IN RE: Bard IVC Filters Products Liability Litigation
Federal Court Proceeding Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:15-md-02641
District Judge David G Campbell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 16, 2021 at 4:02 PM DT (1.2 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Abbie Hill, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Abdul-Mutaal Bilal, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niemeyer and Grebel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Grebel +1 314 241 1919 +1 314 665 3017 grebel@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S Kruse +1 314 963 9000 +1 314 665 3017 kruse@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Niemeyer +1 314 387 9181 +1 314 665 3017 niemeyer@ngklawfirm.com
No Logo Abigail K Wittenbert, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Adam King, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M Hammers, Jr. +1 770 394 0047 rob@schneiderhammers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by schneiderhammers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip J Pendergrass, Jr. +1 770 394 0047 +1 404 600 2626 philip@schneiderhammers.com
No Logo Adam T Tran, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by TORISEVA LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
No Logo Adrienne Ward, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pogust, Braslow, & Millrood, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael G. Daly +1 610 941 4204 +1 610 941 4245 mdaly@pbmattorneys.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Matthew Leckman +1 610 941 4204 +1 610 941 4245 mleckman@pbmattorneys.com
No Logo Alan Ennis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE COCHRAN FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph David Lane +1 334 793 1555 +1 334 793 8280 jlane@cochranfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela J. Mason +1 334 673 1555 +1 334 699 7229 angelamason@cochranfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright & Schulte, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Schulte +1 937 435 7500 +1 937 435 7511 rschulte@yourlegalhelp.com
No Logo Alan Frailich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Gallagher , +1 713 222 8080 +1 713 222 0066 shawnaf@gld-law.com
No Logo Alan R Bushman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Alana Adams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niemeyer and Grebel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Grebel +1 314 241 1919 +1 314 665 3017 grebel@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S Kruse +1 314 963 9000 +1 314 665 3017 kruse@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Niemeyer +1 314 387 9181 +1 314 665 3017 niemeyer@ngklawfirm.com
No Logo Alana Bond, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Law Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tayjes Matthew Shah +1 540 672 4224
No Logo Alana Darlene Adams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Albert A Noa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/28/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leslie Frank Weisbrod +1 214 987 0005 +1 214 987 2545 lweisbrod@mcwlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MILLER CURTIS & WEISBROD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/28/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Max E Freeman +1 214 987 0005 +1 214 987 2545 mfreeman@mcwlawfirm.com
TERMINATED: 07/28/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Les F Weisbrod +1 214 987 0005 +1 214 987 2545 lweisbrod@millerweisbrod.com
No Logo Albert Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LOWE LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Buttars +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 nate@lowelawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Peck +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 jonathan@lowelawgroup.com
No Logo Albert Miller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fears Nachawati PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew R McCarley +1 214 890 0711 +1 214 890 0712 mccarley@fnlawfirm.com
(MD TN - 3:15cv533) Matthew R McCarley +1 214 890 0711 +1 214 890 0712 mccarley@fnlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Bryan Smith +1 901 523 1222 +1 901 523 1999 BryanS@forthepeople.com
No Logo Alec Caldwell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Phillip Cartmell +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 tcartmell@wagstaffcartmell.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Conrad Degreeff +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 ddegreeff@wcllp.com
No Logo Alex Alexander, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Alexandra Willmarth, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson Becker PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth W. Pearson +1 612 436 1879 +1 612 436 1801 kpearson@johnsonbecker.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Alexandro N Kopoulos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth L. Dudley +1 316 746 3969 +1 316 746 3922 Liz@LizDudleyLaw.com
No Logo Alexis A Ameel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Alfred Jones, Sr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Boatman +1 602 530 8340 +1 602 530 8500 rwb@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon L Clark +1 602 530 8194 +1 602 530 8500 slc@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Lincoln Combs +1 602 530 8000 +1 602 530 8500 lincoln.combs@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Stephen O'Connor +1 602 530 8377 +1 602 530 8500 mark.oconnor@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L. Stoller +1 602 530 8220 +1 602 530 8500 paul.stoller@gknet.com
No Logo Alice Jackson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Freiberg Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Jon Freiberg +1 217 801 2733 +1 217 698 0203
(ND IL - 1:14cv4080) Timothy Jon Freiberg +1 217 801 2733 +1 217 698 0203

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
(ND IL - 1:14cv4080) Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell T Button +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LAW OFFICES OF BEN C. MARTIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com
No Logo Allan Kotter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niemeyer and Grebel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Grebel +1 314 241 1919 +1 314 665 3017 grebel@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S Kruse +1 314 963 9000 +1 314 665 3017 kruse@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Niemeyer +1 314 387 9181 +1 314 665 3017 niemeyer@ngklawfirm.com
No Logo Allan Rankin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Blair Clinton bclinton@hgdlawfirm.com
No Logo Allen Gene Erlitz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Boatman +1 602 530 8340 +1 602 530 8500 rwb@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon L Clark +1 602 530 8194 +1 602 530 8500 slc@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Lincoln Combs +1 602 530 8000 +1 602 530 8500 lincoln.combs@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Stephen O'Connor +1 602 530 8377 +1 602 530 8500 mark.oconnor@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L. Stoller +1 602 530 8220 +1 602 530 8500 paul.stoller@gknet.com
No Logo Allen R Durough, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by FARRIS RILEY & PITT LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Craig Van Der Veer +1 205 324 1212 +1 205 324 1255 nate@frplegal.com
No Logo Alvin Cuttler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by FARRIS RILEY & PITT LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Craig Van Der Veer +1 205 324 1212 +1 205 324 1255 nate@frplegal.com
No Logo Alvin Robbins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Edward Goss +1 816 336 1300 pgoss@goss-lawfirm.com
No Logo Alyssa Conn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
(SD TX - 4:14cv298) Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell T Button +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LAW OFFICES OF BEN C. MARTIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com
No Logo Amanda Boutin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Williams Goldwater, III +1 480 990 1400 +1 480 990 1405 bob@BobGoldwater.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Capretz and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don K Ledgard +1 949 724 3000 +1 949 757 2635 dledgard@capretz.com
No Logo Amanda Houston, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Amanda K Lucas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Amanda Lee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gomez Trial Attorneys

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen K Barton +1 619 237 3490 +1 619 237 3496 kbarton@gomeztrialattorneys.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ahmed S. Diab +1 619 237 3490 +1 619 237 3496 adiab@gomeztrialattorneys.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John H Gomez +1 619 237 3490 +1 619 237 3496 john@gomeztrialattorneys.com
No Logo Amanda Pritchett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Amber Nordin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson Miner Marlow Woodward & Huff PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael F Marlow
No Logo Amparo Pastor, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Rafferty & Proctor, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D. Schultz +1 850 435 7140 +1 850 436 6123 mschultz@levinlaw.com
No Logo Amy Hitch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net
No Logo Amy Jean Houston, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Anders Linster, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Andrea Jean Richardson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Andrea Stith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen A. Presby +1 214 774 2258 +1 214 393 7897 ellenpresby@nemerofflaw.com
No Logo Angela Brondou, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 332

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua D Christian +1 864 232 7363 +1 864 370 3731 JChristian@christiananddavis.com
No Logo Angela C Martin-Morehead, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annesley H. DeGaris +1 205 281 5185 adegaris@degarislaw.com
No Logo Angela Gibson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niemeyer and Grebel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Grebel +1 314 241 1919 +1 314 665 3017 grebel@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S Kruse +1 314 963 9000 +1 314 665 3017 kruse@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Niemeyer +1 314 387 9181 +1 314 665 3017 niemeyer@ngklawfirm.com
No Logo Angela M Henley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(ED WI - 2:14cv59) Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Martin Law Offices SC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R Martin +1 414 856 2310 +1 414 856 2315

