Mark Okano, et al v. Trex Company, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 10-15871

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2017 at 2:16 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4385 - Property Damage-Product Liability
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
Order filed (Deputy Clerk: PWS) Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys’ fees on appeal. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. [7400428] (SC) [Entered: 07/12/2010 10:05 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) Appellants Sharon Ding and Mark Okano Stipulated Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 07/09/2010. [7399176] (SB) [Entered: 07/09/2010 01:23 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
      Filed order MEDIATION (PWS): The court is informed that the parties have reached a settlement of their dispute. Within 30 days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file either a motion or a stipulation to dismiss this matter pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or shall contact the Circuit Mediator. A copy of any motion or stipulation to dismiss shall be faxed to the Circuit Mediator at (415) 355-8566, or emailed (Peter_Sherwood@ca9.uscourts.gov). The schedule for preparation of the record and briefing in this matter, including the reporter’s transcript, is vacated. [7389530] (SC) [Entered: 06/30/2010 11:41 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
        Filed order MEDIATION (PWS): Pending settlement discussions, the schedule for preparation of the record and briefing in this matter, including the reporter’s transcript, is reset as follows: transcript ordered by June 28, 2010; reporter’s transcript is due July 28, 2010; appellant Sharon Ding and appellant Mark Okano shall file their opening brief on or before September 7, 2010; appellee Bradley S. Hureth, Appellee Eric Ross and Appellee Trex Company, Inc. shall file their answering brief on or before October 6, 2010; the optional brief is due 14 days after service of each answering brief. [7374477] (SC) [Entered: 06/16/2010 02:10 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
          Filed order MEDIATION (PWS): On or before June 14, 2010, counsel for appellants is requested to contact the Circuit Mediator to report on the status of the case. [7362015] (WL) [Entered: 06/07/2010 11:02 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
            Filed order MEDIATION (PWS): Pending settlement discussions, the schedule for preparation of the record and briefing in this matter, including the reporter’s transcript, is reset as follows: transcript ordered by June 14, 2010; reporter’s transcript is due July 14, 2010; appellant Sharon Ding and appellant Mark Okano shall file their opening brief on or before August 22, 2010; appellee Bradley S. Hureth, Appellee Eric Ross and Appellee Trex Company, Inc. shall file their answering brief on or before September 22, 2010; the optional brief is due 14 days after service of each answering brief. [7338372] (SC) [Entered: 05/14/2010 03:56 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
              Filed order MEDIATION (EPM): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. The court has scheduled a telephone settlement assessment conference, with counsel only, on June 3, 2010, at 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time to discuss whether this case is appropriate for participation in the Mediation Program. [7309087] (SC) [Entered: 04/21/2010 09:19 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                Filed Appellants Sharon Ding and Mark Okano Mediation Questionnaire. Served on 04/13/2010. [7304306] (GR) [Entered: 04/16/2010 10:22 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                  Filed representation notice of Robert Lopez, Steve Berman, Jeff Friedman. [7304302] (GR) [Entered: 04/16/2010 10:21 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                    DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 05/14/2010. Transcript due 06/14/2010. Appellant Sharon Ding and Appellant Mark Okano opening brief due 07/23/2010. Appellee Stephanie Baptista, Appellee Bradley S. Hureth, Appellee Eric Ross and Appellee Trex Company, Inc. answering brief due 08/23/2010. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7304282] (GR) [Entered: 04/16/2010 10:17 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 108 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?