USA v. Perales-Munoz et al
Criminal Case Puerto Rico District Court, Case No. 3:15-cr-00657-GAG-BJM-2

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 20, 2017 at 8:50 PM DT (4.2 years ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Olga B. Castellon-Miranda +1 787 766 5656 +1 787 766 5398 olga.b.castellon@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Juan
Filed 10/21/2015
County San Juan
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 666A.F
Offense Level 4
18666(a)(1)(A) CONSPIRACY
Count 14-19
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
181028A(a)(1) and 2 A/A FRAUD WITH IDENTIFICATION DOCUMENTS
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349 and 1343 ATTEMPT AND CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT MAIL FRAUD
Count 3-13
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 and 2 A/A FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION
Count 14s-19s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
181028(A)(C)AGGRAVATED IDENTITY THEFT
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 CONSPIRACY
Count 2s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 641.F
Offense Level 4
18641 and 2 A/A; THEFT OF GOVERNMENT FUNDS
Count 3s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 AND 1349 CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT WIRE FRAUD
Count 4s-13s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 AND 2 A/A; WIRE FRAUD
Defendant Custody Status Released
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Return of Surety
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Subpoena Returned executed
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Subpoena Returned executed
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Continue
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Discovery
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/29/2017, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/29/2017, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION to Dismiss Superseding Indictment by Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/31/2016 (Bandas-Del-Pilar, Raul)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 46 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                    ORDER: Granting [45] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2) as follows: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss at Docket No. 25 is hereby MOOT. Defendant must renew his Motion to Dismiss as to superseding indictment on or before June 1, 2016. Government then will have until June 15, 2016 to respond. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/12/2016. (COL)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016, Terminated: 5/12/2016 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [25] MOTION to Dismiss by USA as to Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/31/2016 (Castellon-Miranda, Olga)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 41 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: 5/4/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER as to Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2) re [36] Waiver of Indictment filed by Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez: Although the event chosen was the incorrect one, the waiver of presence at arraignment is granted and a plea of not guilty is entered as to all counts. The parties will have 7 days for discovery and 14 days thereafter to file any motions. Case is referred to Judge Gelpi for scheduling. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 5/4/2016.(yr)
                          LREF
                          Blank 39 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: 5/3/2016 Memorandum of the ClerkCourt Filing
                          MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK as to Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2): Pursuant to the Order (docket entry 33) entered by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/3/16, the [24] Motion to travel has been referred to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. Signed by Clerk on 5/3/16.(gsr)
                            LREF
                            Blank 38 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: 5/3/2016 Order on Motion under Rule 12Court Filing
                            ORDER: Noted [37] Motion under Rule 12 as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/3/2016. (COL)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: 5/3/2016, Terminated: 5/3/2016 Motion under Rule 12
                              MOTION under Rule 12 Designation of Evidence by USA as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/20/2016 (Soto-Ortega, Amanda)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: 5/3/2016 Waiver of Indictment
                                WAIVER of Reading of Superseding Indictment by Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2) (Bandas-Del-Pilar, Raul) Modified on 5/4/2016 as to event (mr).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 35 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: 5/3/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [24] Motion to Travel by Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez, subject to approval by the USPO. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 5/3/2016. (jm)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 44 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: 5/5/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi:Status Conference as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2) held on 5/2/2016: Present were AUSA Amanda Soto and Atty Raul Bandas. All pending motions were ruled upon in open court. The government informed discovery was provided. Defendant #1 was also indicted in case 15-655 JAG and 15-656 FAB, the government will try to negotiate a plea for all three cases. The government informed will be responding to the motion to dismiss filed by counsel as to defendant #2. A superseding indictment was filed on this case. Motion to travel will be referred to a magistrate judge. Further Status Conference set for 7/5/2016 at 9:00 AM in Old San Juan Courtroom before Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. The Court made a finding that the Speedy Trial remains tolled in the interest of justice which outweighs the best interest of the public and the defendants under 18 U.S.C. Sec. 3161(h)(7)(A) until the next conference. (Court Reporter Evilys Carrion.)Hearing set for 09:00.Hearing held at 10:13.Hearing ended at 10:17. (al)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 33 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER: as to Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2): Referring to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin [24] MOTION to Travel. GRANTING [32] MOTION for Discovery and Inspection. If any witness security issues arise, the matter will be discussed at the next pre-trial conference. GRANTING [29] MOTION for Discovery and Inspection (Designation of Evidence). DENYING without prejudice as premature [30] MOTION for Jencks Act Material . NOTED [19] INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Discovery filed by USA. As to [31] MOTION for Discovery and Inspection : all Giglio and Brady to be provided, with same caveat as to this Court's order re: Docket No. 32. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/2/2016. (COL)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/1/2016, Entered: 5/1/2016, Terminated: 5/2/2016 Motion for Discovery and Inspection
                                        MOTION for Discovery and Inspection by Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/19/2016 (Bandas-Del-Pilar, Raul)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/1/2016, Entered: 5/1/2016, Terminated: 5/2/2016 Motion for Discovery and Inspection
                                          MOTION for Discovery and Inspection by Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/19/2016 (Bandas-Del-Pilar, Raul)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/1/2016, Entered: 5/1/2016, Terminated: 5/2/2016 Motion for Jencks Act Material
                                            MOTION for Jencks Act Material by Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/19/2016 (Bandas-Del-Pilar, Raul)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/1/2016, Entered: 5/1/2016, Terminated: 5/2/2016 Motion for Discovery and Inspection
                                              MOTION for Discovery and Inspection (Designation of Evidence) by Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/19/2016 (Bandas-Del-Pilar, Raul)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016 Return of Indictment by Grand JuryCourt Filing
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2):Return of Superseding Indictment by Grand Jury held on 4/28/2016. Arraignment set for 5/5/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11 before US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive. (Court Reporter DCR.) (gav) (Main Document 34 replaced on 5/3/2016 to correct Judge's initials and Judge assigned) (mr).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: 4/29/2016 Indictment
