The Ohio State University v. Herbert, Dean L Ta Ppy Pty Ltd Acn 163 593 413
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91223653-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 9, 2017 at 8:07 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Ohio State University Ohio State University, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "The Ohio State University"

Represented by Frost Brown Todd LLC

v.
No Logo Herbert, Dean L Ta Ppy Pty Ltd Acn 163 593 413 , Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rick Ruz Pllc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rick Ruz rickruz@ruzlaw.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney YONG OH (RICHARD) KIM
Date in Location 9/3/2015
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None M
D Undeliverable Mail
    LREF
    Blank 34 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None M
    D Undeliverable Mail
      LREF
      Blank 32 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None T
      Bd Decision: Dismissed W/ Prej
        LREF
        Blank 31 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None N
        W/draw Of Opposition
          LREF
          Blank 30 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None T
          Amdt Approved; Td Reset
            LREF
            Blank 29 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None W
            Extension Of Time Granted
              LREF
              Blank 28 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None T
              Stip For Ext
                LREF
                Blank 27 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None T
                Paper Received At Ttab
                  LREF
                  Blank 26 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None W
                  Extension Of Time Granted
                    LREF
                    Blank 25 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None T
                    Stip For Ext
                      LREF
                      Blank 24 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None W
                      Extension Of Time Granted
                        LREF
                        Blank 23 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None T
                        Stip For Ext
                          LREF
                          Blank 22 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None W
                          Extension Of Time Granted
                            LREF
                            Blank 21 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None T
                            Stip For Ext
                              LREF
                              Blank 20 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None W
                              Extension Of Time Granted
                                LREF
                                Blank 19 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None T
                                Stip For Ext
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 18 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None W
                                  Extension Of Time Granted
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 17 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None T
                                    Stip For Ext
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 16 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None W
                                      Extension Of Time Granted
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 15 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None T
                                        Stip For Ext
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 14 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None
                                          Extension Of Time Granted
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None
                                            Stip For Ext
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None W
                                              Extension Of Time Granted
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None T
                                                Stip For Ext
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None W
                                                  Extension Of Time Granted
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None T
                                                    Stip For Ext
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None W
                                                      Extension Of Time Granted
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None T
                                                        Stip For Ext
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None W
                                                          Extension Of Time Granted
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None T
                                                            Stip For Ext
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None N
                                                              Answer
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None T
                                                                Pending, Instituted
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None T
                                                                  Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None N
                                                                    Filed And Fee
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 811 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?