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LAW OFFICES OF BEN C. MARTIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com
No Logo Angela Novy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niemeyer and Grebel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S Kruse +1 314 963 9000 +1 314 665 3017 kruse@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Niemeyer +1 314 387 9181 +1 314 665 3017 niemeyer@ngklawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Niemeyer, Grebel & Kruse LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Grebel +1 314 241 1919 +1 314 665 3017 grebel@ngklawfirm.com
No Logo Angela Petroutsa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niemeyer and Grebel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Grebel +1 314 241 1919 +1 314 665 3017 grebel@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S Kruse +1 314 963 9000 +1 314 665 3017 kruse@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Niemeyer +1 314 387 9181 +1 314 665 3017 niemeyer@ngklawfirm.com
No Logo Angela Sasko, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rheingold, Valet, Rheingold Shkolnik & McCartney LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherri Lynn Plotkin +1 212 684 1880 +1 212 689 8156 splotkin@rheingoldlaw.com
No Logo Angela VanCleve, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by TORISEVA LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
No Logo Angela Voigt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards & Connor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence R. Murphy, Jr. +1 918 585 2394 +1 918 585 1449 lmurphy@richardsconnor.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mariann M. Robison +1 918 585 2394 +1 918 585 1449 mrobison@richardsconnor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TORISEVA LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(ED OK - 6:15cv239) Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
No Logo Anitra Price, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M Hammers, Jr. +1 770 394 0047 rob@schneiderhammers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider Hammers, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip J Pendergrass, Jr. +1 770 394 0047 +1 404 600 2626 philip@schneiderhammers.com
No Logo Ann Clark, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Anna M Hoyle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by TORISEVA LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
No Logo Anne Bizzarro-Pierro, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rheingold Valet Rheingold Mccartney & Giuffra, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherri Lynn Plotkin +1 212 684 1880 +1 212 689 8156 splotkin@rheingoldlaw.com
No Logo Anne Cribb, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Annette Casey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Law Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff Seldomridge +1 540 672 4224 +1 540 672 3055 jseldomridge@millerfirmllc.com
No Logo Annie Thomas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niemeyer and Grebel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Grebel +1 314 241 1919 +1 314 665 3017 grebel@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S Kruse +1 314 963 9000 +1 314 665 3017 kruse@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Niemeyer +1 314 387 9181 +1 314 665 3017 niemeyer@ngklawfirm.com
No Logo Anthony Badger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenneth S. Nugent, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com
No Logo Anthony DeChristofaro, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenneth S. Nugent, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com
No Logo Anthony Edward Jacobi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Anthony Jackson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Freiberg Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Jon Freiberg +1 217 801 2733 +1 217 698 0203
(ND IL - 1:14cv4080) Timothy Jon Freiberg +1 217 801 2733 +1 217 698 0203

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
(ND IL - 1:14cv4080) Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell T Button +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LAW OFFICES OF BEN C. MARTIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com
No Logo April Arnold, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenneth S. Nugent, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com
No Logo April Buracker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowper Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Moze Cowper +1 877 529 3707 mcowper@cowperlaw.com
No Logo April Christine Matthews, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Jacob Zonies +1 720 464 5300 +1 720 961 9252 jzonies@zonieslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zonies Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory D Bentley +1 720 464 5300 +1 720 961 9252
No Logo April Dilworth, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Capretz and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don K Ledgard +1 949 724 3000 +1 949 757 2635 dledgard@capretz.com
No Logo April Guinn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annesley H. DeGaris +1 205 281 5185 adegaris@degarislaw.com
No Logo April Matthews, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rick Barreca +1 202 702 5000 +1 202 818 0164 RBarreca@bernripka.com
No Logo Arinda Hoke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Aron C Aldridge, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Arrek P Taylor, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Arthur Bush, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wendt Law Firm, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel M. Wendt +1 816 531 4415 +1 816 531 2507 sam@wendtlaw.com
No Logo Arthur M Andalon, Sr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Ashley M Carter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Earl Brady +1 225 925 5297 +1 225 231 7000 scott@bohrerbrady.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite B

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Bohrer +1 225 925 5297 + 225 231 7000 phil@bohrerbrady.com
No Logo Ashwin Narayan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Athena L Douglas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Audrey I Kasler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heaviside Reed Zaic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Reed Zaic +1 949 715 5120 +1 949 715 5123 Julia@hrzlaw.com
No Logo Audrey Leary, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fears Nachawati PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew R McCarley +1 214 890 0711 +1 214 890 0712 mccarley@fnlawfirm.com
No Logo Audrey Oliver, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy R Fleishman +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 wfleishman@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Seltz +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 dseltz@lchb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/15/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff Seldomridge +1 540 672 4224 +1 540 672 3055 jseldomridge@millerfirmllc.com
No Logo Audrey R Keegan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cory Watson, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Collins Conlin +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 jconlin@corywatson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schmidt Ronca & Kramer PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerard C Kramer +1 717 232 6300 +1 717 232 6467
No Logo Audrey Rogers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborne & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph A. Osborne +1 561 293 2600 +1 561 923 8100 josborne@oa-lawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright & Schulte, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Schulte +1 937 435 7500 +1 937 435 7511 rschulte@yourlegalhelp.com
No Logo Audrey Valente-Kropf, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Ava E Langford, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 959

