USA v. Vecham et al
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:15-cr-00427-BLF

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 24, 2017 at 11:56 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Countryman +1 415 436 7303 +1 415 436 6748 david.countryman@usdoj.gov
Space Timothy Joseph Lucey +1 415 436 7200 timothy.lucey@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Kishore Pallapothu, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edwin Prather

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin Ken Prather +1 415 881 7774 edwin@pratherlawoffices.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Swanson & McNamara LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Britt H Evangelist +1 415 477 3800 +1 415 477 9010 bevangelist@swansonmcnamara.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Jose
Filed 9/2/2015
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1546.F
Offense Level 4
18371 - Conspiracy to Commit Visa Fraud, Mail Fraud, Obstruction of Justice, Witness Tampering, and to Defraud the United States
Count 15-27
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341- Mail Fraud
Count 2-14
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1546.F
Offense Level 4
181546(a) - Visa Fraud
Count 28
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1505.F
Offense Level 4
181505 - Obstruction of Justice
Count 29-30
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1512B.F
Offense Level 4
181512(b)(3) - Witness Tampering
Count 32-33
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 - Loan Fraud
Count 34
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 - Wire Fraud
Count 35-36
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1957-7600.F
Offense Level 4
181957 - Money Laundering
Count 37-39
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 - Loan Fraud
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (133) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 113 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Clerk's NoticeCourt Filing
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING INITIAL APPEARANCE AND ARRAIGNMENT as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC and Lily 20 Hayward LLC : 2/16/2017 Initial Appearance and Arraignment reset to 4/25/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017 OrderCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: Continuance of Hearing (granting [111]) as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy. Status Conference set for 4/25/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/10/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017) Modified on 2/13/2017 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: 2/9/2017, Terminated: 2/10/2017 Stipulation
      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Continuance of Hearing as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota,, Ramana Reddy, filed by USA. (Lucey, Timothy) (Filed on 2/9/2017) (As to 4 dfts only) Modified on 2/13/2017 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
        Reset Hearing as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC: Status Conference set for 2/16/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
          LREF
          Blank  Electronic Filing Error
          Electronic Filing Error. Incorrect event used - [err101]Document must be linked AS TO DEFENDANT 1 only and not as to all defendants [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:[108] STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Ragini Vecham (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: 2/8/2017 Statement
            Statement Regarding Travel to Reno, Nevada [109] by Ragini Vecham (Clarence, Nanci) (Filed on 2/8/2017) Modified on 2/9/2017 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: 2/8/2017 OrderCourt Filing
              STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING TRAVEL TO RENO, NEVADA (granting [108]) as to Ragini Vecham. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/8/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: 2/7/2017, Terminated: 2/8/2017 Stipulation
                Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Travel to Reno, Nevada by Ragini Vecham as to Ragini Vecham (Clarence, Nanci) (Filed on 2/7/2017)(As to Dft 1 only, a Stipulation) Modified on 2/9/2017 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING DEFENDANT RAGINI VECHAM'S CONDITIONS OF RELEASE TO PERMIT TRAVEL OUT OF DISTRICT FROM JUNE 6 THROUGH JUNE 18, 2017, AND JULY 1 THROUGH JULY 7, 2017, granting 118 Stipulation as to Ragini Vecham (1) Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/31/17. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 107 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/14/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Status Conference as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy held on 12/13/2016. Possible Change of Plea/Further Status Conference set for 2/14/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Total Time in Court: 9:10 - 9:15. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Timothy Lucey. Defendant Attorney: Mary McNamara, Ethan Balogh, Ismail Ramsey. Defendants Present: Yes. Defendants in Custody: No. Excludable Delay: Effective Preparation of Counsel. Begins: 12/13/2016. Ends: 02/14/2017. This is a text only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Conditions of Release to Permit Travel Out of District From June 6, Through June 18, 2017, and July 1 Through July 7, 2017 as to Ragini Vecham . (Cohen, Josh) (Filed on 5/30/2017) Modified on 5/31/2017 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 106 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Clerk's NoticeCourt Filing
                        CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING DECEMBER 13, 2016 ARRAIGNMENT as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC and Lily 20 Hayward LLC: 12/13/2016 Arraignment is hereby vacated. Status Conference set for 2/16/2017 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING INITIAL APPEARANCE AND ARRAIGNMENT ON INDICTMENT as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC and Lily 20 Hayward LLC: 4/25/2017 Initial Appearance and Arraignment on Indictment is reset to 6/27/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 105 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: 12/1/2016 Clerk's Notice
