Butler v. Gunja, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-03770-WMN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James A. Butler, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo D. Miller, Defendant
No Logo D. Williams, Defendant
No Logo Elayan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
No Logo Forster, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
No Logo Grey, Defendant
No Logo J. E. Gunja, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
No Logo Jane Doe, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
No Logo John Doe, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
No Logo Kathleen H. Hawk, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
No Logo R. Cosgrove, Defendant
No Logo Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M DiBiagio +1 202 789 6000 +1 202 789 6190 tdibiagio@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
No Logo T. Miller, Defendant
Office Baltimore
Filed 11/30/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $2050000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Allegany
Terminated 6/12/2002
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 02-7237[], 1:01-cv-02230[USDC Dist. of Col.]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE
  Entries (81) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment
MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e) and 60 Fed. R. Civil P. by James A. Butler (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 55 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
    ORDER denying [53] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 7/17/08. (c/m 7/21/08)(bmh, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Legal Document 54 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER directing the U.S. Bureau of Prisons to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel on or before 45 days. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 6/2/08. (c/m 6/2/08)(bmh, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Legal Document 53 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008, Terminated: 7/17/2008 Motion to Compel
        MOTION to Compel Bureau of Prisons to Follow Courts Order Pursuant to PLR's by James A. Butler (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Mail Returned
          Mail Returned as Undeliverable, Receipt #14637004559. Mail sent to James A. Butler (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005 Filing Fee Paid
            Filing fee: $ 6.98, receipt number 14637004559 (cem, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Mail Returned
              Mail sent to James Butler returned as Undeliverable. (cem, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005 Mail Returned
                Mail sent to James Butler Returned as Undeliverable. (cem, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Filing Fee Paid
                  Filing fee: $ 8.00, receipt number 14637003772 (cem, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Filing Fee Paid
                    Filing fee: $ 13.00, receipt number 14637003612 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Filing Fee Paid
                      Filing fee: $ 13.00, receipt number 14637003613 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Filing Fee Paid
                        Filing fee: $ 1.60, receipt number 146370019 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Filing Fee Paid
                          Filing fee: $ 1.05, receipt number 14637001499 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Filing Fee Paid
                            Filing fee: $ 3.36, receipt number 14637001500 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Filing Fee Paid
                              Filing fee: $ 3.47, receipt number 14637001162 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Filing Fee Paid
                                Filing fee: $.15, receipt number 1201049 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Filing Fee Paid
                                  Filing fee: $ 6.40, receipt number 1199399 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Filing Fee Paid
                                    Filing fee: $ 6.40, receipt number 1199397 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 50 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Miscellaneous Correspondence
                                      Correspondence by Controller at F.C.I.-Cumberland to Pro Se Unit Providing the Status of the 20% Monthly Withholdings for March 2002 Through May 2003. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 49 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Miscellaneous Correspondence
                                        Correspondence by Controller at F.C.I.-Cumberland to Pro Se Unit Providing the Status of the 20% Withholdings for the Months of December 2002 Through May 2003. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 48 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Correspondence
                                          Correspondence from Controller re: Account statement of the 20% withholdings for the month of December 2002. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 47 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Correspondence
                                            Correspondence from Controller re: Account Status of 20% Monthly Withholdings. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 46 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Miscellaneous Correspondence
                                              Correspondence by Controller at F.C.I.-Cumberland to Pro Se Unit re: Providing the Status of the 20% Monthly Withholdings for March 2002 Through March 2003. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 45 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Miscellaneous Correspondence
                                                Correspondence by Controller at F.C.I.-Cumberland to Pro Se Unit re: Providing the Status of the 20% Withholdings for the Months of December 2002 Through March 2003. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003, Terminated: 3/21/2003 USCA Mandate
                                                  JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) "AFFIRMING" the judgment of the District Court as to [33] Notice of Appeal filed by James A. Butler (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Appeal Record Returned