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert D. Rowland , +1 618 656 5150 +1 618 656 6230 rrowland@ghalaw.com
No Logo Barbara Buchanan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Gallagher , +1 713 222 8080 +1 713 222 0066 shawnaf@gld-law.com
No Logo Barbara E Christoffer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Barbara E Witmer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Barbara J Kaplysh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Barbara Meinholdt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Roslansky +1 888 783 8378 +1 727 323 7720 ivc@getjustice.com
No Logo Barbara Satterwhite, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Law Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff Seldomridge +1 540 672 4224 +1 540 672 3055 jseldomridge@millerfirmllc.com
No Logo Barbara Van Sciver, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annesley H. DeGaris +1 205 281 5185 adegaris@degarislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy R Fleishman +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 wfleishman@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Seltz +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 dseltz@lchb.com
No Logo Barbara Wilson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Eugene Hilton +1 816 714 7118 +1 816 714 7101 hilton@stuevesiegel.com
No Logo Barbarea Corba, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Barry Lee Browning, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth L. Dudley +1 316 746 3969 +1 316 746 3922 Liz@LizDudleyLaw.com
No Logo Barry Phares, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LOWE LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Buttars +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 nate@lowelawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Peck +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 jonathan@lowelawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T Aaron Stringer +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 aaron@lowelawgroup.com
No Logo Beau Wilt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heaviside Reed Zaic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Reed Zaic +1 949 715 5120 +1 949 715 5123 Julia@hrzlaw.com
No Logo Benjamin Townsend, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baron & Budd, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Jean Baughman +1 214 521 3605 +1 214 520 1181 lbaughman@baronbudd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RUSSELL W. BUDD +1 214 521 3605 rbudd@baronbudd.com
No Logo Bennett I Buxbaum, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Boatman +1 602 530 8340 +1 602 530 8500 rwb@gknet.com
No Logo Benny Guzman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborne & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph A. Osborne +1 561 293 2600 +1 561 923 8100 josborne@oa-lawfirm.com
No Logo Bernard Pikal, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Bernardette McBride, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Boatman +1 602 530 8340 +1 602 530 8500 rwb@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon L Clark +1 602 530 8194 +1 602 530 8500 slc@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Lincoln Combs +1 602 530 8000 +1 602 530 8500 lincoln.combs@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Stephen O'Connor +1 602 530 8377 +1 602 530 8500 mark.oconnor@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L. Stoller +1 602 530 8220 +1 602 530 8500 paul.stoller@gknet.com
No Logo Beth Hardenbrook, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldenberg Law, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marlene J. Goldenberg +1 612 333 4662 +1 612 367 8107 mjgoldenberg@goldenberglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suwa, Yuuichi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart L Goldenberg , +1 612 335 9960 +1 612 339 8168 slgoldenberg@goldenberglaw.com
No Logo Bethany Jurns, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Blair Clinton bclinton@hgdlawfirm.com
No Logo Betty Beason, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Betty Hare, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Allen & Williams Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John H Allen, III +1 214 521 2300 +1 214 528 7755 trey@jacksonallenfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Williams +1 214 521 2300 jwilliams@jacksonallenfirm.com
No Logo Betty Holland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Allen & Williams Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Williams +1 214 521 2300 jwilliams@jacksonallenfirm.com
No Logo Betty Mestre, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heaviside Reed Zaic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Reed Zaic +1 949 715 5120 +1 949 715 5123 Julia@hrzlaw.com
No Logo Betty . Williams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Driscoll Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN J. DRISCOLL +1 314 932 3232 +1 314 932 3233 john@thedriscollfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Driscoll Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Sholtz +1 314 932 3232 +1 314 932 3233 phil@thedriscollfirm.com
No Logo Beverly Lohr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Driscoll Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN J. DRISCOLL +1 314 932 3232 +1 314 932 3233 john@thedriscollfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Driscoll Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Sholtz +1 314 932 3232 +1 314 932 3233 phil@thedriscollfirm.com
No Logo Beverly Lusk, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Bianca Fraser-Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy E. Lengkeek +1 302 571 6600 +1 302 576 3343 tlengkeek@ycst.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neilli M. Walsh +1 302 571 6603 +1 302 576 3343 nwalsh@ycst.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Zappa +1 302 571 6600 rzappa@ycst.com
No Logo Billie Tentori, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Phillip Cartmell +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 tcartmell@wagstaffcartmell.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Conrad Degreeff +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 ddegreeff@wcllp.com
No Logo Billy C Morgan, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LAW OFFICES OF BEN C. MARTIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TORISEVA LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(ED TX - 6:15cv603) husband Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
No Logo Billy Gene Brummett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry S Queener, III +1 615 327 9990 +1 615 327 9998 hqueener@queenerlaw.com
No Logo Billy R Leist, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Verhine & Verhine, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E. Scott Verhine +1 601 636 0791 +1 601 636 2718 scott@verhine.biz
No Logo Birdie Crathers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Boatman +1 602 530 8340 +1 602 530 8500 rwb@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon L Clark +1 602 530 8194 +1 602 530 8500 slc@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Lincoln Combs +1 602 530 8000 +1 602 530 8500 lincoln.combs@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Stephen O'Connor +1 602 530 8377 +1 602 530 8500 mark.oconnor@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L. Stoller +1 602 530 8220 +1 602 530 8500 paul.stoller@gknet.com
No Logo Bobby Fitch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Bradley Ricker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carrie R. Capouellez +1 215 952 6910 +5 215 952 6914 ccapouellez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Brandi A Chargois, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bertram & Graf, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Amery Bertram +1 816 523 2205 +1 816 523 8258 benbertram@bertramgraf.com
No Logo Brenda Collins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wendt Law Firm, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel M. Wendt +1 816 531 4415 +1 816 531 2507 sam@wendtlaw.com
No Logo Brenda Glant, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin William Fishback +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 jfishback@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Riley +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 mriley@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan L Shaw +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 elshaw@shawcowart.com
No Logo Brenda Ledbetter Cox, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Brenda Townley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baron & Budd, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Jean Baughman +1 214 521 3605 +1 214 520 1181 lbaughman@baronbudd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RUSSELL W. BUDD +1 214 521 3605 rbudd@baronbudd.com
No Logo Brenda Weakley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net
No Logo Brent Dewitt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Brent Niemeyer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karolina S. Kulesza +1 801 363 9982 +1 801 931 2552 kkulesza@lawdbd.com
No Logo Brett C Barton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Boatman +1 602 530 8340 +1 602 530 8500 rwb@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon L Clark +1 602 530 8194 +1 602 530 8500 slc@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Lincoln Combs +1 602 530 8000 +1 602 530 8500 lincoln.combs@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Stephen O'Connor +1 602 530 8377 +1 602 530 8500 mark.oconnor@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L. Stoller +1 602 530 8220 +1 602 530 8500 paul.stoller@gknet.com
No Logo Brett Waliczek, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Brian Morrison, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niemeyer and Grebel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Grebel +1 314 241 1919 +1 314 665 3017 grebel@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S Kruse +1 314 963 9000 +1 314 665 3017 kruse@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Niemeyer +1 314 387 9181 +1 314 665 3017 niemeyer@ngklawfirm.com
No Logo Brian O'Regan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaclyn L Anderson +1 213 254 4800 +1 213 254 4801 janderson@klwtlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GRAHAM B. LIPPSMITH +1 949 851 9000 glippsmith@klwtlaw.com
No Logo Brian Van Brocklin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 397 9360 +1 949 607 4192 tbrenes@breneslawgroup.com
No Logo Bridget Cager, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming, Nolen & Jez, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rand P. Nolen +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 rand_nolen@fleming-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelsey Louise Stokes +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 kelsey_stokes@fleming-law.com
No Logo Brigitte Tsomos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fears Nachawati PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew R McCarley +1 214 890 0711 +1 214 890 0712 mccarley@fnlawfirm.com
No Logo Britt Sherfy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Brittany Ann Hough, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Alonso Krangle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andres F. Alonso +1 516 350 5555 +1 516 350 5554 aalonso@alonsokrangle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Bruce Krangle +1 516 350 5555 +1 516 350 5554 dkrangle@alonsokrangle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Alonso Krangle LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(NJ - 2:15cv1892) David Bruce Krangle +1 516 350 5555 +1 516 350 5554 dkrangle@alonsokrangle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Brittnee Carlson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Allen & Williams Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John H Allen, III +1 214 521 2300 +1 214 528 7755 trey@jacksonallenfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Williams +1 214 521 2300 jwilliams@jacksonallenfirm.com
No Logo Brockett Wagner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin William Fishback +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 jfishback@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Riley +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 mriley@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan L Shaw +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 elshaw@shawcowart.com
No Logo Bryan Campbell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LOWE LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Buttars +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 nate@lowelawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Peck +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 jonathan@lowelawgroup.com
No Logo Bryan Lockett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dr. Shezad Malik Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shezad Malik +1 888 210 9693 +1 888 210 9693 DrMalik@ShezadMalik.com
No Logo Cally Lutz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Hamilton Kidd +1 713 520 2500 dkidd@perdueandkidd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jim M. Perdue, Jr. +1 713 520 2500 +1 713 520 2525 jperduejr@perdueandkidd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perdue & Kidd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Broussard Winegar +1 713 520 2500 +1 713 520 2525 bwinegar@perdueandkidd.com
No Logo Calvin Landry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LOWE LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Buttars +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 nate@lowelawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Peck +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 jonathan@lowelawgroup.com
No Logo Camela M Henley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net
No Logo Carl Hunt, Plaintiff
No Logo Carl Paul Tangredi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Carla Fletcher, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Carla Hoover, Plaintiff
No Logo Carla Ogidiagba, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by TORISEVA LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
No Logo Carlos Infante, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Jacob Zonies +1 720 464 5300 +1 720 961 9252 jzonies@zonieslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zonies Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory D Bentley +1 720 464 5300 +1 720 961 9252
No Logo Carlos Newsom, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Carmelo Ocasio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by AndersonGlenn, L.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Glenn +1 561 893 9192 +1 561 893 9194
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wilnar Jeanne Julmiste +1 561 893 9192 +1 561 893 9194