                            CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME OF STATUS CONFERENCE as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy, Reset Time of Status Hearings, Status Conferences set for 12/13/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE STATUS CONFERENCE (granting 115 ) as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy. Status Conference set for 6/27/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/21/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2017) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 Clerk's NoticeCourt Filing
                                CLERK'S NOTICE as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC Arraignment set for 12/13/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy RE STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Kishore Pallapothu. (Prather, Edwin) (Filed on 4/20/2017) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 103 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016 Order
                                    JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE STATUS CONFERENCE **AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT** as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy (granting [102]). Status Conference set for 12/13/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Change of Address of Counsel by Kishore Pallapothu (Prather, Edwin) (Filed on 3/31/2017) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 102 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016, Terminated: 10/14/2016 Stipulation
                                        JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Status Conference filed by Kishore Pallapothu as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy . (Prather, Edwin) (Filed on 10/14/2016) Modified on 10/17/2016 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016 Clerk's Notice Continuance of Hearing
                                          CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME of STATUS HEARING as to Ragini Vecham. Status Conference set for 10/18/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016 Clerk's Notice Continuance of Hearing
                                            CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME of STATUS HEARING as to Kishore Pallapothu. Status Conference set for 10/18/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016 Clerk's Notice Continuance of Hearing
                                              CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME of STATUS HEARING as to Satyanarayana Tota. Status Conference set for 10/18/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016 Clerk's Notice Continuance of Hearing
                                                CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME of STATUS HEARING as to Ramana Reddy. Status Conference set for 10/18/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 Clerk's NoticeCourt Filing
                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC Arraignment set for 10/19/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016 Order
                                                    JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE OCTOBER 18, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE **AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT** (granting [95]) as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy. Status Conference set for 10/18/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 9/30/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: 9/29/2016, Terminated: 9/30/2016 Stipulation
                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy RE OCTOBER 18, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Kishore Pallapothu. (Prather, Edwin) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/11/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Status Conference as to Ramana Reddy held on 8/9/2016. Change of Plea/Further Status Hearing set for 10/4/2016 08:30 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher, Time in Court: 9:25 - 9:32.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/11/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Status Conference as to Satyanarayana Tota held on 8/9/2016. Change of Plea/Further Status Hearing set for 10/4/2016 08:30 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher, Time in Court: 9:25 - 9:32.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/11/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Status Conference as to Kishore Pallapothu held on 8/9/2016. Change of Plea/Further Status Hearing set for 10/4/2016 08:30 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher, Time in Court: 9:25 - 9:32.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/11/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Status Conference as to Ragini Vecham held on 8/9/2016. Change of Plea/Further Status Hearing set for 10/4/2016 08:30 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher, Time in Court: 9:25 - 9:32.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/9/2016 Clerk's NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC. Initial Appearance/Arraignment set for 10/4/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016 Clerk's Notice Continuance of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE Continuance of Hearing as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC Initial Appearance set for 8/9/2016 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                    Set/Reset Hearing as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC re [89] Clerk's Notice Continuance of Hearing, Arraignment set for 8/9/2016 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 88 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: 6/9/2016 Order
                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING STATUS AND EXCLUDING TIME as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy (granting [87]). Status Conference set for 8/9/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 6/9/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: 6/8/2016, Terminated: 6/9/2016 Stipulation
                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Continuance of Status Hearing as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy filed by USA. (Lucey, Timothy) (Filed on 6/8/2016)(As to 4 dfts only) Modified on 6/8/2016 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/8/2016 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016 Clerk's Notice
