USA v. Perales-Munoz et al
Criminal Case Puerto Rico District Court, Case No. 3:15-cr-00656-FAB-1

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 19, 2017 at 10:12 AM DT (4.2 years ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Olga B. Castellon-Miranda +1 787 766 5656 +1 787 766 5398 olga.b.castellon@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julio Cesar Alejandro-Serrano +1 787 647 6632 +1 775 366 7629 alejandroj.abogadopr@gmail.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Juan
Filed 10/21/2015
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES
Count 16-22
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
181028A (a)(1) AND 2 AGGRAVATED IDENTITY THEFT
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 AND 1349 FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION
Count 3-15
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 AND 2 FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION
Count 17s-23s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
181028A(a)(1) and 2 A/A AGGRAVATED IDENTITY THEFT
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES
Count 2s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 641.F
Offense Level 4
18641 and 2 A/A THEFT OF GOVERNMENT FUNDS
Count 3s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349 and 1343 CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT WIRE FRAUD
Count 4s-16s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 and 2 A/A FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flag JUDGE
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Return of Surety
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: 4/29/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
      ***SELECTED PARTIES***Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Francisco A. Besosa: Status Conference as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1) held on 4/29/2016. (Court Reporter Joe Reynosa.)Hearing set for 09:00.Hearing held at 09:51.Hearing ended at 09:55. (grf)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 48 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: 4/29/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Francisco A. Besosa: Status Conference as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) held on 4/29/2016. Present: AUSA Olga Castellon and Atty. Francisco Acevedo (also covering for Atty. Julio Alejandro). Government indicated that all discovery was provided. As to defendant Quinones-Pacheco (2) a motion to dismiss (Docket No. 47) is pending. A further status conference will be scheduled once the motion is decided. The STA is tolled until the next conference in the interest of justice. The Court finds that the need of defendants and attorneys to further negotiate or adequately prepare for trial outweighs defendants' and the community's interest in a speedy trial.(Court Reporter Joe Reynosa.)Hearing set for 09:00.Hearing held at 09:50.Hearing ended at 09:55. (grf)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: 4/13/2016 Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION to Dismiss due to TIME BAR by Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/2/2016 (Alejandro-Serrano, Julio)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
            ***SELECTED PARTIES***Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Francisco A. Besosa: Scheduling Conference as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1) held on 4/6/2016. A Further Status Conference was set for 4/29/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. (Court Reporter Joe Reynosa.)Hearing set for 09:00.Hearing held at 10:00.Hearing ended at 10:09. (grf)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 45 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Francisco A. Besosa: Scheduling Conference as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) held on 4/6/2016. Present: SAUSA Amanda Soto and Attys. Francisco Acevedo and Julio Alejandro. Government informed that all discovery was provided, plea offers were tendered. Atty. Alejandro stated that a motion to renew the motion to dismiss may be filed; deadline to file motion set for 4/13/2016. A further status conference was scheduled at which time defense counsel will have a better idea of how the case may be resolved. Motion due by 4/13/2016. A Further Status Conference was set for 4/29/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. The STA is tolled until the next conference in the interest of justice. The Court finds that the need of defendants and counsel to further negotiate or adequately prepare for trial outweighs defendants' and the community's interest in a speedy trial.(Court Reporter Joe Reynosa.)Hearing set for 09:00.Hearing held at 10:00.Hearing ended at 10:09. (grf)
                LREF
                Blank 44 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) : Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 3/29/2016.(grf)
                  LREF
                  Blank 43 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll: Arraignment as to Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) held on 3/23/2016. Present: AUSA Alexander Alum and Defense Counsel Julio Alejandro. Defendant was present, on bond and did not require the services of the court interpreter. Defendant was found competent to understand the proceedings. He waived the reading of the Superseding Indictment and entered a plea of not guilty as to all counts. The parties will have 7 days for discovery and 14 days thereafter to file any motions. Case is referred to Judge Besosa for trial setting. (Court Reporter DCR.) Hearing set for 03:30. Hearing held at 03:51. Hearing ended at 03:55.Interpreter Mary Jo Smith. (sc)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: 3/23/2016 Waiver of Presence at Arraignment