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
(MD FL - 8:13cv-1962)  an individual Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell T Button +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LAW OFFICES OF BEN C. MARTIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com
No Logo Carmen M Rivera, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GRAHAM B. LIPPSMITH +1 949 851 9000 glippsmith@klwtlaw.com
No Logo Carol A Oakleaf, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Carol Ann Rotondo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Carol Ann Zimmermann, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JULIE S. FERRARO +1 617 424 9100 +1 617 227 4006 jferraro@kreindler.com
No Logo Carol Boutin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin William Fishback +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 jfishback@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Riley +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 mriley@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan L Shaw +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 elshaw@shawcowart.com
No Logo Carol DiFranco, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborne & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph A. Osborne +1 561 293 2600 +1 561 923 8100 josborne@oa-lawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright & Schulte, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Schulte +1 937 435 7500 +1 937 435 7511 rschulte@yourlegalhelp.com
No Logo Carol Jo Winland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 959

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert D. Rowland , +1 618 656 5150 +1 618 656 6230 rrowland@ghalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TORISEVA LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
(CD IL - 2:15cv-2144) Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
No Logo Carol Kruse, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
(NE 8:15cv108)  an individual Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SCHICKER LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard J. Schicker +1 402 344 4400 +1 402 344 2581 rschicker@teamschick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LAW OFFICES OF BEN C. MARTIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com
No Logo Carol Lewis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Carol Mary Spears, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Carolyn D Young, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bertram & Graf, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Amery Bertram +1 816 523 2205 +1 816 523 8258 benbertram@bertramgraf.com
No Logo Casey Varner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LOWE LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Buttars +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 nate@lowelawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Peck +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 jonathan@lowelawgroup.com
No Logo Casey Wyatt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(MD FL - 6:14cv1853)  an individual Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
(MD FL - 6:14cv1853)  an individual Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Robert Boatman +1 602 530 8057
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Boatman +1 602 530 8340 +1 602 530 8500 rwb@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon L Clark +1 602 530 8194 +1 602 530 8500 slc@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Lincoln Combs +1 602 530 8000 +1 602 530 8500 lincoln.combs@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Stephen O'Connor +1 602 530 8377 +1 602 530 8500 mark.oconnor@gknet.com
(MD FL - 6:14cv1853)  an individual Paul L. Stoller +1 602 530 8220 +1 602 530 8500 paul.stoller@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L. Stoller +1 602 530 8220 +1 602 530 8500 paul.stoller@gknet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heaviside Reed Zaic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Reed Zaic +1 949 715 5120 +1 949 715 5123 Julia@hrzlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Cassidae Amber Chance, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Cassie L Hutchens, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Catherine Rowden, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(ED MO - 4:15cv1489) Individually and on behalf of the Estate of Johnny Rowden Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
(ED MO - 4:15cv1489) Individually and on behalf of the Estate of Johnny Rowden Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Driscoll Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. Driscoll +1 618 444 6049 +1 618 277 0962 john@dchelps.com
(ED MO - 4:15cv1489) Individually and on behalf of the Estate of Johnny Rowden Andrew D. Kinghorn +1 314 932 3232 +1 314 932 3233 andrew@thedriscollfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J Quinn +1 312 932 3232 +1 312 932 3233

Toggle Switch Represented by The Driscoll Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(ED MO - 4:15cv1489) Individually and on behalf of the Estate of Johnny Rowden Philip Sholtz +1 314 932 3232 +1 314 932 3233 phil@thedriscollfirm.com
No Logo Cedric Justice, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Chad Alan Cribb, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Charlene Agee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Charlene Hayama, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Charles Carroll, Plaintiff
No Logo Charles Conn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
(SD TX - 4:14cv298) Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell T Button +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LAW OFFICES OF BEN C. MARTIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com
No Logo Charles Edward Madison, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Charles Gibson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Charles Hardwick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Law Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff Seldomridge +1 540 672 4224 +1 540 672 3055 jseldomridge@millerfirmllc.com
No Logo Charles Henry Ford, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo CHARLES JOHNSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by RILEY & JACKSON PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Jackson +1 205 879 5000 +1 205 879 5801 kj@rileyjacksonlaw.com
No Logo CHARLES ROBINSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas T Merrigan +1 617 391 9001 +1 617 357 9001 tom@sweeneymerrigan.com
No Logo Charletta Carpenter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Skikos Crawford Skikos Joseph & Millican, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MELISSA ERIN MIELKE +1 415 546 7300 mmielke@skikos.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew John Skikos +1 415 546 7300 +1 415 546 7301 mskikos@skikos.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven James Skikos +1 415 546 7300 +1 415 546 7301 sskikos@skikos.com
No Logo Chastity Sepulveda, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Faraci Lange, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hadley L. Matarazzo +1 585 325 5150 +1 585 325 3285 hmatarazzo@faraci.com
No Logo Cheryl Ann Gallant, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Cheryl Rouse, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alex Chinhyung Park +1 408 246 1515 +1 408 246 4105 alexcpark@yahoo.com
No Logo Cheryl Wright-Butler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd C Comeaux +1 225 706 9000 +1 225 706 9001 TC@ComeauxLawFirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peyton P Murphy +1 225 928 8800 +1 225 246 8780 Peyton@MurphyLawFirm.com
No Logo Cheyenne Carter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baron & Budd, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Jean Baughman +1 214 521 3605 +1 214 520 1181 lbaughman@baronbudd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RUSSELL W. BUDD +1 214 521 3605 rbudd@baronbudd.com
No Logo Chris Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Chris Johnson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chris Johnson
No Logo Christian Leigh Gates, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Christina Landry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LOWE LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Buttars +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 nate@lowelawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Peck +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 jonathan@lowelawgroup.com
No Logo Christine Ann Bisesi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson Becker PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROLF T. FIEBIGER +1 612 436 1800 +1 612 436 1801 fiebiger@johnsonbecker.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael K. Johnson +1 612 436 1800 +1 612 436 1801 mjohnson@johnsonbecker.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth W. Pearson +1 612 436 1879 +1 612 436 1801 kpearson@johnsonbecker.com
No Logo Christine Baker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niemeyer and Grebel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Grebel +1 314 241 1919 +1 314 665 3017 grebel@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S Kruse +1 314 963 9000 +1 314 665 3017 kruse@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Niemeyer +1 314 387 9181 +1 314 665 3017 niemeyer@ngklawfirm.com
No Logo Christine Kiscadden, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Christine Lorthe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Christopher Cronan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
(ED CA 2:15cv1418) Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LAW OFFICES OF BEN C. MARTIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Waters Kraus & Paul