                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy. Reset Hearing, Status Conferences set for 7/5/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER ON AMENDED STIPULATION MODIFYING DEFENDANT RAGINI VECHAM'S CONDITIONS OF RELEASE TO PERMIT TRAVEL OUT OF DISTRICT FROM JUNE 5 THROUGH JUNE 22, 2016 AND JUNE 28 THROUGH JULY 15, 2016. finding as moot [83] Stipulation as to Ragini Vecham (1); granting [84] Stipulation as to Ragini Vecham (1). Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/27/16. (pmc, COURT STAFF)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 84 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016, Terminated: 5/27/2016 Stipulation
                                                                              AMENDED STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Conditions of Release to Permit Travel Out of District From June 5, Through June 22, 2016, and June 28 Through July 15, 2016 as to Ragini Vecham . (Cohen, Josh) (Filed on 5/26/2016) Modified on 5/27/2016 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016, Terminated: 5/27/2016 Stipulation
                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Conditions of Release to Permit Travel Out of District From June 5 Through June 22, 2016, and June 28, Through July 15, 2016 as to Ragini Vecham . (Cohen, Josh) (Filed on 5/26/2016) Modified on 5/27/2016 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/23/2016 Clerk's NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC. Initial Appearance/Arraignment set for 7/12/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/23/2016 Order
                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER (granting [80]) as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana. Status Conference set for 7/12/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman.Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/23/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/23/2016, Terminated: 5/23/2016 Stipulation
                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Status Hearing as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, and Ramana Reddy filed by USA. (Lucey, Timothy) (Filed on 5/23/2016)***(As to 4 dfts only)*** Modified on 5/23/2016 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/23/2016 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: 5/4/2016 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING MODIFICATION TO CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE granting [78] Stipulation as to Satyanarayana Tota (3). Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/3/16. (pmc, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: 5/3/2016, Terminated: 5/3/2016 Stipulation
                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Satyanarayana Tota TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Balogh, Ethan) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/27/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Status Conference as to Ramana Reddy held on 4/26/2016 Status Conference set for 5/24/2016 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher, Time in Court: 9:27 -9:31.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/27/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Status Conference as to Satyanarayana Tota held on 4/26/2016 Status Conference set for 5/24/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher, Time in Court: 9:27 - 9:31.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/27/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Status Conference as to Kishore Pallapothu held on 4/26/2016. Further Status Conference set for 5/24/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher, Time in Court: 9:27 - 9:31.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/27/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Status Conference as to Ragini Vecham held on 4/26/2016. Further Status Conference set for 5/24/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher, Time in Court: 9:27 - 9:31.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: 4/19/2016 Clerk's Notice Continuance of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING MAY 25, 2016 INITIAL APPEARANCE AND ARRAIGNMENT HEARING as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC and Lily 20 Hayward LLC: 5/25/2016 Initial Appearance and Arraignment advanced to 5/24/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: 4/19/2016 Clerk's Notice Continuance of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING APRIL 19, 2016 INITIAL APPEARANCE AND ARRAIGNMENT HEARING as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC and Lily 20 Hayward LLC: 4/19/2016 Initial Appearance and Arraignment reset to 5/25/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Order
                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy (approving [70]). Status Conference set for 4/26/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 3/27/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016, Terminated: 3/17/2016 Stipulation
                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Continuance of Hearing and Exclusion of Time> as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, and Ramana Reddy filed by USA. (Lucey, Timothy) (Filed on 3/17/2016)***(As to 4 dfts only)*** Modified on 3/18/2016 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearing Initial Appearance set for 4/19/2016 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal as to defendants Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 69 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Beth Labson Freeman:Status Conference as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy held on 1/26/2016. Further Status Conference set for 3/22/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Time excluded from 1/26/2016 to 3/22/2016. Government to prepare and submit exclusion order. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher. Time in Court: 4 minutes, 9:03 - 9:07 AM). (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Clerk's Notice Continuance of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC. Arraignment set for 3/4/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                  Reset Hearing as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC. Initial Appearance set for 3/4/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016 Clerk's NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING JANUARY 22, 2016 INITIAL APPEARANCE AND ARRAIGNMENT as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC and Lily 20 Hayward LLC: Due to Judge Grewal's unavailability, 1/22/2016 Initial Appearance and Arraignment is rescheduled for 1/22/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING MODIFICATION TO CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE, granting [65] Stipulation as to Satyanarayana Tota (3). Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/5/16. (pmc, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: 1/4/2016, Terminated: 1/5/2016 Stipulation