                    WAIVER of Personal Appearance at Arraignment and Entry of Plea of Not Guilty by Angel Perales-Munoz (1) (Acevedo-Padilla, Francisco)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 38 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                      ORDER re [33] Motion to Dismiss as to Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2): DENIED without prejudice. A superseding indictment has been filed. (Docket No. 34.) Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/22/2016. (brc)
                        LREF
                        Blank 40 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Order on Motion to RestrictCourt Filing
                        ORDER re [37] Motion to Restrict as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1): GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/22/2016. (brc)
                          LREF
                          Blank 39 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                          ORDER re [36] Motion to Continue as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1): GRANTED. A Superseding Indictment has been filed. (Docket No. 34.) A revised scheduling order will issue. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/22/2016. (brc)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016, Terminated: 3/22/2016 Dismiss
                            MOTION to Dismiss all counts due to time bar by Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/8/2016 (Alejandro-Serrano, Julio)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016, Terminated: 3/22/2016 Motion to Restrict
                              MOTION to Restrict Document [Dkt. No. 36] by Angel Perales-Munoz (1). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/8/2016 (Acevedo-Padilla, Francisco)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016, Terminated: 3/22/2016 Motion to Continue
                                ***SELECTED PARTIES***Emergency MOTION to Continue Jury Trial scheduled for Monday, March 28, 2016 by USA, Angel Perales-Munoz (1) as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/8/2016 (Acevedo-Padilla, Francisco)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) (Alejandro-Serrano, Julio)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Return of Indictment by Grand JuryCourt Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll: Return of Indictment by Grand Jury as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) held on 3/22/2016. Set Hearings as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2): Arraignment set for 3/23/2016 03:30 PM in Courtroom 8 before US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. (nat)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Indictment
                                      SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s-16s, 17s-23s, Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s-16s, 17s-23s. (nat) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2016: # (1) NPV Superseding Indictment) (gav).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 31 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: 3/11/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1) and Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2). The parties will file their respective proposed voir dire questions and proposed jury instructions no later than March 18, 2016. No extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/11/2016. (brc)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 28 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: 2/16/2016 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
                                          ORDER re [27] Motion to Vacate as to Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2): DENIED. The government will produce the discovery requested by defendant no later than February 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/16/2016. (brc)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: 2/17/2016 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                            ***SELECTED PARTIES***Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Francisco A. Besosa: Pretrial Conference as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1) held on 2/17/2016. Jury Trial re-set for 3/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. (Court Reporter Joe Reynosa.)Hearing set for 09:00.Hearing held at 09:32.Hearing ended at 09:49. (grf)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: 2/16/2016, Terminated: 2/16/2016 Vacate
                                              MOTION to Vacate setting of Jury Trial by Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/4/2016 (Alejandro-Serrano, Julio)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 29 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: 2/17/2016 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Francisco A. Besosa: Pretrial Conference as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) held on 2/17/2016. Present: AUSA Olga Castellon and Attys. Francisco Acevedo and Julio Alejandro. Government informed that military file of defendant #2 is available and will be uploaded to the cloud today. Status of additional discovery requested by defendant was discussed. Government suggested that a meeting with case agent and herself next week may assist counsel. Other military records requested by counsel are not part of the evidence; counsel may obtain them through his client or at the National Guard Bureau. Atty. Alejandro requested copy of a protocol manual and/or training modules, if available. The Court instructed defense counsel to meet with case agent. Jury Trial continued for 3/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. The STA is tolled in the interest of justice. The Court finds that the need of defendants and counsel to further negotiate or adequately prepare for trial outweighs defendants and the community's interest in a speedy trial.