Mundy v. Lacy
Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Southern District Court, Case No. 4:15-cv-00371

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 3:14 PM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mary S Mundy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baer Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberley K Baer +1 515 279 2000 +2792 279 279 2137 kbaer@baerlawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Trusstee U/A DTD, Mary S. Mundy R/L Trust II, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated Shannon Lee Hopkins +1 212 363 7500 +1 212 363 7171 shopkins@zlk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Trusstee U/A DTD, Mary S. Mundy R/L Trust II, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com
v.
No Logo D. Mell Meredith Frazier, Defendant
No Logo Donald A. Baer, Defendant
No Logo Donald C. Berg, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth Tallet, Defendant
No Logo Frederick B. Henry, Defendant
No Logo Joel Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Mary Sue Coleman, Defendant
No Logo Media General, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter L Simmons +1 212 859 8455 +1 212 859 4000 peter.simmons@friedfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nyemaster, Goode, West, Hansell & O'Brien PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W Thrall +1 515 283 3100 +2838 283 283 8045 mwt@nyemaster.com
No Logo Meredith Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Montage Merger Sub 1, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter L Simmons +1 212 859 8455 +1 212 859 4000 peter.simmons@friedfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nyemaster, Goode, West, Hansell & O'Brien PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W Thrall +1 515 283 3100 +2838 283 283 8045 mwt@nyemaster.com
No Logo Montage Merger Sub 2, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter L Simmons +1 212 859 8455 +1 212 859 4000 peter.simmons@friedfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nyemaster, Goode, West, Hansell & O'Brien PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W Thrall +1 515 283 3100 +2838 283 283 8045 mwt@nyemaster.com
No Logo Montage New Holdco Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter L Simmons +1 212 859 8455 +1 212 859 4000 peter.simmons@friedfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nyemaster, Goode, West, Hansell & O'Brien PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W Thrall +1 515 283 3100 +2838 283 283 8045 mwt@nyemaster.com
No Logo Philip A. Marineau, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Lacy, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT in favor of Media General, Inc., Meredith Corporation, Montage Merger Sub 1, Inc., Montage Merger Sub 2, Inc., Montage New Holdco Inc., D. Mell Meredith Frazier, Donald A. Baer, Donald C. Berg, Elizabeth Tallet, Frederick B. Henry, Joel Johnson, Mary Sue Coleman, Philip A. Marineau, Stephen Lacy against Mary S Mundy, Shiva Y Stein. Signed by Clerk Marjorie Krahn on 2/18/2016. (sc)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt on 2/18/2016. (sc)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: 2/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Errata Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice re 14 Motion to Dismiss filed by Mary S Mundy. (Baer, Kimberley)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Unresisted MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Mary S Mundy. Responses due by 2/29/2016 (Baer, Kimberley)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: 1/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
          Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Media General, Inc., Montage Merger Sub 1, Inc., Montage Merger Sub 2, Inc., Montage New Holdco Inc.. (Thrall, Michael)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            TEXT ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Peter L. Simmons. Signed by Clerk, Marge Krahn on 12/30/2015. (don, ) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: 12/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2815858 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Media General, Inc., Montage Merger Sub 1, Inc., Montage Merger Sub 2, Inc., Montage New Holdco Inc.. (Thrall, Michael)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: 12/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W Thrall on behalf of Montage Merger Sub 1, Inc., Montage Merger Sub 2, Inc., Montage New Holdco Inc. (Thrall, Michael)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: 12/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W Thrall on behalf of Media General, Inc. (Thrall, Michael)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    TEXT ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gustavo Bruckner. Signed by Clerk of Court Marge Krahn on 12/18/2015. (tak, ) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2808237 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Mary S Mundy, Shiva Y Stein. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement ECF Attorney Registration Form)(Baer, Kimberley)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: 12/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                        CERTIFICATE by Mary S Mundy, Shiva Y Stein. (Baer, Kimberley)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: 12/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                          First AMENDED COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against All Defendants. All Defendants., filed by Mary S Mundy.(Baer, Kimberley)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: 11/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                            Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Mary S Mundy. (Baer, Kimberley)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None
                              TEXT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Shannon L. Hopkins. Signed by Clerk of Court Marjorie Krahn on 10/26/2015. (kmc, ) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2759138 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Mary S Mundy. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement ECF Attorney Registration Form)(Baer, Kimberley)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                  COMPLAINT 15-371 against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-2758184., filed by Mary S Mundy. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/18/2016. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/18/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons, # 2 Exhibit Summons, # 3 Exhibit Summons, # 4 Exhibit Summons, # 5 Exhibit Summons, # 6 Exhibit Summons, # 7 Exhibit Summons, # 8 Exhibit Summons, # 9 Exhibit Summons, # 10 Exhibit Summons, # 11 Exhibit Summons, # 12 Exhibit Summons, # 13 Exhibit Summons, # 14 Exhibit Summons, # 15 Exhibit Summons)(Baer, Kimberley)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt added. Judge Stephanie M. Rose no longer assigned to case. (jm)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Space Space

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?