                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Modify Conditions of Pretrial Release as to Satyanarayana Tota . (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Balogh, Ethan) (Filed on 1/4/2016) Modified on 1/6/2016 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                          Reset Hearing as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC: Initial Appearance and Arraignment set for 1/22/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                            Reset Hearing as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC: Initial Appearance/Arraignment set for 12/15/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015 Order
                                                                                                                              ORDER APPROVING [63] JOINT STIPULATION RE STATUS CONFERENCE as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy. Status Conference set for 1/26/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 12/2/2015. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015, Terminated: 12/2/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Status Conference as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy filed by Kishore Pallapothu. (Prather, Edwin) (Filed on 12/2/2015)***(As to 4 dfts only)*** Modified on 12/3/2015 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearing Arraignment set for 12/7/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Initial Appearance set for 12/7/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. For all corporate defendants. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE STIPULATION REGARDING TRAVEL TO RENO NEVADA, granting [61] Stipulation as to Ragini Vecham (1). Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/23/15. (pmc, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/25/2015 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: 11/20/2015, Terminated: 11/23/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Travel to Reno, Nevada as to Ragini Vecham . (Clarence, Nanci) (Filed on 11/20/2015) Modified on 11/24/2015 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Clerk's Notice Continuance of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE Continuance of Hearing as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC Arraignment set for 11/30/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Initial Appearance set for 11/30/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nanci L. Clarence appearing for Ragini Vecham (Clarence, Nanci) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE FROM NOVEMBER 3, 2015 TO DECEMBER 8, 2015 as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy (approving [57]). Status Conference set for 12/8/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 11/2/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                              Motions terminated: [57] STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 11/2/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: 10/30/2015, Terminated: 11/2/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Status Conference From November 3, 2015 to December 8, 2015 as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy filed by Kishore Pallapothu . (McNamara, Mary) (Filed on 10/30/2015)***(As to 4 dfts only)*** Modified on 11/3/2015 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: 10/30/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Britt H Evangelist appearing for Kishore Pallapothu (Evangelist, Britt) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: 10/30/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mary Geraldine McNamara appearing for Kishore Pallapothu (McNamara, Mary) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 Clerk's NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING OCTOBER 30, 2015 INITIAL APPEARANCE AND ARRAIGNMENT ON INDICTMENT as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC and Lily 20 Hayward LLC: 10/30/2015 Initial Appearance and Arraignment is reset to 11/12/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal: Status Conference as to Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC held on 10/26/2015. Attorney A. Marisa Chun makes general appearance for corporate defendants. Corporate officer not present. Matter continued to allow parties to discuss need for corporate officer to be present for arraignment. Initial Appearance and Arraignment on Indictment continued to 10/30/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (Court Reporter FTR: 3:54 to 4:02.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amy E Craig appearing for Ramana Reddy (Craig, Amy) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                            Receipt # 54611015852 for Short Form Deed of Trust #23117920 from Ragini Vecham receipted on 10/16/15 as to Ragini Vecham (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: 10/16/2015 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd:Bond Hearing as to Ragini Vecham held on 10/16/2015. Counsel report that the property will be posted today. (Recording #1:30-1:35.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                Set Hearings as to Dfts 4,5,7,8,9,10,& 11- Initial Appearance set for 10/26/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 49 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/16/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015 Order
