab LL-RainSoft Surveys (Filed Under Seal))(Freel, Mark) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Statement of Disputed Facts
                                                              STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS by Rainsoft. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Filed Conditionally Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit B-MacFarland Dep Exhibit 17, # 3 Exhibit C-How To Get Clean Purified Water, # 4 Exhibit D-RainSoft Response to LazyMan First Set RFP, # 5 Exhibit E-Filed Conditionally Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit F-Filed Conditionally Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit G-MacFarland Depo Excerpts, # 8 Exhibit H-LazyMan Article)(Freel, Mark)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Motion to seal
                                                                MOTION to Seal Statement of Disputed Facts Filed. Notice Sent To: Rainsoft, Brian MacFarland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Statement of Disputed Facts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A-LazyMan Supp Resp to Inter 12,13-Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit E-LazyMan Email Communication-Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit F-Palframan Depo Excerpts-Filed Under Seal)(Freel, Mark) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: 12/19/2017 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                  Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order on Motion to Stay,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed by Brian MacFarland. Responses due by 1/2/2018. (Dunn, Mary)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 motion to amend/correct
                                                                    Assented MOTION to Amend/Correct Correct/Refile re ECF Nos 92-100 filed by Rainsoft. Responses due by 1/2/2018. (Freel, Mark)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Response to motion
                                                                      RESPONSE In Opposition to 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Rainsoft. Replies due by 12/18/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Response to Defendant's MSJ and in Support of Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Freel, Mark)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                        MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law Filed. Notice Sent To: Rainsoft, Brian MacFarland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Memo of Law in Response to Defs MSJ and in Support of Cross Mot Partial SJ (UNREDACTED))(Freel, Mark) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                          STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (REDACTED) by Rainsoft. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab A-Ex 3, Lazy Man Article, RS1618 to 21, # 2 Exhibit Tab B-Ex 7, Lazy Man Article RS 1663 to 1664, # 3 Exhibit Tab C-Ex 10, Lazy Man Article, RS1667-1670, # 4 Exhibit Tab D-get clean purified water best, # 5 Exhibit Tab E-Ex 13, Lazy Man Article, RS1622-1626, # 6 Exhibit Tab F-Ex 20, Lazy Man Article, RS1760-1764, # 7 Exhibit Tab G-Ex 14, Lazy Man Article, RS 1627-1632, # 8 Exhibit Tab H-Ex 15, Lazy Man Article, RS1633-1639, # 9 Exhibit Tab I-Lazy Man Article RS 1640-1645, # 10 Exhibit Tab J-Ex 18, Lazy Man Article RS 1646-1662, # 11 Exhibit Tab K-RS 09.2, # 12 Exhibit Tab L-11.22 Article, # 13 Exhibit Tab M-Ex 24, Lazy Man Article, # 14 Exhibit Tab N-Article Full with Comments, # 15 Exhibit Tab O-MacFarland Comments, # 16 Exhibit Tab P-REDACTED MacFarland Mini (Unredacted Conditionally Filed Under Seal), # 17 Exhibit Tab Q-Ex 41, Aff of MacFarland, # 18 Exhibit Tab R - Filed Conditionally Under Seal, # 19 Exhibit Tab S - Filed Conditionally Under Seal, # 20 Exhibit Tab T-BT Website, # 21 Exhibit Tab U - Filed Conditionally Under Seal, # 22 Exhibit Tab V-September 12 Email, # 23 Exhibit Tab W - Filed Conditionally Under Seal, # 24 Exhibit Tab X-EPA 2005, # 25 Exhibit Tab Y-NSF Article, # 26 Exhibit Tab Z-Ex 31, Rainsoft System Owner's Manual, # 27 Exhibit Tab AA-Ex 32, Rainsoft Performance Data Sheet Doc, # 28 Exhibit Tab BB-Ex 36, Rainsoft Ultrefiner System Doc, # 29 Exhibit Tab CC-Ex 37, Whirlpool Water Softener Doc, # 30 Exhibit Tab DD-Ex 29, Whirlpool Whole House Doc, # 31 Exhibit Tab EE - Filed Conditionally Under Seal, # 32 Exhibit Tab FF-Ex 22, GoFundMe, # 33 Exhibit Tab GG - Filed Conditionally Under Seal, # 34 Exhibit Tab HH - Filed Conditionally Under Seal, # 35 Exhibit Tab II-Verson Declaration, # 36 Exhibit Tab JJ-Ex 23 Google Search, # 37 Exhibit Tab KK-REDACTED andy p aff (Unredacted filed conditionally