                                                  SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s and Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s. (gav)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER: as to Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). The Government shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss at Docket No. [25], on or before May 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 4/26/2016. (COL)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016, Terminated: 4/28/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/12/2016 (Bandas-Del-Pilar, Raul)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016, Terminated: 5/2/2016 Travel
                                                        MOTION to Travel by Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/25/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bandas-Del-Pilar, Raul)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 5/5/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        STA and Discovery STANDING ORDERS as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2) Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/1/16.(al)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/10/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi:Status Conference as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2) held on 3/1/2016: Present were AUSA Victor Acevedo for Amanda Soto and Atty Raul Bandas also substituting Francisco Acevedo. Plea and discovery provided by the government. As to defendant #2 defense counsel informed that might end up going to trial as discovery is not pointing at him. Parties were granted additional time for negotiations and review of the evidence. Further Status Conference set for 5/2/2016 09:00 AM in Old San Juan Courtroom before Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. The Court made a finding that the Speedy Trial remains tolled in the interest of justice which outweighs the best interest of the public and the defendants under 18 U.S.C. Sec. 3161(h)(7)(A) until the next conference.(Court Reporter Evilys Carrion.)Hearing set for 09:00.Hearing held at 10:16.Hearing ended at 10:18. (al)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi:Status Conference as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2) held on 12/10/2015: Present were AUSA Amanda Soto and Atty Raul Bandas, (Francisco Acevedo was not present). Discovery was provided, need to meet with counsels to discuss plea agreement. Additional time was granted. Further Status Conference set for 3/1/2016 09:00 AM in Old San Juan Courtroom before Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. The Court made a finding that the Speedy Trial remains tolled in the interest of justice which outweighs the best interest of the public and the defendants under 18 U.S.C. Sec. 3161(h)(7)(A) until the next conference. (Court Reporter Evilys Carrion.)Hearing set for 09:00.Hearing held at 10:00.Hearing ended at 10:01. (al)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: 11/25/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2), Set/Reset Hearings as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2): Status Conference set for 12/10/2015 09:00 AM in Old San Juan Courtroom before Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/25/15.(al)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: 11/17/2015, Terminated: 5/2/2016 Informative Motion
                                                                INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Discovery by USA as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/4/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A. Acknowledgement Form for USAFx, # (2) Attachment B. USAFx External DOJ User Guide for Defense Counsel)(Castellon-Miranda, Olga)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Order on Motion Requesting OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [16] Motion Requesting Order as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2)Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/9/15. (al)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/16/2015 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                    *RESTRICTED* Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/22/2015 in case as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). (mr)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015, Terminated: 11/9/2015 Motion Requesting Order
                                                                      MOTION Requesting Order by USA as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/23/2015 (Castellon-Miranda, Olga)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin: Arraignment as to Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2) Count 1,2,3-13,14-19 held on 10/27/2015. Present: AUSA Amanda Soto and Atty. Raul Bandas. Dft is on Bond and present in court. Defendant was found competent to understand the proceedings. He waived the reading of the Indictment and entered a plea of not guilty as to all counts. The Government has 7 days to produce discovery and the defense has 14 days thereafter to file motions. Case is referred to Judge Gelpi for trial setting. (Court Reporter DCR.) Hearing set for 09:00. Hearing held at 09:31. Hearing ended at 09:33. (ari)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 Bond
                                                                          *RESTRICTED* Appearance Bond Entered as to Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2) in amount of $ 5,000; $2,500 in cash and $2,500 unsecured, Receipt # PRX100037262. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement) (mr)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Raul E. Bandas-Del-Pilar appearing for Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). (mr)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/28/2015 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER Setting Conditions of Release in the amount of $2,500 unsecured and $2,500 secured to be posted in seven (7) days. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 10/22/2015.(mr)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin: Initial Appearance / Detention Hearing as to Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2) held on 10/22/2015. Defendant was provided with copy of the Indictment and advised as to the charges and his rights. Also, defendant was advised of the applicable minimum and maximum statutory penalties that he is exposed to if convicted of the charges in the indictment. After reviewing the CJA-23 form filled by defendant, the Court deemed it appropriate to appoint counsel. Defendant will be represented by CJA counsel. The Court imposed bail in the amount of $2,500 unsecured and $2,500 secured to be posted in seven (7) days, plus all other standard conditions of release. Arraignment set for 10/27/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. (Court Reporter DCR.) Hearing held at 11:03. Hearing ended at 11:08. (ari)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 Financial Affidavit (CJA 23)
                                                                                  *RESTRICTED* CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). (ari)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Arrest
                                                                                    Arrest of Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2).(ari)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Warrant IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                      *RESTRICTED* Arrest Warrant Issued by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin in case as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). (mr)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Return of Indictment by Grand JuryCourt Filing
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin: Return of Indictment by Grand Jury as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2) held on 10/21/2015. Arraignment to be set upon arrest. Arrest warrant to be issued.
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Indictment -Sealed
                                                                                          SEALED INDICTMENT as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-13, 14-19, Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3-13, 14-19. (mr)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Order on Motion to Seal CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [1] Motion to Seal Case as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2) Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 10/21/2015. (mr)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Angel D. Rivera-Rodriguez (2). (mr)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 233 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?