ESTATE OF ERNEST GOTTDIENER et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:15-cv-01245
District Judge Victor J. Wolski, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 8, 2021 at 3:44 PM DT (1.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ERVIN TAUSKY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Martin Oberlander +1 212 826 0357 +1 212 202 7624 fred55@aol.com
No Logo ESTATE OF ERNEST GOTTDIENER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Martin Oberlander +1 212 826 0357 +1 212 202 7624 fred55@aol.com
No Logo ESTATE OF JUDIT GOTTDIENER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Martin Oberlander +1 212 826 0357 +1 212 202 7624 fred55@aol.com
No Logo SUAN INVESTMENTS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Martin Oberlander +1 212 826 0357 +1 212 202 7624 fred55@aol.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher James Carney +1 202 305 7597 +1 202 514 8624 chris.carney@usdoj.gov
Space Lisa Lefante Donahue +1 202 353 9498 +1 202 514 8624 lisa.donahue@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Out of Time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Status Conference Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF this is identical to plaintiffs' previous filing on this even date at 5.00pm EDT, except it has been retypeset by hand to have wider than required margins, double spacing, and otherwise equal or exceed the requirements of the Rules for motion reply papers, notwithstanding that the earlier filed version is provably optimal in layout and typeset, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 50 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 18 Motion to Dismiss - Rules 12(b)(1) and (6), 32 Reply to Response to Motion , filed by USA. (Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 48 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER Notice of Compliance due by 10/3/2017. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 5, 2017 before Judge Victor J. Wolski. Total No. of Pages: 1-118. Procedures Re: Electronic Transcripts and Redactions. To order a copy of the proceeding (click HERE) Notice of Intent to Redact due 10/2/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/25/2017. (ac7) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript for proceedings held on April 5, 2017, in Washington, D.C. (ac7) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of TimeSupplemental Briefs due by 9/27/2017 Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/20/17 to file supp brief per order of court issued on or about July 20, 2017, filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 9/19/2017.(Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of TimeBrief due by 9/15/2017 Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/16/2017 to File supplemental brief. Such briefing ordered by ECF 41, filed by ESTATE OF ERNEST GOTTDIENER, ESTATE OF JUDIT GOTTDIENER, SUAN INVESTMENTS, ERVIN TAUSKY.Response due by 8/18/2017.(Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER re 18 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by USA Supplemental Brief due by 8/7/2017. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 38 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 4/5/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom before Judge Victor J. Wolski. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION for Leave to File 37 (previously approved supplemental) as a letter brief, rather than a formally styled brief, filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 3/27/2017.(Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 32 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss (please note this is a corrected event filing, see 36 , and is identical to the previous filing in all respects except for typographical corrections listed on the appended errata sheet),, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Decsion and Order, Kriss v. Bayrock, 10-cv-3959 (SDNY) (Dec. 2, 2016))(Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              SUR-REPLY re 35 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File this is a supplemental letter brief, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order in Kriss v. Bayrock)(Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of TimeSupplemental Paper due by 3/9/2017 Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 9, 2017 to File supplemental brief. , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 3/24/2017.(Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    Supplemental Paper Order Supplemental Paper Order due by 3/7/2017 Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. (Entered: 02/28/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint , filed by USA. (Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE, filed by All Plaintiffs of possible submission(s) from plaintiffs subsequent to the government's reply papers due November 30, 2016 (Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until November 30, 2016 to File Reply In Support Of Motion To Dimiss First Amended Complaint Reply due by 11/30/2016. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until November 30, 2016 to File Reply In Support Of Motion To Dimiss First Amended Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 11/14/2016.(Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              RESPONSE to 18 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint , filed by All Plaintiffs.Reply due by 10/31/2016. (Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 19, 2016 to Filing Opposition Papers , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 11/7/2016.(Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 24 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the government's motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint Response due by 10/17/2016. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the government's motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint, filed by ESTATE OF ERNEST GOTTDIENER, ESTATE OF JUDIT GOTTDIENER, SUAN INVESTMENTS, ERVIN TAUSKY.Response due by 10/28/2016.(Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in opposition to the motion of the defendant United States to dismiss the First Amended Complaint pursuant to 12(b)(6) Response due by 10/11/2016. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in opposition to the motion of the defendant United States to dismiss the First Amended Complaint pursuant to 12(b)(6), filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 10/17/2016.(Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Lefante Donahue for USA . (Donahue, Lisa) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Response due by 9/30/2016. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/30/2016 to File Response as to 18 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint , filed by ESTATE OF ERNEST GOTTDIENER, ESTATE OF JUDIT GOTTDIENER, SUAN INVESTMENTS, ERVIN TAUSKY.Response due by 9/12/2016.(Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 8/29/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Carney, Christopher) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Response due by 7/27/2016. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 15 Amended Complaint, , filed by USA.Response due by 6/30/2016.(Carney, Christopher) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA, filed by All Plaintiffs. Amendment to 14 Amended Complaint,, CORRECTED VERSION OF FIRST AMENDMENT COMPLAINT UPLOADED THIS DATE WITH THE CONSENT OF THE GOVERNMENT.Answer due by 6/27/2016. (Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA, filed by All Plaintiffs. .Answer due by 6/27/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A Press Release, # 2 Exhibit Exh B Sater Sentencing Transcript, # 3 Exhibit Exh C US v Coppa Indictment, # 4 Exhibit Exh D US v Sater Information, # 5 Exhibit Exh E US v Palagonia Sentencing Transcript, # 6 Exhibit Exh F Deposition of Palagonia, # 7 Exhibit Exh G Glasser order of restitution re Palagonia, # 8 Exhibit Exh H EDNY transcript re restitution liability of Alan Berkun, # 9 Exhibit Exh I SDNY RICO complaint re defendant Sater)(Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time Response or Amended Complaint due on or by Wednesday, June 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. Modified on 6/2/2016 to add deadlines(vdw). (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Third MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/8/2016 to respond to motion to dismiss , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 6/20/2016.(Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Response or Amended Complaint shall be filed on or by Wednesday, June 1, 2016. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. Modified on 5/3/2016 to add deadline to docket text(vdw). (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vdw) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to motion to dismiss complaint. , Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response, or amended complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 5/19/2016.(Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Victor J. Wolski. (vdw) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) , 7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) Response due by 5/2/2016. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 3/31/2016.(Oberlander, Frederick) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) , filed by USA.Response due by 3/24/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Carney, Christopher) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/22/16 to File Response as to 1 Complaint, Response due by 2/22/2016. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jad) Copy to parties. (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/22/16 to File Response as to 1 Complaint, , filed by USA.Response due by 12/28/2015.(Carney, Christopher) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Carney for USA . (Carney, Christopher) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against USA (DOJ) (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 9998-3034257) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by SUAN INVESTMENTS, ESTATE OF ERNEST GOTTDIENER, ERVIN TAUSKY, ESTATE OF JUDIT GOTTDIENER. Answer due by 12/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(vdw) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?