MITCHELL v. TILLERSON
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-01849

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 15, 2021 at 5:39 PM DT (1.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LA RUFUS MITCHELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LA RUFUS MITCHELL larufusmitchell@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Scott Oswald +1 202 261 2806 +1 202 261 2835 soswald@employmentlawgroup.net

Toggle Switch Represented by EDWARDS LEGAL GROUP, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christal E. Edwards +1 240 232 3122 +1 240 232 3169 cedwards@edwards-legal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Lee Vogelsang +1 202 261 2818 +1 202 261 2835 mvogelsang@employmentlawgroup.com
v.
No Logo John F. Kerry, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Senator - D-MA Marian L. Borum +1 703 562 2438 mborum@fdic.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Senator - D-MA Eric B. Beckenhauer +1 202 514 3338 +1 202 616 8470 eric.beckenhauer@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Rhonda Lisa Campbell +1 202 514 9519 +1 202 514 8780 rhonda.campbell@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Brian Matthew Collins +1 202 305 0428 +1 202 353 2021 brian.m.collins@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Kathleen Ann Connolly +1 202 305 8627 +1 202 307 8781 kathleen.a.connolly@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Carol Federighi +1 202 514 1903 +1 202 318 7597 carol.federighi@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Dillon Ariel Fishman +1 202 598 2377 dillon.a.fishman@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Heather D. Graham-Oliver +1 202 305 1334 +1 202 514 8180 heather.graham-oliver@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Wynne Patrick Kelly +1 202 305 9343 +1 202 514 8780 wynne.p.kelly@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Joshua M. Kolsky +1 202 252 2541 +1 202 514 8780 joshua.kolsky@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA William Mark Nebeker +1 202 514 7230 +1 202 514 8780 mark.nebeker@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Marissa A Piropato +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 marissa.piropato@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Joshua Samuel Press +1 202 305 0106 +1 202 305 7000 joshua.press@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Carl Ezekiel Ross +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 carl.ross@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Daniel Patrick Schaefer +1 202 252 2531 +1 202 252 2599 Daniel.Schaefer@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA April Denise Seabrook +1 202 252 2525 +1 202 252 2599 april.seabrook@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov
Senator - D-MA Davene Dashawn Walker +1 202 353 9213 +1 202 305 0506 davene.walker@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Labor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Senator - D-MA Geoffrey Forney +1 202 532 4329 +1 202 305 7000 forney.geoffrey@dol.gov
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL POMPEO"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Garrett Coyle +1 213 894 6167 +1 213 894 7819 garrett.coyle@usdoj.gov
, Christopher Walker Radcliffe +1 202 514 0265 +1 202 616 8460 Christopher.Radcliffe3@usdoj.gov
Tillerson, Rex W. Tillerson, Rex W., Defendant
Officially listed as "REX W. TILLERSON"
ExxonMobil Corporation Unknown Role, ExxonMobil Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Eric B. Beckenhauer +1 202 514 3338 +1 202 616 8470 eric.beckenhauer@usdoj.gov
, , , Garrett Coyle +1 213 894 6167 +1 213 894 7819 garrett.coyle@usdoj.gov
, Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov
, Christopher Walker Radcliffe +1 202 514 0265 +1 202 616 8460 Christopher.Radcliffe3@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 551
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (87) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: None Continue
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: None Continue
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Continue
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Mediation
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance- Pro Bono
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Mediation
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/31/2019, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/31/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MICHAEL POMPEO. Attorney Christopher Walker Radcliffe terminated. (Coyle, Garrett)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by MICHAEL POMPEO. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Garrett Coyle)(Coyle, Garrett)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018 Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by LA RUFUS MITCHELL (MITCHELL, LA RUFUS)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by LA RUFUS MITCHELL (Edwards, Christal) Modified on 4/27/2018 to correct docket event/text (jf).
