NCO Financial Systems, Inc. v. Montgomery Park, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 15-1988

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 30, 2016 at 12:22 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4230 - Rent Lease Ejectment
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None
BRIEF by Appellee NCO Financial Systems, Incorporated in 15-1988, Appellant NCO Financial Systems, Incorporated in 15-2071 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING/RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/09/2015. [999714907] [15-1988, 15-2071] Andrew Levy
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
    ORDER filed [999696265] granting Motion [24] to extend cross-appeal briefing schedule; terminating Motion to amend/correct. Opening/Response Brief Due: 12/08/2015. Response/Reply Brief Due 01/12/2016. Reply brief due 01/28/2016. Copies to all parties. [15-2071, 15-1988] (ALC)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
      MOTION by Appellant NCO Financial Systems, Incorporated and Appellee Montgomery Park, LLC in 15-2071, Appellant Montgomery Park, LLC and Appellee NCO Financial Systems, Incorporated in 15-1988 to amend/correct order. Date and method of service: 11/09/2015 ecf. [999696141] [15-2071, 15-1988] Andrew Levy
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405680463 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
        FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Montgomery Park, LLC in 15-1988, Appellee Montgomery Park, LLC in 15-2071. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 10/23/2015. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? No. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999685178] [15-1988, 15-2071] John McCann
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
          BRIEF by Appellant Montgomery Park, LLC in 15-1988, Appellee Montgomery Park, LLC in 15-2071 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/23/2015. [999685173] [15-1988, 15-2071] John McCann
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
            BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: Montgomery Park, LLC.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/26/2015. Opening/Response Brief Due: 11/30/2015. Response/Reply Brief Due 12/31/2015. [15-1988, 15-2071] (ALC)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Joshua R. Treem for NCO Financial Systems, Incorporated in 15-1988, 15-2071.[999659861] [15-1988, 15-2071] Joshua Treem
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                ORDER filed [999659361] consolidating case 15-2071 with 15-1988. Cross-appeal appellant: Montgomery Park, LLC. Copies to all parties. [15-1988, 15-2071] (ALC)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee NCO Financial Systems, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999658763] [15-1988] Andrew Levy
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Kevin D. Docherty for NCO Financial Systems, Incorporated.[999658759] [15-1988] Kevin Docherty
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Andrew D. Levy for NCO Financial Systems, Incorporated.[999658753] [15-1988] Andrew Levy
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Ranak K. Jasani for Montgomery Park, LLC.[999656421] [15-1988] Ranak Jasani
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Howard G. Goldberg for Montgomery Park, LLC.[999655839] [15-1988] Howard Goldberg
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                            Initial mediation conference scheduled. [15-1988] (MRB)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Jacqueline Sovich. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Pretrial matters discussed and Opening Statements on 07/06/2015; All testimony 07/06-07/2015, Motion hearing & Arguments on 07/07/2015; and Opinion of Court on 07/08/2015. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Defendant/Appellant Montgomery Park, LLC. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-01020-GLR. Transcript due from Jacqueline Sovich, Official Court Reporter, on 11/10/2015. [15-1988] (ALC)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Montgomery Park, LLC for Jackie Sovich. [15-1988] John McCann
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                  DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Montgomery Park, LLC. [15-1988] John McCann
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Montgomery Park, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999654453] [15-1988] John McCann
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John E. McCann, Jr. for Montgomery Park, LLC.[999654446] [15-1988] John McCann
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                        DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-01020-GLR. [15-1988] (ALC)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                          Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-01020-GLR. Case manager: ACarlheim. [15-1988] (ALC)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 184 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?