Mike Z Marco v. Vmedu, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board,
Case No. 91223970-OPP
|
|
|
Last Updated August 30, 2016 at 8:26 AM EDT (8.7 years ago) |
Update Alerts Jump |
Summary Parties Attributes Timeline |
Summary |
No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.
|
|
Parties |
|
|
Attributes |
Type |
Opposition |
Interlocutory Attorney |
ANDREW P BAXLEY |
Date in Location |
9/23/2015 |
Status Code |
2 |
Location Code |
845 |
|
|
Timeline |
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
10 |
Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None |
|
|
Bd Decision: Sustained
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
9 |
Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None |
T |
|
W/draw Of Application
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
8 |
Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None |
P |
|
Stipulated Protective Order
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
7 |
Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None |
T |
|
Paper Received At Ttab
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6 |
Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None |
T |
|
Trial Dates Reset
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
5 |
Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None |
T |
|
Paper Received At Ttab
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
4 |
Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None |
N |
|
Answer
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
3 |
Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None |
T |
|
Pending, Instituted
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2 |
Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None |
T |
|
Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1 |
Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None |
N |
|
Filed And Fee
|
|
Request |
 |
No calendar events were found for this docket.
|
|
Statistics
This case has been viewed 19 times.
|
|
|
|