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(ED CA 2:15cv1418) Louisa Okonyan Kirakosian +1 310 414 8146 lkirakosian@waterskraus.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louisa Okonyan Kirakosian +1 310 414 8146 lkirakosian@waterskraus.com
No Logo Christopher Jowell Valderas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com
No Logo Christopher Lindow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson Becker PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROLF T. FIEBIGER +1 612 436 1800 +1 612 436 1801 fiebiger@johnsonbecker.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael K. Johnson +1 612 436 1800 +1 612 436 1801 mjohnson@johnsonbecker.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth W. Pearson +1 612 436 1879 +1 612 436 1801 kpearson@johnsonbecker.com
No Logo Christopher Paul Adams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Christopher Svedise, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Boatman +1 602 530 8340 +1 602 530 8500 rwb@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon L Clark +1 602 530 8194 +1 602 530 8500 slc@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Lincoln Combs +1 602 530 8000 +1 602 530 8500 lincoln.combs@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Stephen O'Connor +1 602 530 8377 +1 602 530 8500 mark.oconnor@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L. Stoller +1 602 530 8220 +1 602 530 8500 paul.stoller@gknet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Christopher Wayne Collins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Christopher Weldon George, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Childers, Schlueter & Smith, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Brandon Smith +1 404 419 9500 +1 404 419 9501 bsmith@cssfirm.com
No Logo Christy Sessoms, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rick Barreca +1 202 702 5000 +1 202 818 0164 RBarreca@bernripka.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 397 9360 +1 949 607 4192 tbrenes@breneslawgroup.com
No Logo Cindy Terry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Clara Powell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kell Lampin LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark C. Aubuchon +1 314 621 1575 +1 314 621 1578 mark.aubuchon@kelllampinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Mark Kell +1 636 498 4878 +1 636 441 0198 mark.kell@KellLampinLaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lucas James Ude +1 636 498 4878 +1 636 441 0198 lucas@kelllampinlaw.com
No Logo Clarissa Alexander, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gori Julian & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D Todd Mathews +1 618 659 9833 +1 618 659 9834
No Logo Claudette Y Mears, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TORISEVA LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
(MD PA - 1:15cv1253) Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Urban Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony James Urban +1 570 622 1247
No Logo Claus Anderson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Gallagher , +1 713 222 8080 +1 713 222 0066 shawnaf@gld-law.com
No Logo Clifford Falls, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Clifford Geter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FARRIS RILEY & PITT LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Craig Van Der Veer +1 205 324 1212 +1 205 324 1255 nate@frplegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 961 4050 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Pinckney Harloe, III +1 214 761 6610 +1 214 761 6688 john@freeseandgoss.com
(SD MS - 3:15cv403) Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Clifford Ryan Mullins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McBrayer McGinnis Leslie Kirkland, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Guarnieri +1 859 554 4414 +1 859 231 6518 dguarnieri@mmlk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason S. Morgan +1 859 231 6518 jmorgan@mmlk.com
No Logo Clyde S Murriel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CRANDALL & KATT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Thomas Fennell +1 540 342 2000 +1 540 400 0616 pfennell@crandalllaw.com
No Logo Concepcion Lopez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tor A Hoerman +1 618 656 4400 +1 618 656 4401 tor@thlawyer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric M Terry +1 618 656 4400 +1 618 656 4401 eric@thlawyer.com
No Logo Connie Bolton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Blair Clinton bclinton@hgdlawfirm.com
No Logo Contessa Trotman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Corrina M Hardeman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Cory Behlke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Cougar M Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Craig Willis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy J. Anderson +1 323 302 9488 aanderson@jamlawyers.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Arthur Morris, Jr. +1 323 302 9488 +1 323 931 4990 jmorris@jamlawyers.com
No Logo Criss L Rogers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming, Nolen & Jez, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rand P. Nolen +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 rand_nolen@fleming-law.com
No Logo Cristal Morris, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Crystal Senger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heaviside Reed Zaic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Reed Zaic +1 949 715 5120 +1 949 715 5123 Julia@hrzlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Curley Gene Hayes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Cynthia Bradbury, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Rafferty & Proctor, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff R. Gaddy +1 850 435 7062 +1 850 536 6062 jgaddy@levinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D. Schultz +1 850 435 7140 +1 850 436 6123 mschultz@levinlaw.com
No Logo Cynthia Bruhn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Cynthia Gibson-Mason, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 397 9360 +1 949 607 4192 tbrenes@breneslawgroup.com
No Logo Cynthia Houston, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niemeyer and Grebel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Grebel +1 314 241 1919 +1 314 665 3017 grebel@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S Kruse +1 314 963 9000 +1 314 665 3017 kruse@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Niemeyer +1 314 387 9181 +1 314 665 3017 niemeyer@ngklawfirm.com
No Logo Dale Spears, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Dana Daniels, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com
No Logo Dana M Putnel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M Hammers, Jr. +1 770 394 0047 rob@schneiderhammers.com
No Logo Daniel Arrington, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wendt Law Firm, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel M. Wendt +1 816 531 4415 +1 816 531 2507 sam@wendtlaw.com
No Logo Daniel J Hearns, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kell Lampin LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark C. Aubuchon +1 314 621 1575 +1 314 621 1578 mark.aubuchon@kelllampinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Mark Kell +1 636 498 4878 +1 636 441 0198 mark.kell@KellLampinLaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lucas James Ude +1 636 498 4878 +1 636 441 0198 lucas@kelllampinlaw.com
No Logo Daniel Joseph Kelly, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Daniel M Currie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Daniel Moore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Curtis Ctr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Barry Leh +1 215 893 3410 +1 215 893 3444 mleh@lockslaw.com
No Logo Daniel P Lentz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by TORISEVA LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
No Logo Daniel P Schweska, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 959

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert D. Rowland , +1 618 656 5150 +1 618 656 6230 rrowland@ghalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TORISEVA LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(CD IL - 3:15cv3193) Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
No Logo Daniel W Hodge, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Danielle Knapp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McEwen Law Firm, Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory N McEwen +1 651 224 3833 +1 651 223 5790 gmcewen@mcewenlaw.com
No Logo Danielle Montgomery, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Phillip Cartmell +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 tcartmell@wagstaffcartmell.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Conrad Degreeff +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 ddegreeff@wcllp.com
No Logo Danielle Sowinksi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Danny Dempsey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph N Williams +1 317 633 5270 +1 317 426 3348 jwilliams@rwp-law.com
No Logo Danny Hall, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Darlene Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BRANCH LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Moses Branch +1 505 243 3500 mbranch@branchlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Turner Williamson Branch +1 505 243 3500 +1 505 243 3534 psanchez@branchlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam T. Funk +1 505 243 3500 +1 505 243 3435 afunk@branchlawfirm.com
No Logo Darlene Svedise, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Boatman +1 602 530 8340 +1 602 530 8500 rwb@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon L Clark +1 602 530 8194 +1 602 530 8500 slc@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Lincoln Combs +1 602 530 8000 +1 602 530 8500 lincoln.combs@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Stephen O'Connor +1 602 530 8377 +1 602 530 8500 mark.oconnor@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L. Stoller +1 602 530 8220 +1 602 530 8500 paul.stoller@gknet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Darrell Poole, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin William Fishback +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 jfishback@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Riley +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 mriley@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan L Shaw +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 elshaw@shawcowart.com
No Logo Daryl E Porn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo David A Miramontez, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo David Allen Ruck, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tor A Hoerman +1 618 656 4400 +1 618 656 4401 tor@thlawyer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric M Terry +1 618 656 4400 +1 618 656 4401 eric@thlawyer.com
No Logo David Bilbeck, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fears Nachawati PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew R McCarley +1 214 890 0711 +1 214 890 0712 mccarley@fnlawfirm.com
No Logo David Burton Fish, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Boatman +1 602 530 8340 +1 602 530 8500 rwb@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon L Clark +1 602 530 8194 +1 602 530 8500 slc@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Lincoln Combs +1 602 530 8000 +1 602 530 8500 lincoln.combs@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Stephen O'Connor +1 602 530 8377 +1 602 530 8500 mark.oconnor@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L. Stoller +1 602 530 8220 +1 602 530 8500 paul.stoller@gknet.com
No Logo David Capriglione, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaclyn L Anderson +1 213 254 4800 +1 213 254 4801 janderson@klwtlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GRAHAM B. LIPPSMITH +1 949 851 9000 glippsmith@klwtlaw.com
No Logo David Dilbeck, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fears Nachawati PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew R McCarley +1 214 890 0711 +1 214 890 0712 mccarley@fnlawfirm.com
No Logo David Hill, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fears Nachawati PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew R McCarley +1 214 890 0711 +1 214 890 0712 mccarley@fnlawfirm.com
No Logo David Jenkins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rick Barreca +1 202 702 5000 +1 202 818 0164 RBarreca@bernripka.com
No Logo David Jurns, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Blair Clinton bclinton@hgdlawfirm.com
No Logo David L Sizemore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
(CD CA - 2:15cv1945) Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LAW OFFICES OF BEN C. MARTIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Waters Kraus & Paul