                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE (approving [46])as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Ramana Reddy. Status Conference set for 11/3/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 10/9/2015. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015, Terminated: 10/9/2015 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Continuance of Hearing and Exclusion of Time as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Ramana Reddy, Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC filed by USA. (Lucey, Timothy) (Filed on 10/8/2015) Modified on 10/13/2015 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd:Bond Hearing as to Ramana Reddy held on 9/30/2015 Status Conference set for 10/20/2015 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (Recording #1:44-1:47.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Generally: Ismail Jomo Ramsey appearing for Ramana Reddy (Ramsey, Ismail) (Filed on 9/30/2015) Modified on 10/1/2015 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                            Recorded Notice of Lis Pendens as to RP at 280 Flint Court, San Lorenzo, CA 94580 by USA as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Ramana Reddy, Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC (Countryman, David) (Filed on 9/25/2015) Modified on 9/28/2015 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                              Recorded Notice of Lis Pendens at to RP at 27435 Manon Avenue, Hayward, CA 94544 by USA as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Ramana Reddy, Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC (Countryman, David) (Filed on 9/25/2015) Modified on 9/28/2015 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                Recorded Notice of Lis Pendens as to RP at 27405 Manon Avenue, Hayward, CA 94544 by USA as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Ramana Reddy, Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC (Countryman, David) (Filed on 9/25/2015) Modified on 9/28/2015 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Recorded Notice of Lis Pendens as to RP at 27331-27371 Manon Avenue, Hayward, CA 94544 by USA as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Ramana Reddy, Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC (Countryman, David) (Filed on 9/25/2015) Modified on 9/28/2015 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Recorded Notice of Lis Pendens as to RP at 29125 Dixon Street, Hayward, CA 94554 by USA as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Ramana Reddy, Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC (Countryman, David) (Filed on 9/25/2015) Modified on 9/28/2015 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Recorded Notice of Lis Pendens as to RP at 10576 Johnson Ave., Cupertino, CA 95014 by USA as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Ramana Reddy, Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC (Countryman, David) (Filed on 9/25/2015) Modified on 9/28/2015 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/18/2015 ID of Counsel HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd: ID of Counsel Hearing;Ismail Ramsey (specially appearing) as to Ramana Reddy held on 9/17/2015, Bond Hearing as to Ramana Reddy held on 9/17/2015. Further Attorney Appointment Hearing & Bond Hearing set for 9/30/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Ragini Vecham (1) $200,000 PROPERTY BOND (Secured by equity in family home) Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/17/15. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015) Modified on 9/18/2015 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd:Bond Hearing as to Ragini Vecham held on 9/17/2015 Further Bond Hearing set for 10/16/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Status Conference set for 10/20/2015 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (Court Reporter ftr.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd:Bond Hearing as to Kishore Pallapothu held on 9/17/2015 Status Conference set for 10/20/2015 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (Court Reporter ftr.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd:Bond Hearing as to Satyanarayana Tota held on 9/16/2015 Status Conference set for 10/13/2015 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (Recording #2:54-3:20.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearing Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 9/16/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Bond Hearing set for 9/16/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NO Bail Warrant Returned Executed on 9/3/15 as to Ramana Reddy. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NO Bail Warrant Returned Executed on 9/3/15 as to Satyanarayana Tota. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NO Bail Warrant Returned Executed on 9/3/15 as to Kishore Pallapothu. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NO Bail Warrant Returned Executed on 9/3/15 as to Ragini Vecham. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Satyanarayana Tota (3) $250,000 DEFENDANT'S SIGNATURE BOND. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/3/15. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd:Initial Appearance; Attorney Ethan Balogh present (specially appearing) as to Satyanarayana Tota held on 9/3/2015. Motion to UNSEAL Indictment is GRANTED. Attorney Appointment/Bond Hearing set for 9/17/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Ramana Reddy (6) $200,000 DEFENDANT'S SIGNATURE BOND (Temporary) Secured by Equity in Property. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/3/15. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd:Initial Appearance; Attorney Edwin Prather (specially appearing) as to Ramana Reddy held on 9/3/2015. Motion to UNSEAL Indictment is GRANTED. Attorney Appointment & Bond Hearing set for 9/17/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Ragini Vecham (1) $400,000 DEFENDANT'S SIGNATURE BOND. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/3/15. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd:Initial Appearance; Attorney Edwin Ken Prather present as to Ragini Vecham held on 9/3/2015, Added attorney for Ragini Vecham. Arraigned NOT GUILTY as to Ragini Vecham (1) Counts 1,2-14,15-27,32-33,34,35-36,37-39 held on 9/3/2015. Motion to UNSEAL Indictment is GRANTED. Bond Hearing set for 9/17/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd:Arraigned NOT GUILTY as to Kishore Pallapothu (2) Counts 1,2-14,15-27,28,29-30,32-33,34,35-36,37-39 held on 9/3/2015. Defendant is released on the Conditions of Release set in March 13, 2014. Bond Hearing set for 9/17/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Hearing re [25], Bond Hearing set for 9/17/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Case Referred to ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: 9/3/2015 Order to Seal CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order to Seal Indictment and Arrest Warrants as to Kishore Pallapothu, Ragini Vecham, Satyanarayana Tota, Horizon Technologies, Inc., Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc., Ramana Reddy, Rose 23 Hayward LLC, Sage 20 Hayward LLC, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC, Lily 20 Hayward LLC. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/2/15. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015) (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: 9/3/2015 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                INDICTMENT as to Ragini Vecham (1) count(s) 1, 2-14, 15-27, 32-33, 34, 35-36, 37-39, Kishore Pallapothu (2) count(s) 1, 2-14, 15-27, 28, 29-30, 32-33, 34, 35-36, 37-39, Satyanarayana Tota (3) count(s) 1, 31, Horizon Technologies, Inc. (4) count(s) 1, 34, 35-36, Softnet Technology Solutions, Inc. (5) count(s) 1, 34, Ramana Reddy (6) count(s) 1, Rose 23 Hayward LLC (7) count(s) 1, 32, 34, 35-36, Sage 20 Hayward LLC (8) count(s) 1, 33, Jasmine 20 Hayward LLC (9) count(s) 1, 2-14, 37, Tulip 26 Hayward LLC (10) count(s) 1, 38, Lily 20 Hayward LLC (11) count(s) 1, 39. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2015: # (1) Penalty Sheets, # (2) Criminal Cover Sheet) (cfeS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/8/2015 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE MODIFICATION OF PRETRIAL RELEASE CONDITIONS TO ALLOW FOR OUT-OF-DISTRICT TRAVEL as to Kishore Pallapothu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal on 7/27/2015. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION as to Kishore Pallapothu. Preliminary Hearing/Arraignment set for 9/3/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 6/26/2015. (lhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2015)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Kishore Pallapothu 4/17/2015 Preliminary Hearing/Arraignment reset to 6/29/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal on 4/16/2015. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: 2/10/2015 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Kishore Pallapothu 2/11/2015 Preliminary Hearing/Arraignment reset to 4/17/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal on 2/10/2015. ( ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE MODIFICATION OF PRETRIAL RELEASE CONDITIONS as to Kishore Pallapothu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal on 12/10/2014. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER AND STIPULATION as to Kishore Pallapothu Arraignment set for 2/11/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal.. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/9/14. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Kishore Pallapothu Arraignment set for 12/10/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/27/14. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: 9/3/2014 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Kishore Pallapothu: 9/4/2014 Preliminary Hearing/Arraignment is continued to 10/29/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal on 9/3/2014. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Kishore Pallapothu: 5/28/2014 Bond Hearing and Arraignment continued to 9/4/2014 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 5/23/2014. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: 4/8/2014 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Hearing as to Kishore Pallapothu. Bond Hearing set for 5/28/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Arraignment set for 5/28/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal on 4/7/14. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: 3/27/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal:Status Conference as to Kishore Pallapothu held on 3/27/2014. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Kishore Pallapothu (1) $400,000.00 UNSECURED BOND. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal on 3/13 /14. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal:Attorney Appointment Hearing, Atty Edwin K. Prather for Kishore Pallapothu. Bond Hearing as to Kishore Pallapothu held on 3/13/2014. Defendant's wife Ragini Vecham is added as a surety. Bond amount is increased from $250,000 to $400,000. Location Monitoring & Curfew Condition is deleted. Bond Hearing set for 4/14/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (Court Reporter FTR.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Attorney update in case as to Kishore Pallapothu. Attorney Edwin Ken Prather for Kishore Pallapothu added. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NO Bail Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/6/14 as to Kishore Pallapothu. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Kishore Pallapothu (1) $250,000 UNSECURED BOND. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal on 3/5/14. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal:Initial Appearance;Attorney Robert Carlin (specially appearing) for purposes of assisting with bond as to Kishore Pallapothu held on 3/6/2014.Mr. Pallapothu plans to retain counsel. Complaint to remain SEALED. Bond Hearing set for 3/13/2014 08:30 AM and Preliminary Hearing/Arraignment set for 3/27/14 @ 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal.in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose.(Court Reporter FTR.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Hearing [4] - Preliminary Hearing/ Arraignment set for 3/27/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER to Issue an Arrest Warrant as to Kishore Pallapothu. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal on 3/5/14. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 Order to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order to Seal Criminal Complaint a as to Kishore Pallapothu. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal on 3/4/14. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*] (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 Complaint (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT as to Kishore Pallapothu (1). (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)[5:14-mj-70298-PSG *SEALED*] (cfeS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/8/2015 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 3,123 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?