under seal), # 38 Exhibit Tab LL - Filed Conditionally Under Seal)(Freel, Mark)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                            MOTION to Seal Statement of Undisputed Facts and Exs P, R, S, U, W, EE, GG, HH, KK and LL Filed. Notice Sent To: Rainsoft, Brian MacFarland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Statement of Undisputed Facts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Ex P MacFarland Depo Excerpts (Unredacted-File Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 3 - Ex R Lazyman Emails (File Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit 4 - Ex S Palframan Depo Excerpts (File Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit 5 - Ex U MacFarland Dep Ex 9 (File Under Seal), # 6 Exhibit 6 - Ex W Commentor Info (File Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit 7 - Ex EE Suppl Int Resp 12 13 (File Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit 8 - Ex GG Website Traffic (File Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit 9 - Ex HH Lost Sales (File Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit 10 - Ex KK Parlframan Affidavit (Unredacted - File Under Seal), # 11 Exhibit 11 - Ex LL Rainsoft Surveys (File Under Seal))(Freel, Mark) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Statement of Disputed Facts
                                                                              STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS (REDACTED) by Rainsoft. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Filed Conditionally Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit B - MacFarland Dep Ex 17, # 3 Exhibit C - get-clean-purified water best, # 4 Exhibit D - Rainsoft Resp to LazyMan 1st Set RFP, # 5 Exhibit E - Filed Conditionally Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit F - Filed Conditionally Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit G - MacFarland Excerpts, # 8 Exhibit H - Ex 20-LazyMan Article)(Freel, Mark)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                MOTION to Seal Filed. Notice Sent To: Rainsoft, Brian MacFarland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Statement of Disputed Facts (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit A - LazyMan Suppl Resp to Inter 12,13-Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit E - LazyMan E-mail Communication - Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit F - Palframan Depo Excerpts - Filed Under Seal)(Freel, Mark) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                  RESPONSE In Support to 90 Emergency MOTION to Stay (Temporary Stay of Summary Judgment Briefing) filed by Brian MacFarland. Replies due by 12/7/2017. (Dunn, Mary)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 Motion To Stay
                                                                                    Emergency MOTION to Stay (Temporary Stay of Summary Judgment Briefing) filed by Rainsoft. Responses due by 12/14/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 11/29/17 E-mail, # 2 Exhibit B - 7/17/17 E-mail)(Freel, Mark)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                      Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to Extend Summary Judgment Deadline to November 30, 2017 filed by Rainsoft. Responses due by 12/4/2017. (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Statement of Undisputed Facts
                                                                                        STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by Brian MacFarland re 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-W Filed Conditionally Under Seal)(Dunn, Mary)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment With Supporting Memo filed by Brian MacFarland. Responses due by 11/13/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum Filed Conditionally Under Seal)(Dunn, Mary)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Motion to seal
                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Summary Judgment Filing Filed. Notice Sent To: Brian MacFarland, Rainsoft. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 2 Exhibit Ex A, # 3 Exhibit Ex B, # 4 Exhibit Ex C, # 5 Exhibit Ex D, # 6 Exhibit Ex E, # 7 Exhibit Ex F, # 8 Exhibit Ex G, # 9 Exhibit Ex H, # 10 Exhibit Ex I, # 11 Exhibit Ex J, # 12 Exhibit Ex K, # 13 Exhibit Ex L, # 14 Exhibit Ex M, # 15 Exhibit Ex N, # 16 Exhibit Ex O, # 17 Exhibit Ex P, # 18 Exhibit Ex Q, # 19 Exhibit Ex R, # 20 Exhibit Ex S, # 21 Exhibit Ex T, # 22 Exhibit Ex U, # 23 Exhibit Ex V, # 24 Exhibit Ex W, # 25 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, # 26 Exhibit Redacted Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 27 Exhibit Redacted Ex A, # 28 Exhibit Redacted Ex B, # 29 Exhibit Redacted Ex C, # 30 Exhibit Redacted Ex D, # 31 Exhibit Redacted Ex E, # 32 Exhibit Redacted Ex F, # 33 Exhibit Redacted Ex G, # 34 Exhibit Redacted Ex H, # 35 Exhibit Redacted Ex I, # 36 Exhibit Redacted Ex J, # 37 Exhibit Redacted Ex K, # 38 Exhibit Redacted Ex L, # 39 Exhibit Redacted Ex M, # 40 Exhibit Redacted Ex N, # 41 Exhibit Redacted Ex O, # 42 Exhibit Redacted Ex P, # 43 Exhibit Redacted Ex Q, # 44 Exhibit Redacted Ex R, # 45 Exhibit Redacted Ex S, # 46 Exhibit Redacted Ex T, # 47 Exhibit Redacted Ex U, # 48 Exhibit Redacted Ex V, # 49 Exhibit Redacted Ex W, # 50 Exhibit Redacted Memorandum of Law)(Dunn, Mary) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                              Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion filed by Brian MacFarland. Responses due by 10/30/2017. (Dunn, Mary)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Brian MacFarland. Responses due by 7/14/2017. (Dunn, Mary)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to extend pretrial order deadlines filed by Rainsoft. Responses due by 5/5/2017. (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    MODIFIED CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/13/2017. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part 70 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/13/2017. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/13/2017 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part 66 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/13/2017. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                          NOTICE by Rainsoft Agreed to-Modified Consent Protective Order (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                            NOTICE by Rainsoft re 70 First MOTION to Compel More Responsive Answers to Interrgatories and Responses to Requests for Production of Documents Agreed to-Proposed Order (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/30/2017 before Judge Patricia Sullivan.. (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on March 30, 2017 before Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maryann V. Young, Telephone number 508-384-2003. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 4/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2017. (Young, Maryann)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03-30-2017 before Judge Sullivan.. (Dunn, Mary)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 70 First MOTION to Compel More Responsive Answers to Interrgatories and Responses to Requests for Production of Documents filed by Rainsoft. Replies due by 4/4/2017. (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re 70 First MOTION to Compel More Responsive Answers to Interrgatories and Responses to Requests for Production of Documents filed by Rainsoft. (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                        First MOTION to Compel More Responsive Answers to Interrgatories and Responses to Requests for Production of Documents WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Brian MacFarland. Responses due by 3/27/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Dunn, Mary)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Support re 66 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatory Nos 9 and 10 (Renewed Motion to Compel) filed by Rainsoft. (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 66 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatory Nos 9 and 10 (Renewed Motion to Compel) and Motion for Protective Order WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Brian MacFarland. Replies due by 3/7/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Dunn, Mary)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/20/2017, Entered: 2/20/2017 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to Extend Pretrial Order Deadlines filed by Rainsoft. Responses due by 3/6/2017. (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatory Nos 9 and 10 (Renewed Motion to Compel) filed by Rainsoft. Responses due by 2/28/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Defendant's Response to First Set of Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit B-Hearing Transcript, # 3 Exhibit C-9/12/16 Order, # 4 Exhibit D-Rainsoft request, # 5 Exhibit E-Part 1 of 2 11/30/16 E-mail with attachments, # 6 Exhibit E-Part 2 of 2 11/30/16 E-mail with attachments, # 7 Exhibit F-12/23/16 E-mail, # 8 Exhibit G-1/4/17 E-mail, # 9 Exhibit H-1/27/17 E-mail, # 10 Exhibit I-1/27/17 E-mail, # 11 Exhibit J-1/31/17 E-mail, # 12 Exhibit K-images)(Freel, Mark) (Attachment 5 replaced on 3/7/2017) (McGuire, Vickie). (Attachment 6 replaced on 3/7/2017) (McGuire, Vickie).
