Grizzle v. United States Postal
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-03708-BEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James Roger Grizzle, Sr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Vernon Hitaffer +1 301 776 1729 +1 301 960 4084 jhitafferesq@aol.com
v.
United States Postal Service United States Postal Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 11/28/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $200000
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 2/25/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [10-1] motion of defendant to Dismiss ( signed by Chief Judge Benson E. Legg 2/24/03) (c/i 2/25/03) (MICROFILMED 2/25/03) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Terminated Case
    Case closed (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to submit a short letter with case law that supports his position regarding the conversation with the EEO Representative; provide authority for proposition that plaintiff has a cause of action for violations of USPS policies and an affidavit from either his client or unnamed EEO Representative which provides more details about the alleged conversation, such as date, name of the EEO Representative and extent of the discussion. (signed by Chief Judge Benson E. Legg 1/28/03) (c/i 1/29/03 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Reply to Response
        SUR-REPLY by James Roger Grizzle Sr. to Defendant's Reply in Further Support of its [10-1] Motion to Dismiss (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [15-1] Motion of Plaintiff for Leave to File Surreply (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 6/27/02) (c/i 6/28/02 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002, Terminated: 6/27/2002 Motion for Leave to File
            MOTION by James Roger Grizzle Sr. for Leave to File Surreply with Attachment A (Proposed Surreply) (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER RETURNING Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Reply in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Surreply) for failure of counsel to obtain Leave of Court pursuant to LR 105.2(a). (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 5/13/02) (c/m with return pleading 5/14/02 ms) (c/m) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002, Terminated: 2/25/2003 Response in Support
                REPLY by United States Postal in Further Support of its [10-1] Motion to Dismiss (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002, Terminated: 2/25/2003 Response to Motion
                  RESPONSE by James Roger Grizzle Sr. to [10-1] Motion to Dismiss by United States Postal with Attachment A (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER DIRECTING the defendant's motion to dismiss be filed on or about 3/25/02 ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 3/26/02) (c/i 3/27/02) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002, Terminated: 2/25/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                      MOTION with memorandum in support by United States Postal to Dismiss and Attachment 1 (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002, Terminated: 3/27/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                        MOTION by United States Postal to Extend Time (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002, Terminated: 2/25/2003 Response to Motion
                          RESPONSE by James Roger Grizzle Sr. to [6-1] Motion of Defendant to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by United States Postal (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [6-1] Motion of Defendant to Extend Time to Answer Complaint reset Answer deadline to 3/21/02 for United States Postal ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 2/25/02) (c/i 2/26/02 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002, Terminated: 2/26/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                              MOTION by United States Postal to Extend Time to Answer Complaint (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to United States Postal 1/23/02 Answer due on 3/25/02 for United States Postal (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER DIRECTING Mr. Hitaffer to advise the Court in writing as to when service was effected on U.S. Postal Service. (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 2/14/02) (c/i 2/14/02 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 Local Rule
                                    Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure by James Roger Grizzle Sr. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Summons Issued
                                      SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for United States Postal (krc, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT and attachments A through C filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 2285014 (krc, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?