Asif Damani
Bankruptcy Case Illinois Northern Bankruptcy Court - Chicago, Case No. 15-81015
District Judge Thomas M. Lynch, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 5:58 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Asif Damani, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Chang & Carlin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P Carlin +1 847 843 8600 +1 847 843 8605 jcarlin@changandcarlin.com
No Logo Patrick S Layng, U.S. Trustee
No Logo Stephen G Balsley, Trustee
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
Bankruptcy Case Closed and Trustee Discharged (Admin.) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
    BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge. (RE: 16 Discharge Order Chapter 7 No Asset - Auto). No. of Notices: 28. Notice Date 07/23/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
      Discharge Order Chapter 7 No Asset - Auto (Admin.) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
        Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Stephen G Balsley, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 2 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 0.00, Assets Exempt: $ 4100.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 98140.97, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 98140.97. (Balsley, Stephen) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
          Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 6/25/2015 at 03:00 PM at Stewart Square, 308 West State Street, Rm. 40, Rockford, Illinois 61101. (Balsley, Stephen) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
            Debtor's Certification of Completion of Instructional Course Concerning Personal Financial Management Filed by John P Carlin on behalf of Asif Damani. (Carlin, John) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
              Amended Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form (22A-1) Filed by John P Carlin on behalf of Asif Damani. (Carlin, John) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                CORRECTIVE ENTRY Incorrect event entered, filer notified to refile (RE: 10 Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 22A-2). (Smith, Loretta) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                  Incorrect event entered, filer notified to refile Amended Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 22A-2 Filed by John P Carlin on behalf of Asif Damani. (Carlin, John) Modified on 4/30/2015 (Smith, Loretta). (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                    BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: 8 Chapter 7 341 Meeting of Creditors). No. of Notices: 28. Notice Date 04/17/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                      Chapter 7 341 Meeting of Creditors . (Smith, Loretta) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                        Statement of Social Security Number(s) Filed by John P Carlin on behalf of Asif Damani. (Carlin, John) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                          Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/21/2015 at 02:30 PM at Stewart Square, 308 West State Street, Rm. 40, Rockford, Illinois 61101. Objections for Discharge due by 07/20/2015. (Carlin, John) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                            Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(15-81015) [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29008677. Fee Amount $ 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                              Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by John P Carlin on behalf of Asif Damani. (Carlin, John) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                                Statement of Social Security Number(s) Filed by John P Carlin on behalf of Asif Damani. (Carlin, John) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                                  Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form (22A-1) and Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse Form 22A-1Supp The Debtor has Primarily Business Debts. Filed by John P Carlin on behalf of Asif Damani. (Carlin, John) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                                    Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Fee Amount $335, Filed by John P Carlin on behalf of Asif Damani (Attachments: # 1 Signature Pages) (Carlin, John) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 692 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?