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael L Armitage +1 310 414 8146 +1 310 414 8156 armitage@waterskraus.com
No Logo David Larson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Law Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff Seldomridge +1 540 672 4224 +1 540 672 3055 jseldomridge@millerfirmllc.com
No Logo David Lee Story, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo David Light, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tor A Hoerman +1 618 656 4400 +1 618 656 4401 tor@thlawyer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric M Terry +1 618 656 4400 +1 618 656 4401 eric@thlawyer.com
No Logo DAVID PEARSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pogust, Braslow, & Millrood, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael G. Daly +1 610 941 4204 +1 610 941 4245 mdaly@pbmattorneys.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Matthew Leckman +1 610 941 4204 +1 610 941 4245 mleckman@pbmattorneys.com
No Logo David R. Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 959

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert D. Rowland , +1 618 656 5150 +1 618 656 6230 rrowland@ghalaw.com
No Logo David Shackleford, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(MD - 1:15cv2278) Michael W Heaviside +1 202 223 1993 +1 202 318 8006 mheaviside@hrzlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashcraft and Gerel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(MD - 1:15cv2278) Peter T. Anderson +1 703 931 5500 +1 703 820 0630 panderson@ashcraftlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter T. Anderson +1 703 931 5500 +1 703 820 0630 panderson@ashcraftlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heaviside Reed Zaic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Reed Zaic +1 949 715 5120 +1 949 715 5123 Julia@hrzlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborne & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(MD - 1:15cv2278) Joseph A. Osborne +1 561 293 2600 +1 561 923 8100 josborne@oa-lawfirm.com
No Logo David Troulliet, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo David Turner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin William Fishback +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 jfishback@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Riley +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 mriley@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan L Shaw +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 elshaw@shawcowart.com
No Logo David Vigil, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yvonne M. Flaherty +1 612 339 6900 +1+1+ 1+1 1+1 +1+1 ymflaherty@locklaw.com
No Logo David Werst, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annesley H. DeGaris +1 205 281 5185 adegaris@degarislaw.com
No Logo David Wickstrom, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson Becker PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROLF T. FIEBIGER +1 612 436 1800 +1 612 436 1801 fiebiger@johnsonbecker.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael K. Johnson +1 612 436 1800 +1 612 436 1801 mjohnson@johnsonbecker.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth W. Pearson +1 612 436 1879 +1 612 436 1801 kpearson@johnsonbecker.com
No Logo David Woolley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aitken Aitken Cohn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Allen Cohn +1 714 434 1424 +1 714 434 3600
No Logo Dawn M Hendrickson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by TORISEVA LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
No Logo Dawn Merritt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clair A Montroy, III +1 716 662 4600 +1 716 662 2689 montroylaw@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(WD NY - 1:14cv917) Michael W Heaviside +1 202 223 1993 +1 202 318 8006 mheaviside@hrzlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heaviside Reed Zaic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Reed Zaic +1 949 715 5120 +1 949 715 5123 Julia@hrzlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Dean Becker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(CD CA - 2:15cv7937) Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(CD CA - 2:15cv7937) Leonard W. Aragon +1 602 840 5900 +1 602 840 3012 leonard@hbsslaw.com
(CD CA - 2:15cv7937) Robert Bruce Carey +1 602 840 5900 +1 602 840 3012 rob@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elaine T Byszewski +1 213 330 7150 +1 213 330 7152 elaine@hbsslaw.com
No Logo Deanna Garrett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fears Nachawati PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew R McCarley +1 214 890 0711 +1 214 890 0712 mccarley@fnlawfirm.com
No Logo Deanne Gray, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Debbie Anderson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Debbie J Leslie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowper Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Moze Cowper +1 877 529 3707 mcowper@cowperlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Joshua Kincannon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Kincannon
No Logo Debbie Malestky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright & Schulte, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Schulte +1 937 435 7500 +1 937 435 7511 rschulte@yourlegalhelp.com
No Logo Debora Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rick Barreca +1 202 702 5000 +1 202 818 0164 RBarreca@bernripka.com
No Logo Debora L Janes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua R Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +1 561 884 6308
No Logo Deborah A Kaiser, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Deborah Block, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborne & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph A. Osborne +1 561 293 2600 +1 561 923 8100 josborne@oa-lawfirm.com
No Logo Deborah Burner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborne & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph A. Osborne +1 561 293 2600 +1 561 923 8100 josborne@oa-lawfirm.com
No Logo Deborah Elaine Sulligan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Deborah Fahnestock, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin M Fitzgerald +1 207 874 7407 +1 207 850 2120 kfitzgerald@fitz-lawgroup.com
No Logo Deborah Howard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baron & Budd, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Jean Baughman +1 214 521 3605 +1 214 520 1181 lbaughman@baronbudd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RUSSELL W. BUDD +1 214 521 3605 rbudd@baronbudd.com
No Logo Deborah I Enriquez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Deborah J Halle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & McKay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James B. Tuttle +1 518 783 1001 +1 518 783 1515 jbtesq@nycap.rr.com
No Logo Deborah Kucharski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annesley H. DeGaris +1 205 281 5185 adegaris@degarislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy R Fleishman +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 wfleishman@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Seltz +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 dseltz@lchb.com
No Logo Deborah Zalite, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Debra Branch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(ND TX - 3:15cv1131) Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LAW OFFICES OF BEN C. MARTIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com
No Logo Debra Bryant, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Allen & Williams Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John H Allen, III +1 214 521 2300 +1 214 528 7755 trey@jacksonallenfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Williams +1 214 521 2300 jwilliams@jacksonallenfirm.com
No Logo Debra Castellano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(CD CA - 2:15cv4494) Michael W Heaviside +1 202 223 1993 +1 202 318 8006 mheaviside@hrzlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heaviside Reed Zaic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Reed Zaic +1 949 715 5120 +1 949 715 5123 Julia@hrzlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborne & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(CD CA - 2:15cv4494) Joseph A. Osborne +1 561 293 2600 +1 561 923 8100 josborne@oa-lawfirm.com
No Logo Debra Green, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(MD FL - 5:15cv314) Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
(MD FL - 5:15cv314) Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Debra Marie Emerson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Debra Martin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Rafferty & Proctor, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D. Schultz +1 850 435 7140 +1 850 436 6123 mschultz@levinlaw.com
No Logo Debra Mulkey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Phillip Cartmell +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 tcartmell@wagstaffcartmell.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Conrad Degreeff +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 ddegreeff@wcllp.com
No Logo Debra P Rodrigue, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrios, Kingsdorf & Casteix, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dawn M Barrios +1 504 524 3300 +1 504 524 3313 barrios@bkc-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce S. Kingsdorf +1 504 524 3300 bkingsdorf@bkc-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary Logan Wool +1 504 524 3300 +1 504 524 3313 zwool@bkc-law.com
No Logo Debra Tinlin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Debra Zamsky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo December Faye Klock, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com
No Logo Deloris Stroman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Denine Callihan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Rafferty & Proctor, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff R. Gaddy +1 850 435 7062 +1 850 536 6062 jgaddy@levinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D. Schultz +1 850 435 7140 +1 850 436 6123 mschultz@levinlaw.com
No Logo Denise Gill, Plaintiff
No Logo Denise Jolly, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Rafferty & Proctor, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff R. Gaddy +1 850 435 7062 +1 850 536 6062 jgaddy@levinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D. Schultz +1 850 435 7140 +1 850 436 6123 mschultz@levinlaw.com
No Logo Denise O'Neil, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Robert Boatman +1 602 530 8057
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Boatman +1 602 530 8340 +1 602 530 8500 rwb@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon L Clark +1 602 530 8194 +1 602 530 8500 slc@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Lincoln Combs +1 602 530 8000 +1 602 530 8500 lincoln.combs@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Stephen O'Connor +1 602 530 8377 +1 602 530 8500 mark.oconnor@gknet.com
(SD TX - 2:15cv316) Paul L. Stoller +1 602 530 8220 +1 602 530 8500 paul.stoller@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L. Stoller +1 602 530 8220 +1 602 530 8500 paul.stoller@gknet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LAW OFFICES OF BEN C. MARTIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com
No Logo Denise O'Neill, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 397 9360 +1 949 607 4192 tbrenes@breneslawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Robert Boatman +1 602 530 8057
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Boatman +1 602 530 8340 +1 602 530 8500 rwb@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon L Clark +1 602 530 8194 +1 602 530 8500 slc@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Lincoln Combs +1 602 530 8000 +1 602 530 8500 lincoln.combs@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Stephen O'Connor +1 602 530 8377 +1 602 530 8500 mark.oconnor@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L. Stoller +1 602 530 8220 +1 602 530 8500 paul.stoller@gknet.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Denise Ocasio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by AndersonGlenn, L.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Glenn +1 561 893 9192 +1 561 893 9194
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wilnar Jeanne Julmiste +1 561 893 9192 +1 561 893 9194