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: 11/3/2016 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/2/2016 before Judge Patricia Sullivan.. (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Extend Pretrial Order Deadlines) filed by Rainsoft. Responses due by 11/14/2016 (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing, held on September 2, 2016, before Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Court Reporter Denise P. Veitch, Telephone number 401-323-9337. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 10/20/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2016. (Veitch, Denise) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part 54 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 9/12/2016. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09-02-2016 before Judge Sullivan.. (Dunn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Support re 54 MOTION to Compel More Responsive Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by Rainsoft. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Lazy Man Articles)(Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                              Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time up to and including August 26, 2016 to file its reply in connection with its motion to compel more responsive answers to Defendant's Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (ECF No. 54) filed by Rainsoft. Responses due by 9/6/2016 (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 54 MOTION to Compel More Responsive Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents with supporting memo filed by Brian MacFarland. Replies due by 8/22/2016. (Dunn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                  Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 54 MOTION to Compel More Responsive Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by Brian MacFarland. Responses due by 8/22/2016 (Dunn, Mary) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Jonathan Lawrence Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-994263 ) filed by Rainsoft. (Freel, Mark) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                      Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Brian MacFarland. Responses due by 8/11/2016 (Dunn, Mary) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel More Responsive Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by Rainsoft. Responses due by 8/8/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's First Set of Request for Production, # 3 Exhibit C-Defendant's Answers to First Set of Interrogatories, # 4 Exhibit D-Defendant's Response to First Set of Request for Production, # 5 Exhibit E-Defendant's Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, # 6 Exhibit F-Defendant's Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Request for Production, # 7 Exhibit G-Plaintiff's Rule 37 Letter dated 7/8/16, # 8 Exhibit H-MacFarland Response to Request 17)(Freel, Mark) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 3/18/2016. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: 3/11/2016 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Rainsoft Consent Protective Order (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Pretrial Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual discovery due by 7/28/2016. Plaintiff's expert witness disclosures due by 8/29/2016; Defendant's expert witness disclosures due by 9/28/2016; expert discovery closes 10/28/2016. Dispositive motions due by 11/10/2016. Pretrial Memoranda due 30 days after a decision on any dispositive motion or, if no dispositive motions are filed, by 11/10/2016. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/28/2016. (Marseglia, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Rule 16 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                RULE 16 STATEMENT by Rainsoft. (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Rule 16 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK’S NOTE: Docket entry was docketed in the wrong case. Please disregard. RULE 16 STATEMENT by Rainsoft. (Freel, Mark) Modified on 1/21/2016 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: 1/11/2016 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference scheduled for 1/28/2016 at 9:30 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: 12/14/2015 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 44 Amended Complaint by Brian MacFarland.(Dunn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: 11/17/2015 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Enlarging Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by Brian MacFarland. (Dunn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: 11/16/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Alves on behalf of Brian MacFarland (Alves, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Brian MacFarland, filed by Rainsoft.(Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for David M. Friebus to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-912468 ) filed by Rainsoft. (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for John M. Touhy to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-912440 ) filed by Rainsoft. (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Krystle Guillory Tadesse on behalf of Rainsoft (Tadesse, Krystle)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Freel on behalf of Rainsoft (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Mary C. Dunn on behalf of Brian MacFarland (Dunn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Brian MacFarland Notice of Entry of Appearance and Notice of Simultaneous Withdrawal of Appearance (Cavanagh, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/15/2015 case transferred in - district transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                          Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:15-cv-03627. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Case Transferred Out to Another District
                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island (mmy, ) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Order on motion to transfer case
                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Agreed Motion to transfer case 33 is granted. By agreement of the parties, this case is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406 forthwith. No appearance is required on 10/15/2015 or 10/21/2015. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (jdh) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of hearing on motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by David Michael Friebus for presentment of motion to transfer case 33 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/15/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Friebus, David) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Motion to transfer case