(Court Reporter Joe Reynosa.)Hearing set for 09:00.Hearing held at 09:32.Hearing ended at 09:49. (grf)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Francisco A. Besosa: Status Conference as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) held on 1/21/2016. Present: SAUSA Amanda Soto and Attys. Francisco Acevedo and Julio Alejandro. Government informed that the military profile for defendant Quinones-Pacheco (#2) was received; access will be provided to defense counsel by 1/22/2016. Additional discovery has been requested by Atty. Alejandro. Defendant does not intend to enter into plea negotiations at this time. As to defendant Perales-Munoz (#1), the parties will meet no later than 1/29/2016 to discuss an offer that may include all three of defendant's cases. Motions for change of plea due by 2/12/2016. If going to trial, proposed voir dire questions and proposed jury instructions due by 2/17/2016. Pretrial Conference (or for change of plea hearings if motions are filed) set for 2/17/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Jury Trial set for 2/29/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. (Court Reporter Joe Reynosa.)Hearing set for 09:00.Hearing held at 10:39.Hearing ended at 10:44. (grf)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: 12/3/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Francisco A. Besosa: Status Conference as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) held on 12/3/2015. Present: SAUSA Amanda Soto and Atty. Julio Alejandro (also substituting for Atty. Francisco Acevedo). Government informed that all discovery was provided, except for the military profile of defendant Quinones-Pacheco. Defendant Perales-Munoz is also indicted in Cr. 15-655(JAG) and in Cr. 15-657(GAG). Transfer of this case, as to defendant Perales-Munoz, to Judge Garcia-Gregory was discussed; motion to transfer would be granted, subject to Judge Garcia-Gregory's consent. Defense counsel requested additional time to review discovery, which is extensive. Government did not object. Scheduling order was vacated. A Further Status Conference was set for 1/21/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. The STA is tolled until the next status conference in the interest of justice. The Court finds that the need of defendants and defense counsel to conclude discovery in this case outweighs defendants' and the community's interest in a speedy trial.(Court Reporter Evy Carrion.)Hearing set for 09:00.Hearing held at 10:16.Hearing ended at 10:30. (grf)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015 Order on Motion under Rule 12Court Filing
                                                      ORDER re [23] Motion Under Rule 12 as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1) and Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2): NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/02/2015. (brc)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015, Terminated: 12/2/2015 Motion under Rule 12
                                                        MOTION under Rule 12 Designation of Evidence by USA as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/21/2015 (Castellon-Miranda, Olga)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015 Order on Motion to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER re [21] Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1): GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/02/2015. (brc)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015, Terminated: 12/2/2015 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                            MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Angel Perales-Munoz (1). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/21/2015 (Acevedo-Padilla, Francisco)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: 11/17/2015 Order on Informative MotionCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER re [19] Informative Motion as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1) and Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2). Notice of Use of USA File Exchange is NOTED. Request for reciprocal discovery is GRANTED, but the defense may provide it no later than 10 days before trial. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/17/2015. (brc)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: 11/17/2015, Terminated: 11/17/2015 Informative Motion
                                                                INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Discovery by USA as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/4/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A. Acknowledgement Form for USAFx, # (2) Attachment B. USAFx External DOJ User Guide for Defense Counsel)(Castellon-Miranda, Olga)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                  *RESTRICTED* Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/22/15 in case as to Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2). (ab)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: 11/16/2015 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) : Rule 16 discovery due by 11/16/2015. Motion for change of plea deadline 12/18/2015. Jury Trial set for 12/28/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Status Conference set for 12/3/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/16/2015.(grf)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Order on Motion Requesting OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER re [14] Motion Requesting Order as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1) and Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2). Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/10/2015. (brc)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 Bond