                                                    Appeal Record Returned: [33] Notice of Appeal, (Volume 1) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Miscellaneous Correspondence
                                                      Correspondence by Controller of F.C.I.-Cumberland to Pro Se Unit Providing the Status of the 20% Withholdings For the Months of December 2002 Through February 2003. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Correspondence
                                                        Correspondence from Controller re: financial account status. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Correspondence
                                                          Correspondence from Controller re: Financial Statement for the months December 2002 and January 2003. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Correspondence
                                                            Correspondence re: financial report for the months of April, September, October and November 2002 from Controller. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Filing Fee Paid
                                                              Filing fee: $ 10.68, receipt number 1192612 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Filing Fee Paid
                                                                Filing fee: $ 14.56, receipt number 1192614 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Correspondence
                                                                  CORRESPONDENCE from the Controller with the status of the 20% withholding for the month of December 2002. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Status Report
                                                                    STATUS REPORT from the Controller with the status of the 20% withholdings for the months of April, June and August thur December 2002. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Correspondence
                                                                      CORRESPONDENCE from the Controller. Re: Financial statement for the months of April, June, and August-Novemer 2002. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Order
                                                                        ORDER of the USCA GRANTING Appellant/Plaintiff leave to proceed on appeal without full prepayment of fees on the terms imposed by the Prison Litigation Reform Act. (c/s) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Correspondence
                                                                          CORRESPONDENCE from the Controller. Re: Six month financial statement. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Correspondence
                                                                            CORRESPONDENCE by Terry Day, Controller at F.C.I.-Cumberland, to Pro Se Unit Providing the Status of the 20% Withholdings for the Months of April, June, August and September 2002. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Filing Fee Paid
                                                                              Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 2.88 RECEIPT # 1188680. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Filing Fee Paid
                                                                                Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 1.80 RECEIPT # 1188679. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002, Terminated: 3/21/2003 USCA Case Number
                                                                                  USCA Case Number Re: [33-1] appeal by James A. Butler USCA NUMBER: 02-7237 (Case Manager: Deborah S. Daniel) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002, Terminated: 3/21/2003 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by James A. Butler . Fee Status: (Filing Fee Not Paid) (Appeal rec'd in COA on 8/9/02) (c/m: Plaintiff and N. Clarke) (c/s) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002, Terminated: 3/21/2003 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                      Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [33-1] appeal by James A. Butler (vol. 1) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002, Terminated: 3/21/2003 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                                                                                        Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [33-1] appeal by James A. Butler (c/m) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 Response
                                                                                          RESPONSE of Controller to [5-1] order regarding financial; and financial statement. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [18-2] motion of defendants' for Summary Judgment; and DIRECTING Clerk to close the case. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 6/12/02) (c/m 6/12/02 chambers) (microfilmed 6/12/02 bh ) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 6/12/02) (c/m: 6/12/02 chambers) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Terminated Case
                                                                                                Case closed (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Correspondence
                                                                                                  CORRESPONDENCE from the Controller regarding financial statement; and financial statement. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff James A. Butler in opposition to [18-1] motion to Dismiss by Defendants, or, in the Alternative, [18-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants, and Declarations (5). (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed via certified mail through The U.S. Marshal's Service as to Defendant D. Williams 4/24/02. Answer due on 6/24/02 for Defendant D. Williams. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING plaintiff 10 days, up to and including 5/16/02 to file a Response to the defendants' Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 4/25/02 ) (c/m 4/26/02 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Kathleen H. Hawk 3/28/02 Answer due on 4/17/02 for Kathleen H. Hawk (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                            MOTION by Plaintiff James A. Butler to Extend Time . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002, Terminated: 6/12/2002 Response