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Plaintiff Rainsoft to transfer case (Agreed Motion) (Friebus, David) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion for extension of time to 10/9/2015 to file amended complaint 30 so that the parties can pursue settlement discussions is granted; Status hearing to report on settlement set for 10/21/2015 at 09:30 AM. No appearance is required on 9/15/2015 or 12/22/2015. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of hearing on motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by David Michael Friebus for presentment of extension of time 30 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/15/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Friebus, David) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiff Rainsoft for extension of time to File Amended Complaint (Agreed) (Friebus, David) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff's Agreed Motion for extension of time until 9/9/2015 to file amended complaint 27 is granted. Defendant's motion to dismiss with supporting memoranda due by 10/9/2015. Plaintiff to respond by 11/9/2015. Defendant to reply by 11/23/2015. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/22/2015 at 9:30 AM. No appearance is required on 8/11/2015 or 11/20/2015. Mailed notice (jdh) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of hearing on motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by David Michael Friebus for presentment of extension of time 27 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/11/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Friebus, David) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Plaintiff Rainsoft for extension of time TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT (Friebus, David) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff's Agreed Motion for extension of time until 8/10/2015 to file amended complaint 24 is granted. Defendant's motion to dismiss with supporting memoranda due by 9/14/2015. Plaintiff to respond by 10/14/2015. Replies due by 10/23/2015. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/20/2015 at 9:30 AM. No appearance is required on 7/10/2015. Mailed notice (jdh) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of hearing on motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by David Michael Friebus for presentment of extension of time 24 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/10/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Friebus, David) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Plaintiff Rainsoft for extension of time TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT (AGREED) (Friebus, David) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 7/10/2015 to file amended complaint 21 is granted. Defendant's motion to dismiss with supporting memoranda due by 8/14/2015. Plaintiff to respond by 9/14/2015. Replies due by 9/24/2015. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/22/2015 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (jdh) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of hearing on motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by David Michael Friebus for presentment of extension of time 21 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 6/18/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Friebus, David) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Plaintiff Rainsoft for extension of time to File Amended Complaint (Friebus, David) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rainsoft by John Michael Touhy (Touhy, John) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to substitute counsel is granted. Joseph S. Fischbach and Eileen Lysaught are withdrawn as counsel and John M. Touhy of Baker and Hostetler LLP is given leave to file his appearance. Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 6/3/2015. (rm, ) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff Rainsoft to withdraw as attorney (Fischbach, Joseph) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Notice of hearing on motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Joseph S Fischbach for presentment of before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 6/5/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Fischbach, Joseph) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's Motion for extension of time to file motion to dismiss 13 is granted. Plaintiff to file an amended complaint by 6/19/2015. Defendant's motion to dismiss with supporting memoranda due by 7/20/2015. Plaintiff to respond by 8/3/2015. Defendant to reply by 8/13/2015. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo reset to 9/18/2015 at 9:30 AM. Scheduling Conference date of 8/6/2015 is vacated pending disposition of the motion to dismiss. Mailed notice (jdh) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rainsoft by David Michael Friebus (Friebus, David) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Notice of hearing on motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Hoke Bergman for presentment of motion for extension of time to file 13 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 6/4/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Bergman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Defendant Brian Macfarland for extension of time to file Motion to Dismiss (Bergman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FIRST AMENDED complaint by Rainsoft against Brian Macfarland and Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9)(Fischbach, Joseph) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5-7-15 before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Court Reporter Contact Information: Sandra M. Tennis, Sandra_Tennis@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-554-8244. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2015. (Tennis, Sandra) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion hearing held on 5/7/2015 regarding motion for temporary restraining order 4 . Plaintiff's Motion for TRO 4 is denied for the reasons stated in open court. Plaintiff given leave to file an amended complaint. Defendant's motion to dismiss with supporting memoranda due by 6/4/2015. Plaintiff to respond by 6/15/2015. Defendant to reply by 6/25/2015. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/10/2015 at 10:15 AM. Mailed notice (jdh) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rainsoft by Eileen A. Lysaught (Lysaught, Eileen) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/2/2015, Entered: None Notice of hearing on motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Joseph S Fischbach for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order 4 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 5/7/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Fischbach, Joseph) (Entered: 05/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brian Macfarland by Jeffrey Hoke Bergman (Bergman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION regarding motion for temporary restraining order 4 and Supporting Exhibit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5)(Fischbach, Joseph) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Richard Verson regarding motion for temporary restraining order 4 and Supporting Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Fischbach, Joseph) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Plaintiff Rainsoft for temporary restraining order and OSC re Preliminary Injunction (Fischbach, Joseph) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Scheduling Conference is set for 8/6/2015 at 9:30 a.m. The Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting shall be filed by 8/4/2015. (The form of the report is available on this court's webpage.) Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 4/29/2015. Mailed notice (cc, ) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fischbach, Joseph) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed by Rainsoft; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10576403.(Fischbach, Joseph) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 367 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?