In re Red Hat, Inc., Serial No. 85237936
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 85237936-EXA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tepper & Eryster Pllc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maury M Tepper Iii mtepper@teiplaw.com
Type Ex Parte Appeal
Date in Location 9/22/2015
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None T
    Bd Decision: Dismissed For Failure To File Brief
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None T
      Paper Received At Ttab
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None X
        Proceedings Resumed
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None P
          Recon Denied
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None T
            Instituted
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None X
              Appeal Acknowledged; Case Remanded
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None X
                Appeal To Board
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 12 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?