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Walker Radcliffe on behalf of REX W. TILLERSON (Radcliffe, Christopher)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION to Quash Subpoena by LA RUFUS MITCHELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defender's First Request Of Production of Documents, # 2 Exhibit Letter to Defendant, # 3 Exhibit Defendant Subpoena)(MITCHELL, LA RUFUS)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . . MOTION to Quash Subpoena by LA RUFUS MITCHELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendant Subpoena for Shuman, # 2 Exhibit Expert Witness Letter to Defendant, # 3 Exhibit Defendant's First Set Of Request For Production of Documents)(MITCHELL, LA RUFUS) Modified on 4/18/2018 (td).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 45 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/05/2018. (lckbj1)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Joint MOTION for Protective Order [Amended] by REX W. TILLERSON (Attachments: # 1 Redline, # 2 Proposed Amended Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit A: Acknowledgement and Consent Form)(Coyle, Garrett)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Disclose Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Statement, To Complete Discovery, and of the Post-Discovery Status Conference by REX W. TILLERSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coyle, Garrett)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Garrett Joseph Coyle on behalf of REX W. TILLERSON Substituting for attorney Eric B. Beckenhauer (Coyle, Garrett)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 41 Motion to Amend Protective Order. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/27/2018. (lckbj1)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 29 Protective Order by REX W. TILLERSON (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order, # 2 Proposed Protective Order - Ex. A - Acknowledgment & Consent Form, # 3 Redline - Proposed Protective Order, # 4 Redline - Proposed Protective Order - Ex. A - Acknowledgment & Consent Form)(Beckenhauer, Eric)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) by LA RUFUS MITCHELL (MITCHELL, LA RUFUS)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding the Court's January 22, 2018, Minute Order by REX W. TILLERSON. (Beckenhauer, Eric)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              RESPONSE re 37 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by REX W. TILLERSON. (Beckenhauer, Eric)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct 29 Protective Order of May 9, 2017 by LA RUFUS MITCHELL (MITCHELL, LA RUFUS) Modified on 1/17/2018 (znmw).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Joint STATUS REPORT by REX W. TILLERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Renewed Meet and Confer Statement)(Beckenhauer, Eric)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 34 Proposed MOTION to Amend/Correct July 31, 2017 Mediation Order filed by REX W. TILLERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B)(Beckenhauer, Eric) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct July 31, 2017 Mediation Order by LA RUFUS MITCHELL (MITCHELL, LA RUFUS) Modified event title on 8/11/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson held on 3-23-17; Page Numbers: 1-34. Date of Issuance:8-7-17. Court Reporter/Transcriber Barbara DeVico, Telephone number 202-354-3118, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/7/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2017.(DeVico, Barbara) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Joint STATUS REPORT by REX W. TILLERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beckenhauer, Eric)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Joint STATUS REPORT by REX W. TILLERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beckenhauer, Eric)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 27 Motion for Order Under Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). See attached document. The parties' attention is directed to the edits that this Court made to paragraphs 5 and 6 of the proposed order. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on May 17, 2017. (lckbj2)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 26 Motion for Protective Order. See attached document. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on May 17, 2017. (lckbj2)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None CM/ECF Password
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for CM/ECF Password by LA RUFUS MITCHELL (jf) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Order under Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) by REX W. TILLERSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beckenhauer, Eric)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Protective Order by REX W. TILLERSON (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order, # 2 Proposed Protective Order - Ex. A - Acknowledgment & Consent Form)(Beckenhauer, Eric)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Beckenhauer, Eric)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for 5/16/2017 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/14/2016. (lckbj1)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by REX W. TILLERSON.(Beckenhauer, Eric)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: 3/23/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 8 Motion to Dismiss. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on March 23, 2017. (lckbj2)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Edward Gardner on behalf of All Defendants (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by LA RUFUS MITCHELL (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Counsel/Party)(Oswald, R.)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: 2/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by LA RUFUS MITCHELL (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Oswald, R.)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/1/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOHN F. KERRY. (Beckenhauer, Eric) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by JOHN F. KERRY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beckenhauer, Eric) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LA RUFUS MITCHELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Medical Records, # 2 Exhibit B- Vacancy Announcement, # 3 Exhibit C- Brochure, # 4 Exhibit D- Email Correspondence, # 5 Exhibit E- Training and Awards Score, # 6 Exhibit F- Letter, # 7 Exhibit G- Voucher, # 8 Exhibit H- Memorandum, # 9 Exhibit I- Pierce Complaint, # 10 Exhibit J- Recommendation, # 11 Exhibit K- Separation Documents, # 12 Exhibit L- Letter, # 13 Exhibit M- Letter, # 14 Exhibit N- Fitness Matrix, # 15 Exhibit O- Emails, # 16 Exhibit P- Email, # 17 Exhibit Q- Agency Decision, # 18 Exhibit R- Grievance Appeal, # 19 Exhibit S- DoS Opposition, # 20 Exhibit T- Supplemental Statement, # 21 Exhibit U- DoS Response, # 22 Exhibit V- Rebuttal, # 23 Exhibit W- Health Metrics Study)(Oswald, R.) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: 3/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael L. Vogelsang, Jr., :Firm- The Employment Law Group, :Address- 888 17th Street NW, 9th Floor. Phone No. - 202-261-2818. Fax No. - 202-261-2835 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4465971. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LA RUFUS MITCHELL (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Oswald, R.)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by LA RUFUS MITCHELL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oswald, R.)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibit B) filed by JOHN F. KERRY. re 11 Supplemental Memorandum filed by JOHN F. KERRY. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(znmw) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOHN F. KERRY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E)(znmw) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 9 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or, in the Alternative, for an Order Permitting Public Filing. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 03/16/2016. (lckbj1)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: 3/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by JOHN F. KERRY (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 SEALED Memorandum in Support of 8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, # 2 SEALED Ex. B, # 3 SEALED Ex. C, # 4 SEALED Ex. D, # 5 SEALED Ex. E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Beckenhauer, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: 3/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN F. KERRY (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A - Vacancy Announcement, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Beckenhauer, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: 1/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JOHN F. KERRY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beckenhauer, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: 1/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Eric B. Beckenhauer on behalf of JOHN F. KERRY Substituting for attorney Heather Graham-Oliver (Beckenhauer, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: 12/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Heather D. Graham-Oliver on behalf of JOHN F. KERRY (Graham-Oliver, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: 11/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/9/2015. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/8/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Oswald, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to JOHN F. KERRY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint filed by LA RUFUS MITCHELL. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by LA RUFUS MITCHELL. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Oswald, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: 10/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against JOHN F. KERRY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4299056) filed by LA RUFUS MITCHELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oswald, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 714 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?