N5 Technologies LLC v. BB&T Corporation et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00447
District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 6:34 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo N5 Technologies, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Davidson, Berquist, Klima & Jackson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wayne Michael Helge +1 571 765 7700 +1 703 894 6430 whege@dbjg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A. Krauss +1 703 894 6400 +1 703 894 6430 gkrauss@dbjg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Arthur Wright +1 571 765 7700 +1 571 765 7200 awright@davidsonberquist.com
v.
BB&T Corporation BB&T Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Branch Banking And Trust Company, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Motion is hereby GRANTED. The parties shall have up to and including March 31,2016 in which to file a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 2/24/2016. (bgra) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Finalize Settlement by BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement by N5 Technologies LLC (Helge, Wayne) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None
Waiver of re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case , 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument by BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company (Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE by N5 Technologies LLC Notice of Related Cases Pending in Eastern District of Virginia District Court (Helge, Wayne) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 17 , the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alton L. Absher III as certified by Local Counsel Joshua B. Brady for BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/28/2015. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 16 , the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Gardner as certified by Local Counsel Joshua B. Brady for BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/28/2015. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by N5 Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attorney Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of B. Seal)(Helge, Wayne) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under 35 USC 101 filed by N5 Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attorney Declaration and Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E, # 6 Exhibit Ex. F, # 7 Exhibit Ex. G, # 8 Exhibit Ex. H, # 9 Exhibit Ex. I)(Helge, Wayne) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
Brief in Support to 20 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
MOTION to Transfer Case by BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
Brief in Support to 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alton L. Absher III and Certification of Local Counsel Joshua B. Brady Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4773116. by BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Gardner and Certification of Local Counsel Joshua B. Brady Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4768957. by BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 12 , a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Charles Van Arnam as certified by Local Counsel Joshua B. Brady for Defendants BB&T Corporation, and Branch Banking and Trust Company. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/01/2015. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by N5 Technologies LLC as to BB&T Corporation served on 10/27/2015; Branch Banking and Trust Company served on 10/27/2015 (bgra) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants Motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendants BB&T Corporation and Branch Banking and Trust Company shall have up to and including December 17, 2015 in which to answer, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 11/18/2015. (bgra) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Charles Van Arnam and Certification of Local Counsel Joshua B. Brady Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4726922. by BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by BB&T Corporation. (Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Unopposed by BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Bryson Brady on behalf of BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company (Brady, Joshua) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) 7,197,297. (epri) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
Two Summonses, each with service copy, Issued as to BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Arthur Wright on behalf of N5 Technologies LLC (epri) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Albert Krauss on behalf of N5 Technologies LLC (epri) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne Michael Helge on behalf of N5 Technologies LLC (epri) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by N5 Technologies LLC. (epri) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against BB&T Corporation, Branch Banking and Trust Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683054575.), filed by N5 Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Letter, # 4 Receipt)(epri) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 69 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?