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
(MD FL - 8:13cv1962)   an individual Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell T Button +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LAW OFFICES OF BEN C. MARTIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com
No Logo Derek Brandi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yvonne M. Flaherty +1 612 339 6900 +1+1+ 1+1 1+1 +1+1 ymflaherty@locklaw.com
No Logo Devin C Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Dewitt Webster, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin William Fishback +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 jfishback@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Riley +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 mriley@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan L Shaw +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 elshaw@shawcowart.com
No Logo Dezarae Anzaldua, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annesley H. DeGaris +1 205 281 5185 adegaris@degarislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy R Fleishman +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 wfleishman@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Seltz +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 dseltz@lchb.com
No Logo Diana Breitschuh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Dianca Lewis-Rivers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by University Centre I

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHAEL P. MCGARTLAND +1 817 332 9300 mike@mcgartland.com
No Logo Diane C Radke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Diane Monroe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Angelo & White

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Michael Loughran +1 760 603 9664 +1 760 603 9668 michael@angelowhitelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Paul Michael Angelo +1 949 640 0800 +1 949 640 0887 arlene@angelowhitelaw.com
No Logo Diane Perry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Gallagher , +1 713 222 8080 +1 713 222 0066 shawnaf@gld-law.com
No Logo Diane Reynoldson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niemeyer and Grebel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Grebel +1 314 241 1919 +1 314 665 3017 grebel@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S Kruse +1 314 963 9000 +1 314 665 3017 kruse@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Niemeyer +1 314 387 9181 +1 314 665 3017 niemeyer@ngklawfirm.com
No Logo Diann Hill, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborne & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph A. Osborne +1 561 293 2600 +1 561 923 8100 josborne@oa-lawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright & Schulte, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Schulte +1 937 435 7500 +1 937 435 7511 rschulte@yourlegalhelp.com
No Logo Dianne Gibson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Dodi Froehlich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 397 9360 +1 949 607 4192 tbrenes@breneslawgroup.com
No Logo Dolores Malanga, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gori Julian & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY D Todd Mathews +1 618 659 9833 +1 618 659 9834
No Logo Dolores Walker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborne & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph A. Osborne +1 561 293 2600 +1 561 923 8100 josborne@oa-lawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright & Schulte, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Schulte +1 937 435 7500 +1 937 435 7511 rschulte@yourlegalhelp.com
No Logo Dona Jane Dyer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Frederick Decker +1 212 355 9500 mdecker@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy R Fleishman +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 wfleishman@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Seltz +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 dseltz@lchb.com
No Logo Dona Seaman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Donald E Yates, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by HOVDE DASSOW & DEETS LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick R Hovde +1 317 818 3100 +1 317 818 3111

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net
No Logo Donald Epps, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TORISEVA LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(NV - 2:15cv1210) Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wetherall Group Limited

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter C Wetherall +1 702 838 8500 +1 702 837 5081
No Logo Donald Eugene Painter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Donald Germany, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Phillip Cartmell +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 tcartmell@wagstaffcartmell.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Conrad Degreeff +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 ddegreeff@wcllp.com
No Logo Donald Larry Elliott, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meshbesher & Spence Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L Davick , +1 507 280 8090 +1 507 280 0807 adavick@meshbesher.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason P Johnston +1 612 339 9121 jjohnston@meshbesher.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony J Nemo , +1 612 339 9121 +1 612 339 9188 tnemo@meshbesher.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashleigh Raso +1 612 339 9121 +1 612 339 9188 araso@meshbesher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zimmerman Reed PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Genevieve Mary Zimmerman +1 612 341 0400 +1 612 341 0844 genevieve.zimmerman@zimmreed.com
No Logo Donald Marsh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Roslansky +1 888 783 8378 +1 727 323 7720 ivc@getjustice.com
No Logo Donald Martel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baron & Budd, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Jean Baughman +1 214 521 3605 +1 214 520 1181 lbaughman@baronbudd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RUSSELL W. BUDD +1 214 521 3605 rbudd@baronbudd.com
No Logo Donald Menez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baron & Budd, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Jean Baughman +1 214 521 3605 +1 214 520 1181 lbaughman@baronbudd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RUSSELL W. BUDD +1 214 521 3605 rbudd@baronbudd.com
No Logo Donald S McDonnell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 397 9360 +1 949 607 4192 tbrenes@breneslawgroup.com
No Logo Donna Briggs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yvonne M. Flaherty +1 612 339 6900 +1+1+ 1+1 1+1 +1+1 ymflaherty@locklaw.com
No Logo Donna Brooks, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Blair Clinton bclinton@hgdlawfirm.com
No Logo Donna L Moore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Curtis Ctr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Barry Leh +1 215 893 3410 +1 215 893 3444 mleh@lockslaw.com
No Logo Donna Lee Lowman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Donna M Day, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming, Nolen & Jez, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rand P. Nolen +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 rand_nolen@fleming-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelsey Louise Stokes +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 kelsey_stokes@fleming-law.com
No Logo Donna Marie Farrington, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Edward Goss +1 816 336 1300 pgoss@goss-lawfirm.com
No Logo Doris Frain, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Doris J Winterbottom, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Doris Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Boatman +1 602 530 8340 +1 602 530 8500 rwb@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon L Clark +1 602 530 8194 +1 602 530 8500 slc@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Lincoln Combs +1 602 530 8000 +1 602 530 8500 lincoln.combs@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Stephen O'Connor +1 602 530 8377 +1 602 530 8500 mark.oconnor@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L. Stoller +1 602 530 8220 +1 602 530 8500 paul.stoller@gknet.com
No Logo Dorothy Kay Alexander, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GALLAGHER & KENNEDY, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W Boatman +1 602 530 8340 +1 602 530 8500 rwb@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon L Clark +1 602 530 8194 +1 602 530 8500 slc@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Lincoln Combs +1 602 530 8000 +1 602 530 8500 lincoln.combs@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Stephen O'Connor +1 602 530 8377 +1 602 530 8500 mark.oconnor@gknet.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul L. Stoller +1 602 530 8220 +1 602 530 8500 paul.stoller@gknet.com
No Logo Dorothy R Cox, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Dorothy - Spann, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin William Fishback +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 jfishback@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Riley +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 mriley@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan L Shaw +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 elshaw@shawcowart.com
No Logo Douglas Spencer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Dustin Craig, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenneth S. Nugent, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com
No Logo Dustin Scheib, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Dwain T Anderson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Childers, Schlueter & Smith, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Brandon Smith +1 404 419 9500 +1 404 419 9501 bsmith@cssfirm.com
No Logo Dwayne Carroll, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Edna M Gray, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Edna M Gray