                                                                        *RESTRICTED* Appearance Bond Entered as to Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) in amount of $25,000.00 ($12,500.00 in cash & $12,500.00 unsecured), Receipt # PRX100037428. (ab)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                          *RESTRICTED* Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/22/2015 in case as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1). (ab)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin: Arraignment as to Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) Count 1,2,3-15,16-22 held on 10/27/2015. Present: AUSA Amanda Soto and Atty. Julio Alejandro-Serrano. Dft is on bond and present in court. Defendant was found competent to understand the proceedings. He/She waived the reading of the Indictment and entered a plea of not guilty as to count(s). The Government has 7 days to produce discovery and the defense has 14 days thereafter to file motions. Case is referred to Judge for trial setting. (Court Reporter DCR.)Hearing set for 09:00.Hearing held at 10:39.Hearing ended at 10:40.Interpreter Marie Hernandez. (ari)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015, Terminated: 11/10/2015 Motion Requesting Order
                                                                              MOTION Requesting Order by USA as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2). Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/23/2015 (Castellon-Miranda, Olga)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) $12,500.00 unsecured and $12,500 secured to be posted in seven days. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 10/22/2015.(ab)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin:Initial Appearance/Detention Hearing as to Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) held on 10/22/2015. Defendant was provided with copy of the Indictment and advised as to the charges and his rights. After reviewing the CJA-23 form filled by defendant, the Court deemed it appropriate to appoint counsel. Defendant will be represented by CJA counsel. The Court imposed bail in the amount of $12,500 unsecured and $12,500 secured to be posted in seven (7) days, plus all other standard conditions of release apply. Arraignment set for 10/27/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. (Court Reporter DCR.) Hearing held at 10:51. Hearing ended at 10:57. Interpreter Felix Toledo. (ari)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1) in the amount of $2,500 unsecured and $2,500 secured to be posted in seven (7) days. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 10/22/2015.(mr) Modified on 10/29/2015 to add name of defendant (mr).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 Financial Affidavit (CJA 23)
                                                                                      *RESTRICTED* CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2). (ari)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/28/2015 Arraignment/DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin: Initial Appearance/Arraignment/Detention as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1) Count 1,2,3-15,16-22 held on 10/22/2015. Present: AUSA Olga Castellon, Atty. Francisco Acevedo, and USPO Alejandra Battle. Defendant was provided with copy of the Indictment and advised as to the charges and his rights. Also, defendant was advised of the applicable minimum and maximum statutory penalties that he is exposed to if convicted of the charges in the indictment. Defendant informed the Court that he has retained counsel. As to Arraignment, Defendant waived the reading of the Indictment and entered a plea of not guilty as to all counts. The Government has 7 days to produce discovery and the defense has 14 days thereafter to file motions. Case is referred to Judge Francisco Besosa for further proceedings. As to Detention, the Court imposed bail in the amount of $2,500 unsecured and $2,500 secured to be posted in seven (7) days, plus all other standard conditions of release. (Court Reporter DCR.) Hearing held at 02:54. Hearing ended at 03:05. Interpreter Marie Hernandez. (ari)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/28/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Francisco Acevedo-Padilla appearing for Angel Perales-Munoz (1). (ari)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank  CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                            CJA 20 as to Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2): Appointment of Attorney Julio Cesar Alejandro-Serrano for Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 10/22/2015.(ari)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Arrest
                                                                                              Arrest of Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2). (ari)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Warrant IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                *RESTRICTED* Arrest Warrant Issued by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin in case as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2). (ab)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Return of Indictment by Grand JuryCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin: Return of Indictment by Grand Jury as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) held on 10/21/2015. Warrant of arrest to be issued. (Court Reporter DCR.) (ab)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Indictment
                                                                                                    INDICTMENT as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1) counts 1, 2, 3-15, 16-22, Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2) counts 1, 2, 3-15, 16-22. (ab)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Order on Motion to Seal CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [1] Motion to Seal Case as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 10/21/2015. (ab)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Angel Perales-Munoz (1), Gregorio Quinones-Pacheco (2). (ab)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 874 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?