                                                                                                              RESPONSE of Financial Officer to [5-1] order regarding financial statement; and financial statement. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/17/2002 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                Return of service unexecuted as to Defendant J. E. Gunja. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [20-1] motion of plaintiff to Extend Time to file a response to the Motion of Defendants to Dismiss to and including 5/6/02. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 4/16/02 ) (c/m 4/16/02 chambers) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002, Terminated: 4/16/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                    MOTION by plaintiff James A. Butler to Extend Time to file a response to the Motion of Defendants to Dismiss (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 Rule
                                                                                                                      Rule 12/56 letter mailed to parties. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                        MOTION with memorandum in support by defendants J. E. Gunja, Kathleen H. Hawk, Smith, Forster, Elayan, John Doe, Jane Doe to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment ; and Exhibits 1-5. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS(ES) (20 days) issued for defendant D. Williams. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [13-1] motion of defendants to Extend Time to file a Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment to and including 4/3/02; and DIRECTING Clerk to amend the caption of the case to include the name of D. Williams as a defendant and to issue summons for service on D. Williams. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 4/2/02) (c/m 4/3/02 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to J. E. Gunja, Forster 3/22/02 Answer due on 4/11/02 for J. E. Gunja, for Forster (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Smith 3/22/02 Answer due on 4/11/02 for Smith (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002, Terminated: 4/3/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant J. E. Gunja, Kathleen H. Hawk, Smith, Forster to Extend Time to file a Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS(ES) (20 days) issued for defendants J. E. Gunja, Forster, Smith, Kathleen H. Hawk. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 Filing Fee Paid
                                                                                                                                      Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 5.28 RECEIPT # 1183522 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER DIRETING plaintiff to forward to the Clerk within 20 days $5.28 as the initial partial filing fee and to make monthly payments of 20% of each preceding month's income credited to his account as continued partial payments on the remainder of the $150.00 filing fee; DIRECTING Clerk to mail copies; DIRECTING Clerk to amend the docket to reflect the names of additional defendants Elayan, D. Miller, T. Miller, R. Cosgrove, and Lt. Grey; DIRECTING defendants to answer the amended complaint; DIRECTING Clerk to mail 5 USM 285 forms to plaintiff; GRANTING plaintiff 21 days to complete and return said forms; and upon receipt of completed forms, DIRECTING Clerk to issue summons and the USM to effectuate service on defendants J.E. Gunja, Kathleen Hawks, Smith and Foster in their individual capacity. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 2/14/02) (c/m 2/14/02 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/14/2002
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Plaintiff James A. Butler for Leave to File an Amended Complaint . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [7-1] motion of defendants to Extend Time to file a response reset Answer deadline to 3/19/02 for Kathleen H. Hawk, for Smith, for Forster, for J. E. Gunja ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 2/7/02 ) (c/m 2/8/02 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/7/2002 Remark
                                                                                                                                              Account Statement. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002, Terminated: 2/8/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by defendants to Extend Time to file a response (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DIRECTING plaintiff to inform this Court and all counsel of any change of address; granting [2-1] motion of plaintiff to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; DIRECTING Clerk to mail copies and withhold service; and DIRECTING defendants to answer the complaint within 30 days. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 1/17/02 ) (c/m 1/18/02 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DIRECTING within 20 days the Finance Officer at FCI - Cumberland shall file an inmate account summary information sheet for the past six months. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 12/10/01 ) (c/m 12/12/01 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND TRANSFER ORDER ( signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly 10/22/01 ) "transferring" this action to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland, Northern Division; and "directing" that whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis is a determination to be made by the transferee court. (c/m by Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Correspondence
                                                                                                                                                        TRUST FUND ACCOUNT Filed by Plaintiff James A. Butler. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001, Terminated: 1/18/2002 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Plaintiff James A. Butler to Proceed in Forma Pauperis . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                            DEMAND for jury trial by Plaintiff James A. Butler. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT filed; (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                All of the above pleadings were filed in the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                  Original file consisting of pleadings #1 through #4; certified copy of order and docket sheet received from District of Columbia. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?