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edna M Gray
No Logo Edward Blair, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LOWE LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Buttars +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 nate@lowelawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Peck +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 jonathan@lowelawgroup.com
No Logo Edward St John, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Eugene Hilton +1 816 714 7118 +1 816 714 7101 hilton@stuevesiegel.com
No Logo Eileen Schmuck, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Eileen Shea, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Shrader & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea Layne Stackhouse +1 713 782 0000 +1 713 571 9605 layne@shraderlaw.com
No Logo Elaine Sargeant, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Elaine Sargeant

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elaine Sargeant
No Logo Elizabeth Ann Grave, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Seltz +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 dseltz@lchb.com
No Logo Elizabeth Coffman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborne & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph A. Osborne +1 561 293 2600 +1 561 923 8100 josborne@oa-lawfirm.com
No Logo Elizabeth J Stafford, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net
No Logo Elizabeth Leyva, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LOWE LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Buttars +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 nate@lowelawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Peck +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 jonathan@lowelawgroup.com
No Logo Elizabeth Waliczek, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Ellen Anderson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Childers, Schlueter & Smith, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Brandon Smith +1 404 419 9500 +1 404 419 9501 bsmith@cssfirm.com
No Logo Elmer Steinbrunn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Eugene Hilton +1 816 714 7118 +1 816 714 7101 hilton@stuevesiegel.com
No Logo Emily Landress, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com
(ND GA - 1:15cv2672) Thomas W Arbon +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 tarbon@bencmartin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by schneiderhammers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M Hammers, Jr. +1 770 394 0047 rob@schneiderhammers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LAW OFFICES OF BEN C. MARTIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C Martin +1 214 761 6614 +1 214 744 7590 bmartin@bencmartin.com
No Logo Emma Powell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CRANDALL & KATT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Thomas Fennell +1 540 342 2000 +1 540 400 0616 pfennell@crandalllaw.com
No Logo Eric Robinson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niemeyer and Grebel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Grebel +1 314 241 1919 +1 314 665 3017 grebel@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S Kruse +1 314 963 9000 +1 314 665 3017 kruse@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Niemeyer +1 314 387 9181 +1 314 665 3017 niemeyer@ngklawfirm.com
No Logo Erin Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(ED TX - 1:13cv633) Amorina Patrice Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 alopez@lopezmchugh.com
(ED TX - 1:13cv633) Matthew Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 mlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Provost Umphrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Thomas Kirchmer +1 409 835 6000 +1 409 813 8612 ckirchmer@pulf.com
No Logo Ernest Winland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 tbrenes@lopezmchugh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramon Rossi Lopez +1 949 737 1501 +1 949 737 1504 rlopez@lopezmchugh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 959

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert D. Rowland , +1 618 656 5150 +1 618 656 6230 rrowland@ghalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TORISEVA LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
(CD IL - 2:15cv2144) Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
No Logo Esther Delois Coleman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Esther W Exley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Eulalio Bazan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Frederick Decker +1 212 355 9500 mdecker@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy R Fleishman +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 wfleishman@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Seltz +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 dseltz@lchb.com
No Logo Eva Lorfing, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gori Julian & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D Todd Mathews +1 618 659 9833 +1 618 659 9834
No Logo Evan Laufer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin William Fishback +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 jfishback@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Riley +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 mriley@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan L Shaw +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 elshaw@shawcowart.com
No Logo Evelyn M Seals, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bossier & Associates, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheila M. Bossier +1 601 352 5450 +1 601 352 5452 sbossier@bossier-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese & Goss PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Arthur Freese +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 rich@freeseandgoss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Calle Mendenhall +1 205 871 4144 +1 205 871 4104 calle@freeseandgoss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Matthews +1 713 520 5250 + 713 535 7131 dmatthews@dmlawfirm.com
No Logo Everett Edward Sakosko, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin William Fishback +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 jfishback@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Riley +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 mriley@shawcowart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan L Shaw +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 elshaw@shawcowart.com
No Logo Everett L Scott, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Ezekiel Crittendon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BRANCH LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Moses Branch +1 505 243 3500 mbranch@branchlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Turner Williamson Branch +1 505 243 3500 +1 505 243 3534 psanchez@branchlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam T. Funk +1 505 243 3500 +1 505 243 3435 afunk@branchlawfirm.com
No Logo Faith Hinchman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niemeyer and Grebel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Grebel +1 314 241 1919 +1 314 665 3017 grebel@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S Kruse +1 314 963 9000 +1 314 665 3017 kruse@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Niemeyer +1 314 387 9181 +1 314 665 3017 niemeyer@ngklawfirm.com
No Logo Farah E Radjewski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by TORISEVA LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
No Logo Florence Bures, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lopez McHugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carrie R. Capouellez +1 215 952 6910 +5 215 952 6914 ccapouellez@lopezmchugh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHAEL S. KATZ +1 215 952 6910 mkatz@lopezmchugh.com
No Logo Florence Philmore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Frances McCallister, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kay L. Van Wey +1 214 329 1350 +1 800 582 1042 kay@vanweylaw.com
No Logo Frank Benanti, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Rafferty & Proctor, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff R. Gaddy +1 850 435 7062 +1 850 536 6062 jgaddy@levinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D. Schultz +1 850 435 7140 +1 850 436 6123 mschultz@levinlaw.com
No Logo Frank George Sulligan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Lynn Nations +1 713 807 8400 +1 713 807 8423 nations@howardnations.com
No Logo Frank J Bell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Babbitt & Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Johnson +1 561 684 2500 +6846 684 684 6308 jjohnson@babbitt-johnson.com
No Logo Frederick Becker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niemeyer and Grebel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Grebel +1 314 241 1919 +1 314 665 3017 grebel@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S Kruse +1 314 963 9000 +1 314 665 3017 kruse@ngklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Niemeyer +1 314 387 9181 +1 314 665 3017 niemeyer@ngklawfirm.com
No Logo Freedom Zybert, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Troy Alexander Brenes +1 949 397 9360 +1 949 607 4192 tbrenes@breneslawgroup.com
No Logo Gabriel Ogidiagba, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Karon & Dalimonte

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Dalimonte +1 617 367 3311 +1 617 742 9130 johndalimonte@kdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by TORISEVA LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Clark Toriseva , +1 304 238 0066 +1 304 233 0149 tct@torisevalaw.com
No Logo Gail Ekblad, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail