Advanced Media Networks LLC v. T-Mobile USA Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-01518
District Judge Gregory M. Sleet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2021 at 5:17 PM DT (1.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Advanced Media Networks, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bayard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen B. Brauerman +1 302 429 4232 +1 302 658 6395 sbrauerman@bayardlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara E. Bussiere +1 302 429 4230 sbussiere@bayardlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes +1 302 429 4228 vtiradentes@bayardlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brian A. Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian A. Carpenter

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher M. Joe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Joe

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric W. Buether

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric W. Buether

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/16/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Brian Williams +1 302 622 4211 +1 302 656 8920 gwilliams@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark D. Perantie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Perantie

Toggle Switch Represented by Niknaz Bukovcan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Niknaz Bukovcan
T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adam Lauridsen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Lauridsen

Toggle Switch Represented by Asim M. Bhansali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Asim M. Bhansali

Toggle Switch Represented by Justina K. Sessions

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justina K. Sessions

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Shea Gaza +1 302 571 6727 agaza@ycst.com
Space Samantha G. Wilson +1 302 571 5018 swilson@ycst.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Shea Gaza +1 302 571 6727 agaza@ycst.com
Space Samantha G. Wilson +1 302 571 5018 swilson@ycst.com
v.
T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adam Lauridsen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Lauridsen

Toggle Switch Represented by Asim M. Bhansali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Asim M. Bhansali

Toggle Switch Represented by Justina K. Sessions

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justina K. Sessions

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Shea Gaza +1 302 571 6727 agaza@ycst.com
Space Samantha G. Wilson +1 302 571 5018 swilson@ycst.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Shea Gaza +1 302 571 6727 agaza@ycst.com
Space Samantha G. Wilson +1 302 571 5018 swilson@ycst.com
No Logo Advanced Media Networks, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bayard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara E. Bussiere +1 302 429 4230 sbussiere@bayardlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes +1 302 429 4228 vtiradentes@bayardlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brian A. Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian A. Carpenter

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher M. Joe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Joe

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric W. Buether

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric W. Buether

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/16/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Brian Williams +1 302 622 4211 +1 302 656 8920 gwilliams@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark D. Perantie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Perantie

Toggle Switch Represented by Niknaz Bukovcan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Niknaz Bukovcan
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Advanced Media Networks LLC (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER - Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review (D.I. 36 in C.A. No. 14-1495; D.I. 36 in C.A. No. 14-1518; D.I. 19 in C.A. No. 131; D.I. 41 in C.A. No. 15-142) is GRANTED. The above-captioned cases are STAYED. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/21/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01495-GMS et al.(mdb) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            SO ORDERED - re (21 in 1:15-cv-00420-GMS, 31 in 1:15-cv-00131-GMS, 46 in 1:14-cv-01518-GMS, 22 in 1:15-cv-00405-GMS, 23 in 1:15-cv-00410-GMS, 46 in 1:14-cv-01495-GMS) Stipulation (Corrected Stipulation and [Proposed] Order) filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/14/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01495-GMS et al.(mdb) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              STIPULATION (Corrected Stipulation and [Proposed] Order) by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit B (Part 2), # 4 Exhibit B (Part 3), # 5 Exhibit B (Part 4), # 6 Exhibit B (Part 5), # 7 Exhibit B (Part 6), # 8 Exhibit B (Part 7), # 9 Exhibit B (Part 8), # 10 Exhibit B (Part 9), # 11 Exhibit B (Part 10), # 12 Exhibit B (Part 11), # 13 Exhibit B (Part 12), # 14 Exhibit B (Part 13), # 15 Exhibit B (Part 14), # 16 Exhibit B (Part 15), # 17 Exhibit B (Part 16), # 18 Exhibit B (Part 17), # 19 Exhibit B (Part 18), # 20 Exhibit B (Part 19), # 21 Exhibit B (Part 20), # 22 Exhibit B (Part 21), # 23 Exhibit B (Part 22))(Tiradentes, Vanessa) Modified on 6/15/2016 (mdb). (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (PART 1), # 3 Exhibit B (PART 2), # 4 Exhibit B (PART 3), # 5 Exhibit B (PART 4), # 6 Exhibit B (PART 5), # 7 Exhibit B (PART 6), # 8 Exhibit B (PART 7), # 9 Exhibit B (PART 8), # 10 Exhibit B (PART 9), # 11 Exhibit B (PART 10), # 12 Exhibit B (PART 11), # 13 Exhibit B (PART 12), # 14 Exhibit B (PART 13), # 15 Exhibit B (PART 14), # 16 Exhibit B (PART 15), # 17 Exhibit B (PART 16), # 18 Exhibit B (PART 17), # 19 Exhibit B (PART 18), # 20 Exhibit B (PART 19), # 21 Exhibit B (PART 20), # 22 Exhibit B (PART 21), # 23 Exhibit B (PART 22))(Tiradentes, Vanessa) Modified on 6/7/2016 (mdb). (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    REPLY BRIEF re 36 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Joint PROPOSED ORDER / Proposed Scheduling Order by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 2/1/2016 (mdb). (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        DECLARATION re (45 in 1:15-cv-00142-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (24 in 1:15-cv-00131-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (40 in 1:14-cv-01495-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (40 in 1:14-cv-01518-GMS) Answering Brief in Opposition by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O (Part 1 of 3), # 16 Exhibit O (Part 2 of 3), # 17 Exhibit O (Part 3 of 3), # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Exhibit Z, # 29 Exhibit AA)(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/8/2016. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Advanced Media Networks LLC to Respond to Motion to Stay Until January 28, 2016 by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 1/25/2016 (mdb). (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              DECLARATION of Justina K. Sessions re 36 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 and 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 3, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 4, Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 4, Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 5-11)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 1/7/2016 (mdb). (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 36 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/25/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A and Appendix B)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 1/7/2016 (mdb). (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review - filed by T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Boost Worldwide Inc., Clearwire Communications LLC, Clearwire Corporation, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Corporation, Virgin Mobile USA Inc., Virgin Mobile USA LP, United States Cellular Corporation, Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Pursuant to D.Del. Local Rule 7.1.1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 1/6/2016 (mdb). (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Filing of Petitions for Inter Partes Review for U.S. Patent No. 5,960,074 by T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 12/24/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER - The defendants' Motion to Stay is DENIED; The plaintiff's Motion to Lift the Temporary Stay is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/8/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01495-GMS, 1:14-cv-01518-GMS, 1:15-cv-00142-GMS(mdb) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        DECLARATION of Justina K. Sessions re 32 Answering Brief in Opposition by T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - E)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 12/1/2015 (mdb). (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 30 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/10/2015. (Gaza, Anne) Modified on 12/1/2015 (mdb). (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Issuance of Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate by Advanced Media Networks LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION to Lift the Temporary Stay - filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 11/12/2015 (mdb). (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Advanced Media Networks LLC: Entry of appearance of attorney Stephen B. Brauerman. Attorney Gregory Brian Williams, Esquire and Fox Rothschild LLP terminated. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Status of Related Proceedings by T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. re 20 MOTION to Stay re 16 Proposed Order, 18 Letter, 15 Status Report, 19 Letter - Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Ex Parte Reexamination Proceedings - (Wilson, Samantha) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                    REPLY BRIEF re 20 MOTION to Stay re 16 Proposed Order, 18 Letter, 15 Status Report, 19 Letter - Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Ex Parte Reexamination Proceedings - filed by T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Official Transcript of T/C held on 07/02/15 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maurer. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2015. (kjm) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                        DECLARATION re 23 Answering Brief in Opposition, Declaration of Niknaz Bukovcan in Support of Plaintiff's Answering Brief in Oppposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibits 3-5, # 4 Exhibits 6-7, # 5 Exhibits 8-13, # 6 Exhibits 14-18, # 7 Exhibits 19-20, # 8 Exhibit 21 (Part 1), # 9 Exhibit 21 (Part 2), # 10 Exhibit 22 (Part 1), # 11 Exhibit 22 (Part 2), # 12 Exhibits 23-25, # 13 Exhibit 26 (Part 1), # 14 Exhibit 26 (Part 2), # 15 Exhibits 27-34)(Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                          DECLARATION re 23 Answering Brief in Opposition, Declaration of Richard Agostinelli by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A through D, # 2 Exhibits E through G)(Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                            ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Stay re 16 Proposed Order, 18 Letter, 15 Status Report, 19 Letter - Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Ex Parte Reexamination Proceedings - filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                              DECLARATION re 21 Opening Brief in Support, 20 MOTION to Stay re 16 Proposed Order, 18 Letter, 15 Status Report, 19 Letter - Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Ex Parte Reexamination Proceedings - Declaration of Anne Shea Gaza by T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 4)(Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 20 MOTION to Stay re 16 Proposed Order, 18 Letter, 15 Status Report, 19 Letter - Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Ex Parte Reexamination Proceedings - filed by T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/20/2015. (Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Stay re 16 Proposed Order, 18 Letter, 15 Status Report, 19 Letter - Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Ex Parte Reexamination Proceedings - - filed by T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Pursuant to D.Del. Local Rule 7.1.1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Gregory B. Williams regarding Response to Defendants' Letter dated June 3, 2015 - re (22 in 1:15-cv-00142-GMS) Letter. (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Karen Jacobs regarding to bring to the Court's attention four new cases brought by plaintiff Advanced Media Networks, LLC in the last three weeks. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff Advanced Media Networks, LLC's Identification of Accused Products and Asserted Claims on T-Mobile US, Inc. and T-Mobile USA, Inc. by Advanced Media Networks LLC (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            Joint STATUS REPORT of PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the deadline to file a joint status report and proposed scheduling order pursuant to D.I. 13 in C.A. 14-1495-GMS to May 14, 2015 - filed by Boost Worldwide Inc., Clearwire Communications LLC, Clearwire Corporation, Sprint Communications, Inc., Sprint Corporation, Virgin Mobile USA Inc., Virgin Mobile USA LP. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT IN CIVIL CASES. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/9/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01495-GMS, 1:14-cv-01518-GMS, 1:15-cv-00131-GMS, 1:15-cv-00142-GMS(asw) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  ANSWER to 10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants T-Mobile US, Inc. and T-Mobile USA, Inc. by Advanced Media Networks LLC.(Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc.; Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V. for T-Mobile US Inc. filed by T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Advanced Media Networks LLC by T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc..(Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Asim M. Bhansali, Esquire; Adam Lauridsen, Esquire; and Justina Kahn Sessions, Esquire - filed by T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric W. Beuther, Christopher M. Joe, Brian A. Carpenter, Mark D. Perantie, and Niknaz Bukovcan - filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Shea Gaza on behalf of T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. (Gaza, Anne) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME and [Proposed] Order to Move Against or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint for Patent Infringement to February 9, 2015 - filed by T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. T-Mobile USA Inc. served on 12/29/2014, answer due 1/20/2015. (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. T-Mobile US Inc. served on 12/29/2014, answer due 1/20/2015. (Williams, Gregory) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,960,074;. (els) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (els) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against T-Mobile US Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1646434.) - filed by Advanced Media Networks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 4-15, # 3 Exhibit 16-22, # 4 Exhibit 23-32, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2015: # 6 Exhibit 33-38) (mas, ). (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 97 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?